FURR et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS R. FURR and SHIRLEY V. FURR
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC., PACCAR INC., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, RILEY POWER INC., HARSCO CORPORATION, DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO., CNA HOLDINGS, INC., RPM, INC., GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., AIRCO, INC., NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, BOILER ENGINEERING & SUPPLY CO., WARREN PUMPS LLC, FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, BELL & GOSSETT, UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC., HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, SEARS, MAREMONT CORPORATION, FLUOR CAROLINA, INC., THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY, YARWAY CORPORATION, SEPCO CORPORATION, KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC., CRANE CO., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., VIACOM, INC., BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, CELANESE CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HARRISBURG STEEL CORPORATION, COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., CHRYSLER CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR INC., MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., CELANESE CORPORATION, PETERBILT TRUCKS, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, NORTH BROTHERS, INC., THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., AURORA PUMP, PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION, GREFCO, REPUBLIC POWDERED METALS, INC., JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL HARVESTER COMPANY, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FURNANCE ROAD CORP., AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC A Virginia Corporation doing business as RECO USA, HNA HOLDINGS, INC., GARLOCK INC., A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, WEIL-MCLAIN, B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY, THE, FOSTER WHEELER, INC., NSI ENTERPRISES, INC., LEIGHTON INDUSTRIES, INC. and BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC.
Cross Defendant: AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv66033
Filed: July 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER THAT THE SEVERED PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/1/2018; 8/2/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 9019 IN 01-MD-875). (tjd)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE SEVERED PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED MDL-875 CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS HAVING BEEN SETTLED OR OTHERWISE TERMINATED AFTER REMAND OF THE COMPENSATORY CLAIMS. NO LATER THAN 7/11/2018, ANY PLAINTIFF WHO CONTENDS THAT HE OR SHE HAS A VIABLE PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIM THAT WAS SEVERED UPON REMAND OF HIS OR HER COMPENSATORY CLAIMS AND IS PENDING IN THIS COURT SHALL FILE A WRITTEN REPORT OUTLINING THE NATURE AND STATUS OF THE CLAIM. IN ANY SUCH CASES, DEFENDANTS MAY RESPOND NO LATER THAN 8/8/2018. THE COURT WILL THEN ADDRESS THOSE CLAIMS, IF ANY. ALL OTHER PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED CASES, FOR WHICH THE PLAINTIFFS DO NOT FILE REPORTS, WILL BE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/2/2018. 5/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 9016 IN 01-MD-875) (ems)
May 23, 2012 Certified Copy of Conditional Remand Order along with copy of Docket mailed to the Middle District of North Carolina. (tjd)
May 23, 2012 Filing 145 Copy of Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all claims in the actions on this order except the severed damages claims be remanded to its respective transferor courts: ME-D 2:10-212; NC-M 1:07-400, 1:09-334; NC-W 1:08-17, 1:09-157. (See Paper # 8596 in 01-md-875). (tjd)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER THAT THE COURT SUGGESTS THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/14/2012; 5/15/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THE DEFT, CRANE CO. ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/21/2012; 2/22/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 17, 2012 Filing 142 PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal filed by CRANE CO.(TOMLIN, TRACY) Modified on 2/21/2012 (md).
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER THAT CLAIMS AGAINST DEFT, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAREMONT CORP., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., CLEAVER BROOS CO., A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SEPCO CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., AND RILEY POWER INC., ARE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/15/2012; 2/16/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 15, 2012 Filing 140 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by SHIRLEY V. FURR, THOMAS R. FURR..(BLACK, JANET)
February 14, 2012 Filing 139 MOTION to Remand filed by SHIRLEY V. FURR, THOMAS R. FURR.(BLACK, JANET) (Main Document 139 replaced on 2/15/2012) (md). (DOCUMENT REMOVED PER PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS; ATTY TO RE-FILE) (Modified on 2/15/2012 (md).
February 14, 2012 Filing 138 PROPOSED ORDER as to Dismissal filed by SHIRLEY V. FURR, THOMAS R. FURR.(BLACK, JANET) Modified on 2/15/2012 (md).
February 14, 2012 Filing 137 STATUS REPORT by SHIRLEY V. FURR, THOMAS R. FURR. (BLACK, JANET)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT TO THE UNDERSIGNED ON OR BEFORE 2/9/2012 WHICH MUST FALL INTO ONE OF THE FOLLOWING THREE CATEGORIES LISTED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/26/2012; 1/26/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 28, 2011 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK S. THOMAS on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY (THOMAS, MARK)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER THAT THE DEFT, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION F/K/A THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY, IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/18/2011. 4/22/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 133 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Industrial Holdings Corporation filed by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
January 26, 2011 Filing 132 MOTION AND ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE ABOVE-ENTITLED PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC. ONLY ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/24/2011. 1/26/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ON THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 3, 2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 6, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING AND/OR CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE; ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 12/23/2010. 12/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 130 MOTION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/20/2010. 10/22/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFF ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT "A" AS AGAINST DEFENDANT POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC., F/K/A LEIGHTON INDUSTRIES, INC. F/K/A FURNACE ROAD CORPORATION, F/K/A BOILER ENGINEERING & SUPPLY CO., AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CONTINENTAL BOILERS, INC ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/25/2009. 8/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(stwe, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER THAT THE ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS, THOMAS R. FURR AND SPOUSE, SHIRLEY V. FURR, AGAINST DEFENDANT, TRANE US, INC., F/K/A AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/29/2010.8/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 30, 2010 Filing 127 JUDGMENT in favor of the PLAINTIFFS against DEFENDANT NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC. f/k/a NORTH BROTHER CORPORATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/24/2010. 6/30/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
May 28, 2010 Filing 126 MOTION FOR AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., OR AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE, INC. OR BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC. AND UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/14/2010. 6/1/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, CBS CORPORATION f/k/a VIACOM, IN., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (WESTINGHOUSE). 5/5/10 SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. 5/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(tj, )
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND ALL CLAIMS CONTAINED THEREIN AGAINST DEFENDANT DUPONT ONLY ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/6/2010. 5/21/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER THAT THE ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS, THOMAS R. FURR AND SPOUSE, SHIRLEY V. FURR, AGAINST DEFENDANT, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/30/2010. 5/17/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
April 29, 2010 Filing 122 STIPULATION of Dismissal of E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THOMAS R. FURR. (ROSENTHAL, KAREN) COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Modified on 4/30/2010 (jmf, ).
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS ON THE ATTACHED LIST AGAINST DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/22/2010. 4/19/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS ON THE ATTACHED LIST AGAINST DEFENDANT AURORA PUMP, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/22/2010. 4/19/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 119 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant General Electric Company filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL IS DISMISSED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 3/16/2010. 3/17/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS AS AGAINST DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC, BE AND THE SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/8/2010. 3/16/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dmc, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER THAT THE ACTION OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/9/2010. 3/4/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dmc, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION BE AND IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US INC. AND ANY AND ALL OF ITS PREDECESSORS AND/OR SUBSIDIARIES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/19/10. 2/19/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd)
February 5, 2010 Filing 113 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/1/2010. 2/8/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dmc, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/25/2010. 2/4/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
February 3, 2010 Filing 111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company filed by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY)
January 29, 2010 Filing 110 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS ON THE ATTACHED APPENDIX "A" AS AGAINST DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION BE AND THE SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/21/2010. 2/2/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dmc, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 109 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY) Modified on 1/29/2010 (ac, ).(FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
January 21, 2010 Filing 108 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JONES, KELLY)
January 19, 2010 Filing 107 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, IMPROPERLY SUED AS PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/12/2010. 1/19/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/15/10. 2/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mas, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS IN EACH OF THE ABOVE ACTIONS AGAINST THE DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/11/2010. 1/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (stwe, )
January 14, 2010 Filing 105 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Standard, Inc. filed by DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. & PLAINTIFFS, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PECK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 1/15/2010 (fh)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JAMES P. MAHAN AND WIFE, LETTIE K. MAHAN, AGAINST THE DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/4/10. 1/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.lboy
January 7, 2010 Filing 103 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC by PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY. (SANTOS, PETER)
January 5, 2010 Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY..(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
December 30, 2009 Filing 101 MOTION AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/17/2009. 12/30/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(tomh, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS IN THE ABOVE-ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE, US, INC., IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/18/2009.12/28/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED IN APPENDIX A AGAINST DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE..SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/18/2009. 12/24/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(uh, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Ford Motor Company filed by THOMAS R. FURR, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, SHIRLEY V. FURR.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal of Defendant Ford Motor Company)(WARNER, KIRK)
December 18, 2009 Filing 97 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JONES, KELLY)
December 17, 2009 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Flowserve US, Inc. filed by THOMAS R. FURR, SHIRLEY V. FURR.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLACK, JANET)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS FROM PLAINTIFFS ON ATTACHED LIST AGAINST DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. TERMINATED. ATTORNEY RICHARD V. BENNETT TERMINATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/23/2009. 11/30/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp )
November 18, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE CO. with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT HARSCO CORPORATION F/K/A HARRISBURG STEEL CORPORATION, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PATTERSON-KELLEY COMPANY, INC. WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/29/2009. 11/12/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jmf, )
October 27, 2009 Filing 92 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/19/2009. 10/28/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ems)
October 21, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE by ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. Substitution of Counsel (TOMLIN, TRACY)
October 13, 2009 Filing 90 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by GOULDS PUMPS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Chart of Plaintiffs)(PEED, LINDSAY)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BY PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A, TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO DISMISS INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION F/K/A NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORP F/K/A INTERNATIONAL HARVESTER COMPANY AND NAVISTER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, IS HEREBY GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/28/2009. 10/8/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(amas)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS THOMAS R. FURR AND SHIRLEY V. FURR AGAINST THE DEFENDANT WEIL-MCLAIN IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/18/09. 9/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF THOMAS R. FURR, AGAINST THE DEFENDANT SEARS, ROEBUCK & COMPANY, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/18/09. 9/29/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kk, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 86 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to International Truck by INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION. (HAFNER, ROBERT)
September 15, 2009 Filing 85 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order of Dismissal by SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO.. (JUDGE, MCRAY)
September 15, 2009 Filing 84 Joint MOTION for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by WEIL-MCLAIN..(GORDON, FRANK)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' ACTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION INCORRECTLY SUED AS BELL & GOSSETT, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/3/09. 9/10/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 4, 2009 Filing 82 Discovery Plan by AURORA PUMP.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER THAT COUNSEL IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES WILL BE REQUIRED TO HOLD A DISCOVERY PLANNING CONFERENCE, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F), AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT A FED. R. CIV. P. 26 (F)(3) DISCOVERY PLAN BY SEPTEMBER 4, 2009. 8/24/09 SIGNED BY HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. 9/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kk, )
August 21, 2009 Filing 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION SUED INCORRECTLY AS BELL & GOSSETT WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by BELL & GOSSETT. Certificate of Service.(NYE, MARISA)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, JOHN DEERE & COMPANY and JOHN DEERE & COMPANY TERMINATED., ATTORNEY TRACY E. TOMLIN TERMINATED., MOTIONS TERMINATED:. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/30/09. 8/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jwl, )
August 10, 2009 Filing 78 Proposed Order to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC...(WELLMAN, JACOB) Modified on 8/11/2009 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MACK TRUCKS, INC. IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/5/2009. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED ON 8/6/2009. (kp)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST CNA HOLDINGS, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/5/09. 8/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
August 6, 2009 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY..(KIGER, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 19TH - AUGUST 27TH WILL NOW BE HELD ON AUGUST 19TH AND 20TH; THE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED CONFERENCES ON AUGUST 26TH AND 27TH ARE CANCELLED; COURT WILL CONVENE AT 10:00 A.M. EACH DAY, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 7/31/2009. 8/3/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ccg, )
July 30, 2009 Filing 73 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CNA HOLDINGS, INC.. (CARRINGTON, SAMUEL) Modified on 7/31/2009 (ac, ).(FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS THOMAS R. FURR AND SPOUSE, SHIRLEY V. FURR, AGAINST THE DEFENDANT PACCAR, INC., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/23/09. 7/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
July 27, 2009 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Compel filed by THOMAS R. FURR, SHIRLEY V. FURR. (BLACK, JANET)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR, INC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/15/09. 7/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST DEFENDANT, COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC. ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/20/09. 7/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lisad, )
July 22, 2009 Filing 68 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed ORDER by JOHN DEERE & COMPANY. (TOMLIN, TRACY) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE) Modified on 7/27/2009 (md, ).
July 20, 2009 Filing 67 Proposed Order to Dismiss filed by MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT..(BOUCH, TIMOTHY) Modified on 7/21/2009 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
July 17, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION to Compel filed by PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY.memorandum and certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MOORE, LACEY) Modified on 6/17/2010 (tomg, ).
July 17, 2009 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION to Compel filed by THOMAS R. FURR, SHIRLEY V. FURR, Certificate of Service. (BLACK, JANET) Modified on 7/20/2009 (md, ).
July 17, 2009 Filing 64 JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL and Order of Dismissal filed by MACK TRUCKS, INC...(KESHIAN, RICHARD) Modified on 7/20/2009 (md, ).
July 16, 2009 Filing 63 Consent MOTION to Dismiss filed by HARSCO CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BARTLEY, DAUNA)
July 15, 2009 Filing 62 Proposed Order to Dismiss filed by PACCAR INC...(BOUCH, TIMOTHY) Modified on 7/16/2009 (ac, ). (FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
July 10, 2009 Filing 61 MOTION to Compel filed by WARREN PUMPS LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BENNETT, JOSHUA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2009: #4 Exhibit B - Personal Information) (ac, ).
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAISNT THE DEFENDANT GOODRICH CORPORATION ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/25/09. 7/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
June 22, 2009 Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Order of Dismissal filed by GOODRICH CORPORATION..(EPPS, JOHN) (PROPOSED ORDER FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY AS MOTION) Modified on 6/23/2009 (md, ).
June 8, 2009 Filing 58 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/2/09. 6/8/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(uh, )
June 3, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE by HARSCO CORPORATION of Substitution of Counsel (BARTLEY, DAUNA)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL COMMENCE ON AUGUST 19, 2009, AND CONTINUE ON AUGUST 20,26, AND 27, 2009. COURT WILL CONVENE AT 10:00 AM EACH DAY BEFORE THE UNDERSIGNED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 05/29/2009. 06/02/2009 COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED. (tomh, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 55 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order of Dismissal by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (DAVIS, H.)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS OF ALL PLAINTTIFFS IN THIS ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., ET AL., ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/11/2009. 5/18/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND MAILED.(ccg, )
May 15, 2009 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION.(KYRE, KENNETH)
May 15, 2009 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint by GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, Defenses, Certificate of Service. (KYRE, KENNETH) Modified on 5/18/2009 (ac, ).
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFF, THOMAS R. FURR, AGAINST DEFENDANT BORGWARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC., AS LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/4/2009. 5/15/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED. (amas)
May 7, 2009 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP..Certificate of Service.(DUKE, DAVID)
May 6, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE by GOODRICH CORPORATION re #46 MOTION for Order to Show Cause is Hereby Withdrawn. (SCHUSTER, RICHARD)
May 1, 2009 Filing 46 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by GOODRICH CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(SCHUSTER, RICHARD) Modified on 5/7/2009 (ac, ).
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/22/2009. 5/5/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (kk, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLANTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/22/09. 5/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED. (bc, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, LISTED IN APPENDIX A TO THE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DEFENDANT LINDE LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, F/K/A THE BOC GROUP, INC., AND/OR AIRCO, INC. (COLLECTIVELY, 'BOC').. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/22/2009. 4/29/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO COMPEL, MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON EACH OF THE CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ARE DISMISSED AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 4/23/09. 4/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 15, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion)(WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN) Modified on 4/16/2009 (md).
March 16, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE by SEPCO CORPORATION re #38 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Proposed Rule to Show Cause Order (WITHDRAWAL OF ITS MOTION FOR A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED, EXHIBIT A and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (HARTON, OLLIE)
February 26, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE by BELL & GOSSETT OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (NYE, MARISA)
February 3, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Issuance of Rules to Show Cause Under Administrative Order No. 12A filed by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JONES, KELLY) Modified on 2/4/2009 (ac, ). Modified on 6/17/2010 (tomg, ).
January 31, 2009 Filing 39 Memorandum of Law re #38 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Proposed Rule to Show Cause Order by SEPCO CORPORATION. (HARTON, OLLIE)
January 30, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Proposed Rule to Show Cause Order filed by SEPCO CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(HARTON, OLLIE)
November 13, 2008 Filing 37 Consent to Dismiss Caterpillar filed by THOMAS R. FURR, SHIRLEY V. FURR..(BLACK, JANET) Modified on 3/20/2009 (nd, ).
November 7, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY PECK on behalf of AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. with Certificate of Service(PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 4, 2008 Filing 36 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE DEFENDANT AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC, d/b/a RECO USA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/27/08. 11/10/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(bc, )
August 13, 2008 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT..(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
August 12, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by I. TIMOTHY ZARSADIAS AND ENTRY OF RODNEY A. DEAN on behalf of ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (ZARSADIAS, I.) Modified on 8/13/2008 (afm, ).
August 1, 2008 Filing 32 Statement by FLOWSERVE US, INC.. (ROBERTS, STEPHANIE)
July 28, 2008 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AIRCO, INC..(MAISANO, CLARE)
July 28, 2008 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MAISANO, CLARE)
July 25, 2008 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AIRCO, INC..(MAISANO, CLARE) Modified on 7/28/2008 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY REFILING CORRECT DOCUMENT)
July 25, 2008 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MAISANO, CLARE) Modified on 7/28/2008 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY REFILING CORRECT DOCUMENT)
July 25, 2008 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY.(MAISANO, CLARE)
July 25, 2008 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against all defendants by HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, AIRCO, INC. with Certificate of Service.(MAISANO, CLARE) Modified on 7/29/2008 (le, ).
July 16, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE by ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. Substitution of Counsel (ROGERS, LEILA)
March 13, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE by BELL & GOSSETT of Substitution of Counsel (YOOST, MARY)
March 13, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE by BELL & GOSSETT of Substitution of Counsel (EDGAR, JONATHAN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE CORRECTLY) Modified on 3/13/2008 (nd).
March 10, 2008 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES C. WHITE on behalf of HARSCO CORPORATION (WHITE, JAMES)
January 24, 2008 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Janet Ward Black re: served Complaint & Summons upon Defendants by Certified Mail (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts 1, #2 Return Receipts 2, #3 Return Receipts 3)(BLACK, JANET)
December 4, 2007 Filing 20 Notice of Substitution of Attorneyfiled by WARREN PUMPS LLC..(BENNETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/22/2009 (ac, ).
November 8, 2007 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Ingersoll-Rand Barbados with Certificate of Service by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2007 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY.(PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2007 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with Certificate of Service by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION.(PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2007 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION.(PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2007 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(PECK, TIMOTHY)
November 8, 2007 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(PECK, TIMOTHY)
October 24, 2007 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(ROBERTS, STEPHANIE)
October 11, 2007 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS J. ZIDIK on behalf of AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC with Certificate of Service(ZIDIK, NICHOLAS)
September 3, 2007 Filing 11 NOTICE by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO. of Substitution of Counsel OF KELLY B. JONES as Counsel in Place of TIMOTHY PECK.(PECK, TIMOTHY) Modified on 9/4/2007 (nd).
August 29, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Theresa Lazzaroni and Substitution of Counsel MCRAY JUDGE, II on behalf of SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY. Certificate of Service. (tjd)
August 20, 2007 Filing 9 NOTICE for subsitution of counsel of MCRAY JUDGE, II on behalf of SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY in place of ROBERT E. THACKSTON with Certificate of Service(eibo, )
August 6, 2007 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WARREN PUMPS LLC.(ZARSADIAS, I.)
August 6, 2007 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Jacuzzi Brands, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC..(ZARSADIAS, I.)
July 27, 2007 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
July 27, 2007 Filing 5 Entry of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint by CBS CORPORATION.(TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
July 20, 2007 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by SEPCO CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure)(HARTON, OLLIE)
July 16, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (eibo, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (eibo, )
July 16, 2007 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 48 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. MIDDLE DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (eibo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FURR et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Represented By: JOHN D. EPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC.
Represented By: JACOB HOLMES WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY POWER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARSCO CORPORATION
Represented By: DAUNA L. BARTLEY
Represented By: JAMES C. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO.
Represented By: MCRAY JUDGE, II
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: SAMUEL LINDSAY CARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: LEILA WILLIFORD ROGERS
Represented By: RODNEY A. DEAN
Represented By: I. TIMOTHY ZARSADIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRCO, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Represented By: CLARE M. MAISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOILER ENGINEERING & SUPPLY CO.
Represented By: JACOB HOLMES WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: I. TIMOTHY ZARSADIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT
Represented By: MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN
Represented By: MARY E.H. YOOST
Represented By: MARISA B NYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Represented By: CLARE M. MAISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: HARRY LEE DAVIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD J. KESHIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION
Represented By: KENNETH K. KYRE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS
Represented By: MCRAY JUDGE, II
Represented By: TERESA F. LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CAROLINA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YARWAY CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Represented By: OLLIE M. HARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE U. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. KIGER
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.
Represented By: DAVID M. DUKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELANESE CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: SAMUEL LINDSAY CARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRISBURG STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: DAUNA L. BARTLEY
Represented By: JAMES C. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK G. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC.
Represented By: H. RANDOLPH SUMNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA H. BENNETT
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELANESE CORPORATION
Represented By: SAMUEL LINDSAY CARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETERBILT TRUCKS, A DELAWARE CORPORATION
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO
Represented By: CLARE M. MAISANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Represented By: KELLY BROOKS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: LACEY M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION
Represented By: SAMUEL LINDSAY CARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREFCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC POWDERED METALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DEERE & COMPANY
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL HARVESTER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FURNANCE ROAD CORP.
Represented By: JACOB HOLMES WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC A Virginia Corporation doing business as RECO USA
Represented By: NICHOLAS J. ZIDIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: SAMUEL LINDSAY CARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Represented By: MARK S. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY, THE
Represented By: RICHARD D. SCHUSTER
Represented By: JOHN D. EPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSI ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEIGHTON INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JACOB HOLMES WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS R. FURR
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID RHODES
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY V. FURR
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID RHODES
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?