KABASHA GRIFFIN-EL v. BEARD et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02719
Filed: June 22, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MOYER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; DEFENDANTS CANINO, GALINSKI, DIGUGLIELMO, SCARPATI, THOMAS, DOMBROSKY LORENZO, DOHMANAND SHAYLOR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR O F DEFENDANTS CANINO, GALINSKI, DIGUGLIELMO, SCARPATI, THOMAS, DOMBROSKY, LORENZO, DOHMAN AND SHAYLOR AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT MOYER ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT ON 1/31/13 AT 11:0 AM TO DISCUSS A TRIAL DATE. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL COORDINATE THE CALL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 1/22/13. 1/22/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
October 6, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 10/6/09. 10/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
September 8, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 9/8/09. 9/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jpd)
June 9, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' ASSERTION OF THE DELIBERATIVE PROCESS PRIVILEGE OVER PLAINTIFF'S MENTAL HEALTH RECORDS IS DENIED; DEFENDANTS REQUEST THAT THE COURT RECOGNIZE THE DOCUMENTS AS PRIVILEGED UNDER STATE LAW IS DENIED; THE CONTESTED DOCUME NTS MUST BE PRODUCED. DISCOVERY OF THESE DOCUMENTS IS LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL NOT SHOW THE DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL NOT PROVIDE COPIES OF THESE DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIF F'S COUNSEL SHALL NOT DISCUSS THE CONTENTS OF THE DOCUMENTS WITH PLAINTIFF. AT THE COMPLETION OF THIS LITIGATION, PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL MUST RETURN THESE DOCUMENTS TO THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. DEFENDANTS MUST PRODUCE THESE DOCUMENTS WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS OF THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. DOCUMENTS THAT WERE NOT GENERATED AT SCI GRATERFORD NEED NOT EB PRODUCED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 6/9/09. 6/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
May 29, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANTS SMITH, GALINSKI, FEILD, BANTA AND BITNER THE SUMMONS ARE TO ISSUE, SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE TO BE MADE UPON DEFENDANTS BY THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS IN THE EVENT THAT WAIVER OF SERVICE IS NOT EFFECTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 5/29/09. 6/1/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jpd)
April 30, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH 4 OF THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDER DATED 3/16/09 (DOC. NO. 76) IS HEREBY VACATED. WENDY MOYER AND KIM ULISNY ARE PROPER DEFENDANTS IN THIS ACTION. WENDY MOYER AND KIM ULISNY MUST FILE AN ANSWER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH IN TEN (10) DAYS. WENDY MOYER AND KIM ULISNY MUST RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS. ALL OTHER PARAGRAPHS CONTAINED IN THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDER DATED 3/16/09 (DOC. NO. 76) REMAIN IN FORCE IN THEIR ENTIRETY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 4/30/09. 4/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
March 16, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED AND DEFENDANTS MUST PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND PSYCHIATRIC AND COUNSELING RECORDS THAT WERE GENERATED DURING HIS INCARCERATION AT SCI GRATERFORD, ETC. PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTNION FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 3/16/09. 3/16/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KABASHA GRIFFIN-EL v. BEARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?