QVC, INC. v. SCHIEFFELIN et al Featured Case

Plaintiff QVC Inc. alleges that it entered into certain agreements with defendants Stacey Schieffelin and David Schieffelin under which plaintiff received the exclusive worldwide right to promote Models Prefer products. Plaintiff further alleges that defendants purported to terminate the agreement with the plaintiff and have stated their intention to promote the Models Prefer products in violation of the non-competition provisions of their agreement with the plaintiff.

Plaintiff: QVC, INC.
Defendant: MODELS PREFER, LTD., STACEY SCHIEFFELIN and DAVID SCHIEFFELIN
Case Number: 2:2006cv04231
Filed: September 22, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2007 30 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY JUDGE THOMAS N. ONEILL JR. ON 07/16/2007. 07/16/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ce, )
May 1, 2007 28 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SHARON BLINKOFF, ESQUIRE IS HEREBY GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE THOMAS N. ONEILL JR. ON 4/30/07. 5/2/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, )
April 30, 2007 27
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sharon Blinkoff filed by STACEY SCHIEFFELIN, DAVID SCHIEFFELIN, MODELS PREFER, LTD..certificate of service.(STONE, ANTOINETTE)
March 29, 2007 24
RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by STACEY SCHIEFFELIN, DAVID SCHIEFFELIN, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (STONE, ANTOINETTE) Modified on 3/30/2007 (afm, ).
March 22, 2007 23
REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF Motion to Dismiss filed by MODELS PREFER, LTD., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (STONE, ANTOINETTE) Modified on 3/23/2007 (afm, ).
March 16, 2007 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CONTRACT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT 2 TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS OF AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL AS CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. SIGNED BY JUDGE THOMAS N. ONEILL JR. ON 3/16/07. 3/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2007 (lvj, ).
March 8, 2007 19
Statement F.R.C.P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by MODELS PREFER, LTD.. (STONE, ANTOINETTE)
March 6, 2007 18
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN EDMUND BISORDI on behalf of QVC, INC. with Certificate of Service(BISORDI, JOHN)
March 1, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION UNTIL 3/15/2007 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY JUDGE THOMAS N. ONEILL JR. ON 3/1/07. 3/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2007 (le, ).
February 1, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION UNTIL 2/20/2007 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY JUDGE THOMAS N. ONEILL JR. ON 2/1/07. 2/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (le, ).
January 22, 2007 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION UNTIL 2/6/2007 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY JUDGE THOMAS N. ONEILL JR. ON 1/22/07. 1/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (le, ).
October 26, 2006 10
Amended Complaint against STACEY SCHIEFFELIN, DAVID SCHIEFFELIN and MODELS PREFER, LTD. filed by QVC, INC. with Certificate of Service.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2006 (le, ).
October 19, 2006 9
STIPULATION for Enlargement of Time by STACEY SCHIEFFELIN, DAVID SCHIEFFELIN, MODELS PREFER, LTD.. (STONE, ANTOINETTE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/20/2006 (np).
October 9, 2006 7
Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by STACEY SCHIEFFELIN, DAVID SCHIEFFELIN, MODELS PREFER, LTD. (STONE, ANTOINETTE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/10/2006 (np).
October 4, 2006 6
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by QVC, INC. with regard to Notice of pretrial conference scheduled to be held on December 18, 2006 at 10:00 a.m. (METZ, NATHANIEL)
September 25, 2006 5
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Juan Ortiz re: served Summons and Complaint upon Models Prefer, Ltd. by Authorized Agent/Managing Agent on 9/22/06 (METZ, NATHANIEL)
September 22, 2006 2
Disclosure Statement Form by QVC, INC.(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QVC, INC. v. SCHIEFFELIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MODELS PREFER, LTD.
Represented By: ANTOINETTE R. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACEY SCHIEFFELIN
Represented By: SHARON BLINKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SCHIEFFELIN
Represented By: SHARON BLINKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QVC, INC.
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND BISORDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?