EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY et al v. CEPHALON, INC.
Plaintiff: EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, EMCASCO INSURANCE COMPANY and UNION INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Case Number: 2:2007cv04492
Filed: October 25, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B. TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 21:033

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' 339 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATIONIS DENIED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/23/15. 3/24/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, )
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE DECLARATION AND TESTIMONY OF MEREDITH ROSENTHAL (DOC. NO.371) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/21/2014. 7/21/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (kk, )
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR INTEROCUTORY APPEAL (DOC. NO.276) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/12/2012. 6/13/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (kk, )
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (DOC. NO. 230, 231 ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 3/23/2011. 3/24/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (kk, )
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 8/20/2009. 8/21/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ap, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE RICO COUNTS IS GRANTED AND THE RICO COUNTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED; DEFENDAN T'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO QUASH SUBPOENAS IS DENIED; DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IS DENIED; MOTIONS FOR VOLUNATRY DISMISSAL, PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL, SHALL BE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA FOR RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 5/22/2009. Motions referred to LINDA K. CARACAPPA. 5/22/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ap, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY et al v. CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID J. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMCASCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID J. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNION INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID J. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?