ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION Featured Case

Case Number: 2:2006md01741
Filed: February 27, 2006
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: RONALD L. BUCKWALTER
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2009 121 Featured Case ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 6, 2009 THE FOLLOWING CASES ARE MARKED CLOSED: C.A. 05-5090, 06-1303, 06-1311. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/20/09; 5/20/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-5090, 06-1303, 06-1311).(tjd)
May 19, 2009 120 FINAL JUDGMENT RE: C.A. 06-1302, 08-724 THAT THE SETTLEMENT IS APPROVED AS FAIR, REASONABLE AND ADEQUATE AND THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CONSUMMATE THE SETTLEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS AND PROVISIONS OF THE STIPULATION, ETC.; THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN THE STIPULATION, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/18/09; 5/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302, 08-724).(tjd)
May 19, 2009 119 Minute Sheet for proceedings held before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Fairness Hearing held on 5/12/09. Court Reporter: Matthew J. Higgins. (tjd)
March 24, 2009 118 Featured Case ORDER RE: AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/24/09; 3/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED BY CHAMBERS. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983 AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONS).(tjd)
March 24, 2009 117 Featured Case ORDER RE: FINAL JUDGEMENT; THE COURT HEREBY AFFIRMS ITS FINDINGS IN THE PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER THAT THE PREREQUISITES FOR A CLASS ACTION UNDER F.R.C.P. 23(a) AND (b)(3) HAVE BEEN SATISFIED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER; THE SETTLEMENT IS APPROVED AS FAIR, REASONABLE, AND ADEQUATE; THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN THE STIPULATION AS AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/24/09; 3/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND DISTRIBUTED BY CHAMBERS. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983 AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONS).(tjd)
March 6, 2009 116 Featured Case ORDER RE: PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE; A FAIRNESS HEARING IS SET FOR MAY 12, 2009 AT 4:00 PM IN COURTROOM 14A, ETC.; THE COURT APPROVES AS TO FORM AND CONTENT THE NOTICE ATTACHED AS EXHIBITS B AND FINDS THAT THE PUBLICATION OF THE NOTICE BY ISOLAGEN AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC.; THE COURT WILL CONSIDER COMMENTS AND/OR OBJECTIONS TO THE SETTLEMENT, ETC. AS LONG AS THEY ARE FILED WITH THE CLERK OF COURT AND COPIES ARE SERVED ON ON OR BEFORE 14 DAYS BEFORE THE FAIRNESS HEARING UPON THE COUNSEL LISTED ON THIS ORDER AND AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/5/09; 3/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302, 08-724).(tjd)
October 31, 2008 115 Memorandum in Support re 114 MOTION for Approval (Preliminary Approval) of Settlement, Preliminary Certification of the Class and Approval of Notice to the Class MOTION for Approval (Preliminary Approval) of Settlement, Preliminary Certification of the Class and Approval of Notice to the Class MOTION for Approval (Preliminary Approval) of Settlement, Preliminary Certification of the Class and Approval of Notice to the Class by CONTEXT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, MICHAEL F. MCNULTY, SILVERBACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, SILVERBACK LIFE SCIENCES MASTER FUND, LTD., SILVERBACK MASTER, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (GOLAN, JEFFREY)
October 31, 2008 114 MOTION for Approval (Preliminary Approval) of Settlement, Preliminary Certification of the Class and Approval of Notice to the Class filed by CONTEXT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, MICHAEL F. MCNULTY, SILVERBACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, SILVERBACK LIFE SCIENCES MASTER FUND, LTD., SILVERBACK MASTER, LTD..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1, part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1, part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1, part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1, part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1, part 7, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Certificate of Service)(GOLAN, JEFFREY)
July 9, 2008 113 COPY OF DOCKET FROM USCA WITH ENTRY DATED 5/22/08 ORDERING THAT THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION (lisad, )
April 29, 2008 112 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JENNIFER L. COHEN on behalf of CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP. Certificate of Service. (COHEN, JENNIFER) Modified on 4/30/2008 (tjd).
April 1, 2008 111 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES TO THE SECURITIES ACTION AND THE BEATTIE ACTION SHALL PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION BEFORE A PRIVATE MEDIATOR, ETC.; THE SCHEDULE ESTABLISHED IN THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IS HEREBY STAYED FOR 90 DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER AND ALL DEADLINES SET FORTH THEREIN SHALL BE ADJOURNED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT; THE DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE AGAINST OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE BEATTIE ACTION SHALL BE EXTENDED FOR 60 DAYS BEYOND THE 90-DAY PERIOD; WITHIN 90 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS STIPULATION THE PARTIES HERETO SHALL JOINTLY OR SEVERALLY REPORT TO THE COURT BY LETTER AS TO THE PROGRESS OR FINAL RESULT OF THE MEDIATION PROCESS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 4/1/08; 4/1/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983, 08-724).(tjd)
February 21, 2008 110 NOTICE by CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. of Consent to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims Without Prejudice (RAPISARDA, GREGORY)
February 12, 2008 109 NOTICE of Appearance by PAULA D SHAFFNER on behalf of CITIGROUP, INC., STIFEL FINANCIAL CORP., LEGG MASON, INC., LEGG MASON WOOD WALKER, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHAFFNER, PAULA)
December 10, 2007 108 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KARL H. BUCH, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 12/10/07; 12/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1311, 05-4983, 05-5090, 06-1302).(tjd)
December 10, 2007 107 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MEGAN J. KLEIN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 12/10/07; 12/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1311, 05-4983, 05-5090, 06-1302).(tjd)
December 6, 2007 106 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan J. Klein, Esquire by STEVEN MORRELL, HENRY Y.L TOH, RALPH DE MARTINO, MARSHALL G WEBB, FRANK M. DELAPE, ROBERT J. BITTERMAN, MICHAEL MACALUSO, OLGA MARKO, WILLIAM K. BOSS, JR, MICHAEL AVIGNON. Certificate of Service. (LINDY, JEFFREY) Modified on 12/7/2007 (tjd).
December 6, 2007 105 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karl H. Buch, Esquire by STEVEN MORRELL, HENRY Y.L TOH, RALPH DE MARTINO, MARSHALL G WEBB, FRANK M. DELAPE, ROBERT J. BITTERMAN, MICHAEL MACALUSO, OLGA MARKO, WILLIAM K. BOSS, JR, MICHAEL AVIGNON. Certificate of Service. (LINDY, JEFFREY) Modified on 12/7/2007 (tjd).
November 12, 2007 104 ANSWER to Complaint Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by STEVEN MORRELL, HENRY Y.L TOH, RALPH DE MARTINO, MARSHALL G WEBB, FRANK M. DELAPE, ROBERT J. BITTERMAN, MICHAEL MACALUSO, MARTIN SCHMEIG, OLGA MARKO, WILLIAM K. BOSS, JR, MICHAEL AVIGNON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LINDY, JEFFREY)
November 12, 2007 103 ANSWER to Complaint (First Corrected) by CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., certificate of servie.(COHEN, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/15/2007 (sc, ).
November 12, 2007 102 ANSWER to Complaint (First Corrected) by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., certificate of service.(COHEN, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/15/2007 (sc, ).
November 12, 2007 101 Defendant Isolagen, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint First Corrected Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ISOLAGEN, INC., certificate of service.(HAYES, ROBERT) Modified on 11/15/2007 (sc, ).
November 12, 2007 100 ANSWER to Complaint (First Corrected) by UBS SECURITIES, LLC., certficate of service. (COHEN, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/15/2007 (sc, ).
November 12, 2007 99 ANSWER to Complaint by CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC., certificate of service.(RAPISARDA, GREGORY) Modified on 11/15/2007 (sc, ).
November 12, 2007 98 ANSWER to Complaint (First Corrected Consolidated Class Action) by JEFFREY W. TOMZ, certificate of service.(DONLEY, JOSEPH) Modified on 11/15/2007 (sc, ).
November 6, 2007 97 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: DEFTS' ANSWER TO THE FIRST CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT IS TO BE FIELD BY NOVEMBER 12, 2007; PLFFS TO JOIN ANY ADDITIONAL PARTIES TO THE LITIGATION BY MARCH 31, 2008; LEAD PLFFS TO MOVE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY FEBRUARY 4, 2008, ETC., DEFTS TO FILE OPPOSITION TO LEAD PLFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BY MAY 19, 2008; PLFFS TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION BY JUNE 9, 2008; ALL DISCOVERY TO BE COMPLETED BY JUNE 8, 2008; MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY JULY 13, 2009, ETC. APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 11/7/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(sc, )
November 1, 2007 96 NOTICE by CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. of Authority regarding Case Management Order (RAPISARDA, GREGORY)
November 1, 2007 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Scheduling Hearing held on 10/31/07. Court Reporter/ESR Matthew Higgins. Applies to c.a. 05-4983. (sc, )
October 31, 2007 94 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC., TO CORRECT CAPTION IN MEMO OPINION OF SEPTEMBER 26, 2007 IS GRANTED; CITIGROUP, INC., LEGG MASON, INC., LEGG MASON WOOD WALKER, INC., AND STIFEL FINANCIAL CORP., BE DELETED FROM THE CAPTION IN THE MEMO OPINION OF SEPTEMBER 26, 2007; AND THAT CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC, BE ADDED AS A DEFT IN THE CAPTION IN THE MEMO OPINION OF SEPTEMBER 26, 2007. APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 10/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
October 31, 2007 93 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE RELIEF SOUGHT IN THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY DEFTS CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., UBS SECURITIES, LLC AND CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC., IS DENIED. APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 10/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
October 30, 2007 92 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STEVEN B. SINGER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), IS GRANTED. APPLIES TO C.A. 5-4983. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 10/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(sc, )
October 29, 2007 91 APPLICATION OF STEVEN B. SINGER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS. STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 cert of service# 2 proposed order)(tjd)
October 25, 2007 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CONTEXT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, MICHAEL F. MCNULTY, SILVERBACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, SILVERBACK LIFE SCIENCES MASTER FUND, LTD., SILVERBACK MASTER, LTD. re 89 Memorandum, in Opposition to the Underwriter Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (GOLAN, JEFFREY)
October 25, 2007 89 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Underwriter Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration re 86 MOTION for Reconsideration re 83 Memorandum & Opinion, MOTION for Reconsideration re 83 Memorandum & Opinion, by CONTEXT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, MICHAEL F. MCNULTY, SILVERBACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, SILVERBACK LIFE SCIENCES MASTER FUND, LTD., SILVERBACK MASTER, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re UW Defs' Motion for Reconsideration) (GOLAN, JEFFREY)
October 19, 2007 88 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by GREGORY E. RAPISARDA on behalf of CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. Certificate of Service. (RAPISARDA, GREGORY) Modified on 10/22/2007 (tjd).
October 15, 2007 87 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION IS EXTENDED UNTIL NOVEMBER 12, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 10/15/07; 10/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd)
October 11, 2007 86 MOTION for Reconsideration re 83 Memorandum & Opinion, filed by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP..Form of Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(COHEN, JENNIFER)
October 9, 2007 85 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edith K. Altice by CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1)(RAPISARDA, GREGORY) Modified on 10/10/2007 (tjd).
October 9, 2007 84 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption in Memorandum Opinion of September 26, 2007 filed by CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC... (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAPISARDA, GREGORY)
September 26, 2007 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ISOLAGEN AND INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED; DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 9/26/07; 9/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd)
June 4, 2007 82 Letter to Chambers by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. re 49 MOTION to Dismiss, 73 Reply to Response to Motion Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1)(RAPISARDA, GREGORY) Modified on 6/5/2007 (tjd).
June 4, 2007 81 Letter to Chambers by CITIGROUP, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. re 49 MOTION to Dismiss, 73 Reply to Response to Motion Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Bell Atlantic Corp. v. Twombly, 127 S. Ct. 1955 (2007))(RAPISARDA, GREGORY) Modified on 6/5/2007 (tjd). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY RE-FILED CORRECTLY) Modified on 6/5/2007 (nd). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2007 (nd, ).
May 31, 2007 80 Copy of TPO Form re 78 Notice of Appeal. (Applies to C.A. 06-1302). (tjd)
May 21, 2007 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 78 Notice of Appeal filed by PLAINTIFF(S). USCA Case Number 07-2445. (Applies to C.A. 06-1302). (tjd)
May 11, 2007 Filing fee: $ 455.00, receipt number 400 939260 fo rNotice of Appeal filed on 5/9/07. (tjd)
May 9, 2007 79 Clerk's Notice to USCA re 78 Notice of Appeal. (tjd)
May 9, 2007 78 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 76 Order by PLAINTIFF(S). Filing fee $ 455. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and MARC S. HENZEL. Certificate of Service. (HENZEL, MARC) Modified on 5/11/2007 (tjd).
April 17, 2007 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ISOLAGEN, INC., ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION, Certificate of Service. (HAYES, ROBERT) Modified on 4/18/2007 (np).
April 11, 2007 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE (C.A. 06-1302) BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJDUCICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 4/10/07; 4/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302).(tjd)
April 3, 2007 75 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC..(RAPISARDA, GREGORY)
April 2, 2007 74 NOTICES of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address by ROBERT HAYDEN BURNS, Certificates of Service. (Applies to C.A. 06-1302, 06-1311).(fdc) Modified on 4/3/2007 (tjd).
March 26, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including UBS AG with Certificate of Service by UBS SECURITIES, LLC. (For Original See Paper # 72 in 06-md-1741).(tjd)
March 26, 2007 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SHTASEL, LAURENCE)
March 26, 2007 72 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by UBS SECURITIES, LLC. Certificate of Service. (SHTASEL, LAURENCE) Modified on 3/27/2007 (tjd).
March 5, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP.. (SEE PAPER #71 FOR ATTACHMENT)(np)
March 5, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC.. (SEE PAPER #70 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 5, 2007 71 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP.. (SHTASEL, LAURENCE)
March 5, 2007 70 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC.. (SHTASEL, LAURENCE)
March 5, 2007 69 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO AMEND DOCUMENTS RELATED TO THE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF DONNA GOGGIN PATEL, JEFF G. HAMMEL, AND DAVID M. BRODSKY IS HEREBY GRANTED; THE CAPTIONS OF DOCUMENT NOS. 44-47, 52, AND 55 AS LISTED ON THE DOCKET SHEET FOR CASE 06-MD-1741 SHALL BE CONSIDERED AMENDED AND IDENTICAL TO THE CAPTION USED ABOVE TO REFLECT THAT THOSE DOCUMENTS ALSO RELATE TO C.A. 05-4983 AS WELL AS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONS; DOCUMENT NOS. 46-47, AND 55 SHALL BE CONSIDERED AMENDED SUCH THAT DONNA GOGGIN PATEL, JEFF G. HAMMEL, AND DAVID M. BRODSKY ARE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., CANACCORD, ADAMS, INC. AND UBS SECURITIES LLC IN 06-MD-1741 AND C.A. 05-4983 AS WELL AS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONS. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/5/07; 3/5/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2007 (tjd, ).
March 5, 2007 68 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME PERIOD IN WHICH DEFENDANTS MUST FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPECTIVE MOTIONS TO DISMISS SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL MARCH 26, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/5/07; 3/5/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2007 (tjd, ).
February 23, 2007 67 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP.. Amendment to 40 Notice of Appearance by Jennifer L. Cohen. (COHEN, JENNIFER)
February 23, 2007 66 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP. Amendment to 40 Notice of Appearance by Jennifer L. Cohen. (FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY WILL RESUBMIT). (COHEN, JENNIFER) Modified on 2/23/2007 (tjd).
February 23, 2007 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct 45 Application/Petition, 55 Order, 47 Order, 52 Application/Petition, 46 Order, 44 Application/Petition filed by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP..Certificate of Service.(SHTASEL, LAURENCE)
February 23, 2007 64 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP.. Amendment to 39 Notice of Appearance by Laurence S. Shtasel. (SHTASEL, LAURENCE)
February 22, 2007 63 MOTION to Amend/Correct 45 Application/Petition, 55 Order, 47 Order, 52 Application/Petition, 46 Order, 44 Application/Petition filed by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP. Certificate of Service. (FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY WILL RESUBMIT). (SHTASEL, LAURENCE) Modified on 2/23/2007 (tjd).
February 22, 2007 62 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP. Amendment to 39 Notice of Appearance by Laurence S. Shtasel. (FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY WILL RESUBMIT). (SHTASEL, LAURENCE) Modified on 2/23/2007 (tjd).
February 22, 2007 61 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP. Amendment to 40 Notice of Appearance by Jennifer L. Cohen. (FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY WILL RESUBMIT).(COHEN, JENNIFER) Modified on 2/23/2007 (tjd).
January 24, 2007 60 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 1/24/07; 1/25/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302).(tjd)
December 22, 2006 59 EXHIBITS A AND B RE: 58 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS by ISOLAGEN, INC. (np)
December 22, 2006 58 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memo of Law filed by ISOLAGEN, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1)(HAYES, ROBERT)
December 21, 2006 57 REPLACEMENT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT LEAD PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWERING BRIEF(S) IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 5, 2007; DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR REPLY BRIEFS ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 23, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 12/20/06; 12/22/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983 AND CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONS).(tjd)
December 15, 2006 56 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT LEAD PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR ANSWERING BRIEF(S) IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 22, 2006; DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE THEIR REPLY BRIEFS ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 2, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 12/13/06; 12/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd)
November 6, 2006 55 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID M. BRODSKY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED . SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 11/6/06; 11/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(tjd)
November 3, 2006 54 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHARLES O. MONK, II, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED . SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 11/2/06;11/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983). (tjd)
November 3, 2006 53 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF GREGORY E. RAPISARDA, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED . SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 11/2/06;11/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983). (tjd)
November 1, 2006 51 Appendix (Parts 1 & 2) to the Opening Memorandum of Law of Isolagen, Inc. and Individual Defendants in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the First Corrected Class Action Consolidated Complaint. Certificate of Service. (Applies to C.A. 05-4983).(tjd)
November 1, 2006 49 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Memorandum in Support# 3 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, JENNIFER)
October 31, 2006 52 APPLICATION BY DAVID M. BRODSKY FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., CANACCORD, ADAMS, INC., AND USB SECURITIES LLC, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (sc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2006 (tjd, ).
October 30, 2006 50 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY GREGORY E. RAPISARDA ON BEHALF OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC., CITIGROUP, INC., STIFEL FINANCIAL CORP., LEGG MASON, INC., LEGG MASON WOOD WALKER, INC. APPLICATION, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd)
October 30, 2006 48 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FILED BY CHARLES O. MONK, II ON BEHALF OF CITIGROUP, INC., STIFEL FINANCIAL CORP., LEGG MASON, INC., LEGG MASON WOOD WALKER, INC. APPLICATION, PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd)
September 26, 2006 47 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFF G. HAMMEL, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) ON BEHALF OF CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., UBS SECURITIES LLC AND CANNACORD, ADAMS, INC., IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 9/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
September 26, 2006 46 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DONNA GOGGIN PATEL, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) ON BEHALF OF CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., UBS SECURITIES LLC AND CANNACORD, ADAMS, INC., IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 9/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
September 22, 2006 45 APPLICATION OF DONNA GOGGIN PATEL FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (sc, )
September 22, 2006 44 APPLICATION OF JEFF G. HAMMEL FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE. (sc, )
September 18, 2006 43 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFTS SHALL HAVE NO OBLIGATION TO ANSWER THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT UNTIL NOVEMBER 1, 2006; PLFFS SHALL FILE ON OCTOBER 2, 2006 A CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTING PARTIES AND CORRECTING ANY TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS FOUND IN THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; ON NOVEMBER 1, 2006, DEFTS SHALL FILE OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; PLFFS SHALL FILE AN ANSWERING BRIEF ON DECEMBER 15, 2006; DEFTS SHALL FILE REPLY BRIEFS ON JANUARY 26, 2007. APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 9/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
September 15, 2006 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Derivative Plaintiff Joinder in Opposition filed by JEFFREY W. TOMZ. (DONLEY, JOSEPH)
September 15, 2006 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Derivative Plaintiff filed by ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (HAYES, ROBERT) Modified on 9/19/2006 (np).
September 15, 2006 40 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. COHEN on behalf of CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
September 14, 2006 39 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE S. SHTASEL on behalf of CIBC WORLD MARKETS CORP., CANACCORD ADAMS, INC., UBS SECURITIES, LLC. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
September 14, 2006 38 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN EDMUND BISORDI on behalf of CITIGROUP, INC., STIFEL FINANCIAL CORP., LEGG MASON, INC., LEGG MASON WOOD WALKER, INC. with Certificate of Service (BISORDI, JOHN)
September 13, 2006 37 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE S. SHTASEL on behalf of UBS SECURITIES, LLC with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (SHTASEL, LAURENCE)
September 13, 2006 36 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. COHEN on behalf of UBS SECURITIES, LLC, CANACCORD ADAMS, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (COHEN, JENNIFER) Modified on 9/14/2006 (np).
September 11, 2006 35 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ISOLAGEN, INC., FRANK DELAPE, ROBERT J. BITTERMAN, MICHAEL MACALUSO, OLGA MARKO, WILLIAM K. BOSS, JR., MICHAEL AVIGNON, STEVEN MORRELL, HENRY Y.L. TOH, RALPH DE MARTINO, MARSHALL G. WEBB AND SUSAN CIALLELLA MUST SERVE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED SHAREHOLDERS DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT BY SEPTEMBER 15, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 9/11/06; 9/11/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302).(tjd)
September 11, 2006 34 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME PERIOD WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT JEFFREY W. TOMZ MUST SERVE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF RICHARD KEENE'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED SHAREHOLDERS DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL SEPTEMBER 15, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 9/11/06; 9/11/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302).(tjd)
August 21, 2006 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Derivative Plaintiff filed by ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION.Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint, Proposed Order, Certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Ameded Complaint# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(HENZEL, MARC)
July 10, 2006 32 AMENDED STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES THERETO, AND A BRIEFING SCHEDULE: CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT DUE: JULY 14, 2006; DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DUE: SEPTEMBER 14, 2006; LEAD PLAINTIFFS' ANSWERING BRIEF DUE: OCTOBER 30, 2006; DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF DUE: NOVEMBER 20, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 7/10/06; 7/10/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983, CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONS).(tjd)
June 30, 2006 31 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT, DEFTS' RESPONSES THERETO, AND A BRIEFING SCHEDULE: CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT DUE JULY 14, 2006; DEFTS' RESONSE DUE SEPTEMBER 14, 2006; LEAD PLFFS' ANSWERING BRIEF DUE OCTOBER 30, 2006; DEFTS' REPLY BRIEF DUE NOVEMBER 20, 2006. APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983. SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM H. YOHN JR. 6/30/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 29, 2006 30 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME PERIOD WITHIN WHICH DEFT JEFFREY W. TOMZ MUST SERVE A REPLY TO PLFF RICHARD KEENES' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 29, 2006. APPLIES TO C.A. 6-1302. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 6/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 26, 2006 29 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME PERIOD WITHIN WHICH ISOLAGEN, INC., AND THE MOVING INDIVIDUAL DEFTS MUST SERVE A REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 29, 2006. APPLIES TO C.A. 6-1302. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 6/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 12, 2006 28 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KATHERINE G. MAECHLER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) ON BEHALF OF DEFT JEFFREY W. TOMZ, IS GRANTED. APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302, 06-1311. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 6/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 12, 2006 27 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SESHA KALAPATAPU, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) ON BEHALF OF DEFT JEFFREY W. TOMZ, IS GRANTED. APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302, 06-1311. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 6/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, )
June 12, 2006 26 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID M. BOND, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B), IS GRANTED ON BEHALF OF DEFT JEFFREY W. TOMZ. APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302, 06-1311. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. 6/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, ) Modified on 6/13/2006 (sc, ).
June 5, 2006 Filing fee: $ 120.00, receipt number 400 929360 for Applications Pro Hac Vice of Katherine G. Maechler, David M. Bond, Sesha Kalapatapu. (tjd)
June 5, 2006 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine G. Maechler filed by JEFFREY W. TOMZ.Certificate of Service.(DONLEY, JOSEPH)
June 5, 2006 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sesha Kalapatapu filed by JEFFREY W. TOMZ.Certificate of Service.(DONLEY, JOSEPH)
June 5, 2006 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David M. Bond, Esquire filed by JEFFREY W. TOMZ.Certificate of Service.(DONLEY, JOSEPH)
May 31, 2006 22 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF C. IAN ANDERSON, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/30/06; 6/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1311, 05-4983, 05-5090, 06-1302). (tjd)
May 31, 2006 21 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS J. MCCORMACK, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/30/06; 6/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1311, 05-4983, 05-2090, 06-1302).(tjd)
May 25, 2006 Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 400 929102 for Application Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. McCormack. (tjd) Modified on 5/25/2006 (tjd).
May 25, 2006 Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 400 929101 for Application Pro Hac Vice of C. Ian Anderson. (tjd)
May 23, 2006 20 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. McCormack, Esquire by STEVEN MORRELL, HENRY Y.L TOH, RALPH DE MARTINO, MARSHALL G WEBB, FRANK M. DELAPE, ROBERT J. BITTERMAN, MICHAEL MACALUSO, OLGA MARKO, WILLIAM K. BOSS, JR, MICHAEL AVIGNON. (LINDY, JEFFREY)
May 23, 2006 19 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Ian Anderson, Esquire by STEVEN MORRELL, HENRY Y.L TOH, RALPH DE MARTINO, MARSHALL G WEBB, FRANK M. DELAPE, ROBERT J. BITTERMAN, MICHAEL MACALUSO, OLGA MARKO, WILLIAM K. BOSS, JR, MICHAEL AVIGNON. (LINDY, JEFFREY)
May 23, 2006 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. (HENZEL, MARC)
May 18, 2006 17 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR LEAD PLAINTIFFS; CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT DUE: JUNE 30, 2006; DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE DUE: AUGUST 31, 2006; LEAD PLAINTIFFS' ANSWERING BRIEF DUE (IF DEFENDANTS MOVE TO DISMISS COMPLAINT): OCTOBER 16, 2006; DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF DUE (IF DEFENDANTS MOVE TO DISMISS COMPLAINT): NOVEMBER 6, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM YOHN FOR JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/17/06; 5/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983).(tjd) Modified on 6/1/2006 (tjd).
May 4, 2006 16 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WILLIAM B. FEDERMAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. (APPLIES CASE NO. 06-1302) . SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/3/06. 5/4/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(mac, )
April 20, 2006 15 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING BRIEFING SCHEDULE WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED SHAREHOLDER COMPLAINT IS ENTERED: SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE AMENDED COMPLAINT DUE: MAY 15, 2006; DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS DUE: JUNE 5, 2006; PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS DUE: JUNE 20, 2006; REPLY BRIEFS TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS DUE: JUNE 26, 2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 4/20/06; 4/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302).(tjd) Modified on 4/20/2006 (tjd).
April 18, 2006 14 Joint Stipulation for Order filed by ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION, Derivative Stipulation & Order on Briefing Schedule.(HENZEL, MARC) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/19/2006 (np).
April 4, 2006 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE INVESTMENT FUND GROUP'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF THEIR SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE CLASS IS GRANTED; SILVERBACK, CONTEXT AND MCNULTY ARE APPOINTED TO SERVE AS LEAD PLAINTIFFS, ETC; THE SELECTION OF COUNSEL BY THE INVESTMENT FUND GROUP IS APPROVED AND THE LAW FIRMS OF BERNSTEIN, LITOWITZ, BERGER & GROSSMAN, LLP AND KIRBY, MCINERNEY & SQUIRE, LLP ARE HEREBY APPOINTED AS CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE CLASS; THE MOTIONS OF MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS' GROUP AND OPPENHEIM PRAMERICA ASSET MANAGEMENT, S.A.R.L. (OPAM) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 4/4/06; 4/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(tjd)
April 3, 2006 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Plaintiffs argue for Lead Class Plaintiff on 3/30/06. Court Reporter/ESR Matthew J. Higgins. (sc, )
March 27, 2006 11 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF TRICIA L. MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/27/06; 3/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983, 05-5090).(tjd)
March 27, 2006 10 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF GERALD H. SILK, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/27/06; 3/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983, 05-5090).(tjd)
March 27, 2006 9 APPLICATION AND STATEMENT IN SUPPORT FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY WILLIAM B. FEDERMAN. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO C.A. 06-1302). (tjd)
March 27, 2006 Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 400 926983 for Application of Gerald H. Silk. (tjd)
March 27, 2006 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gerald H. Silk, Esq. filed by CONTEXT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, MICHAEL F. MCNULTY, SILVERBACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, SILVERBACK LIFE SCIENCES MASTER FUND, LTD., SILVERBACK MASTER, LTD..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 2 Certificate of Service)(GOLAN, JEFFREY)
March 24, 2006 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. BERNEY, JEFFREY M. LINDY on behalf of FRANK M. DELAPE, ROBERT J. BITTERMAN, MICHAEL MACALUSO, OLGA MARKO, WILLIAM K. BOSS, JR, MICHAEL AVIGNON. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
March 24, 2006 6 APPLICATION AND STATEMENT IN SUPPORT FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY TRICIA L. MCCORMICK. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983, 05-5090). (tjd)
March 23, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTIONS TO APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTERS IS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 30, 2006 AT 9:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 14A. SIGNED BY JUDGE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/23/06; 3/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (APPLIES TO C.A. 05-4983, 05-5090).(tjd)
March 9, 2006 4 MOTION to Reinstate Motion to Appoint the Investment Fund Group as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel filed by CONTEXT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, MICHAEL F. MCNULTY, SILVERBACK ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, SILVERBACK LIFE SCIENCES MASTER FUND, LTD., SILVERBACK MASTER, LTD..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GOLAN, JEFFREY)
March 8, 2006 3 MOTION to Reinstate Motion to Appoint Oppenheim Pramerica Asset Management S.A.R.L. As Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel filed by ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION.certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service)(GROSS, DEBORAH)
March 8, 2006 2 MOTION to Reinstate MOTION TO APPOINT THE MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS? GROUP AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND FOR APPROVAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF?S SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION.Notice, Declaration of service, Service List. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Service List)(HENZEL, MARC)
February 27, 2006 1 Certified Copy of Transfer Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following actions: Gargiulo (ED-PA: 2:05-4983), Newman (ED-PA: 2:05-5090), Liff (SD-TX: 4:05-2887), Cummiskey (SD-TX: 4:05-3105), Keene (SD-TX: 4:05-3441) to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania and with the consent of the court assigned to the Honorable Ronald L. Buckwalter for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district. (tjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISOLAGEN, INC., SECURITIES & DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?