BUTTS v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JAMES P. BUTTS
Defendant: 3M COMPANY, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, PACCAR INC., INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS LLC, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., THE ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, JOHN CRANE, INC., RILEY POWER INC., BELL & GOSSETT, CATERPILLAR, INC., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, AIRCO, INC., DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC., CBS CORPORATION, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, CRANE CO., A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY, PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION, MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. and INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2007cv60041
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT A ARE DISMISSED AND THE CASES ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE BANKRUPTCY ONLY DOCKET. IT IS FURTHER ORDER THE CASES BE MARKED CLOSED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/22/12. 2/24/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 20, 2012 Filing 123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC...(BENNETT, JOSHUA)
February 15, 2012 Filing 122 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by JAMES P. BUTTS..(BLACK, JANET)
February 14, 2012 Filing 121 MOTION to Remand filed by JAMES P. BUTTS.(BLACK, JANET) (Main Document 121 replaced on 2/15/2012) (md). (DOCUMENT REMOVED PER PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS; ATTY TO RE-FILE) (Modified on 2/15/2012 (md).
February 14, 2012 Filing 120 PROPOSED ORDER as to Dismissal filed by JAMES P. BUTTS.(BLACK, JANET) Modified on 2/15/2012 (md).
February 14, 2012 Filing 119 STATUS REPORT by JAMES P. BUTTS. (BLACK, JANET)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT TO THE UNDERSIGNED ON OR BEFORE 2/9/12. IF ANY DEFENDANT DISAGREES WITH THE STATUS PROVIDED BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, IT MAY FILE A RESPONSE ON OR BEFORE 2/23/12.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/26/12. 1/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/18/11. 4/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Industrial Holdings Corporation filed by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 3, 2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 6, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 12/23/2010. 12/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 114 MOTION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT TRANE US, INC., F/K/A AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/20/2010. 10/22/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
June 30, 2010 Filing 113 JUDGMENT in favor of the PLAINTIFFS against DEFENDANT NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC. f/k/a NORTH BROTHER CORPORATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/24/2010. 6/30/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN OPTICAL COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/7/10. 6/22/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 28, 2010 Filing 111 MOTION FOR AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., OR AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE, INC. OR BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. AND UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/14/2010. 6/1/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, CBS CORPORATION f/k/a VIACOM, IN., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (WESTINGHOUSE). 5/5/10 SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. 5/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(tj, )
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER THAT ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE... SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/30/10. 5/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 108 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant General Electric Company filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS AS AGAINST DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC, BE AND THE SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/8/2010. 3/15/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dmc, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER THAT ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/2/10. 2/9/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(rf, )
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JAMES P. BUTTS AND CYNTHIA P. BUTTS AGAINST DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS INC., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2/1/10 SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. 2/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. LBOY
February 5, 2010 Filing 104 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT CRANE CO. ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/1/2010. 2/8/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dmc, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/26/10. 2/4/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 1, 2010 Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company filed by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
January 27, 2010 Filing 101 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY) Modified on 1/28/2010 (ac, ).(FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
January 27, 2010 Filing 100 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by CRANE CO.. (TOMLIN, TRACY) Modified on 1/28/2010 (ac, ).(FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
January 20, 2010 Filing 99 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JONES, KELLY)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANTS THE ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY AND GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 01/08/2010. 01/20/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(tomh, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 97 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA) LLC, IMPROPERLY SUED AS PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/12/10. 1/19/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(rf, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS IN EACH OF THE ABOVE ACTION AND SPOUSES, AND/OR PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ESTATE OF THE ABOVE-NAMED PLAINTIFFS, AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION AND FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., F/K/A FLUOR DANIEL, INC. ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/12/10. 1/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS IN EACH OF THE ABOVE ACTIONS AGAINST THE DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/11/2010. 1/15/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (stwe, ) (stwe, ).
January 14, 2010 Filing 94 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Standard, Inc. filed by DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. & PLAINTIFFS, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 1/15/2010 (fh, ).
January 7, 2010 Filing 93 Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC by PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY. (SANTOS, PETER) Modified on 1/8/2010 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
January 5, 2010 Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC..(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED IN APPENDIX A AGAINST DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE..SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/18/2009. 12/24/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(uh, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 90 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JONES, KELLY)
December 17, 2009 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Ford Motor Company filed by JAMES P. BUTTS, FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal of Defendant Ford Motor Company)(WARNER, KIRK)
December 1, 2009 Filing 88 MOTION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/23/2009. 12/3/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(kp)
November 18, 2009 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE CO. with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
November 10, 2009 Filing 86 Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims against Morton International, Inc. filed by MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
October 27, 2009 Filing 85 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/19/2009. 10/27/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ems)
October 23, 2009 Filing 84 Consent Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by RILEY POWER INC., Certificate of Service.(SHOFNER, ERIN) **(FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** Modified on 10/26/2009 (fh)
October 23, 2009 Filing 83 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Chart of Plaintiffs)(PEED, LINDSAY)
October 13, 2009 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Chart of Plaintiffs)(PEED, LINDSAY)
October 8, 2009 Filing 81 Proposed Order of Dismissal by AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION. (COLE, MICHAEL) Modified on 10/9/2009 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A, TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO DISMISS INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION F/K/A NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORP F/K/A INTERNATIONAL HARVESTER COMPANY AND NAVISTER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, IS HEREBY GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/28/2009. 10/8/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(amas)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF JAMES P. BUTTS, AGAINST THE DEFENDANT SEARS, ROEBUCK & COMPANY, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/18/09. 9/29/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kk, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 78 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to International Truck by INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION. (HAFNER, ROBERT) Modified on 9/23/2009 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
September 15, 2009 Filing 77 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order of Dismissal by SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY. (JUDGE, MCRAY)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS JAMES BUTTS AGAINST ITT CORPORATION INCORRECTLY SUED AS BELL & GOSSETT, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/1/09. 9/11/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 4, 2009 Filing 75 Discovery Plan by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., CBS CORPORATION, CRANE CO., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, JAMES P. BUTTS, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC., A.W. CHESTERTON, INC., WARREN PUMPS LLC.(KYRE, KENNETH)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER THAT COUNSEL IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES WILL BE REQUIRED TO HOLD A DISCOVERY PLANNING CONFERENCE, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F), AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT A FED. R. CIV. P. 26 (F)(3) DISCOVERY PLAN BY SEPTEMBER 4, 2009. 8/24/09 SIGNED BY HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. 9/3/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kk, )
August 20, 2009 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Dismiss ITT CORPORATION SUED INCORRECTLY AS BELL & GOSSETT WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by BELL & GOSSETT.Certificate of Service.(NYE, MARISA)
August 14, 2009 Filing 71 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC..(PEED, LINDSAY)
August 14, 2009 Filing 70 ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC..(PEED, LINDSAY)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, ATTORNEY TRACY E. TOMLIN TERMINATED., JOHN DEERE & COMPANY and JOHN DEERE & COMPANY TERMINATED., MOTIONS TERMINATED:. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/30/09. 8/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jwl, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MACK TRUCKS, INC. IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/5/2009. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED ON 8/6/2009. (kp)
August 6, 2009 Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY..(KIGER, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 19TH - AUGUST 27TH WILL NOW BE HELD ON AUGUST 19TH AND 20TH; THE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED CONFERENCES ON AUGUST 26TH AND 27TH ARE CANCELLED; COURT WILL CONVENE AT 10:00 A.M. EACH DAY, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 7/31/2009. 8/3/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ccg, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT GOODRICH CORPORATION... SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/23/09. 7/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PACCAR, INC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/23/09. 7/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS LISTED IN APPENDIX "A" TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE, INC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/23/2009. 7/28/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ccg, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JAMES P. BUTTS AND CYNTHIA J. BUTTS AGAINST DEFENDANTS COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/20/09. (Attachments: #1 order) 7/28/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 27, 2009 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Compel filed by JAMES P. BUTTS. (BLACK, JANET)
July 24, 2009 Filing 62 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/15/09. 7/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 22, 2009 Filing 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by JOHN DEERE & COMPANY. (TOMLIN, TRACY) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE) Modified on 7/24/2009 (md, ).
July 20, 2009 Filing 59 Proposed Stipulation and Order to Dismiss filed by JOHN CRANE, INC...(BROOKS, EDWARD) Modified on 7/21/2009 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
July 17, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION to Compel filed by PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY.memorandum of law and certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MOORE, LACEY)
July 17, 2009 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Compel filed by JAMES P. BUTTS, Certificate of Service. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 7/20/2009 (md, ).
July 15, 2009 Filing 56 Proposed Orderof Dismissal filed by GOODRICH CORPORATION..(EPPS, JOHN) Modified on 7/16/2009 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
July 15, 2009 Filing 55 Consent MOTION to Dismiss filed by PACCAR INC...(BOUCH, TIMOTHY) Modified on 7/16/2009 (ac, ). (FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE)
July 15, 2009 Filing 54 Proposed Order to Dismiss filed by PACCAR INC...(BOUCH, TIMOTHY) Modified on 7/16/2009 (ac, ).(FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 7/16/2009 (ac, ).
July 10, 2009 Filing 53 MOTION to Compel filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BENNETT, JOSHUA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2009: #4 Exhibit B - in hard copy - personal information) (ac, ).
June 8, 2009 Filing 52 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/09. 6/8/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(uh, )
June 4, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANN TERRELL DORSETT on behalf of DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Certificate of Service.(tjd, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL COMMENCE ON AUGUST 19, 2009, AND CONTINUE ON AUGUST 20,26, AND 27, 2009. COURT WILL CONVENE AT 10:00 AM EACH DAY BEFORE THE UNDERSIGNED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 05/29/2009. 06/02/2009 COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED. (tomh, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL COMMENCE ON AUGUST 19, 2009, AND CONTINUE ON AUGUST 20, 26, AND 27, 2009. COURT WILL CONVENE AT 10:00 AM EACH DAY BEFORE THE UNDERSIGNED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/29/09. 6/3/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(la, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 48 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order of Dismissal by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (DAVIS, H.)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/11/09. 5/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
May 19, 2009 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT re #34 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, #44 Order, AND RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JAMES P. BUTTS, Certificate of Service. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 5/20/2009 (ac, ).
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 12A, IN THE CASES LISTED IN THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT "A", WILL BE HELD TUESDAY, JUNE 2, 2009 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/13/2009. (kmk, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFF,JAMES P. BUTTS, AGAINST DEFENDANT BORGWARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC., AS LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/4/2009. 5/14/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED. (amas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION.(KYRE, KENNETH)
May 12, 2009 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION, Certificate of Service. (KYRE, KENNETH) Modified on 5/13/2009 (md).
May 7, 2009 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP..Certificate of Service.(DUKE, DAVID)
May 6, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE by GOODRICH CORPORATION re #38 MOTION for Order to Show Cause is Hereby Withdrawn. (SCHUSTER, RICHARD)
May 1, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by GOODRICH CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(SCHUSTER, RICHARD) Modified on 5/7/2009 (ac, ).
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLANTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/22/09. 4/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(bc, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/22/2009. 4/29/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kk, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT LINDE LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, F/K/A THE BOC GROUP, INC., AND/OR AIRCO, INC. (COLLECTIVELY, 'BOC').. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/22/2009. 4/29/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 26, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE by BELL & GOSSETT OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (NYE, MARISA)
February 3, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION FOR A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLANTIFFS' CLAIMS SHOULD BE DISMISSED. FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(bc, )
February 3, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Issuance of Rules to Show Cause Under Administrative Order No. 12A filed by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JONES, KELLY) Modified on 2/4/2009 (ac, ).
November 13, 2008 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2008 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Caterpillar filed by JAMES P. BUTTS..(BLACK, JANET)
November 6, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY PECK on behalf of AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. with Certificate of Service(PECK, TIMOTHY)
July 25, 2008 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AIRCO, INC..(MAISANO, CLARE)
July 25, 2008 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MAISANO, CLARE)
July 25, 2008 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY.(MAISANO, CLARE)
July 25, 2008 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, AIRCO, INC. with Certificate of Service.(MAISANO, CLARE) Modified on 7/29/2008 (le, ).
January 9, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE by BELL & GOSSETT of Substitution of Counsel (YOOST, MARY)
December 7, 2007 Filing 24 Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC..(BENNETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/22/2009 (ac, ).
September 21, 2007 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by BORG-WARNER CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(GARDNER, JOHN)
August 29, 2007 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Theresa Lazzaroni and Substitution of Counsel MCRAY JUDGE, II on behalf of SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
August 27, 2007 Filing 21 NOTICE by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (PECK, TIMOTHY)
August 20, 2007 Filing 20 NOTICE for subsitution of counsel of MCRAY JUDGE, II on behalf of SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY in place of ROBERT E. THACKSTON with Certificate of Service(eibo, )
August 2, 2007 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(ZARSADIAS, I.)
June 13, 2007 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO AIRCO, INC., WAIVER SENT 10/13/06. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/14/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTT AS TO AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO CBS CORPORATION. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO . (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO RILEY POWER INC.. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO JOHN CRANE, INC.. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
June 8, 2007 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS AS TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 6/11/2007 (afm, ).
March 27, 2007 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(RANIERI, RICHARD)
March 22, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD KENNETH BROOKS on behalf of JOHN CRANE, INC. AND WITHDRAW OF MARK E. ANDERSON with Certificate of Service(BROOKS, EDWARD) Modified on 3/23/2007 (afm, ).
March 19, 2007 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.. (SEE PAPER #5 FOR ATTACHMENT) (np)
March 19, 2007 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Corporate Disclosure by COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure)(GANDY, JAMES)
March 14, 2007 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES P. BUTTS. (BLACK, JANET)
January 3, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (jmp, )
January 3, 2007 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jmp, )
January 3, 2007 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 7 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. EASTERN, MIDDLE AND WESTERN DISTRICTS OF NORTH CAROLINA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTTS v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: I. TIMOTHY ZARSADIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION
Represented By: A. TODD BROWN, SR.
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Represented By: JOHN D. EPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Represented By: CLARE M. MAISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: HARRY LEE DAVIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD J. KESHIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. GANDY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. SMITH
Represented By: MARK E. ANDERSON
Represented By: EDWARD KENNETH BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY POWER INC.
Represented By: ERIN ELAINE SHOFNER
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT
Represented By: MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MARY E.H. YOOST
Represented By: MARISA B NYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: LANGDON M. COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRCO, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Represented By: CLARE M. MAISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: MARK S. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: KELLY BROOKS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. KIGER
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.
Represented By: DAVID M. DUKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN A. GARDNER, III
Represented By: SHANNON STRICKLAND FRANKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD S. RANIERI
Represented By: ANN TERRELL DORSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: MICHAEL T. COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Represented By: CLARE M. MAISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOEL M. BONDURANT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), INC.
Represented By: LINDSAY P. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY
Represented By: MCRAY JUDGE, II
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: LACEY M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DEERE & COMPANY
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION
Represented By: KENNETH K. KYRE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD S. RANIERI
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES P. BUTTS
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?