BRAGG v. LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Marc Bragg alleged that defendants Linden Research, Inc. and Philip Rosedale seized Taessot, a piece of virtual land that plaintiff had purchased using an exploit in the system, and also froze his account.

Plaintiff: MARC BRAGG
Defendant: PHILIP ROSEDALE and LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.
Counter Claimant: PHILIP ROSEDALE and LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.
Counter Defendant: MARC BRAGG
Case Number: 2:2006cv04925
Filed: November 7, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2007 84 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS & COUNTERCLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CASE SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/26/07. 10/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 12, 2007 83 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED ON 10/26/2007 AT 2:00 P.M. TO CONSIDER THE JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(A)(1)(II), ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/12/07. 10/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 19, 2007 81 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF BENJAMIN F. CHAPMAN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/18/07. 9/19/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
September 17, 2007 79
APPLICATION for admission of MICHAEL G. RHODES, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. (kw, )
September 13, 2007 77
COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT MARC BRAGG'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COUNTERCLAIMS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) AND RULE 12(B)(7) AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(E). by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.(A CORPORATION), Certificate of Service (SHIEKMAN, LAURENCE) Modified on 9/14/2007 (nd).
July 25, 2007 72
NOTICE of Appearance by COLIN GERARD SCHAFER on behalf of MARC BRAGG (SCHAFER, COLIN)
July 20, 2007 73 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE HEARING ON PLFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED WITH A FINAL DETERMINATION ON THE MERITS OF PLFFS' COMPLAINT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS WITH THE COURT IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,902.80 IS GRANTED. THE CLERK IS HEREBY ORDERED TO DEPOSIT SUCH FUNDS IN A MONEY MARKET ACCOUNT, AT THE PREVAILING RATE OF INTEREST AT A FEDERALLY APPROVED FINANCIAL INSTITUTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/19/07.7/25/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 13, 2007 65
Report Of Joint Report of the Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) - Signed by Defendants Only by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE. (CRITTENDEN, JOHN)
June 28, 2007 64
MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC..Certificate of Service.(CRITTENDEN, JOHN)
June 22, 2007 62
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANDREW J. SOVEN AND SCOTT D. BAKER on behalf of LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (SOVEN, ANDREW) Modified on 6/25/2007 (afm, ).
June 13, 2007 59 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT DEFTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT BY 6/28/07. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE THEIR INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO SEC. 4:01 OF THE CIVIL JUSTICE EXPENSE & DELAY REDUCTION PLAN BY 7/9/07, ETC. AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/19/2007 AT 2:00 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/12/07. 6/14/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 12, 2007 57 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT MOTION OF ANDREW J. SOVEN, ESQ., FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KATHLEEN E. TREIBER, ESQ. TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DEFTS LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. & PHILIP ROSEDALE IN THIS ACTION IS GRANTED UPON PAYMENT OF ADMISSION FEE, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/12/07.6/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 11, 2007 54
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE.Certificate of Service.(SOVEN, ANDREW)
May 30, 2007 51 Opinion or Order of the Court
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFT PHILIP ROSEDALE'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION & DEFT LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ARE DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS & TO COMPEL ARBITRATION TO ADDRESS ISSUES RAISED BY THE COURT AT ARGUMENT ON 2/5/07 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/30/07. 5/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 17, 2007 50
RESPONSE in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by MARC BRAGG, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (BALLOD, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 5/18/2007 (afm, ).
May 3, 2007 49 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT TELEPHONE STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED ON 5/9/07 IS RESCHEDULED ON 5/8/07 AT 2:30 P.M. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/3/07. 5/4/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 26, 2007 47 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/9/2007 AT 11:00 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/25/07. 4/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 21, 2007 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE, UNDER SEAL, PLFF'S DECLARATION OF PERSONAL FINANCIAL INFORMATION UNDER SEAL, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/20/07. 2/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 9, 2007 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DECLARATION OF PERSONAL FINANCIAL INFORMATION UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED & PLFF MAY FILE A DECLARATION OF PERSONAL FINANCIAL INFORMATION WITH THE CLERK, UNDER SEAL, WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/9/07.2/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2007 (kw, ).
February 7, 2007 33
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. (SOVEN, ANDREW) Modified on 2/8/2007 (afm, ).
February 2, 2007 30
NOTICE by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE re 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, Certificate of Service. (SOVEN, ANDREW) Modified on 2/5/2007 (np).
January 29, 2007 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REGARDING PLFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/5/2007 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/26/07. 1/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 10, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT MOTION OF ANDREW J. SOVEN, ESQ. FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SCOTT D. BAKER, ESQ. TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DEFTS LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. & PHILIP ROSEDALE IN THIS ACTION IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/9/07.1/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2007 (kw, ).
January 9, 2007 15
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott D. Baker filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE.Certificate of Service.(SOVEN, ANDREW)
January 5, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFT PHILIP ROSEDALE'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION & DEFT LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY 1/16/2007, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION & MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/5/2007 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/4/06. 1/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 19, 2006 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 1/4/2007 AT 3:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/19/2006. 12/20/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, MAILED BY CHAMBERS ON 12/19/2006.(nda, )
December 18, 2006 11 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & HEARING PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED ON 12/19/06 IS RESCHEDULED ON 1/5/2007 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, ETC.SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/18/06. 12/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED: COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 12/18/06.(kw, )
December 7, 2006 10
RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE. (SOVEN, ANDREW) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2006 (kw, ).
November 30, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER THAT A HEARING IS SCHEDULED ON 12/19/06 AT 2:00 P.M., TO CONSIDER THE MOTION TO REMAND IN COURTROOM 11A, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/29/06. 12/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED: COPIES MAILED BY CHAMBERS.(kw, )
November 29, 2006 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT THE COURT ADOPTS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE PARTIES' STIPULATION AND THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS OF THE COURT'S ORDER IN THE EVENT THAT THE COURT DENIES PLAINTFF'S MOTION TO REMAND, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/28/2006. 11/30/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(nda, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (ti, ).
November 20, 2006 5
Memorandum in Support re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MARC BRAGG. (BALLOD, CHRISTOPHER)
November 7, 2006 1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE from Chester County, case number 06-08711 and Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 934310) (ss, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAGG v. LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: PHILIP ROSEDALE
Represented By: THOMAS T. WATKINSON, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.
Represented By: KATHLEEN E. TREIBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MARC BRAGG
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ERIC BALLOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP ROSEDALE
Represented By: LAURENCE Z. SHIEKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.
Represented By: LAURENCE Z. SHIEKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC BRAGG
Represented By: COLIN GERARD SCHAFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?