CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. v. FACEBOOK, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Cross Atlantic Capital Partners Inc. alleges that defendant Facebook, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,518,629 B2 entitled "System for creating a community for users with common interests to interact in."

Plaintiff: CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.
Defendant: FACEBOOK, INC. and THEFACEBOOK, LLC
Counter_claimant: FACEBOOK, INC. and THEFACEBOOK, LLC
Counter_defendant: CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2007cv02768
Filed: July 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JOHN R. PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONOF KEVIN P. ANDERSON, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF PLFF CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/5/10. ) 4/6/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JAMES H. WALLACE, JR., ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF PLFF CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. IS GRANTED. (. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/5/10. ) 4/6/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER THAT TH APPLICATION OF GREGORY LYONS, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF PLFF CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/5/10. ) 4/6/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 218 APPLICATION BY PLFF CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF GREGORY LYONS, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( $40.00 PAID RECEIPT #020215) (gn, ) (gn, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 217 APPLICATION BY PLFF CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF KEVIN P. ANDERSON, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( $40.00 PAID RECEIPT #020215) (gn, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 216 APPLICATION BY PLFF CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF JAMES H. WALLACE, JR., ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( $40.00 PAID RECEIPT #020215) (gn, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO AMEND AND TO STRIKE DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #211) IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/3/09. ) 11/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 27, 2009 Filing 214 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CRAIG W. CLARK on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC(MCCOOE, DENNIS) Modified on 10/28/2009 (nd, ).
October 27, 2009 Filing 213 NOTICE of Change of Address by DENNIS P. MCCOOE(MCCOOE, DENNIS)
October 21, 2009 Filing 212 RESPONSE in Opposition re 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct 210 Suspense Order MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity (D.E. #138) filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MCCOOE, DENNIS) Modified on 10/22/2009 (nd, ).
October 8, 2009 Filing 211 MOTION to Amend/Correct 210 Suspense Order, MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity (D.E. #138) filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC..Certificate of Service.(TECCE, FREDERICK)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/18/08. 8/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sc, )
August 18, 2008 Filing 209 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (DOC #179) IS GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO THE PARTIES TO SEEK TO LIFT THE STAY AFTER THE UNITED STATES PATENT & TRADEMARK OFFICE HAS ISSUED TO ITS DECISION ON WHETHER TO GRANT REEXAMINATION. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/18/08. ) 8/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 18, 2008 Filing 205 RESPONSE in Opposition re 183 MOTION for Leave to File to File Reply Brief or in The Alternative Motion For Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment of Inequitable Conduct filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (TECCE, FREDERICK)
August 18, 2008 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re 189 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Infringement Re Current Facebook System or in The Alternative For Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Re Current Facebook System filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (TECCE, FREDERICK)
August 18, 2008 Filing 203 RESPONSE in Opposition re 187 MOTION to Strike 166 Memorandum Ntc of Mtn and Mtn to Strike Declaration of Donald Caldwell; Mem of Law ISO Mtn to Strike; Burke Decl ISO Mtn to Strike; Proposed Order MOTION to Strike 166 Memorandum Ntc of Mtn and Mtn to Strike Declaration of Donald Caldwell; Mem of Law ISO Mtn to Strike; Burke Decl ISO Mtn to Strike; Proposed Order ; Declaration of Frederick A. Tecce with Exhibits A Through D filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (TECCE, FREDERICK)
August 15, 2008 Filing 208 RESPONSE to defts' motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of defts' motionfor summary judgment of Invalidity, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. Certificate of Service. ( Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition attached) ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
August 15, 2008 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition to defts' motion to strike the declarations of Edward Yourdon and preclude evidence, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Brief, Certificate of Service. ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
August 15, 2008 Filing 206 Response to defts' motion for leave to file a reply brief in suport of defts' motionfor summary judgment on Non-Infringement, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Certificate of Service. ( Sur-Reply Memorandum attached) ( FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
August 12, 2008 Filing 202 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC re 180 Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,519,629 NTC of Mtn and Mtn for Leave to file Reply; Reply ISO Def's Mtn to Stay, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED). (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 8/14/2008 (afm, ).
August 11, 2008 Filing 201 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 179 MOTION to Stay Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,519,629 filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A - continued, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit J - continued, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N)(KEENAN, PATRICK) Modified on 8/12/2008 (nd).
July 28, 2008 Filing 200 Memorandum of Law in support of defts' motion to strike the declaration of Donald Caldwell, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 199 EXHIBIT A to defts' Notice of motion and motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of defts' motion for partial summary judgment precluding injunction, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 198 EXHIBIT A to defts' Notice of Motion and motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of defts' motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 197 Reply in support of defts' motion for summar judgment of invalidity, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 196 EXHIBIT A to declaration of Mark R. Weinstein in support of defts' reply in support of deft's motion for summary judgment of invalidity, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 195 EXHIBITS A-E to declaration of Craig W. Clark in support of defts' reply to plff's response in opposition to defts' motion for summary judgment of inequitable conduct, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 194 Reply to plff's response in opposition to defts' motion for summary judgment of inequitable conduct, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 193 EXHIBITS A-G to Declaration of Craig W. Clark in support of defts' motion to strike the declarations of Edward Yourdon and preclude evidence, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. ( UNDER SEAL )(gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 192 MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATIONS OF EDWARD YOURDON AND PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, FILED BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( UNDER SEAL) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 191 EXHIBIT A to defts' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File A Reply Brief in support of reply in support of defts' motion for partial summary judgment of noninfringement re current Facebook System, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 190 MOTION to Strike Ntc of Mtn and Mtn to Strike Declaration of D Caldwell; Memorandum of Law ISO Mtn to Strike; Burke Decl ISO Mtn to Strike; Proposed Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. Declaration; Proposed Order AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/29/2008 (afm, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 189 NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT RE CURRENT FACEBOOK SYSTEM by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC , DECLARATION. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/29/2008 (afm, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 188 MOTION to Strike Ntc of Mtn and Mtn to Strike Declarationof E Yourdon and Preclude Evidence; Motion to Strike; Clark Decl ISO Mtn to Strike; Proposed Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. Declaration; Certificate of Service; Proposed Order.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/29/2008 (afm, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 187 MOTION to Strike 166 Memorandum Ntc of Mtn and Mtn to Strike Declaration of Donald Caldwell; Mem of Law ISO Mtn to Strike; Burke Decl ISO Mtn to Strike; Proposed Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Brief; Declaration; Proposed order.(KEEFE, HEIDI) **(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY., ATTY. HAS REFILED, SEE DOC. # 190 )** Modified on 7/29/2008 (fh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2008: # 1 MAIN DOC.) (fh, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 186 NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT PRECLUDING INJUNCTION by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC re 166 , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/29/2008 (afm, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 185 NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC , DECLARATION AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/29/2008 (afm, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 184 NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC re 165 Exhibit, DECLARATION AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/29/2008 (afm, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 183 NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC, DECLARATION AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/29/2008 (afm, ).
July 25, 2008 Filing 182 Proposed Order RE 179 MOTION to Stay by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/28/2008 (afm, ).
July 25, 2008 Filing 181 Declaration re 179 MOTION to Stay Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,519,629 Decl of Heidi Keefe ISO facebook's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of US Patent 6,519,629 by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Keefe Decl Exs A-F, # 2 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex G, # 3 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex H, # 4 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex I-J Pt 1 of 3, # 5 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex J Pt 2 of 3, # 6 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex J Pt 3 of 3)(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/28/2008 (afm, ).
July 25, 2008 Filing 180 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,519,629 filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 7/28/2008 (afm, ).
July 25, 2008 Filing 179 MOTION to Stay Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,519,629 filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Certificate of Service.(KEEFE, HEIDI)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER THAT THE REDACTED PORTIONS OF THE "POST LAWSUIT INVESTOR EMAILS" ARE SUBJECT TO ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/23/08. ) 7/23/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
July 15, 2008 Filing 176 Reply And ANSWER to 76 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Amended) by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC..(TECCE, FREDERICK)
July 14, 2008 Filing 177 DECLARATION of PATRICK J. KEENAN, ESQ., as to CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.'s Brief in Opposition to Defts' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G - Part 1 (Declaration), # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N) (md) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2008: # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit G - Part 2, # 17 Exhibit O) (md)
July 14, 2008 Filing 175 Brief in opposition to defts FACEBOOK, INC. & THE FACEBOOK, LLC'S motion for summary judgment of invalidity, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Certificate of Service. ( Document exceeds 3.5mh - too large) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Brief in opposition to defts FACEBOOK, INC. & THE FACEBOOK, LLC'S motion for summary judgment of invalidity, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Certificate of Service. ( Document exceeds 3.5mb) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 174 Response and Counterstatement to plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC'S Statement of Uncontested Facts in support of motion for partial summary judgment, filed by defts' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 173 Declaration of MICHAEL KEARNS, PH.D., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 172 Declaration of CRAIG W. CLARK in support of FACEBOOK'S opposition to plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNER, INC.'S motion for partial summary judgment, Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 171 Declaration of BLAKE ROSS filed here in support of FACEBOOK'S Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of its opposition to plff's motion for partial summary judgment of infringement, Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 170 Declaration of DUSTIN MOSKOVITZ in support of FACEBOOK'S Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of its opposition to plff's motion for partial summary judgment of infringement, Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 169 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of its opposition to plff's motion for partial summary judgment of infringement, filed by deft FACEBOOK, INC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 168 Brief in support of its opposition to defts motion for partial summary judgment of non-infringement re: Current FACEBOOK SYSTEM, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 167 Brief in support of its opposition to defts' motion for summary judgment of inequitable conduct, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 166 Brief in support of its opposition to defts' motion for summary judgment precluding injunction, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 165 APPENDIX to Brief in opposition to defts, FACEBOOK, INC. & THE FACEBOOK, LLC'S motion for summary judgment of invalidity, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. (gn, ) Modified on 7/15/2008 (gn, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2008: # 1 brief) (gn, ).
July 14, 2008 Filing 164 APPENDIX to Brief in opposition to defts, FACEBOOK & THE FACEBOOK, LLC'S motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 163 Declaration of PATRICK J. KEENAN, ESQUIRE. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 162 Brief in opposition to defts FACEBOOK, INC. and THE FACEBOOK, LLC'S motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Certificate of Service. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 161 Response to defts FACEBOOK, INC. and THE FACEBOOK, LLC'S Statement of Material Facts in support of motion for summary judgment of non-infringement, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Certificate of Service. (gn, )
July 14, 2008 Filing 160 NOTICE by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. re 136 Statement By Way of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Precluding Injunction (TECCE, FREDERICK)
July 14, 2008 Filing 159 NOTICE by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. re 120 MOTION for More Definite Statement Facebook's Statement of Material Facts ISO Motin for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re current Facebook system of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Re Current Facebook System (TECCE, FREDERICK)
July 14, 2008 Filing 158 NOTICE by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. re 126 Statement By Way of Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment of Inequitable Conduct (TECCE, FREDERICK)
July 14, 2008 Filing 157 NOTICE by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC Response and Counterstatement to XACP's Statement of Uncontested Facts ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docket 143) (KEEFE, HEIDI)
July 14, 2008 Filing 156 Declaration re 152 Response to Motion Declaration of Dustin Moskovitz ISO Opposition to XACP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
July 14, 2008 Filing 155 Declaration re 152 Response to Motion Declaration of Blake Ross Filed Here ISO Opposition to XACP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
July 14, 2008 Filing 154 Declaration re 152 Response to Motion Declaration of Michael Kearns ISO Opposition to XACP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
July 14, 2008 Filing 153 Declaration re 152 Response to Motion Declaration of Craig W. Clark ISO Opp to XACP Motion for partial summary judgment by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
July 14, 2008 Filing 152 RESPONSE to Motion re 143 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Mem of Points & Authorities In Support of Opposition to XACP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
July 14, 2008 Filing 151 RESPONSE to Motion re 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment FB Motin for SJ of Invalidity filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KEENAN, PATRICK)
July 1, 2008 RESPONSES DUE BY 7/14/2008. (gn, )
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER THAT PLFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE (DOC #149) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES WILL SUBMIT THEIR RESPECTIVE RESPONSES TO THE PENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS ON OR BEFORE 7/14/08. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/30/08.) 7/1/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 26, 2008 Filing 149 Consent MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Response Dates (Unopposed) filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC..Certificate of Service.(TECCE, FREDERICK)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER THAT DEFTS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC #108) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/23/08. ) 6/24/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 147 MOTION NO. 5 FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT PRECLUDING INJUNCTION, FILED BY DEFT FACEBOOK, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 146 MOTION NO. 4 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT, FILED BY DEFT FACEBOOK, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 145 MOTION NO. 2 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT, FILED BY DEFT FACEBOOK, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 144 MOTION NO. 1 FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT RE: CURRENT FACEBOOK SYSTEM, FILED BY FACEBOOK, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 143 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, FILED BY PLFF CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 142 Statement Statement of Material Facts ISO FB Mtn for SJ of Inequitable Conduct by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 141 Statement FB Statement of Material Facts ISO Mtn for SJ of Invalidity by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 140 Declaration re 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment FB Motin for SJ of Invalidity Declaration of M Weinstein ISO FB Mtn for SJ of Invalidity by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Exhibit Ex C, # 4 Exhibit Ex D, # 5 Exhibit Ex E, # 6 Exhibit Ex F, # 7 Exhibit Ex G, # 8 Exhibit Ex H, # 9 Exhibit Ex I)(KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment FB Motin for SJ of Invalidity filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 138 NOTICE by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC FB Ntc of Motion and Mtn for SJ of Invalidity (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 137 Declaration re 135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Mem of POA ISO FB Mtn for PSJ precluding injunction REDACTED DECL OF HEIDI KEEFE ISO FB Mtn for PSJ precluding injunction by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 136 Statement Statement of Material Facts ISO FB Mtn for PSJ precluding injunction by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 135 Memorandum of Points Of Authority In Support Of FB Motion for Partial Summary Judgment precluding injunction filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 6/23/2008 (nd).
June 20, 2008 Filing 134 NOTICE by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC Notice of Motion and Motion for PSJ Precluding Injunction (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 133 Declaration re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED FB Ntc of Mtn and Mtn for SJ of Non-Infringement REDACTED Decl of Blake Ross ISO Mtn for SJ of Non-Infringement by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 132 Declaration re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED FB Ntc of Mtn and Mtn for SJ of Non-Infringement Declaration of Burke ISO FB Mtn SJ of Non-Infringement and Ex A by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 131 Statement REDACTED Statement of Material Facts ISO Mtn SJ of Non-Infringement by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 130 REDACTED FB Ntc of Mtn and Mtn for SJ of Non-Infringement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 6/23/2008 (nd).
June 20, 2008 Filing 129 NOTICE by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC FB Ntc of Mtn and Mtn for SJ of Non-Infringement (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 128 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Order by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 127 Declaration re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment FB Memorandum of POA ISO Mtn for SJ of Inequitable Conduct REDACTED McCooe Decl ISO FB Mtn for SJ of Inequitable Conduct and Exs A-T by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit McCooe Decl Exs U-V, # 2 Exhibit McCooe Decl Ex W part 1, # 3 Exhibit McCooe Decl Ex W part 2, # 4 Exhibit McCooe Decl Exs X-Y)(KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 126 Statement REDACTED Stmt of Material Facts ISO FB Mtn for SJ of Inequitable Conduct by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 125 FB Memorandum of POA ISO Mtn for SJ of Inequitable Conduct filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Memorandum of POA.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 6/23/2008 (nd).
June 20, 2008 Filing 124 NOTICE by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC FB Notice of Mtn and Mtn for SJ of Inequitable Conduct (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 123 Proposed Pretrial Order [Proposed] Order by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 122 Declaration re 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re Current Facebook System REDACTED Decl of Craig Clark ISO Mtn for PSJ of Non-Infringement re current FB system by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 121 Declaration re 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re Current Facebook System REDACTED Declaration of Blake Ross ISO Motion for PSJ of Non-Infringement re current FB system by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 120 MOTION for More Definite Statement Facebook's Statement of Material Facts ISO Motin for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re current Facebook system filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Material Facts.(KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re Current Facebook System filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Memorandum.(KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 20, 2008 Filing 118 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Facebook's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re Current Facebook System filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Notice and Motion.(KEEFE, HEIDI)
June 13, 2008 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Reply Brief)(MCCOOE, DENNIS)
June 10, 2008 Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re 108 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Notice and Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Certification under Local Rule 26.1(f) MOTION to Compel Defendants' Notice and Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Certification under Local Rule 26.1(f) and Declaration of Frederick A. Tecce; Declaration of Richard Fox; and Declaration of James Harvey, all in Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (TECCE, FREDERICK)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION FOR CRAIG W. CLARK IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/5/08. 6/6/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(rf, )
May 30, 2008 Filing 114 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC..(MCCOOE, DENNIS)
May 23, 2008 Filing 113 SEALED ENVELOPE. ( UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
May 23, 2008 Filing 112 Proposed Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 5/27/2008 (fh)
May 23, 2008 Filing 111 Appendix to Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 5/27/2008 (fh)
May 23, 2008 Filing 110 Declaration of Heidi L. Keefe ISO Facebook's Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Redacted Exhibits filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits to Keefe Declaration)(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 5/27/2008 (fh)
May 23, 2008 Filing 109 Redacted Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 5/27/2008 (fh)
May 23, 2008 Filing 108 Notice & Renewed MOTION to Compel Defendants' Notice and Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Certification under Local Rule 26.1(f) filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 5/27/2008 (fh, ).
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER THAT PLFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISCOVERY (DOC #103) IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/6/08. ) 5/7/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
May 5, 2008 Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion re 103 MOTION for Discovery By Way of Leave to Serve Seven Additional Interrogatories Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to serve additional interrogatories filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 5/8/2008 (afm, ).
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO THE WITHDRAWAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, OF PARAGRAPHS 27 AND 29 OF ITS COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/21/08. ) 4/24/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 22, 2008 Filing 104 EXHIBIT B to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC... (TECCE, FREDERICK)
April 21, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION for Discovery By Way of Leave to Serve Seven Additional Interrogatories filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC..Certficiate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Cross Atlantic Capital Partners, Inc.'s First Set of Interogatories Directed to Defendants)(TECCE, FREDERICK)
April 17, 2008 Filing 102 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint Stipulation to withdraw paragraphs 27 and 29 by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/18/2008 (nd).
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER THAT THE CONSTRUCTION OF "TRANSMIT" CONTAINED IN PARAGRAPH 1(g) OF THE COURT'S CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DATED 2/29/08, IS AMENDED TO READ: "ELECTRONICALLY CONNECTING AND/OR COMMUNICATING BY ANY WIRELESS OR WIRE MECHANISM." ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/3/08. ) 4/4/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINES ESTABLISHED BY THE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ARE ADJUSTED AS FOLLOWS: DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/21/2008. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 8/22/2008. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/22/2008. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/5/2008. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS 6/20/08. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS 9/19/08. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 10/20/2008. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/3/08. ) 4/4/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 2, 2008 Filing 99 Report Of Telephone Conference held on 4/2/08 before Judge Padova. (gn, ) Modified on 4/8/2008 (le, ).
March 26, 2008 Filing 98 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Response to Order to Show Cause re Construction of "transmit")(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 3/27/2008 (fh)
March 24, 2008 Filing 97 PLAINTIFFS' Memorandum in Support of the COURT'S PROPOSED AMENDMENT TO ITS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 29, 2008, by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Certificate of Service. (TECCE, FREDERICK) Modified on 3/31/2008 (fh)
March 18, 2008 Filing 96 Memorandum in opposition to defts' motion for protective order, filed by plff CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Certificate of Service. ( EXHIBITS A THROUGH D ATTACHED FILED UNDER SEAL ) (gn, )
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT AMEND OUR CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER DATED 2/9/08, BY DELETING WORDS "SENDING OUT" FROM THE CONSTRUCTION OF THE TERM "TRANSMIT," TO MAKE CONSTRUCTION CONSISTENT WITH THE COURT'S STATED RATIONALE, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANY PARTY SO WISHING MAY FILE A RESPONSE, NOT EXCEEDING (10) PAGES, TO THIS SHOW CAUSE ORDER WITHIN (7) DAYS. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/17/08. ) 3/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 17, 2008 Filing 94 Reply in support of its motion to comple further responses to FACE BOOK Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documentss, filed by defts' filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THE FACEBOOK, LLC. (gn, )
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC #77) IS GRANTED AS TO INTERROGATORIES 2 AND 5; THE MOTION IS DENIED INSOFAR AS IT SEEKS A FURTHER RESPONSE TO DEFTS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. DEFTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; (DOC #83) IS DENIED. DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE TO FILE A REPLY (DOC #88) IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/17/08. )3/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 17, 2008 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION for Protective Order filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) A (Filed Under Seal) Through D in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Protective Order)(TECCE, FREDERICK)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR ALL REQUESTS FOR AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY TO BE SERVED, NOTICED AND COMPLETED SHALL BE CONTINUNED TO 4/16/08. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/11/08. ) 3/13/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
March 7, 2008 Filing 90 STIPULATION to Continue Expert Report Deadlines and the Discovery Cutoff by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/12/2008 (nd).
March 5, 2008 Filing 89 Proposed Order RE: MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 3/6/2008 (nd).
March 5, 2008 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC..(KEEFE, HEIDI)
March 4, 2008 Filing 87 [Proposed] Order RE: MOTION for Protective Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.[Proposed] Order.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 3/5/2008 (nd).
March 4, 2008 Filing 86 Declaration of Mark Zuckerberg in Support of Facebook's Motion for Protective Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Declaration.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 3/5/2008 (nd).
March 4, 2008 Filing 85 Declaration of Mark R. Weinstein in Support of Facebook's Motion for Protective Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Declaration.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 3/5/2008 (nd).
March 4, 2008 Filing 84 Facebook's Memorandum of Law in Suppport of Its Motion for Protective Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Memorandum.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 3/5/2008 (nd).
March 4, 2008 Filing 83 MOTION for Protective Order filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Memorandum.(KEEFE, HEIDI)
March 3, 2008 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re 77 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories And Requests For Production of Documents filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) - A Through D in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories And Production of documents)(TECCE, FREDERICK)
February 29, 2008 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DISPUTED CLAIM TERMS SOF THE '629 PATENT ARE CONSTRUED AS INDICATED: "COMMUNITY" IS CONSTRUED TO MEAN "INFORMATION AND AT LEAST ONE FUNCTION RELATING TO A SPECIFIC TRANSACTION, INTERACTION, AND/OR EXPRESSION OF INTEREST THAT MAY BE ACCESSED AND/OR INTERACTED WITH BY A PLURALITY OF USERS WITH COMMON INTERESTS THROUGH A PRIVATE OR PUBLIC COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, SUCH AS WEB PAGES OR AN INTERNET SITE", ETC. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/29/08. ) 3/3/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
February 15, 2008 Filing 80 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
February 15, 2008 Filing 79 MOTION to Compel Declaration of Heidi Keefe ISO Facebook's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents and Complete Interrogatory Responses filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Keefe Decl Exh A-G, # 2 Exhibit Keefe Decl Exh H-M, # 3 Exhibit Keefe Decl - Exh N)(KEEFE, HEIDI)
February 15, 2008 Filing 78 MOTION to Compel Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motin to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Motion to Compel)(KEEFE, HEIDI)
February 15, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION to Compel Further Responses filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Notice and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents; Certification under 26.1(F).(KEEFE, HEIDI)
February 15, 2008 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/8/08 before Judge PADOVA. Court Reporter: JEN CABRERA. HEARING (jl, )
February 14, 2008 Filing 76 FACEBOOK, INC., THE FACEBOOK, LLC.'S First Amended Answer and CounterClaims, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand (FILED UNDER SEAL). (fdc)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/14/08.2/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 12, 2008 Filing 73 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS, DECLARATION OF HEIDI L. KEEFE, WITH SUPPORTING EXHIBITS, FILED BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. ( UNDER SEAL ).(gn, )
February 12, 2008 Filing 72 Amended Minute Entry (Amending Doc #68) for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Markman Hearing held on 2/12/2008. ESR Reporter: Jennifer Cabrera. (gn, )
February 12, 2008 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF 69 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 2/13/2008 (fh)
February 12, 2008 Filing 70 PROPOSED ORDER RE: 69 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC..(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 2/13/2008 (fh)
February 12, 2008 Filing 69 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Counterclaims, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Heidi Keefe, # 10 Certificate of Service)(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 2/13/2008 (fh)
February 11, 2008 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Status Conference held on 2/11/08. ESR Reporter: Jennifer Cabrera. (gn, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR ALL REQUESTS FOR AND RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY TO BE SERVED, NOTICE AND COMPLETED SHALL BE CONTINUED FROM 3/26/08 TO 4/9/08. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/7/08. ) 2/11/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
February 6, 2008 Filing 66 STIPULATION to Continue Expert Report Deadlines and the Discovery Cutoff by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/7/2008 (nd).
January 18, 2008 Filing 65 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing/argument re Plaintiff's proposed claim construction set for 2/8/2008 9:30 AM in COURTROOM 17B before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, )
January 18, 2008 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Address by THOMAS J. DUFFY(DUFFY, THOMAS)
January 18, 2008 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by PATRICK J. KEENAN(KEENAN, PATRICK)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER APPROVING PROTECTIVE ORDER. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/16/08. ) 1/18/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 17, 2008 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/08 (gn, )
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONFOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY (DOC #51) IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/15/08. ) 1/16/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
January 15, 2008 Filing 59 Proposed Pretrial Order by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Order Dated December 20, 2007, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Protective Order and Protective Order)(KEENAN, PATRICK)
January 11, 2008 Filing 58 MOTION for Order re Defendant Facebook's Memorandum in Support of its proposed claim construction filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Claim Construction Brief.(KEEFE, HEIDI)
January 11, 2008 Filing 57 Proposed Pretrial Order by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
January 11, 2008 Filing 56 Declaration of Heidi L. Keefe Attaching Exhibits to Defendant Facebook's Memorandum in Support of Its Proposed Claim Construction by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex B, # 3 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex C, # 4 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex D, # 5 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex E, # 6 Exhibit Keefe Decl Ex F)(KEEFE, HEIDI)
January 11, 2008 Filing 55 EXHIBITS by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC in support of its proposd claim construction. (Exhibits filed in hard copy)(gn, )
December 28, 2007 Filing 54 NOTICE by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. of Filing of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of its Proposed Claim Construction (TECCE, FREDERICK)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE A CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.1 (f) IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF ALL ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN ITS NATIVE FORM IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/20/07. 12/24/07 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 20, 2007 Filing 52 Opposition to 51 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Responses and Documents Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC., Certificate of Service.(KEEFE, HEIDI) Modified on 12/31/2007 (fh)
December 20, 2007 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Responses and Documents filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service, Exh. A,1,2,3.(KEENAN, PATRICK)
December 13, 2007 Filing 50 Proposed Pretrial Order re Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
December 13, 2007 Filing 49 Declaration re 46 Response in Opposition to Motion re Declaration of Dennis P. McCooe by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
December 13, 2007 Filing 48 Declaration re 46 Response in Opposition to Motion re Declaration of Mark R. Weinstein by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
December 13, 2007 Filing 47 Declaration re 46 Response in Opposition to Motion re Declaration of Heidi L. Keefe by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
December 13, 2007 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Compel Full And Complete Interrogatory Responses And Documents filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFTS SHALL HAVE A (3) DAYS EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 12/13/07, TO RESPOND TO PLFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DATED 11/25/07. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/11/07. ) 12/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
December 10, 2007 Filing 44 Consent Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Compel Full And Complete Interrogatory Responses And Documents filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Certificate of Service.(MCCOOE, DENNIS) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/12/2007 (nd).
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC #42) IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR RESOLUTION. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/27/07. ) Motions erred to TIMOTHY R. RICE. 11/28/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (gn, )
November 25, 2007 Filing 42 MOTION to Compel Full And Complete Interrogatory Responses And Documents filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Through Exhibit D In Support of Motion to Compel# 2 Exhibit D In Support of Motion To Compel# 3 Exhibit F Through Exhibit I In Support of Motion to Compel)(TECCE, FREDERICK)
November 8, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS P. MCCOOE on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC with Certificate of Service(MCCOOE, DENNIS)
November 8, 2007 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL L. DION on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC with Certificate of Service(DION, JOEL)
November 8, 2007 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by ALFRED W. ZAHER on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC with Substitution of Counsel and Certificate of Service(ZAHER, ALFRED)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ACCEPT FOR FILING DEFT'S SPECIAL MANAGEMENT DESIGNATION FORM AND SHALL SO AMEND THE DOCKET. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/17/07. ) 10/18/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2007 (gn, ).
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD ON OR ABOUT 4/25/08. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/15/07. ) 10/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 15, 2007 EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR 1/25/2008 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 17-B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (gn, )
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/25/2008 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/26/2008. A MARKMAN HEARING FOR THIS MATTER WILL BE HELD ON 1/25/08 AT 10:00AM IN COURTROOM 17-B. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 6/27/2008. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/27/2008. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/11/2008. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 8/25/2008 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 17-B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/12/07. ) 10/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
October 10, 2007 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Telephone Conference held on 10/9/2007 (ap, )
October 5, 2007 Filing 34 Proposed Case Management Plan Fed Rule of Civil Procedure 16 Pretrial Scheduling Order by FACEBOOK, INC.. (KEEFE, HEIDI)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/28/07. ) 10/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
September 27, 2007 Filing 32 Report of Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/07 before Judge Padova (gn, )
September 24, 2007 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC., Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue# 2 Exhibit B Through E in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue) (TECCE, FREDERICK) Modified on 9/25/2007 (nd).
September 17, 2007 Filing 30 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERIC ANDREW MERCER on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC, Certificate of Service.(gn, )
September 17, 2007 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THEODORE T. HERHOLD on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC, Certificate of Service.(gn, )
September 17, 2007 Filing 28 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT J. ARTUZ on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC, Certificate of Service.(gn, )
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF HEIDI L. KEEFE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/12/07. ) 9/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONOF MARK R. WEINSTEIN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 912/07. ) 9/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SEAN C. O'ROURKE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ) 9/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (gn, )
September 12, 2007 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re 23 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC, Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support)(BLOOM, CHARLES) Modified on 9/13/2007 (ac, ).
September 12, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLOOM, CHARLES)
September 10, 2007 Filing 22 APPLICATION BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF HEIDI L. KEEFE, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 21 APPLICATION BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF MARK R. WEINSTEIN, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 20 APPLICATION BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF SAM C. O'ROURKE, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 19 Response to Counterclaim by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (DUFFY, THOMAS) Modified on 9/11/2007 (nd).
September 7, 2007 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Facebook, Inc. with Certificate of Service by THEFACEBOOK, LLC.(BLOOM, CHARLES)
September 7, 2007 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FACEBOOK, INC..(BLOOM, CHARLES)
September 4, 2007 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. by FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC.(BLOOM, CHARLES)
August 23, 2007 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing:PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/26/2007 01:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: # 1 Scheduling Information Report# 2 Letter to Counsel)(gk, )
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC MAY ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 9/4/2007. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ) 8/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ERIC ANDREW MERCER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/14/07. ) 8/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT J. ARTUZ, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/14/07. ) 8/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THEODORE T. HERHOLD, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/3/07. ) 8/15/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
August 10, 2007 Filing 10 APPLICATION BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ERIC ANDREW MERCER, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, )
August 10, 2007 Filing 9 APPLICATION BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT J. ARTUZ, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, )
August 10, 2007 Filing 8 APPLICATION BY DEFTS' FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. FOR PRO HAC VICE OF THEODORE T. HERHOLD, ESQ., STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, )
August 9, 2007 Update Answer Deadline (afm, )
August 9, 2007 Filing 7 Stipulation The Time Within Which Defendants May Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC...(TECCE, FREDERICK) Modified on 8/10/2007 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, FORWARDED TO CLERK FOR APPROVAL)
August 9, 2007 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frederick A. Tecce re: served Summons & Complaint upon Facebook, Inc. & TheFaceBook, LLC by Certified Mail, RRR on July 20, 2007, ANSWER DUE 8/9/07. (TECCE, FREDERICK) Modified on 8/10/2007 (afm, ).
July 13, 2007 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.(nda)
July 5, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. DUFFY on behalf of CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DUFFY, THOMAS)
July 5, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. KEENAN on behalf of CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. with Certificate of Service(KEENAN, PATRICK)
July 3, 2007 Filing 2 Copy of Form to Commissioner of Patents. (jmp, )
July 3, 2007 Summons Issued as to FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC. Forwarded 2 Origs to counsel on 7/5/07 (jmp, )
July 3, 2007 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. (jmp, )
July 3, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK, INC., THEFACEBOOK, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 940594), filed by CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.(jmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC. v. FACEBOOK, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN P. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By: JOEL L. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEFACEBOOK, LLC
Represented By: JOEL L. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By: HEIDI L. KEEFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: THEFACEBOOK, LLC
Represented By: HEIDI L. KEEFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: CROSS ATLANTIC CAPITAL PARTNERS, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?