AMG NATIONAL TRUST BANK v. RIES

Case Number: 2:2006cv04337
Filed: September 28, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: J. CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AGAINST DEFENDANT RIES, DEFENDANTS MOTION IS GRANTED. THE MOTION IS OTHERWISE DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/28/11. 12/29/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 22, 2011 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR CONTEMPT IS GRANTED IN PART FOR REASONS OUTLINED HEREIN. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS GRANTED FOR REASONS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 7/20/2011. 7/22/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 21, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR CONTEMPT IS GRANTED IN PART. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S CROSS MOTION FOR SANTIONS IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 7/20/11. 7/21/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 4, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/3/09. 6/5/09 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 6/5/2009 (jl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMG NATIONAL TRUST BANK v. RIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?