CHIRDO v. MINERALS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv05523
Filed: December 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE FOR A SPOLIATION CHARGE AND TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' EXHIBITS 10-39, 41 AND 42 AND 61-66 (DOCUMENT #66) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 7/23/09. 7/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE FROM LOUIS DIZIKES 46 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/22/2009. 4/24/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY REGARDING SUCCESSION PLANNING AND LEADERSHIP TRAINING IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/20/09. 4/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHIRDO v. MINERALS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?