R & R CAPITAL LLC v. MERRITT et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01554
Filed: April 12, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT LYN MERRITT'S MOTION 54 , TITILED AS A MOTION FOR JNOV, AND THE RESPONSE THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, FOR THE REASONS SET OUT IN A MEMORANDUM OF TODAY'S DATE, THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/24/09. 6/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
June 9, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT 37 , AND THE RESPONSES THERETO, AND AFTER A HEARING HELD JUNE 4, 2009, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN A MEMORANDUM OF TODAY'S DATE, THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/9/09. 6/10/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREP AND E-MAILED.(ti, )
April 20, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE COURT FINDS FOR PLAINTIFF R&R CAPITAL, LLC AGAINST LYN MERRITT ON R&R'S CLAIMS FOR RESCISSION OF ITS PURCHASE OF THE HORSE "BY PULPIT, OUT OF LIPSTICK" AND ENTERS A CONDITIONAL VERDICT IN R&R'S FAVOR FOR THE PURCHAS E PRICE OF $150,000.00. THE COURT FINDS FOR DEFENDANT MERRITT AGAINST PLAINTIFF R&R ON MERRITT'S COUNTERCLAIM FOR UNPAID EXPENSES FOR THE HORSES. THE COURT FINDS FOR PLAINTIFF R&R AGAINST DEFENDANT MERRITT ON R&R'S CLAIM FOR REPLEVIN OF THE HORSES "BY MR. GREELEY, OUT OF SPLASHING WAVE," ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/17/09. 4/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED. (ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R & R CAPITAL LLC v. MERRITT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?