DIVERSIFIED FOODS & SEASONINGS, INC. v. EASTERN MUSHROOM MARKETING COOPERATIVE, INC. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00638
Filed: February 10, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RECONSIDERATION [DOC. NO. 109 ), IS DENIED TO THE EXTENT THAT IT SEEKS RECONSIDERATION OF THE DECISION OF 3/26/2009, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/14/2014. 10/15/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
October 22, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE OBJECTIONS OF M.D. BASCIANI AND BFI ARE OVERRULED AND THE ORDER DATED 8/21/12 IS AFFIRMED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/22/12. ) 10/22/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 31, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED AND BFI'S MOTION TO QUASH IS DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/31/12. 2/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ti, )
March 26, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS (DOC #245), (DOC #239, (DOC 243) AND 251), (DOC #244), (DOC #246) (DOC #247) ARE DENIED. PLFFS' CROSS MOTIONFOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC #250) IS GRANTED. ALL OTHER MOTIONS TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST INDIVIDUAL DEFTS UNRELATED TO CAPPER-VOLSTEAD IMMUNITY ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLFFS MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC #27) IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. (. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 3/26/09. ) 3/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIVERSIFIED FOODS & SEASONINGS, INC. v. EASTERN MUSHROOM MARKETING COOPERATIVE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?