LUGO et al v. FARMER'S PRIDE INC.
Plaintiff: LUZ LUGO and YESENIA MARCO
Defendant: FARMER'S PRIDE INC.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00749
Filed: February 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Lehigh
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDERTHAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AS TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES, GRANTED AS TO THE APPLICABLE TWO-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMINTATIONS AND DENIED AS TO ALL OTHER CLAIMS. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/20/2011. 7/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED BY CHAMBERS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/23/2011. 6/24/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEYS AND E-MAILED.(lbs, )
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL CERTIFY FOR TRIAL A CLASS OF PLAINTIFF AND FOR PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR NOT BEING PAID MEAL PERIODS. COUNSEL SHALL CONFER ON A PRETRIAL SCHEDULE FOR SUCH MATTERS AS THEY BELIEVE ARE APPROPRIATE AND A PROPSOED TRIAL DATE E TC.. THE COURT WILL HAVE A RECORDED PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/21/2010 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. THE CASE WILL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE PENDING THE TRIAL OF THIS LIMITED CLASS CLAIM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/9/2010. 12/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(sg, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DECERITFY THE COLLECTIVE ACTION CLASS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL ADVISE THE COURT WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THEIR INTENTIONS AND PROPOSAL CONCERNING A COLLECTIVE ACTION OR OTHERWISE; DEFENDANT MAY THEN RESPOND WITHIN 1 4 DAYS AND A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 9/29/2010 AT 3:30 PM AND WILL BE HELD BY TELECONFERENCE UNLESS ALL COUNSEL PREFER AN IN-COURT HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/25/2010. 8/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUGO et al v. FARMER'S PRIDE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ LUGO
Represented By: BRIAN P. MCCAFFERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YESENIA MARCO
Represented By: BRIAN P. MCCAFFERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARMER'S PRIDE INC.
Represented By: JILL S. WELCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?