UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, DONALD M. HELLINGER, ROBERT DEBOYCE, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN, PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, MICHAEL WEISBERG and RANDY D. TROST
Petitioner: REP. JOSEPH SESTAK, REP. BARNEY FRANK, RICHARD M. MELTZER, JAMES WHITT, REP. EDWARD MARKEY, ANITRA WHITT, MARY FALONEY, IRWIN NATURALS and OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
Interested Party: WACHOVIA BANK, N.A. and FIRST LIBERTY, LLC
Receiver: WAYNE GEISSER
Case Number: 2:2006cv00725
Filed: February 17, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b).SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/29/15. 4/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
April 28, 2015 Filing 410 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by VIRGINIA A. GIBSON on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(GIBSON, VIRGINIA)
April 24, 2015 Filing 409 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by VIRGINIA A. GIBSON on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(GIBSON, VIRGINIA) *FILED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE CORRECTED WITHDRAWAL* Modified on 4/27/2015 (lisad, ).
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER THAT THE COURT ACCEPTS THAT RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT DATED 4/14/2015 & ORDERS THAT RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT IS ACCEPTED & FEE APPLICATION IS APPROVED, ETC. THE RECEIVER'S RESPONSIBILITIES HAVE BEEN COMPLETED & HE IS HEREBY RELEASED FROM ANY FURTHER DUTIES ASSOCIATED WITH THIS MATTER.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/15/15. 4/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
April 14, 2015 Filing 407 Final Report and Final Fee Application filed by WAYNE GEISSER.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GALLINARO, ANDREW) Modified on 4/15/2015 (lisad, ).
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER THAT THE COURT ACCEPTS RECEIVER'S INTERIM REPORT DATED 12/8/2014 & ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE RECEIVER SHALL DESTROY/DISPOSE OF THE PAPER & DIGITAL RECORDS OF PPC & THE FALONEY CLAIM FILES AS RECOMMENDED IN HIS INTERIM REPORT DATED 12/8/2014. RECEIVER SHALL FILE A FINAL REPORT & FEE APPLICATION UPON RESOLUTION OF THE RECORDS & ANY LEASE OBLIGATIONS.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/9/14. 12/11/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
December 8, 2014 Filing 405 Final Interim Report and Plan for Disposition of PPC Documents and Digital Devices filed by WAYNE GEISSER.Certificate of Service.(GALLINARO, ANDREW) Modified on 12/9/2014 (lisad, ).
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER THAT THE COURT ACCEPTS THE RECEIVER'S INTERIM REPORT DATED 1/31/2013, ETC. THE FEES & EXPENSES DETAILED IN THE ABOVE TABLE DUE TO SMART DEVINE AND CONRAD O'BRIEN ARE APPROVED & SHALL BE PAID ACCORDINGLY; THE RECEIVER SHALL REMIT $100,000 TO WELLS FARGO BANK AS A PARTIAL REVERSION OF THE RESERVE ESCROW ACCOUNT AS PROVIDED FOR IN THE COURT'S ORDERS OF 12/17/2010 & 12/19/2011, ETC. THE RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO REPLACE THE SINGLE FALONEY SETTLEMENT CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF #264.75 FROM AVAILABLE FUNDS.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 2/4/13. 2/5/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
January 31, 2013 Filing 403 Report Of Receiver and Fee Application #26 by WAYNE GEISSER. (GALLINARO, ANDREW)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER THAT THE COURT ACCEPTS THE RECEIVER'S INTERIM REPORT DATED 12/12/2011 & ORDERS THAT THE FEES & EXPENSES DETAILED IN THE ABOVE TABLE DUE TO SMART DEVINE & CONRAD O'BRIEN ARE APPROVED. THE RECEIVER SHALL CONTINUE TO MAINTAN THE AMOUNTS HELD IN THE RESERVE ESCROW ACCOUNT & CONRAD O'BRIEN SHALL CONTINUE TO HOLD IN ESCROW THE AMOUNTS PAID TO IT AS A RETAINER & UNTIL SUCH TIME AS ALL MATTERS ASSOCIATED WITH PPC ARE RESOLVED, ETC.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/19/11. 12/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
December 12, 2011 Filing 401 Report Of PPC Receiver and Interim Fee Application #25 by WAYNE GEISSER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GALLINARO, ANDREW)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER'S INTERIM REPORT IS ACCEPTED & FEE APPLICATION #24 IS APPROVED.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/12/11. 7/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 399 Report Of Receiver and Fee Application by WAYNE GEISSER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GALLINARO, ANDREW)
January 11, 2011 Copy of order dated 12/17/10 & envelope returned by U.S. Postal Service addressed to David A. Kotler for the following reason: Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. (kw, )
December 28, 2010 Filing 398 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JAMIE M. PEARLMAN RE: 12/17/2010 ORDER. (kp, )
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER APPROVING FINAL DISPOSITION OF PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER ESTATE FUNDS AND FEE APPLICATION #23. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE RECEIVER IS FOREVER RELEASED AND DISCHARGED FROM LIABILITY FOR ALLACTIONS ASSOCIATED WITH THE PPC ESATE AND THE FALONEY/HARRISON RESITITUTION /CLAIMS PROGRAM TAKEN TO DATE, AND EACH OF THE ACTIONS OUTLINED HEREIN IS APPROVED BY THE COURT AND SHALL BE DISCHARGED ACCORDINGLY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/17/2010. 12/20/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, MAILED, AND E-MAILED. (kp, )
December 16, 2010 Filing 396 Report Of Receiver, Notice of Disposition and Request for Fees by WAYNE GEISSER. (HAMILL, PATRICIA)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE RECEIVER'S APPLICATION, THE APPLICATION DESCRIBED ABOVE IS APPROVED AND THE RECIEVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES, IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/24/10. 8/25/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED PRO-SE, MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(dp, ) Modified on 8/30/2010 (dp, ).
August 19, 2010 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JAMIE M. PEARLMAN RE: ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF RESOLUTION. (kp, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED PLAN OF RESOLUTION IS HEREBY GRANTED. THE PLAN OF RESOLUTION IS APPROVED BY THE COURT AND THE RECEIVER IS DIRECTED TO EXECUTE THE STEPS OUTLINED IN THE PLAN OF RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/10/10.8/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 9, 2010 Filing 393 MOTION for Approval of Proposed Plan of Resolution filed by WAYNE GEISSER.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HAMILL, PATRICIA)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER, WAYNE D. GEISSER'S APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES BY HIS LETTER TO THE COURT DATED 4/23/10, THE APPLICATION IS APPROVED & RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES, IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/28/10. 4/29/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(kw, )
April 14, 2010 Filing 391 Certification of DEFT MICHAEL WEISBERG, re: Certain Facts. (kw, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RECEIVER'S APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES BY LETTER TO THE COURT DATED 11/30/09, THE APPLICATION IS APPROVED & RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES, IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/7/09. 12/10/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RECEIVER'S APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES BY LETTER TO THE COURT DATED 9/30/09, THE APPLICATION IS APPROVED & RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES, IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/2/09. 10/7/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER SHALL REIMBURSE MICHAEL DROSSNER IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,838, AS REASONABLE COMPENSATION AT THE RATE OF $215 PER HOUR FOR ALL LEGAL SERVICES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/22/09. 9/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER SHALL REIMBURSE MICHAEL DROSSNER IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,902.50, AS REASONABLE COMPENSATION AT THE RATE OF $215 PER HOUR FOR ALL LEGAL SERVICES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/16/09. 7/17/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
July 10, 2009 Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DROSSNER on behalf of PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC (DROSSNER, MICHAEL)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RECEIVER'S APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES BY LETTER TO THE COURT DATED 6/15/09, THE APPLICATION IS APPROVED & RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES, IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/19/09. 6/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER THAT WAYNE GEISSER, THE RECEIVER UNDER THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEREIN, IS DIRECTED TO PAY LEGAL FEES TO ANNE M. DIXON FOR 15.5 HOURS OF LAWYER SERVICES AT THE RATE OF $250.00 PER HOUR & FOR 1 HOUR OF LEGAL ASSISTANT SERVICES AT THE RATE OF $80.00 PER HOUR, FOR A TOTAL OF $3,955.00, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/29/09. 5/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED: COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFT.(kw, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER THAT ALL OUTSTANDING MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/30/09.3/31/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(stb, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION DESCRIBED ABOVE IS APPROVED & THE RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/4/09. 3/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER THAT THIS COURT AUTHORIZES THE RECEIVER TO RELEASE THE SUM OF $20,000.00 FOR PAYMENTS RELATED TO CERTAIN NON-CONSUMER CREDITOR CLAIMS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 2/17/09. 2/18/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S FEES AND EXPENSES & THAT RECEIVER BE PAID AN ADDITIONAL AMOUNT RELATING TO THE INCREASE IN HOURLY RATES, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/15/08. 12/17/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER THAT EFFECTIVE 4/25/08 THE HOURLY RATES FOR THE RECEIVER AND COUNSEL TO THE RECEIVER SHALL BE INCREASED AND IT IS ORDERED THAT THE RECEIVER BE PAID AN ADDITIONAL AMOUNT RELATING TO THE INCREASE IN HOURLY RATES, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/10/08. 12/12/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER THAT MOTION OF IRWIN NATURALS TO INTERVENE IN THIS ACTION (DOC. #377) IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/10/08.12/12/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 28, 2008 Filing 377 MOTION OF IRWIN NATURALS TO INTERVENE IN THIS ACTION, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(kw, )
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER THAT WAYNE GEISSER, THE RECEIVER UNDER THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEREIN, IS DIRECTED TO PAY LEGAL FEES TO ANNE M. DIXON IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,350.00 FOR REPRESENTATION OF MICHAEL WEISBERG PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 17 OF THE INJUNCTION, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/14/08. 10/15/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 375 CONSENT ORDER APPROVING PRELIMINARY RESTITUTION PROGRAM PURSUANT TO SECTION IV OF THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION BY CONSENT OF ALL DEFENDANTS ENTERED FEBRUARY 12, 2007, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/10/2008. 10/14/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds)
October 10, 2008 Filing 374 PROPOSED Consent Order Approving Preliminary Restitution Program Pursuant to Section IV of the Permanent Injunction by Consent of all Defendants Entered February 12, 2007 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Certificate of Service. (BLUME, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/14/2008 (fh)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER THAT MOTION OF ANN M. DIXON, ESQ., FOR PAYMENT OF LEGAL FEES PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 1 OF THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION & THE LACK OF OPPOSITION FROM THE RECEIVER OR THE U.S. ATTORNEY, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE RECEIVER SHALL REIMBURSE ANN M. DIXON THE AMOUNT OF $7,500 AS REASONABLE COMPENSATION AT THE RATE OF $250 PER HOUR FOR ALL LEGAL SERVICES RELATED TO HER ASSERTION OF PRIVILEGE & THE MOTION FILED ON 8/21/008, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/29/08. 9/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 19, 2008 Filing 372 Letter from Congress of the United States House of Representatives, dated 8/13/08, re: Method of distribution of restitution funds, etc. (kw, )
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT SHALL DOCKET THE LETTER ACCOMPANYING THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/19/08. 8/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2008: #1 Letter) (kw, ).
August 12, 2008 Filing 370 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MARC DURANT on behalf of RONALD HELLINGER, DONALD M. HELLINGER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DURANT, MARC) Modified on 8/13/2008 (afm, ).
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST BY COUNSEL FOR MICHAEL WEISBERG THAT THE ORDER DATED 8/4/2008 PERMITTING PERMANENT RECEIVER, WAYNE D. GEISSER, TO COMPLY WITH THE GRAND JURY SUBPOENA BE STAYED FOR A PERIOD OF 14-DAYS IS GRANTED. WAYNE D. GEISSER SHALL NOT TURN OVER THE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED IN THE GRAND JURY SUBPOENA BEFORE 8/22/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/8/2008. 8/11/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(mbh, )
August 7, 2008 Filing 368 MOTION to Enforce Permanent Injunction and in Opposition to the Government's Proposed Restitution Plan filed by RONALD HELLINGER.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DROSSNER, MICHAEL)
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST OF THE PERMANENT RECEIVER WAYNE D. GEISSER THAT HE BE PERMITTED TO COMPLY WITH THE SUBPOENA AND PROVIDE THE REQUESTED DOCUMENTS TO THE GRAND JURY IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS IS DENIED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/4/08.8/5/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ah)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS DONALD HELLINGER AND RONALD HELLINGER IS GRANTED (DOC. 357). MARC DURANT, SHARI AMSTER AND THE LAW FIRM OF DURANT & DURANT LLP, ARE GRANTED LEAVE AND PERMITTED TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DONALD HELLINGER AND RONALD HELLINGER, AND ARE RELEASED FROM ALL FUTHER PARTICIPATION IN THIS MATTER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/4/08. 8/5/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO SHELDON LUSTIGMAN, DAVID A. KOTLER, NIHILL & RIEDLEY, MARK ANDERSON, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN. COPIES E-MAILED TO ALL OTHER COUNSEL.(rf, )
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER THAT ROBB EVANS AND ASSOCIATES IS AUTHORIZED TO INCUR REASONABLE FEES AND OUT-OF-POCKET EXPENSES, INCLUDING LEGAL FEES OF OUTSIDE COUNSEL, UP TO $12,500 AT THE HOURLY RATES REPRESENTED TO THE RECEIVER AND THE COURT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/4/08. 8/5/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 4, 2008 Filing 364 MOTION to Enforce Permanent Injunction filed by JAMIE M. PEARLMAN.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(NASTASI, NICHOLAS)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S FEES AND EXPENSES APPLICATION #14 AND INCREASE IN HOURLY RATES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/1/08. 8/4/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
July 23, 2008 Filing 362 MOTION for Approval to Approve Payments to Robb Evans and Associates filed by WAYNE GEISSER.Certificate of Service.(HAMILL, PATRICIA)
July 21, 2008 Filing 361 Response to Motion to Stay All Proceedings with Certificate of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (BLUME, MICHAEL)
July 21, 2008 Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DROSSNER on behalf of RONALD HELLINGER (DROSSNER, MICHAEL)
July 10, 2008 Filing 359 NOTICE of Hearing:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/14/2008 AT 1:30 P.M. IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE.(cms)
July 1, 2008 Filing 358 RESPONSE in Support re #355 MOTION Seeking Resolution of Escrow of Certain Documents with Certificate of Service filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (BLUME, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2008 Filing 357 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by RONALD HELLINGER, DONALD M. HELLINGER.Certificate of Service.(DURANT, MARC)
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE GOVERNMENT'S PLAN IS STAYED. A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE SCHEDULED IN JULY, 2008, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/18/08. 6/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
June 19, 2008 Filing 355 MOTION Seeking Resolution of Escrow of Certain Documents filed by WAYNE GEISSER.Certificate of Service.(HAMILL, PATRICIA)
June 6, 2008 Filing 354 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Motion of Intervenors, the Faloney Plaintiffs, for Injunctive Relief filed by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAMONACA, VINCENT)
June 5, 2008 Filing 353 Government's Proposed Restitution Plan Pursuant to Permanent Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A-J)(BLUME, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/6/2008 (afm, ).
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS DESIGN A NOTICE & CLAIMS PROCEDURE & A PLAN FOR THE ALLOCATION OF THE CONSUMER FUND, ETC. PARTIES SHALL WITHIN 14 DAYS SUBMIT ANY COMMENT ON THE PROCEDURE & PLAN BEFORE THE COURT CONSIDERS IT FOR FINAL APPROVAL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/30/08. 6/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
May 29, 2008 Filing 351 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE INTERVENOR FALONEY PLFFS' MOTION FOR AN INJUNCTION UNDER THE ALL WRITS ACT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED), FILED BY REPRESENTATIVES BARNEY FRANK, EDWARD MARKEY, & JOSEPH SESTAK.(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2008: #1 Brief) (kw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2008: #2 Exhibits) (kw, ).
May 29, 2008 Filing 350 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #349 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by MARY FALONEY, Certificate of Service. (LANGER, HOWARD) Modified on 5/30/2008 (nd).
May 27, 2008 Filing 349 MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION OF INTERVENORS, THE FALONEY PLFFS, FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY.(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2008: #1 Proposed Order) (kw, ).
May 9, 2008 Filing 348 Proposed Form of Order Injunction re #347 MOTION to Enjoin Government Pursuant to All Writs Act filed by MARY FALONEY..(DIVER, EDWARD) Modified on 5/12/2008 (nd).
May 9, 2008 Filing 347 MOTION to Enjoin Government Pursuant to All Writs Act filed by MARY FALONEY, JAMES WHITT, ANITRA WHITT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Exhibit C - I, #3 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion, #4 Certificate of Service)(LANGER, HOWARD)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER THAT APPLICATION BY RECEIVER, WAYNE D. GEISSER, FOR FEES & EXPENSES IS APPROVED & THE RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/19/08. 3/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 3/11/08. 3/11/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 344 STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING FALONEY PLAINTIFFS TO PARTICIPATE IN PROCEEDINGS DESCRIBED IN SECTION IV OF THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/5/08. 2/6/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, )
February 6, 2008 Filing 343 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ALEXANDRA C. GAUGLER on behalf of MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY(GAUGLER, ALEXANDRA)
January 17, 2008 Filing 342 Certification of DEFT RANDY D. TROST, re: Certain Facts. (kw, )
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER THAT ALL COUNSEL IN THIS MATTER ARE REQUIRED TO REGISTER AS ELECTRONIC CASE FILING USERS, ETC. COUNSEL ARE ADVISED THAT ALL FUTURE NOTICES & ORDERS BY THE COURT WILL BE TRANSMITTED TO COUNSEL THROUGH THE ECF SYSTEM ONLY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/16/08. 1/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
January 17, 2008 Filing 340 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ALEXANDRA C. GAUGLER on behalf of PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC(GAUGLER, ALEXANDRA)
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO MOTION TO INTERVENE ON OR BEFORE 2/5/2008.) SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/15/08. 1/16/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 338 MOTION TO INTERVENE, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY MARY FALONEY, JAMES WHITT, ANITRA WHITT.(kw, )
January 10, 2008 Filing 337 Certification of DEFT RONALD HELLINGER, re: Certain Facts. (kw, )
January 10, 2008 Filing 336 Certification of DEFT MICHAEL WEISBERG, re: Certain Facts. (kw, )
January 10, 2008 Filing 335 Certification of DEFT DONALD M. HELLINGER, re: Certain Facts. (kw, )
January 9, 2008 Filing 334 AFFIDAVIT Cerfitication of Michelle O'Keefe Quigley by MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY. (BENEDETTI, GINO)
January 8, 2008 Filing 333 AFFIDAVIT by JAMIE M. PEARLMAN. (NASTASI, NICHOLAS)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER THAT RECEIVER'S APPLICATION IS APPROVED & RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/11/07. 12/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER REPORT DATED 11/6/07, WHICH IS ATTACHED HERETO, BE ACCEPTED & ENTERED AS A PUBLIC RECORD. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/7/07. 11/9/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER THAT RECEIVER SHALL PAY FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER FUNDS THE AMOUNTS AS DETAILED ON ATTACHED ATTACHMENT A. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/17/07. 10/18/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION DESCRIBED ABOVE IS APPROVED & THE RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/17/07. 10/18/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER THAT THE RELEASE & SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN WACHOVIA BANK N.A. & WAYNE GEISSER, RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER AND IS APPROVED AND IS EFFECTIVE UPON THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/10/07. 10/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER SHALL PAY FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER FUNDS THE AMOUNTS AS DETAILED ON ATTACHED EXHIBIT A. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE )8/27/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & IT SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC FUNDS, THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/22/07. 8/23/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER THAT THE PPC RECEIVER SHALL REIMBURSE NSF CHECK RECOVERY $30,014, ETC. THE $30,041 WILL BE CREDITED AGAINST THE $79,330.51 RECEIVABLE OWED TO THE PPC RECEIVER BY NSF, REDUCING THE AMOUNT OWED TO $49,289.51, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/8/07. 8/9/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 26, 2007 Filing 324 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 7/25/07. (kw, )
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER THAT RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY MONTHLY OPERATING EXPENSES NOT TO EXCEED $2,000 PER MONTH. ALL ADDITIONAL EXPENSES SHALL BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR APPROVAL OF PAYMENT AUTHORITY BEFORE DISPERSAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/26/07. 7/27/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
July 17, 2007 Filing 322 NOTICE of Hearing:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/25/2007 AT 1:30 P.M. IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. NOTICE FAXED ON 7/13/07.(cms)
June 15, 2007 Filing 321 NOTICE of Hearing:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/25/2007 AT 1:30 P.M. IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. NOTICE FAXED TO COUNSEL ON 6/15/07.(cms)
June 6, 2007 Filing 320 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 6/5/07. (kw, )
June 6, 2007 Filing 319 NOTICE of Hearing:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/19/2007 and 6/20/07 AT 9:00 A.M. IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. NOTICE FAXED TO COUNSEL ON 6/6/07.(cms)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S FEES AND EXPENSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION BY CONSENT OF ALL DEFENDANTS #304 AND THE RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/31/2007. 6/4/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nda)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER SHALL PAY FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER FUNDS THE AMOUNTS AS DETAILED ON ATTACHED EXHIBIT A. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/17/07. 5/21/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 30, 2007 Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/18/06 before Judge RICE. Court Reporter: JERRY LAROSA, JR.. HEARING (jl, )
April 30, 2007 Filing 315 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/17/06 before Judge RICE. Court Reporter: JERRY LAROSA, JR.. HEARING (jl, )
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S 12/15/06, 3/9/07, & 3/21/07 ORDERS ARE AMENDED TO AUTHORIZE THE PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM PNC ACCOUNT NO. XXXX3953; & ALL AMOUNTS AUTHORIZED IN THIS COURT'S 12/15/06, 3/9/07, & 3/21/07 ORDERS SHALL REMAIN UNCHANGED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/10/07. 4/10/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS SUBMITTED BY RECEIVER, WAYNE D. GEISSER, FOR FEES & EXPENSES ARE APPROVED & RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO PAY THE INVOICES IN THE AMOUNTS LISTED, FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC FUNDS. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/2/07. 4/4/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (le, ).
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH PAYMENT FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/21/07. 3/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2007 (kw, ).
March 12, 2007 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA M. HAMILL on behalf of WAYNE GEISSER with Certificate of Service(HAMILL, PATRICIA)
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, AND PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/9/2007. 3/12/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(nda, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (jl, ).
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATIONS ENTERED 3/22/06 & 4/4/06 REGARDING PAYMENT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES & EXPENSES INCURRED IN DEFENSE OF DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, IT IS ORDERED THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH PAYMENT FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/15/06. 3/8/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF RECEIVER'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES & EXPENSES, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT APPLICATION IS APPROVED & THE RECEIVER IS AUTHORIZED TO BE PAID THE SUM OF $47,328.30 FROM PPC ASSETS HELD BY THE RECEIVER ON BEHALF OF PPC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/2/07. 3/5/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2007 (ap, ).
March 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER THAT THE RECEIVER SHALL SUBMIT PERIODIC REPORTS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICE AS HE DIRECTS. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/1/07. 3/2/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
February 21, 2007 Filing 306 Certified copy of order from USCA, dated 2/21/07, as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, that the foregoing motion by petitioners for voluntary dismissal of petition for writ of mandamus is granted. The petition for writ of mandamus is dismissed pursuant to Rule 42(b), F.R.A.P. (kw, )
February 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER MAY BE CLOSED STATISTICALLY. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/13/07. 2/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
February 12, 2007 Filing 304 PERMANENT INJUNCTION BY CONSENT OF ALL DEFENDANTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/8/07. 2/9/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(mac, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2007 (kw, ).
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATIONS ENTERED 3/22/06 & 4/4/06 REGARDING PAYMENT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES & EXPENSES INCURRED IN DEFENSE OF DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH PAYMENT FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 2/5/07. 2/6/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER THAT DISBURSEMENTS BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BUDGET & THAT FUNDS TOTALING NOT MORE THAN $12,000 BE TRANSFERRED BY CHECK FROM THE MONITOR'S ESCROW ACCOUNT TO THE PPC OPERATING ACCOUNT AT BANK OF AMERICA, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/30/07. 1/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (kw, ).
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER THAT MONITOR'S APPLICATION IS APPROVED & THE MONITOR IS AUTHORIZED TO BE PAID THE SUM OF $46,821.64 FOR FEES & EXPENSES FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, WASHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 200013369529. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/25/07. 1/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (kw, ).
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06 SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: PNC BANK SHALL WIRE TRANSER $115,000 FROM THE ACCOUNT OF MICHAEL WEISBERG TO THE DECHERT LLP TRUST ACCOUNT AT REPUBLIC FIRST BANK, ETC. COMMERCE BANK SHALL WIRE TRANSFER $25,000 FROM THE ACCOUNT OF MICHELE QUIGLEY TO THE DECHERT LLP TRUST ACCOUNT AT REPUBLIC FIRST BANK, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/23/07. 1/24/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (kw, ).
January 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER, PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S 7/26 AND 8/24/06 ORDERS AND AFTER REVIEWING IN CAMERA, THE BILLING RECORDS OF MILLER, ALFANO & RASPANTI, PC TO DETERMINE WHETHER THE INVOICED FEES WERE REASONABLE, THAT MICHELE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY $1,152.61 FROM COMMERCE BANK ACCT. NO. 0367773447 TO MILLER, ALFANO & RASPANTI, PC FOR THE LEGAL FEES AND COSTS INCURED IN HER DEFENSE FOR THE MONTH OF 12/06. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/11/07. 1/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jmp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2007 (jmv, ).
January 10, 2007 Filing 298 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 1/9/07. (kw, )
January 4, 2007 Filing 297 NOTICE of Hearing:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR TUESDAY, 1/9/2007 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. (cms)
January 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO "LIMIT THE SCOPE OF THE ASSET FREEZE" (DOC. NO. 189) AND DEFTS' MOTION TO "DISSOLVE THE ASSET FREEZE" (DOC NO. 268) ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/3/07.1/4/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (jmp, )
January 3, 2007 Filing 295 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Telephone Conference held on 1/3/07. (le, )
January 3, 2007 Filing 294 Declaration OF RICHARD ZAYAS, CPA TO SHOW COMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATION FOR TRANSFER OF ADDITIONAL FUNDS TO REFUND AND PAYMENT OF REFUNDS ENTERED 11/1/06. (jl, )
December 28, 2006 Filing 293 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE STATUS SET FOR 1/3/2007 10:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE CALL.(gk, )
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES FOR PERIOD 10/30/06 THROUGH 12/1/06 BY LETTER TO THE COURT DATED 12/18/06, IS APPROVED & THE MONITOR IS AUTHORIZED TO BE PAID THE SUM OF $35,754.40 FOR FEES & EXPENSES FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/22/06. 12/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 21, 2006 Filing 291 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 12/21/06. (kw, )
December 20, 2006 Filing 290 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 12/18/06. (kw, )
December 20, 2006 Filing 289 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 12/15/06. (kw, )
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER THAT DEFT MICHAEL WEISBERG'S MOTION FOR COMPENSATION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/18/06.12/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, )
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/19/06.12/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, )
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH PAYMENT FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/17/06. 12/15/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER THAT MICHELE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY $6,782.77 FROM COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. 0367773447 TO MILLER, ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C. FOR THE LEGAL FEES INCURRED IN HER DEFENSE FOR THE MONTH OF OCTOBER, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/14/06. 12/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 284 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: PPC SHALL CAUSE THE ISSUANCE OF REFUND CHECKS TO THE CONSUMERS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULE A OF THIS STIPULATION NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION ON THE COURT'S DOCKET. WACHOVIA SHALL TRANSFER $1,036.35 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018853797 TO PPC'S WACHOVIA ACOUNT NO. 2000018538274, WHICH IS THE ACCOUNT PPC USES TO PAY CONSUMER REFUNDS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/12/06. 12/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 12, 2006 Filing 283 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 12/11/06. (kw, )
December 8, 2006 Filing 282 Memorandum in Opposition re #260 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ANDERSON, MARK)
December 8, 2006 Filing 281 Memorandum re #268 MOTION to Dissolve Asset Freeze with Certificate of Service and Service List filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(ANDERSON, MARK)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO STAY THE TIME FOR ALL DEFTS TO ANSWER THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: DEFTS ARE NOT REQUIRED TO ANSWER THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AT THE PRESENT TIME, ETC. ON BEHALF OF DEFTS, COUNSEL FOR PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER SHALL PROVIDE THE COURT WITH A STATUS UPDATE REGARDING THE PENDING PETITION FOR MANDAMUS ON 1/3/07. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/5/06. 12/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER THAT GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR AN ETENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PPC'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY IS GRANTED & RESPONSE SHALL BE SUBMITTED NO LATER THAN 12/8/2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/4/06. 12/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER THAT GOVERNMENT'S 12/1/06 LETTER REQUESTING THIS COURT VACATE ITS ORDER APPROVING PPC'S DECEMBER BUDGET & HOLD A CONFERENCE IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/4/06. 12/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER THAT DISBURSEMENTS BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BUDGET & THAT FUNDS TOTALING NOT MORE THAN $24,407 BE TRANSFERRED BY CHECK FROM THE MONITOR'S ESCROW ACCOUNT TO THE PPC OPERATING ACCOUNT AT BANK OF AMERICA, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/28/06. 12/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: PPC HAS PREPARED A SCHEDULE IDENTIFYING THE CONSUMERS WHO REQUESTED REFUNDS FROM 8/19/06 TO 10/25/06. ON OR ABOUT 11/22/06, THE MONITOR APPROVED PAYMENT OF REFUNDS TO THE CONSUMERS & IN THE AMOUNTS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A FOR A TOTAL AMOUNT OF $6,655.00, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/27/06. 11/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER THAT DEFTS' APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES IS APPROVED & THE MONITOR IS AUTHORIZED TO BE PAID THE SUM OF $37,243.55 FOR FEES & EXPENSES FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 200013369529. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/22/06. 11/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER THAT MICHAEL WEISBERG'S MOTION FOR COMPENSATION IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/21/06. 11/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 21, 2006 Mail Returned Notice of Hearing dated 11/9/2006, not deliverable as addressed unable to forward as to Defendant, Jamie M. Pearlman. (nda, )
November 20, 2006 Filing 272 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/9/2006 before Judge PADOVA. Court Reporter: JENNIFFER CABRERA. (nda, )
November 17, 2006 Filing 273 MOTION FOR COMPENSATION FOR SERVICES RENDERED TO PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL WEISBERG.(kw, )
November 16, 2006 Filing 271 Defts' Reply in support of their motion to stay the time to answer the amended complaint, filed by DEFTS MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, ROBERT DEBOYCE, PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, DONALD M. HELLINGER, MICHAEL WEISBERG, RANDY D. TROST, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN. (See Paper #253 for attachment) (kw, )
November 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MOTION TO STAY THE TIME FOR ALL DEFTS TO ANSWER THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. THE REPLY BRIEF ANNEXED TO THEIR MOTION SHALL BE DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/16/06.11/17/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, )
November 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER THAT MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY $7,458.19 FROM COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. 0367773447 TO MILLER, ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C., ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/16/06. 11/17/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 15, 2006 Filing 268 MOTION to Dissolve Asset Freeze filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(WESTBROOK, SARAH)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER THAT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/9/06. 11/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 266 CONSENT ORDER THAT THE GOVERNMENT SHALL NOT TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF RICHARD MELTZER IN CONNECTION WITH THIS ACTION UNTIL THERE HAS BEEN A FINAL RULING BY THE COURT ON THE APPLICABILITY OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE OR THE ATTORNEY WORK-PRODUCT DOCTRINE ASSERTED BY ANY DEFT TO THE DISCLOSURE OF COMMUNICATIONS BETWEEN RICHARD MELTZER & ANY SUCH DEFT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/9/06. 11/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 13, 2006 Filing 265 Minute Entry, re: Status Conference held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 11/9/06. Ruling: An order is to follow. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
November 9, 2006 Filing 263 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #189 MOTION Limit the Scope of the Asset Freeze: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 11/30/2006 01:30 PM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gk, )
November 9, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #189 MOTION Limit the Scope of the Asset Freeze. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 11/30/2006 01:30 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (afm, )
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ACCOUNTS OF PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC SHALL BE CONVERTED TO INTEREST-BEARING MONEY MARKET ACCOUNTS TO BE MAINTAINED BY WACHOVIA, ETC. EACH MONEY MARKET ACCOUNT WILL ACCRUE INTEREST AT A GUARANTEED RATE OF 5.25% FOR 90 DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/8/06. 11/9/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT WACHOVIA'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY & TO EXEMPT WACHOVIA FROM THE 4/7/06 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/8/06. 11/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH PAYMENT FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/8/06. 11/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 8, 2006 Filing 260 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B#2 Exhibit C-E)(WESTBROOK, SARAH)
November 3, 2006 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE M. DIXON, ESQ. on behalf of DEFT MICHAEL WEISBERG. (kw, )
November 3, 2006 Filing 258 Memorandum Post Hearing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Modified - All Accounts#2 Exhibit C- Modified - Account No. 797 Only#3 Exhibit E - All PPC Accounts) (ANDERSON, MARK)
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 257 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER THAT THE COURT'S RESTRAINTS ON PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER'S ASSETS SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT WACHOVIA TO CHARGEBACK $513,625.00 AGAINST ACCOUNT NO. 2000018853797 FOR RETURNED CHECKS. ANY PARTY OBJECTING TO THIS CONSENT DECREE SHALL FILE A MEMORANDUM WITHIN 5 DAYS OF THE ENTRY DATE OF THIS CONSENT DECREE SETTING FORTH THE BASIS FOR THE OBJECTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/1/06. 11/3/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO STAY THE TIME FOR ALL DEFTS TO ANSWER THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: DEFTS HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS IN WHICH TO FILE THEIR ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/31/06.11/2/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, )
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 255 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PPC PROCESSED CERTAIN DRAFTS FOR ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING ENTITIES: UNIVERSAL PREMIUM SERVICES,INC. CONSUMER REWARDS NETWORK, INC. STAR COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, ETC. THE STAR COMPANIES ARE SUBJECT TO AN INJUNCTION IMPOSED BY JUDGE S. JAMES OTERO OF THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, ETC. THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF REFUNDS PAYMENTS PERMITTED TO BE MADE ON BEHALF OF THE STAR COMMUNICATION COMPANIES IS $105,000. WACHOIVA BANK SHALL WIRE $105,000 FROM PPC'S ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529 TO PPC'S ACCOUNT NO. 2000018538274, WHICH IS THE ACCOUNT PPC USES TO PAY CONSUMER REFUNDS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/31/06. 11/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, )
November 1, 2006 Filing 254 Proposed Consent Decree filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ANDERSON, MARK) Modified on 11/2/2006 (np).
October 30, 2006 Filing 253 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay the Time for All Defendants to Answer the Amended Complaint filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, ROBERT DEBOYCE, DONALD M. HELLINGER, RONALD HELLINGER, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN, MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RANDY D. TROST, MICHAEL WEISBERG, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(WESTBROOK, SARAH) Modified on 11/1/2006 (md).
October 27, 2006 Filing 252 Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay the Time for All Defendants to Answer the Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SWEET, JOEL)
October 27, 2006 Filing 251 Statement (Post-Hearing Memorandum) by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LAMONACA, VINCENT)
October 26, 2006 Filing 250 Certified copy of Order from USCA, dated 10/26/06, as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, that the foregoing motion for expedited appeal is denied as moot, as we hereby dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. (kw, )
October 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER THAT MICHELLE O'KEEKE QUIGLEY SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY $3,227.60 FROM COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. 0367773447 TO MILLER, ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C., ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/23/06. 10/25/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 24, 2006 Filing 248 MOTION to Stay the Time for All Defendants to Answer the Amended Complaint filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC., ROBERT DEBOYCE, DONALD M. HELLINGER, RONALD HELLINGER, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN, MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RANDY D. TROST, MICHAEL WEISBERG, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D) (WESTBROOK, SARAH) Modified on 10/27/2006 (np).
October 24, 2006 Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 10/10/06. (ESR) (kw, )
October 23, 2006 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID E. SHAPIRO, ESQ. on behalf of RICHARD M. MELTZER, Affidavit of Service. (kw, )
October 23, 2006 Filing 245 MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c), AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, FILED BY RICHARD M. MELTZER.(kw, )
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER THAT DISBURSEMENTS BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BUDGET & THAT FUNDS TOTALING $16,379 BE TRANSFERRED BY CHECK FROM THE MONITOR'S ESCROW ACCOUNT TO THE PPC OPERATING ACCOUNT AT BANK OF AMERICA. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/18/06. 10/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 243 CONSENT ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 30(a)(2)(A), PARTIES HEREBY STIPULATE THAT MORE THAN 10 CONSUMERS MAY BE DEPOSED IN ACCORDANCE THE TERMS & CONDITIONS SET FORTH IN THIS CONSENT ORDER, ETC. PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 30(b)(7), PARTIES HEREBY STIPULATE THAT DEPOSITIONS OF CONSUMERS MAY BE TAKEN "BY TELEPHONE OR OTHER REMOTE ELETRONIC MEANS" IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS & CONDITIONS SET FORTH IN THIS CONSENT ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/18/06. 10/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
October 18, 2006 Filing 242 Minute Entry, re: Evidentiary hearing held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 10/17/2006. (kw, )
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY & INDISPENSABLE PARTIES, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING PLFF TO JOIN ALL NECESSARY PARTIES IS DENIED. DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD FRAUD WITH PARTICULARITY IS GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO PARAGRAPH 335 OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC. PLFF MAY FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT CURING THE DEFICIENCY IN PARAGRAPH 335 OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 10/30/2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/18/06. 10/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 16, 2006 Filing 240 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LAMONACA, VINCENT)
October 13, 2006 Filing 239 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA United States of America's Prehearing Statement Regarding Wachovia Bank's Claims to Money in PPC Account with Certificate of Service. (ANDERSON, MARK)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A TEMPORARY RECEIVER IS DENIED BASED ON THE FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW STATED IN OPEN COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/11/06.10/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, )
October 5, 2006 Filing 237 AFFIDAVIT of Ronald Hellinger To Show Compliance With Stipulation For Transfer of Additional Funds To Refund Accout and Payment of Refunds Entered September 11, 2006 by RONALD HELLINGER. (LUSTIGMAN, ANDREW)
October 2, 2006 Filing 236 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/21/2006 before Judge RICE. Court Reporter: Inna Goldshteyn. (nda, )
September 29, 2006 Filing 235 Letter from Andrew B. Lustigman, dated 9/28/06, re: Response to Joel Sweet's letter regarding the returned checks located at PPC, which have been maintained there before & since the initiation of this action, etc. (See Paper 234) (kw, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER THAT DEFTS SHALL PRODUCE TO WAYNE GEISSER, CPA, THE COURT-APPOINTED MONITOR IN THIS ACTION, & MR. GEISSER SHALL TAKE IMMEDIATE POSSESSION OF, ALL OF THE BANK DRAFTS PROCESSED BY PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC THAT HAVE BEEN RETURNED TO PPC FOR ANY REASON, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/28/06. 10/2/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 29, 2006 Filing 233 AFFIDAVIT to Show Compliance with Stipulation and Transfer of Additional Funds to Refund Account and Payment of Refunds Entered September 11,2006 by DONALD M. HELLINGER. (LUSTIGMAN, ANDREW)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 232 AMENDED ORDER THAT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING TO ADDRESS THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO APPOINT A RECEIVER IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON 10/10/2006 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3G, BEFORE THE HON. TIMOTHY R. RICE, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/25/06. 9/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER THAT MOTION TO STAY HEARING IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/21/06. 9/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S 9/15/06 ORDER IS AMENDED TO AUTHORIZE THE PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529; & ALL AMOUNTS AUTHORIZED IN THIS COURT'S 9/15/06 ORDER SHALL REMAIN UNCHANGED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/21/06. 9/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATION ENTERED 3/22/06 & 4/4/06 RETGARDING PAYMENT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES & EXPENSES INCURRED IN DEFENSE OF DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, IT IS ORDERED THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH PAYMENT FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/21/06. 9/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER THAT MICHELE QUIGLEY SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY $11,024.26 FROM COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. 0367773447 TO MILLER, ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C. FOR THE LEGAL EXPENSES INCURRED IN HER DEFENSE DURING 8/2006, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/21/06. 9/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER THAT GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO STAY HEARING CONCERNING NON-PARTY WACHOVIA BANK'S APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF RESTRAINED FUNDS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/21/06.9/22/206 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, )
September 21, 2006 Filing 226 Minute Entry, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 9/21/06. (kw, )
September 21, 2006 Filing 225 MOTION to Stay Hearing Concerning Non-Party Wachovia Bank's Application for Release of Restrained Funds filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service.(SWEET, JOEL)
September 18, 2006 Filing 224 REPLY in Further Support of Motion re #189 MOTION Limit the Scope of the Asset Freeze filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC., Certificate of Service. (WESTBROOK, SARAH) Modified on 9/21/2006 (np).
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER THAT MONITOR'S APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES IS APPROVED & THE MONITOR IS AUTHORIZED TO BE PAID THE SUM OF $40,445.40 FOR FEES & EXPENSES FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 200013369422, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/15/06. 9/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 13, 2006 Filing 222 Copy of TPO Form re #201 Notice of Appeal. (kw, )
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PPC HAS PREPARED A SCHEDULE IDENTIFYING THE INDIVIDUALS WHO REQUESTED REFUNDS FROM 7/5/06 TO 8/18/06, ETC. PPC SHALL CAUSE ISSUANCE OF REFUNDS CHECKS TO THE INDIVIDUALS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULE A OF THIS STIPULATION NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION ON THE COURT'S DOCKET, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/12/06. 9/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 12, 2006 Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/7/06 before Judge PADOVA. Court Reporter: JEN CABRERA. STATUS HEARING (jl, )
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PPC SHALL CAUSE THE ISSUANCE OF REFUNDS TO THE INDIVIDUALS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULES A & B OF THIS STIPULATION NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION ON THE COURT'S DOCKET. WACHOVIA SHALL TRANSFER $15,986.95 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529 TO PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018538274, WHICH IS THE ACCOUNT PPC USES TO PAY CONSUMER REFUNDS, ETC. WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, PPC SHALL FILE WITH THE COURT A NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RESPECT TO THIS STIPULATED ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/11/06. 9/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. DEFTS MAY FILE A REPLY TO PLFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION TO LIMIT THE SCOPE OF THE ASSET FREEZE BY 9/18/06. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 11/13/2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/11/06. 9/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 11, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines: REPLIES DUE BY 9/18/2006. (kw, )
September 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER THAT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING WILL BE HELD AT 9:30 A.M. ON 10/17/2006 & 10/18/2006 IN COURTROOM 3G TO ADDRESS WACHOVIA BANK, N.A.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY FILED 5/24/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/7/06. 9/11/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER THAT PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/5/06 IS CANCELLED; & A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/9/2006 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 17B. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/7/06. 9/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CONSENT ORDER THAT ALL PARTY DISCOVERY SHALL BE STAYED PENDING FINAL APPELLATE RESOLUTION OF THE 8/14/06 ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DENYING DEFTS' MOTION TO PRESERVE INDIVIDUALS' FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS. PLFF SHALL RESPOND TO THE OUTSTANDING INTERROGATORIES SERVED BY DEFT PPC BY NO LATER THAN 9/20/06, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/7/06. 9/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
September 7, 2006 Filing 214 Minute Entry Status Conference proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Counsel addresses the Court. An Order is to follow.Status Conference held on 9/7/2006. Court Reporter: JENNIFFER CABRERA. (nda, )
September 1, 2006 Filing 213 Reply Memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss plff's amended complaint, filed by DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. (See Paper #206 for attachment) (kw, )
September 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THE MEMORANDUM ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 1 TO SAID MOTION ON THE DOCKET. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/1/06.9/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, )
August 31, 2006 Filing 211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION Limit the Scope of the Asset Freeze with Certificate of Service filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(SWEET, JOEL)
August 30, 2006 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #201 Notice of Appeal filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. USCA Case Number 06-3898 (kw, )
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COMMERCE BANK SHALL DISBURSE BY CHECK PAYABLE TO MEYERSON & O'NEILL THE BALANCE OF FIRST LIBERTY'S COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. 0365739051 ($57,066.58), ETC. BY ENTERING THIS STIPULATION, EACH PARTY HERETO EXPRESSLY ACKNOWLEDGES THAT THE STIPULATION IS BASED UPON FIRST LIBERTY'S EVIDENTIARY DEMONSTRATION THAT THE FUNDS IN THE ACCOUNT REPRESENT REIMBURSEMENTS BY PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER TO FIRST LIBERTY FOR SALARIES & HEALTH CARE BENEFITS FOR FIRST LIBERTY EMPLOYEES WHO PROVIDED ACCOUNTING & COMPUTER SERVICES TO PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, OFFICE SUPPLIES, & EQUIPMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/28/06. 8/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER THAT QUIGLEY'S APPLICATION FOR A REASONABLE LIVING ALLOWANCE IS DENIED. QUIGLEY'S APPLICATION FOR PAYMENT OF LEGAL FEES IS GRANTED IN PART, ETC. QUIGLEY SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY $10,475.87 FROM COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. 0367773447 TO MILLER ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C. FOR THE LEGAL FEES INCURRED FROM 5/4/06 TO 7/31/06, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/24/06. 8/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 25, 2006 Filing 208 EXHIBITS to plff's first Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures, filed by PLFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (kw, )
August 25, 2006 Filing 207 Memorandum in Support re #108 MOTION for Relief from Stay and to Exempt Wachovia Bank, N.A. from the April 7, 2006 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order as to All Defendants (Hearing Memorandum) filed by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A.. (LAMONACA, VINCENT)
August 25, 2006 Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(HOWARD, DAVID)
August 25, 2006 Filing 205 Disclosure with PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(Exhibits to filed in Hard Copy).(SWEET, JOEL) Modified on 8/25/2006 (rs, ).
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER THAT DEFT QUIGLEY'S APPLICATION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES & LIVING ALLOWANCE (DOC. #196) IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/23/06. 8/25/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 25, 2006 Filing 202 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Depositions of PPC and the Individual Defendants Pending Appeal filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B through E)(HOWARD, DAVID)
August 25, 2006 U.S.C.A. Filing fee: $455.00, receipt number 931798 (kw, )
August 24, 2006 Filing 203 Clerk's Notice to USCA, re: #201 Notice of Appeal. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2006 (kw, ).
August 24, 2006 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEAL by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and DAVID M. HOWARD, Certificate of Service. (HOWARD, DAVID) Modified on 8/25/2006 (np).
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S 8/8/06 ORDER IS AMENDED TO AUTHORIZE THE PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369529; & ALL AMOUNTS AUTHORIZED IN THIS COURT'S 8/8/06 ORDER SHALL REMAIN UNCHANGED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/22/06. 8/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL MAKE THEIR RULE 26 DISCLOSURES BY 8/25/06 CONCERNING THE IDENTITY OF INDIVIDUALS LIKELY HAVING DISCOVERABLE INFORMATION UPON WHICH EACH PARTY MAY RELY, FOUND IN ITEM I, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/21/06. 8/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 22, 2006 Filing 198 Response in Opposition of the United States of America to Defendant Quigley's Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Living Allowance with Certificate of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SWEET, JOEL)
August 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER THAT THE BUDGET ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT A IS APPROVED WITH THE UNDERSTANDING IT MAY BE FUNDED WITHOUT THE TRANSFER OF ADDITIONAL FROZEN PPC ASSETS AND WILL BE FUNDED FROM FUNDS PREVIOUSLY RELEASED TO THE MONITOR FOR EMERGENCY FUNDING REQUIREMENTS; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DISBURSEMENTS BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BUDGET, SUBJECT TO ALL OTHER PROVISIONS OF THE STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/18/06. ) 8/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, )
August 15, 2006 Filing 196 JOINT APPLICATION for the payment of legal fees & costs & a reasonable living allowance, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY. (kw, )
August 14, 2006 Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings on 5/15/06 before Judge Timothy R. Rice. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jmp, ) Modified on 8/15/2006 (jmp, ).
August 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PRESERVE INDIVIDUALS' FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS IS DENIED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ATTACHED MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/14/06; 8/15/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(tjd)
August 14, 2006 Filing 193 RESPONSE to Motion re #174 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A)(SWEET, JOEL) Modified on 8/17/2006 (cdd, ).
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED ON 2/21/06 IS MODIFIED TO PERMIT COMMERCE BANK TO DISBURSE $63,216.85 OF FIRST LIBERTY'S COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. 0365739051 TO MEYERSON & O'NEILL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANY PARTY TO THE LITIGATION MAY OBJECT TO THIS STIPULATION WITHIN FIVE DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/11/06. 8/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(stb, )
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER THAT FIRST LIBERTY, LLC'S APPLICATION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/11/06. 8/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, )
August 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO PRESERVE INDIVIDUALS' FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/9/06. 8/11/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 10, 2006 Filing 189 MOTION Limit the Scope of the Asset Freeze filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(WESTBROOK, SARAH)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF DAVID A. KOTLER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/8/06. 8/10/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
August 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS MODIFIED HEREIN, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH PAYMENT FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/8/06. 8/9/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT of oral argument held on 7/18/06. Court Reporter: ESR (kw, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 6/28/06. Court Reporter: ESR (kw, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 4/6/06. Court Reporter: ESR (kw, )
August 8, 2006 Filing 183 Declaration re 166 Order,, by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. (LUSTIGMAN, ANDREW)
August 7, 2006 Copy of order dated 7/26/06 & envelope returned by U.S. Postal Service addressed to Jamie M. Pearlman for the following reason: Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward (kw, )
August 4, 2006 Filing 182 Memorandum In Opposition re #162 MOTION Preserve Individuals' Fifth Amendment Rights filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ANDERSON, MARK)
August 3, 2006 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 6/21/06. (ESR) (kw, )
August 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER THAT WAYNE GEISSER, CPA, THE COURT-APPOINTED MONITOR IN THIS ACTION, IS PERMITTED TO PRODUCE TO ANDREW LUSTIGMAN, ESQ., & AUSA JOEL SWEET, COPIES OF THE MONITOR'S REPORTS TO THE COURT. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/1/06. 8/2/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE PI TO HOLD THE MONITOR'S VIABILITY REPORTING OBLIGATION IN ABEYANCE PENDING A TRIAL ON THE MERITS IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/31/06.8/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kw, )
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER THAT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING WILL BE HELD AT 9:30 A.M. ON 8/28/2006 IN COURTROOM 3G, ETC. THE GOVERNMENT SHALL SUBMIT EXPERT REPORTS NO LATER THAN 8/15/06. WACHOVIA SHALL SUBMIT EXPERT REPORTS NO LATER THAN 8/22/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/28/06. 7/31/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 28, 2006 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by GINO J. BENEDETTI on behalf of MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY with Certificate of Service (BENEDETTI, GINO)
July 28, 2006 Filing 176 Memorandum in Opposition re #161 MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (LUSTIGMAN, ANDREW) Modified on 7/31/2006 (np).
July 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFT PPC'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PERMIT THE PAYMENT OF LEGAL FEES & COSTS OF CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS IS GRANTED IN PART. TO THE EXTENT A DEFT ESTABLISHES HE OR SHE CAN OBTAIN COUNSEL ONLY IF RESTRAINED ASSETS ARE RELEASED, EACH DEFT MAY SUBMIT PROPOSALS TO FUND REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES NOT TO EXCEED $250.00 PER HOUR ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR DEFENSE, SUBJECT TO JUDICIAL REVIEW & APPROVAL ON A MONTHLY BASIS. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/26/06. 7/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 26, 2006 Filing 174 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(WESTBROOK, SARAH)
July 25, 2006 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. HOWARD on behalf of PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC with Certificate of Service (HOWARD, DAVID)
July 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING MOTION IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: #161 GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/24/06. 7/25/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO APPOINT A TEMPORARY RECEIVER IS SET FOR 8/21/2006 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/21/06. 7/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, )
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER THAT EXHIBIT D TO THE GOVERNMENT'S OPPOSITION TO PPC'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PERMIT THE PAYMENT OF THE LEGAL FEES AND COSTS OF CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS IS REMOVED FROM THE PUBLIC RECORD. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/21/06. 7/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc)
July 21, 2006 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS J. NASTASI, JR on behalf of JAMIE M. PEARLMAN (NASTASI, NICHOLAS)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DISBURSEMENTS BE MADE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ATTACHED BUDGET, SUBJECT TO ALL OTHER PROVISIONS OF THE STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/19/06. 7/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, A HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 9:30 A.M. ON 8/2/2006 IN COURTROOM 3G, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/18/06. 7/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 19, 2006 Filing 164 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Kotler by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. (WESTBROOK, SARAH)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPUALTION AND ORDER THAT THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06 SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: ON OR ABOUT 6/9/06 PPC PREPARED A SCHEDULE IDENTIFYING THE INDIVIDUALS WHO REQUESTED REFUNDS FROM 5/24/026 TO 6/8/06. ON OR ABOUT 6/29/06 THE MONITOR REVIEWD SCHEDULE A AND APPROVED PAYMENT OF REFUNDS IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $21, 194.79 TO THE INDIVIDUALS AND IN THE AMOUNTS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/18/06. 7/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jpd)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR FEES & EXPENSES IS APPROVED & THE MONITOR IS AUTHORIZED TO BE PAID THE SUM OF $33,284.50 FOR FEES & EXPENSES FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 200013369422. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/18/06. 7/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Settlement Conference held on 7/18/06. (stb, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 162 MOTION Preserve Individuals' Fifth Amendment Rights filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(WESTBROOK, SARAH)
July 14, 2006 Filing 161 MOTION GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY RECEIVER FOR PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1)(SWEET, JOEL)
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT THE PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO FILE A REPLY TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PPC'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PERMIT THE PAYMENT OF LEGAL FEES AND COSTS OF CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS IS GRANTED AND THE REPLY IS DEEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/13/06.7/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (stb, )
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED AND PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/13/06. 7/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(stb, ) Modified on 7/14/2006 (stb, ).
July 13, 2006 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID HOWARD and Withdrawal of Appearance of GINO BENEDETTI on behalf of PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC with Certificate of Service (WESTBROOK, SARAH) Modified on 7/25/2006 (np).
July 12, 2006 Filing 157 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to the United States of America's Opposition to its Motion to Modify the Temporary Restraining Order to Permit the Payment of Legal Fees and Costs of Certain Individuals filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Motion for Leave to File a Reply. (Attachments: #1 #2)(GAUGLER, ALEXANDRA)
July 12, 2006 Filing 156 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Telephone Conference held on 7/12/06 (pr, )
July 10, 2006 Filing 155 MOTION to Modify the PI to Hold the Monitor's Viability Reporting Obligation in Abeyance Pending a Trial on the Merits filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Certificate of Service.(LUSTIGMAN, ANDREW)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 7/6/2006.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/7/06. 7/10/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(stb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
July 7, 2006 Filing 153 EXHIBITS A through I to Amended Verified Complaint For Injunctive Relief filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(pr, )
July 6, 2006 Filing 152 AMENDED DOCUMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Amended Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief with Certificate of Service. Exhibits filed by hard copy. (SWEET, JOEL)
June 30, 2006 Filing 151 Exhibits A-D to United States of America's Memo of Law in Opposition to Payment Processing Center, LLC's Motion to Modify the Temporary Restraining Order to Allow the Payment of Legal Fees and Costs of Certain Individuals by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Exhibit D Filed under Seal). (jmp, ) Modified on 7/25/2006 (fdc, ).
June 30, 2006 Filing 150 Memorandum in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Modify the TRO to Permit the Payment of Legal Fees & Costs of Certain Individuals with Certificate of Service. Exhibits A-D filed by hard copy filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SWEET, JOEL)
June 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE ISSUANCE OF A PERMANENT INJUNCTION WILL BE HELD ON 10/5/2006 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 17B; ON 9/21/06 THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A TRIAL MEMORANDUM, ALONG WITH FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/29/06. 6/30/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(afm, )
June 29, 2006 Filing 148 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/7/2006 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gk, )
June 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER THAT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 8/10/2006 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/28/06. 6/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 28, 2006 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK ANDERSON on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service (ANDERSON, MARK)
June 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO MODIFY THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PERMIT THE PAYMENT OF 2005 FEDERAL AND STATE INCOME TAXES, AND RELATED TAX PREPARATION EXPENSES, MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, AND LEGAL FEES IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/27/06. 6/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 27, 2006 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/22/06 before Judge PADOVA. Court Reporter: JENNIFER CABRERA. STATUS CONFERENCE (jl, )
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE GOVERNMENT SHALL HAVE TEN DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE TWENTY DAYS THEREAFTER TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO SUCH AMENDED COMPLAINT . SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 06/22/06. 06/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ac, )
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF JAMI M. PEARLMAN TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN ASSETS FROM THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OF FEBRUARY 21, 2006 IS DISMISSED AS MOOT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 06/22/06. 06/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ac, )
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO MODIFY THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PERMIT THE PAYMMENT OF LEGAL FEES AND COSTS OF CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS AND THE MOTION TO MODIFY THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PERMIT THE PAYMENT OF 2005 FEDERAL AND STATE INCOME TAXES, AND RELATED TAX PREPARATION EXPENSES, MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, AND LEGAL FEES ARE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 06/22/06. 06/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ac, )
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER THAT THE GOVERNMENT SHALL HAVE TEN DAYS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE FEBRUARY 21, 2006 AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PERMIT THE PAYMENT OF LEGAL FEES AND THE COST OF CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 06/22/06. 06/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ac, )
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW BY THE ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT JAMI M. PEARLMAN IS GRANTED AND PETER F. VAIRA, JACK L. GRUENSTEIN AND THE LAW FIRM OF VAIRA & RILEY, P.C. ARE PERMITTED TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 06/22/06.06/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ac, )
June 26, 2006 Filing 138 Government's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to First Liberty's Application to Vacate and Unfreeze Bank Account filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SWEET, JOEL) Modified on 6/28/2006 (np).
June 26, 2006 Filing 137 Response Government's Answer to First Liberty's Application to Vacate and Unfreeze Bank Account with Certificate of Service by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B) (SWEET, JOEL)
June 26, 2006 Filing 136 Affidavit of FIRST LIBERTY, LLC. (stb, )
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY AND TO EXEMPT WACHOVIA BANK, N.A. FROM THE 4/7/06 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS IS DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/23/06. 6/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
June 23, 2006 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Status Conference held on 6/22/06. Court Reporter: Jenniffer Cabrera. Counsel address the court on behalf of their clients. An order is to follow. (le, )
June 22, 2006 Filing 133 Minute Entry for an Evidentiary Hearing held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE: on 6/21/06. (fh)
June 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED IN THIS CASE ON 2/21/06 IS HEREBY AMENDED & MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS. DONJA, L.P. BANK ACCOUNT NO. 215699939 AT NATIONAL PENN BANK IS RELEASED & FREED FROM ALL RESTRAINTS, RESTRICTIONS & LIMITATIONS IMPOSED BY THIS COURT & THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. DONJA L.P. IS AUTHORIZED TO CLOSE THE ACCOUNT & WITHDRAW & TRANSFER THE PROCEEDS. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/21/06. 6/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
June 21, 2006 Filing 131 Declaration re #112 Stipulation and Order,,, by RANDY D. TROST. (SOLOMON, ADAM)
June 21, 2006 Filing 130 Memorandum of Law in Support of First Liberty's Application to Vacate and Unfreeze Bank Account by ROBERT DEBOYCE. (Attachments: #1) (MEYERSON, JACK)
June 21, 2006 Filing 129 Declaration re #72 Stipulation and Order,, by RANDY D. TROST. (SOLOMON, ADAM)
June 21, 2006 Filing 128 MOTION to Withdraw By Counsel for Defendant Jami M. Pearlman filed by JAMIE M. PEARLMAN.Certificate of Service.(GRUENSTEIN, JACK)
June 16, 2006 Filing 127 RESPONSE to Motion re #108 MOTION for Relief from Stay and to Exempt Wachovia Bank, N.A. from the April 7, 2006 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order as to All Defendants with proposed order and Certificate of Service filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(SWEET, JOEL)
June 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: PPC SHALL CAUSE THE ISSUANCE OF REFUNDS TO THE INDIVIDUALS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULE A OF THIS STIPULATION NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION ON THE COURT'S DOCKET. TO ENSURE PPC'S ABILITY TO COMPLY WITH THIS STIPULATION, WACHOVIA SHALL WIRE $23,927.72 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018853797 TO PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018538274, WHICH IS THE ACCOUNT PPC USES TO PAY CONSUMER REFUNDS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/13/06. 6/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
June 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR FIRST LIBERTY, LLC SHALL FILE A LEGAL BRIEF CONCERNING ITS APPLICATION TO VACATE & UNFREEZE BANK ACCOUNT ON OR BEFORE 6/20/06; & THAT COUNSEL FOR THE UNITED STATES SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE LEGAL BRIEF ON OR BEFORE 6./26/06; & IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING WILL BE HELD AT 9:00 A.M. ON 6/28/2006 IN COURTROOM 3G. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/14/06. 6/15/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 14, 2006 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT of telephone Conference held on 3/27/06. (ESR) (kw, )
June 13, 2006 Filing 123 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 6/13/06. (kw, )
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS ARE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION: DOC. #93 APPLICATION OF FIRST LIBERTY LLC TO VACATE & UNFREEZE THE BANK ACCOUNT & DOC. #108 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY & TO EXEMPT WACHOVIA BANK, N,A, FROM THE 4/7/06 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/13/06. 6/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 13, 2006 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of in-chambers conference held on 6/7/06. (ESR) (kw, )
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER THAT A HEARING WILL BE HELD AT 9:30 A.M. ON 6/21/2006 IN COURTROOM 3G TO ADDRESS WACHOVIA BANK, N.A.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY FILED 5/24/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/9/06. 6/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER THAT THE MONITOR'S APPLICATION FOR FEES AND EXPENSES IS APPROVED AND THE MONITOR IS AUTHORIZED TO BE PAID THE SUM OF $36,475.00 FOR FEES AND EXPENSES. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/9/06. 6/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jpd) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
June 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR PRETRIAL & SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/8/06. 6/9/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO A JUNE 2006 BUDGET IN THE AMOUNT OF $113,885.47, AS SET FORTH IN THE MONITOR'S 6/2/06 REPORT & BUDGET, ETC. PARTIES HAVE FURTHER AGREED THAT CERTAIN FUNDS THAT WERE UNFROZEN & DISBURSED FOR THE MAY 2006 BUDGET, PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATED ORDER ENTERED 5/4/06, REMAIN UNUSED. WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL THEREFORE WIRE $63,885.47 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018853797 TO BANK OF AMERICA, ACCOUNT TITLE: PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/7/06. 6/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
June 7, 2006 Filing 116 Report of Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 6/7/06. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
June 5, 2006 Filing 115 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 6/2/06. (kw, )
June 5, 2006 Filing 113 NOTICE of Hearing: CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/7/2006 03:00 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gk, )
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED IN PART, & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY ITS ATTORNEYS IN THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/1/06. 6/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (kw, ).
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06 SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: ON OR ABOUT 5/10/06, PPC ISSUED REFUNDS IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $21,437.85 TO THE INDIVIDUALS & IN THE AMOUNTS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A FOR THE PERIOD OF 4/3/06 TO 4/17/06, ETC. ON OR ABOUT 5/17&19/2006, THE MONITOR REVIEWED SCHEDULE B & APPROVED THE PAYMENT OF REFUNDS IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $32,293.55 TO THE INDIVIDUALS & IN THE AMOUNTS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE B. PPC SHALL CAUSE THE ISSUANCE OF REFUNDS TO THE INDIVIDUALS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULE B OF THIS STIPULATION NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION ON THE COURT'S DOCKET, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/30/06. 5/31/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN PLFF, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, & DEFT RANDY TROST, THAT SHE MAY WITHDRAW $5,000.00 FROM COMMERCE ACCOUNT NUMBER 367577392 TO PAY FOR HER 2005 TAX LIABILITIES. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/30/06. 5/31/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
May 26, 2006 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/23/06 - 25 minutes. (rv, )
May 24, 2006 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of in chambers conference held on 5/23/06. (ESR) (kw, )
May 24, 2006 Filing 108 MOTION for Relief from Stay and to Exempt Wachovia Bank, N.A. from the April 7, 2006 Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order as to All Defendants filed by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Memorandum of Law#3 Declaration#4 Exhibit A)(LAMONACA, VINCENT)
May 24, 2006 Filing 107 NOTICE of Hearing: HEARING ON APPLICATION OF FIRST LIBERTY LLC TO VACATE AND UNFREEZE THE BANK ACCOUNT SET FOR 6/22/2006 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. STATUS CONFERENCE WILL FOLLOW THE HEARING.(gk, )
May 18, 2006 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 5/10/06. (ESR) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, )
May 16, 2006 Filing 105 Minute Entry, re: Fee Petition Hearing for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE held on 5/15/06. (kw, )
May 16, 2006 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/9/06 before Judge PADOVA/RICE. Court Reporter: JEN CABRERA. MOTIONS HEARING (jl, )
May 16, 2006 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/5/06 before Judge PADOVA. Court Reporter: JEN CABRERA. STATUS HEARING (jl, )
May 16, 2006 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/4/06 before Judge PADOVA. Court Reporter: JEN CABRERA. STATUS HEARING (jl, )
May 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WACHOVIA BANK SHALL WIRE $23,664.66 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO THE CLIENT ESCROW ACCOUNT OF MILLER ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C., ETC. THE FUNDS SHALL BE CONSIDERED COMPENSATION TO THESE DEFTS FOR ACTIVITIES ON BEHALF OF PPC FOR APRIL 2006, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/15/06. 5/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
May 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RONALD HELLINGER'S BANK ACCOUNT NO. 365738905 AT COMMERCE BANK, SHALL BE UNFROZEN & COMMERCE BANK SHALL ISSUE ONE CHECK DRAWN AGAINST THAT ACCOUNT PAYABLE TO RONALD HELLINGER IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,000.00, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/15/06. 5/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
May 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE 5/15/06 SEALED PROCEEDING, THE FEE PETITION OF MILLER ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C. IS REDUCED BY $1,000.00 & PELINO & LENTZ, P.C. BY $2,000.00 P.C. PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/15/06. 5/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 12, 2006 Filing 98 Minute Entry, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 5/11/06. (kw, )
May 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S 5/2/06 ORDER IS VACATED IN PART. THE PORTION OF THE ORDER AUTHORIZING PPC TO PAY FUNDS FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO PELINO & LENTZ, P.C. IN THE AMOUNT OF $66,527.21 IS VACATED, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A SECOND IN CAMERA HEARING WILL BE HELD AT 9:30 A.M. ON 5/15/2006 IN COURTROOM 3G, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/11/06. 5/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER THAT TRANSCRIPT OF THE CONFERENCE HELD ON 5/10/06 IS SEALED AND IMPOUNDED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/10/06. 5/12/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2006 (kw, ).
May 11, 2006 Filing 95 Minute Entry, re: Status Conference in Chambers held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 5/10/06. (kw, )
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS STAYED FOR ALL PURPOSES FOR 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF APPROVAL BY THE COURT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT UPON A FINDING OF GOOD CAUSE, THE COURT MAY EXTEND THE STAY IF REQUESTED BY ANY PARTY. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/10/06. 5/11/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
May 10, 2006 Filing 93 Application of First Liberty, LLC to Vacate and Unfreeze Bank Account by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC., Certificate of Service. (MEYERSON, JACK) Modified on 5/15/2006 (fh)
May 5, 2006 Filing 92 Minute Entry, re: Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 5/4/06. (kw, )
May 5, 2006 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/25/06 before Judge PADOVA. HEARING (jl, )
May 5, 2006 Filing 90 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/22/2006 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gk, )
May 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTIONS: WACHOVIA CORPORATION SHALL WIRE $172,005.27 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018853797 TO BANK OF AMERICA, ETC. THE FUNDS TRANSFERRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS STIPULATION SHALL BE USED ONLY AS FOLLOWS: $84,397.98 SHALL BE AVAILABLE TO PPC FOR OPERATING EXPENSES FOR 5/2006 & DISBURSED ONLY WITH THE MONITOR'S APPROVAL & ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MONITOR'S 4/28/06 REPORT & BUDGET, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/2/06. 5/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
May 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S 4/13/06 ORDER IS VACATED & FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE 5/2/06 SEALED PROCEEDING, PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANY AMOUNTS PREVIOUSLY PAID TO THE LUSTIGMAN FIRM, P.C., & MILLER ALFANO & RASPANTI, P.C. PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S 4/13/06 ORDER, EXCEEDING THE AMOUNTS AUTHORIZED IN THIS ORDER, SHALL BE SET OFF AGAINST FUTURE INVOICES FOR REASONABLE LEGAL FEES & EXPENSES GENERATED IN THE DEFENSE OF PPC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/2/06. 5/3/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER THAT UPON THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S ORAL MOTION TO VACATE 4/24/06 ORDER APPROVING COUNSEL FEES, IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 4/24/06 CONCERNING PAYMENT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR PELINO & LENTZ, P.C. IS VACATED PENDING AN IN CAMERA MEETING WITH COUNSEL FOR PPC, ON 5/2/06 TO ADDRESS POSSIBLE DUPLICATION OF CHARGES AMONG ALL COUNSEL, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/26/06. 4/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 27, 2006 Filing 86 Minute Entry, re: Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 4/25/06. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO THE ATTORNEY AT THE FIRM OF PELINO & LENTZ, P.C., PAYMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $83,782.06 FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/24/06. 4/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 21, 2006 Filing 83 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to modify or amend Order of 2/21/06 filed by RANDY D. TROST.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCUDERI, PETER)
April 19, 2006 Filing 82 MOTION to Modify the TRO to Permit the Payment of Legal Fees & Costs of Certain Individuals filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC.Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)(GAUGLER, ALEXANDRA)
April 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WIRE $100,000.00 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO PNC BANK, ETC. THE FUNDS TRANSFERRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS STIPULATION SHALL BE USED BY THE COURT APPOINTED MONITOR TO PAY FOR PPC'S APPROPRIATE EXPENSES, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/17/06. 4/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATIONS ENTERED 3/22/06 & 4/4/06 REGARDING PAYMENT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES & EXPENSES INCURRED IN DEFENSE OF DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, IT IS ORDERED THAT PPC'S APPLICATION IS GRANTED & PPC SHALL BE PERMITTED TO PAY TO EACH OF THE ATTORNEYS THE AMOUNTS SET FORTH FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/13/06. 4/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, )
April 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, WHICH IS NOW SCHEDULED FOR 4/18/06, SHALL BE CONTINUED UNTIL 5/2/06. THE UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(7) & 9(b), ETC. SHALL BE FILED 14 DAYS AFTER THE CONCLUSION OF THE DEPOSITION OF PPC PURSUANT TO RULE 30(b)(6), F.R.C.P. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/12/06. 4/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RONALD HELLINGER'S BANK ACCOUNT NO. 365738905 AT COMMERCE BANK, IN WHICH THE APROXIMATE BALANCE IS $232,000, SHALL BE UNFROZEN & COMMERCE BANK SHALL ISSUE TWO CHECKS DRAWN AGAINST THAT ACCOUNT PAYABLE TO U.S. TREASURY IN THE AMOUNT OF $180,000.00 & HAB-EIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,100.00. BOTH CHECKS SHALL BE DELIVERED TO MARC DURANT, ETC. & SHALL BE USED TO PAY RONALD HELLINGER'S TAX LIABILITIES FOR 2005, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/12/06. 4/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WIRE $7,730.75 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO JP MORGAN CHASE AT ROUTING TRANSIT NUMBER 021000021/BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 512068399, ETC. THE FUNDS TRANSFERRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS STIPULATION SHALL BE USED ONLY TO PAY COMPENSATION FOR THE TIME PERIOD 3/25/06 THROUGH & INCLUDING 4/7/06, TO THE FOLLOWING INDIVIDUALS: SHARON R. BRABAZON; ROSA LYDIA ISAAC; ERIC PARKIN; & CHRISTINE WATSON. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/12/06. 4/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 7, 2006 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Status Conference held on 4/5/06. Counsel addresses Court. Court Reporter: Jennifer Cabrera. (jmp, )
April 7, 2006 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Status Conference held on 4/6/06. Counsel addresses the Court. Court Reporter: Jennifer Cabrera. (jmp, )
April 7, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/4/2006 AT 1:30 PM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (md, )
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MS. PEARLMAN SHALL BE PERMITTED IMMEDIATELY TO TRANSFER THE SUM OF $15,000.00 FROM WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 3000051173022 TO WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 1010083157325. UPON COMPLETION OF THE TRANSFER, MS. PEARLMAN SHALL HAVE UNFETTERED ACCESS TO & USE OF THE FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 1010083157325. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/6/06. 4/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT MICHAEL WEISBERG'S ACCOUNT #8610434697, AT PNC BANK, IN WHICH THE APPROXIMATE BALANCE IS $300,000, BE UNFROZEN SO THAT THE BANK WILL BE ABLE TO ISSUE CHECKS DRAWN AGAINST THAT ACCOUNT IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $174,431, TO COVER THE 2005 FEDERAL, STATE & LOCAL TAXES AND RELATED TAX PREPARATION EXPENSE, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/6/06. 4/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 7, 2006 Filing 73 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/4/2006 01:30 PM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gk, )
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WIRE $50,000 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018538274, WHICH IS THE ACCOUNT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER USES TO PAY CONSUMER REFUNDS. PPC SHALL CAUSE THE ISSUANCE OF REFUNDS TO THE INDIVIDUALS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULE A OF THIS STIPULATION NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK AFTER THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION ON THE COURT'S DOCKET, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/6/06. 4/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER AS TO ALL DEFTS, ETC. DEFTS SHALL IMMEDIATELY PROVIDE A COPY OF THIS STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION TO EACH OF ITS MERCHANT-CLIENTS & TO ALL FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS WITH WHICH IT CONDUCTS BUSINESS WITHIN 10 DAYS FROM ITS EFFECTIVE DATE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/7/06. 4/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 6, 2006 Filing 70 REPLY to Government's memorandum of law in opposition to motion of DEFT PEARLMAN to exclude marital assets from the temporary restraining order, filed by DEFT JAMIE M. PEARLMAN. (See Paper #63 for attachment) (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT MOTION OF JAMI M. PEARLMAN TO FILE A REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF UNITED STATES TO HER MOTION TO EXCLUDE MARITAL ASSETS FROM THE FREEZE IMPOSED BY THE TEMORARY RESTRIANING ORDER OF 2/21/06 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/6/06.4/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 5, 2006 Filing 68 Minute Entry, re: Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 3/2/06. (kw, )
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT WACHOVIA BANK, N.A.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW ITS AMENDED EMERGENCY MOTION TO MODIFY THE TRO IS GRANTED. WACHOVIA'S AMENDED EMERGENCY MOTION TO MODIFY THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS HEREBY WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/4/06. 4/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fdc) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE HOURLY RATE FOR ATTORNEYS REQUESTING PAYMENT FROM PPC FOR FEES & COSTS INCURRED ON BEHALF OF PPC, FROM FUNDS FROZEN PURSUANT TO THE 2/21/06 ORDER, SHALL NOT EXCEED $250 PER HOUR OR THE STANDARD RATE CHARGED BY ANY ATTORNEY OR PARALEGAL, WHICHEVER IS LESS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/31/06. 4/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06 SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTION: WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WIRE $7,150.94 FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO JP MORGAN CHASE AT ROUTING TRANSIT NUMBER 021000021/BANK ACCOUNT NUMBER 512068399, ETC. FUNDS TRANSFERRED SHALL BE USED ONLY TO PAY COMPENSATION FOR THE TIME PERIOD 3/11/06 THROUGH 3/24/06 TO THE FOLLOWING INDIVIDUALS: SHARON R. BRABAZON; ROSA LYDIA ISAAC; ERIC PARKIN; & CHRISTINE WATSON. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/31/06. 4/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT THE FIRM OF PELINO & LENTZ WILL TRANSFER THE $100,000 BEING HELD IN ESCROW IN THE NAME OF JAMI PEARLMAN, TO THE JOINT ACCOUNT OF STEVEN & JAMI PEARLMAN, ACCOUNT NUMBER 425 WITH THE PHILADELPHIA TRUST CO., FROM WHICH ACCOUNT THE FUNDS WERE ORIGINALLY TRANSFERRED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/3/06. 4/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
April 3, 2006 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Reply of Jami Pearlman to the Government's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion of Defendant Pearlman to Exclude Marital Assets from the Temporary Restraining Order filed by JAMIE M. PEARLMAN.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 #2)(GRUENSTEIN, JACK)
April 3, 2006 Filing 62 Declaration of Randy D. Trost by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GAUGLER, ALEXANDRA)
April 3, 2006 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw Amended Emergency Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order filed by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAMONACA, VINCENT)
March 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTIONS TO ENABLE PPC & FIRST LIBERTY, LLC TO PAY HEALTH INSURANCE BENEIFTS FOR ITS EMPLOYEES: WACHOVIA CORP. WILL WRITE A CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,159 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NUMBER 2000013369422 TO AETNA, TO PAY THE HEALTH INSURANCE PREMIUMS FOR APRIL 2006 & PRIOR AMOUNT DUE, FOR THE FOLLOWING INDIVIDUALS: RONALD HELLINGER, L. ROSA ISAAC, ERIC PARKIN, RANDY TROST, CHRISTINE WATSON; & MICHAEL WEISBERG, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/29/06. 3/31/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 31, 2006 Filing 59 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/10/2006 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 17B ON MOTIONS 35 and 48 BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gk, )
March 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT THE FUNDS MAINTAINED IN THE FOLLOWING JOINT ACCOUNTS OF DEFT, JAMI PEARLMAN & HER HUSBAND, STEVEN, SHALL BE & ARE HEREBY RELEASED FROM THE ASSET FREEZE IMPOSED BY THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 2/21/06: WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 1010083157325 & WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 1014091014935. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/27/06.3/30/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 29, 2006 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA C. GAUGLER, ESQ. & Withdrawal of appearance of HOWARD A. ROSENTHAL, ESQ.on behalf of DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, Certificate of Service. (kw, )
March 28, 2006 Filing 56 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Exclude Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 1345 Marital Assets from the Temporary Restraining Order Entered on February 21, 2006 with Certificate of Service filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(SWEET, JOEL)
March 28, 2006 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT of Ex Parte TRO Conference held on 2/21/06. (ESR) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kw, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTION: WACHOVIA BANK SHALL WIRE $25,000 FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO THE CLIENT ESCROW ACCOUNT OF THE LUSTIGMAN LAW FIRM IN NEW YORK, ETC. THE LUSTIGMAN LAW FIRM SHALL DISTRIBUTE $5,000 TO EACH OF THE FOLLOWING DEFTS: MICHAEL WEISBERG, RANDY D. TROST, MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, & ROBERT DEBOYACE. THE FUNDS SHALL BE CONSIDERED COMPENSATION TO THESE DEFTS FOR ACTIVITIES ON BEHALF OF PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, AFTER 2/22/06, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/27/06. 3/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTION: FIRSTRUST BANK SHALL PROVIDE MARC DURANT, ESQ., COUNSEL TO DEFT DONALD HELLINGER, A CHECK PAYABLE TO QUINNOVA PHARMACEUTICALS. THE CHECK SHALL BE DRAWN ON THE ACCOUNT OF BUSINESS DEVELOPMENT SERVICES CORP. IN THE AMOUNT OF $8,100, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/27/06. 3/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 27, 2006 Filing 52 Minute Entry, re: Telephone Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 3/27/06. (kw, )
March 27, 2006 Filing 51 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 3/21/06. (kw, )
March 27, 2006 Filing 50 Report of Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 3/27/06. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 27, 2006 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by GINO J. BENEDETTI and Withdrawl of appearance of Malcolm S. Gould, Esq. on behalf of DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, Certificate of Service. (kw, )
March 24, 2006 Filing 48 Amended MOTION to Modify the TRO - Emergency - filed by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Declaration of Linda S. Mill#3 Exhibit A to Declaration#4 Exhibit B to Declaration)(PELLETIER, DAVID)
March 21, 2006 Filing 47 Report of Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 3/21/06. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF DEFT PPC, WHICH IS NOW SCHEDULED FOR 3/21/06 SHALL BE CONTINUED TO A DATE AFTER 4/15/06. PARTY DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER IS STAYED UNTIL AFTER 4/15/06, ETC. UNITED STATES SHALL RESPOND TO DEFT PEARLMAN'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE MARITAL ASSETS ON OR BEFORE 3/28/2006 WITH A HEARING ON THE MOTION ON 4/5/2006, THE DATE OF THE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. DEFTS' EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS FOR NON-DEFT EMPLOYEES & REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. HEARING NOW SCHEDULED FOR 3/22/06 IS CONTINUED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/20/06. 3/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTION: WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WIRE $19,651.83 FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO JP MORGAN CHASE AT ROUTING TRANSIT NO. 021000021/BANK ACCOUNT NO. 512068399 & SHALL DESIGNATE PAYCHEX CLIENT NO. 0026-L491 IN THE "PAYMENT DETAIL" FIELD, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/20/06. 3/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 21, 2006 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/2/06 before Judge PADOVA. HEARING (jl, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J. SCUDERI on behalf of RANDY D. TROST with certificate of service (SCUDERI, PETER)
March 15, 2006 Filing 42 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 3/14/06. (kw, )
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER THAT PPC'S REQUEST IS GRANTED & PLFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS FOR SALARIES OF NON-DEFT EMPLOYEES ON OR BEFORE 3/17/06. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/14/06. 3/15/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED: COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 3/14/06. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 15, 2006 Filing 39 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/5/2006 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gk, )
March 14, 2006 Filing 40 Minute Entry, re: Settlement Conference for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE on 3/13/06. (kw, )
March 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT PPC'S REQUEST IS GRANTED & PLFF SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELEASE OF ATTORNEYS' FEES & REASONABLE & NECESSARY BUSINESS OPERATIONS EXPENSES ON OR BEFORE 3/20/2006. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A HEARING ON THIS MOTION IS SCHEDULED FOR 3/22/2006 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 17B. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/13/06. 3/15/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06 SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WIRE $100,000 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000013369422 TO WACHOVIA ACCOUNT NO. 2000018538274, WHICH IS THE ACCOUNT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER USES TO PAY CONSUMER REFUNDS, ETC. PPC SHALL FILE WITH THE COURT A NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RESPECT TO THIS STIPULATED ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/14/06. 3/15/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 14, 2006 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY.Motion, Memorandum, Orders, Certificate of Service, Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13)(GAUGLER, ALEXANDRA)
March 13, 2006 Filing 35 Emergency MOTION to Modify Amended Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, to Exempt Wachovia Bank from the TRO filed by WACHOVIA BANK, N.A..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Memorandum of Law#3 Affidavit Declaration of Linda S. Mill#4 Exhibit A#5 Exhibit B)(LAMONACA, VINCENT)
March 13, 2006 Filing 34 Emergency Request for Release of Funds for Salaries of Non-Defendant Employees and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, Memorandum, Brief, Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel or Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service#2 Proposed Order - Expedited Briefing#3 Proposed Order - Motion for Release of Funds)(GOULD, MALCOLM) Modified on 3/14/2006 (np).
March 13, 2006 Filing 29 Emergency Request Release of Funds for Reasonable and Necessary Business Operation Expenses and Attorneys? Fees And Request for Expedited Briefing filed by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC., Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 #2 Exhibit A#3 #4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit J#12 Text of Proposed Order Expedited Briefing#13 Text of Proposed Order Emergency Motion#14 Certificate of Service)(ROSENTHAL, HOWARD) Modified on 3/14/2006 (np).
March 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06 SHALL BE MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT NO. IS MISIDENTIFIED IN PARAGRAPH (V) OF THE AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS BEING CONTROLLED BY DEFT JAMI M. PEARLMAN. THE ACCOUNT IS CONTROLLED BY FIRST LIBERTY, LLC, AN ENTITY CONTROLLED BY CAROL SOBLE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/8/06. 3/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW B. LUSTIGMAN, ESQ. IS HEREBY GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/8/06. 3/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SHELDON S. LUSTIGMAN, ESQ. IS HEREBY GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/8/06. 3/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ADAM Z. SOLOMON, ESQ. IS HEREBY GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/8/06. 3/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 10, 2006 Filing 28 Minute Entry, re: Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 3/10/06. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
March 10, 2006 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD A. ROSENTHAL on behalf of PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROSENTHAL, HOWARD)
March 9, 2006 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT A LAMONACA, ESQ. on behalf of WACHOVIA BANK, N.A., Certificate of Service. (kw, )
March 9, 2006 Filing 25 MOTION to Exclude Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 1345 Marital Assets from the Temporary Restraining Order Entered on February 21, 2006 filed by JAMIE M. PEARLMAN.Memo of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (pgs. 1-30)#2 Exhibit Ex. A (pgs. 31-end)#3 Exhibit Ex. B to Motion to Exclude#4 Exhibit Ex C. to Motion to Exclude#5 Memo of Law#6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order#7 Cert of Svc)(GRUENSTEIN, JACK)
March 8, 2006 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/24/06 before Judge PADOVA. HEARING (jl, )
March 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06, SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTIONS: WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WRITE A CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,844.00 FROM PPC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT TO AETNA, ETC. THIS PAYMENT IS FOR HEALTH INSURANCE PREMIUMS FOR 3/2006 FOR THE FOLLOWING INDIVIDUALS: SUSAN FACHET; RONALD HELLINGER; L. ROSA ISAAC, ETC. COMMERCE BANK SHALL WIRE $6,150.27 FROM FIRST LIBERTY, LLC'S COMMERCE BANK ACCOUNT TO INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, WACHOVIA BANK, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/7/06. 3/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
March 7, 2006 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by SHARI AMSTER on behalf of RONALD HELLINGER, DONALD M. HELLINGER with Certificate of Service (AMSTER, SHARI)
March 6, 2006 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN LACHEEN, ESQ. on behalf of DEFT MICHAEL WEISBERG. (kw, )
March 6, 2006 Filing 20 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Solomon, Esquire by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Payment of Fee#2 Proposed Order#3 Certificate of Service)(GOULD, MALCOLM)
March 6, 2006 Filing 19 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sheldon Lustigman, Esquire by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Payment of Fee#2 Proposed Order#3 Certificate of Service)(GOULD, MALCOLM)
March 6, 2006 Filing 18 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Lustigman, Esquire by PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Payment of Fee#2 Proposed Order#3 Certificate of Service)(GOULD, MALCOLM)
March 6, 2006 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by MALCOLM S. GOULD on behalf of PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOULD, MALCOLM)
March 6, 2006 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER F. VAIRA on behalf of JAMIE M. PEARLMAN with Certificate of Service (VAIRA, PETER)
March 3, 2006 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA C. GAUGLER, ESQ. on behalf of DEFT MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, Certificate of Service. (kw, )
March 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT ON 2/21/06 SHALL BE MODIFIED TO PERMIT THE FOLLOWING TRANSACTION: WACHOVIA CORP. SHALL WIRE $21,143.89 FROM PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC'S WACHOVIA ACCOUNT TO PAYCHEX OF NEW YORK, ETC. THE FUNDS TRANSFERRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS STIPULATION SHALL BE USED ONLY TO PAY COMPENSATION FOR THE TIME PERIOD 2/13/06 THROUGH & INCLUDING 2/24/06, TO THE FOLLOWING INDIVIDUALS: ROBERT BECK; DANIELLE BODEN; JESSICA BRABAZON; SHARON R. BRABAZON, DANIELLE DIAMOND, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/1/06. 3/2/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 27, 2006 Filing 13 Minute Entry, re: Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 2/24/06. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
February 27, 2006 Filing 12 Minute Entry, re: TRO Chambers Conference for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA on 2/21/06. Court Reporter: ESR. (kw, )
February 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE INJUNCTION, AS IT RELATES TO THE TRANSFER, WITHDRAWAL, ETC. OF FUNDS IN WACHOVIA ACCOUNT IS VACATED. THIS ACCOUNT IS DEFT PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC'S REFUND ACCOUNT, & ALL CHECKS DRAWN ON THIS ACCOUNT ARE REFUDNS TO CONSUMERS, ETC. DEFTS & RELIEF DEFTS ARE HEREBY EXPRESSLY ENJOINED FROM TRANSFERRING, WITHDRAWING, PLEDGING, ENCUMBRANCING, DISPOSING OF, OR OTHERWISE USING FUNDS IN THE WACHOVIA & BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNTS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/24/06. 2/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT MOTION OF THE UNITED STATES TO LIFT SEAL IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE SEAL PREVIOUSLY ENTERED IN THIS MATTER IS LIFTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/23/06. 2/24/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED BY CHAMBERS. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 23, 2006 Filing 9 MOTION TO LIFT SEAL, FILED BY PLFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER THAT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER & PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER, THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, & MOTION FOR A RESTRAINING ORDER & SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW, UPON EACH DEFT & RELIEF DEFT, BY HAND DELIVERY UPON THE PERSON, OR OTHERWISE PURSUANT TO RULE 4(e), F.R.C.P. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/21/06. 2/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 21, 2006 Filing 7 Verified Complaint for injunctive relief (Corrected), against MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, ROBERT DEBOYCE, PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, DONALD M. HELLINGER, MICHAEL WEISBERG, RANDY D. TROST, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN, filed by PLFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 21, 2006 Filing 6 Praecipe to issue alias summons on all defts, filed by PLFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER & PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFTS PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER LLC, DONALD M. HELLINGER, MICHAEL WEISBERG, & RANDY D. TROST, & RELIEF DEFTS JAMI M. PEARLMAN, MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, & ROBERT DEBOYCE, ETC. ARE HEREBY ENJOINED FROM PROCESSING BANK DRAFTS IN ALL INSTANCES WHERE THE PURPORTED AUTHORIZATION FOR THE BANK DRAFT HAS BEEN OBTAINED IN CONNECTION WITH OUTBOUND TELEMARKETING, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 2/24/06 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 17-B, ETC. A HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 2/27/06 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 17-B, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/21/06.2/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES GIVEN BY CHAMBERS. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT MOTION OF THE UNITED STATES TO FILE PLEADINGS UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLEADINGS & ALL OTHER PAPERS FILED IN THIS CASE SHALL REMAIN SEALED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/21/06.2/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES GIVEN BY CHAMBERS. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 21, 2006 Alias Summons Issued as to PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, DONALD M. HELLINGER, MICHAEL WEISBERG, RANDY D. TROST, JAMI M. PEARLMAN, MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, & ROBERT DEBOYCE. (kw, )
February 17, 2006 Filing 3 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER & PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MEMORANDUM, FILED BY PLFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 17, 2006 Filing 2 MOTION TO FILE PLEADINGS UNDER SEAL, FILED BY PLFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 17, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, ROBERT DEBOYCE, PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, DONALD M. HELLINGER, MICHAEL WEISBERG, RANDY D. TROST, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (dfl, ).
February 17, 2006 Summons Issued as to MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY, RONALD HELLINGER, ROBERT DEBOYCE, PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC, DONALD M. HELLINGER, MICHAEL WEISBERG, RANDY D. TROST, JAMIE M. PEARLMAN. Forwarded To: counsel on 2/17/06. (kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE O'KEEFE QUIGLEY
Represented By: ALEXANDRA C. GAUGLER
Represented By: GINO J. BENEDETTI
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD HELLINGER
Represented By: MICHAEL DROSSNER
Represented By: SHARI AMSTER
Represented By: MARC DURANT
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD M. HELLINGER
Represented By: SHARI AMSTER
Represented By: MARC DURANT
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT DEBOYCE
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE M. PEARLMAN
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. NASTASI, JR.
Represented By: JACK L. GRUENSTEIN
Represented By: PETER F. VAIRA
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAYMENT PROCESSING CENTER, LLC
Represented By: SHELDON LUSTIGMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL DROSSNER
Represented By: HOWARD A. ROSENTHAL
Represented By: ADAM Z. SOLOMON
Represented By: ALEXANDRA C. GAUGLER
Represented By: PATRICIA M. HAMILL
Represented By: GINO J. BENEDETTI
Represented By: MALCOLM S. GOULD
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Represented By: STEPHEN LACHEEN
Represented By: ANDREW B. LUSTIGMAN
Represented By: DAVID M. HOWARD
Represented By: DAVID A. KOTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WEISBERG
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Represented By: STEPHEN LACHEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY D. TROST
Represented By: PETER J. SCUDERI
Represented By: SARAH L. WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REP. JOSEPH SESTAK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. QUIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REP. BARNEY FRANK
Represented By: MICHAEL J. QUIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICHARD M. MELTZER
Represented By: DAVID E. SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES WHITT
Represented By: HOWARD I. LANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REP. EDWARD MARKEY
Represented By: MICHAEL J. QUIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANITRA WHITT
Represented By: HOWARD I. LANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARY FALONEY
Represented By: EDWARD A. DIVER
Represented By: HOWARD I. LANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: IRWIN NATURALS
Represented By: TODD ALAN EWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
Represented By: HORACE GEOFFREY SNEED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WACHOVIA BANK, N.A.
Represented By: DAVID MATTHEW PELLETIER
Represented By: VINCENT A LAMONACA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FIRST LIBERTY, LLC
Represented By: JACK MEYERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: WAYNE GEISSER
Represented By: PATRICIA M. HAMILL
Represented By: ANDREW S. GALLINARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOEL M. SWEET
Represented By: MICHAEL S. BLUME
Represented By: MARK ANDERSON
Represented By: VIRGINIA A. GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?