FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. CEPHALON, INC.
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Respondent: MATTHEW PIKE
Intervenor: PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, URL PHARMA, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., BEN VENUE LABORATORIES, INC., ESAI INC, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS,INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., LUPIN LIMITED, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., PFIZER INC., BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., ANCHEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., ALMIRALL, S.A., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., ABBOTT LABORATORIES, GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ACTAVIS GROUP, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP, KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SUNOVION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT LIMITED, UPSHER SMITH LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ INC,, FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, SHIRE LLC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC and NOVARTIS CORP.
Case Number: 2:2008cv02141
Filed: May 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 410 STIPULATED REVISED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND EQUITABLE MONETARY RELIEF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/21/19. 2/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 409 Joint MOTION to Modify Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Equitable Monetary Relief filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Stipulated Revised Order for Permanent Injunction and Equitable Monetary Relief, #2 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
May 18, 2017 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 5/16/17 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: VERITEXT LEGAL SOLUTIONS.. (rf, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 407 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/25/2015 before Judge Goldberg. Court Reporter: ESR/VERITEXT TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE.. (kp, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 406 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KATHLEEN W. BRADISH on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC(BRADISH, KATHLEEN)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND EQUITABLE MONETARY RELIEF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/17/15. 6/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 17, 2015 Filing 404 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. - Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from James C. Burling, Esq. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
June 12, 2015 Filing 403 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. - Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from James C. Burling, Esq. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
June 9, 2015 Filing 402 Letter to the Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Markus H. Meier (rf, )
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER THAT AETNA'S COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO RENEW ITS REQUEST, IF NECESSARY, AFTER REVIEWING THE SUBMISSIONS FILED BY THE EXISTING PARTIES TO THE ABOVE LISTED CASES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/8/15. 6/8/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER THAT THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION AND CEPHALON SHALL SUBMIT LETTER BRIEFS REGARDING THE COURTS ROLE IN REVIEWING THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT NO LATER THAN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION AND CEPHALON MAY DO SO JOINTLY OR SEPARATELY. FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANY OTHER PARTY MAY FILE A LETTER BRIEF NOT TO EXCEED THREE PAGES RAISING ANY CONCERNS AS TO THE POTENTIAL IMPACT THE AFOREMENTIONED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT MAY HAVE ON THEIR INTERESTS NO LATER THAN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/1/15. 6/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER THAT FTC'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE CONTRAVENING THE COURT'S COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL DECISION (DOC. 373), FTC'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE CEPHALON'S INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE PREVIOUSLY WITHHELD ON PRIVILEGE GROUNDS (DOC. 374) AND CEPHALON, INC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO FTC'S REVISED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (DOC. 393) ARE DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/28/15. 6/1/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 29, 2015 Filing 398 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Telephone Status Conference held on 5/28/15. (rf, )
May 28, 2015 Filing 397 Joint MOTION for Settlement Entry of Proposed Final Order filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, CEPHALON, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Final Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL) Modified on 5/29/2015 (lisad, ).
May 22, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 22ND DAY OF MAY, 2015, THE STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH LEAD COUNSEL ORIGINALLY SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, MAY 26, 2015 IS RESCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, MAY 28, 2015 AT 4:00 P.M. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON, INC. SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL WITH THE OTHER PARTIES PRIOR TO CALLING CHAMBERS.(CJL)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER THAT STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/26/2015 11:00 AM.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/19/15. 5/19/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 5/19/15 IS POSTPONDED AND WILL BE RESCHEDULED AT A LATER DATE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/18/15. 5/19/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 15, 2015 Filing 393 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Objections to FTC's Revised Deposition Designations filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Supplemental Objections))(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER THAT THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 5/19/15 WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 4B.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/13/15. 5/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 7, 2015 Filing 391 DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, INC'S OBJECTIONS TO FTC'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS AND CEPHALON'S AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
May 6, 2015 Filing 390 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION of Revised Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
May 6, 2015 Filing 389 Objections by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION to Cephalon's Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
May 6, 2015 Filing 388 Objections by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION to Cephalon's Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
May 6, 2015 Filing 387 Objections by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION to Cephalon's Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
May 6, 2015 Filing 386 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Objections to FTC's Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations, and Cephalon's Amended Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations (GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF THE FTC'S TRIAL WITNESS MATTHEW PIKE (DOC. 383) IS GRANTED SUBJECT TO THE CONDITIONS AGREED UPON BY THE PARTIES AS SET FORTH IN THE MOTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/5/15. 5/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 30, 2015 Filing 384 RESPONSE to Motion re #383 MOTION to Take Deposition from Matthew Pike (FTC Trial Witness) - Unopposed Motion filed by MATTHEW PIKE. (PERWIN, SCOTT)
April 30, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION to Take Deposition from Matthew Pike (FTC Trial Witness) - Unopposed Motion filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 23, 2015 Filing 382 DEFENDANTS' JOINT OFFERS OF PROOF ON EXPERTS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
April 22, 2015 Filing 381 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Joint Offers of Proof on Experts (GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 20, 2015 Filing 380 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INCS OPPOSITION TO THE FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE CEPHALON'S INTRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE PREVIOUSLY WITHHELD ON PRIVILEGE GROUNDS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
April 20, 2015 Filing 379 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC'S OPPOSITION TO THE FTC'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE CONTRAVENING THE COURT'S COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL DECISION (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
April 17, 2015 Filing 378 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of filing under seal of its Opposition to the FTCs Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence Contravening the Courts Collateral Estoppel Decision (GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 17, 2015 Filing 377 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of the filing under seal of its Motion in Limine to Preclude the Introduction of Evidence Previously Withheld on Privilege Grounds (GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 15, 2015 Filing 376 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT CEPHALON'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE FTC'S DISGORGEMENT CLAIM (DOC. 345) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/15/15. 4/15/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 15, 2015 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/15/15. 4/15/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 3, 2015 Filing 374 Second MOTION in Limine to Preclude Cephalon's Introduction of Evidence Previously Withheld on Privilege Grounds filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
April 3, 2015 Filing 373 First MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Contravening the Court's Collateral Estoppel Decision filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
March 30, 2015 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J WALKER on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(rf, )
March 27, 2015 Filing 371 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/27/15. 3/27/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT JOINT OFFERS OF PROOF ON THE EXPERTS CHALLENGED IN THESE MOTIONS. SUCH OFFERS SHALL SUCCINCTLY STATE, IN NO MORE THAN 7 TO 10 PARAGRAPHS PER EXPERT, THE OPINIONS THAT THESE EXPERTS WILL OFFER AT TRIAL AND THE FACTS SUPPORTING THESE OPINIONS. THE EXPERTS CHALLENGED IN THESE MOTIONS WILL NOT BE PERMITTED TO PROVIDE OPINIONS THAT FALL OUTSIDE OF THE OFFERS OF PROOF SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS. THESE SUBMISSIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 4/22/15.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/27/15. 3/27/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 27, 2015 Filing 369 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Oral Argument held on 3/26/15. Court Reporter: ESR. (rf, )
March 27, 2015 Filing 368 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Oral Argument held on 3/25/15. Court Reporter: ESR. (rf, )
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CEPHALON,INC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT (DOC. 356) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/26/15. 3/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 26, 2015 Filing 366 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE RE: DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/26/15. 3/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 25, 2015 Filing 365 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Motion Hearing held on 3/24/15. Court Reporter: ESR. (rf, )
March 25, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. - Additional Deposition Designation Inadvertently Omitted From Cephalon, Inc.'s March 20, 2015 Pre-Trial Memorandum (GELLMAN, NANCY)
March 24, 2015 Filing 363 JOINT STIPULATION to Supplement Pre-Trial Schedule Re: Deposition Designations by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WEPRIN, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/25/2015 (md).
March 23, 2015 Filing 362 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Motion Hearing held on 3/23/15 re #345 MOTION to Preclude the FTC's Disgorgement Claim filed by CEPHALON, INC. Court Reporter: ESR. (rf, )
March 23, 2015 Filing 361 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC'S PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Pretrial Memorandum (GELLMAN, NANCY)
March 20, 2015 Filing 359 TRIAL BRIEF Pretrial Memorandum by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
March 20, 2015 Filing 358 JOINT STIPULATION to Supplement Pre-Trial Schedule by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WEPRIN, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/23/2015 (md).
March 19, 2015 Copy of Order dated 2/20/15 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to GAIL L GOTTEHRER for the following reason: UNDELIVERABLE. (rf, )
March 4, 2015 Filing 357 RESPONSE in Opposition re #356 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Motion To Preclude The FTC's Disgorgement Claim (Dkt. No. 345) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
March 3, 2015 Filing 356 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Motion To Preclude The FTC's Disgorgement Claim (Dkt. No. 345) filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Cephalon, Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Preclude The FTC's Disgorgement Claim, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
February 25, 2015 Filing 355 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION In Response to Mylan Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Summary Judgment in the Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE ABOVE MOTIONS WILL BE HELD ON 3/23/15 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 4B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/20/15. 2/23/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, AND MAILED.(mbh, )
February 20, 2015 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN K. PEAY on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ti, )
February 17, 2015 Filing 352 RESPONSE in Opposition re #345 MOTION to Preclude the FTC's Disgorgement Claim filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Butrymowicz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
February 10, 2015 Filing 351 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. MAHR on behalf of CEPHALON, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAHR, ERIC)
February 9, 2015 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEPRIN on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(rf, )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER THAT THE MATTER OF FTC VS. CEPHALON, INC. SHALL PROCEED TO TRIAL SEPARATE & APART FROM THE PRIVATE PLFFS' CASES. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT NO LATER THAN 3/20/2015, FTC & CEPHALON SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 4/3/15. A FINAL PRETRIAL HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 5/19/2015 AT 10:00 A.M.. THIS CASE IS LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 6/1/2015 AT 10:00 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/3/15. 2/4/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 3, 2015 Filing 348 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Orgal Argument held on 1/29/15. Court Reporter: ESR. (ti, )
February 2, 2015 Filing 347 AUGUST 28, 2014 CORRESPONDENCE FROM COUNSEL (rf, )
February 2, 2015 Filing 346 JANUARY 22, 2015 CORRESPONDENCE FROM COUNSEL
January 28, 2015 Filing 345 MOTION to Preclude the FTC's Disgorgement Claim filed by CEPHALON, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Preclude the FTC's Disgorgement Claim, #2 Declaration of Mark A. Ford in Support of Motion to Preclude the FTC's Disgorgement Claim, #3 Exhibit 01 to Ford Declaration, #4 Exhibit 02 to Ford Declaration, #5 Exhibit 03 to Ford Declaration, #6 Exhibit 04 to Ford Declaration, #7 Exhibit 05 to Ford Declaration, #8 Exhibit 06 to Ford Declaration, #9 Exhibit 07 to Ford Declaration, #10 Exhibit 08 to Ford Declaration, #11 Exhibit 09 to Ford Declaration, #12 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Preclude the FTC's Disgorgement Claim)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
January 28, 2015 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, BARR AND TEVA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEEMENTS (DOC. 275) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/15. 1/28/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, EMAILED.(rf, )
January 28, 2015 Filing 343 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/15. 1/28/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 28, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 28TH DAY OF JANUARY, 2015, THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, JANUARY 29TH, 2015 WILL COMMENCE AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 8B. (CJL)
January 15, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by PETER J. MARTINEZ on behalf of ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP(MARTINEZ, PETER)
January 14, 2015 Filing 340 STIPULATION - Joint Stipulation by all parties pursuant to Court Order Dkt. No. 338 by CEPHALON, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 part 1, #6 Exhibit 5 part 2, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10 part 1, #12 Exhibit 10 part 2, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13)(GELLMAN, NANCY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 1/15/2015 (md).
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER THAT STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/29/2015 10:00 AM.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/6/15. 1/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE A STIPULATION ON OR BEFORE 1/16/15 TO UNSEAL THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/6/15. 1/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 16, 2014 Filing 337 NOTICE by ASTELLAS PHARMA INC. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Peter J. Martinez (CHANDONNET, NICOLE)
November 12, 2014 Filing 336 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Oral Argument held on 11/6/14 re #275 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., CEPHALON, INC., BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Court Reporter: ESR. (rf, )
November 10, 2014 COPY OF ORDER DATED 9/29/14 MAILED TO PETER J. MARTINEZ, RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE ON 11/10/14 (rf, )
November 4, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 4TH DAY OF NOVEMBER, 2014, THE ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 10:00 A.M., THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 6, 2014 IS RESCHEDUED TO 2:00 P.M. ON THE SAME DATE IN COUTROOM 4B.(CJL)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD ON 11/6/14 AT 10:00 A.M. ON THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS: DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, BARR AND TEVA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS. MOTION OF THE DYLAN DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS UNDER FTC VS ACTAVIS. RANBAXY DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/15/14. 10/15/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER THAT MOTION TO WITHDRAW SUSAN L.C. MITCHELL (DOC. 332) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/3/14. 10/3/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 2, 2014 Filing 332 MOTION to Withdraw Susan L.C. Mitchell filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER THAT THIS COURTS ORDER OF 9/24/14 IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: UPON CONSIDERATION OF "PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CEPHALON'S TEN PATENT EXPERTS" (DOC. 280) IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO THE FTC ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/1/14. 10/1/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC. (SEGURA, SUSAN)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, TO BE REINSTATED AT A LATER DATE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT THOMAS HOXIE (DOC. 271); DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS DRS. HARTMAN (DOC. 273); DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED EXPERT, JOHN R. THOMAS (DOC. 276); DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS (DOC. 277); APOTEX'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY BY DEFENDANTS' BELL, SNYDER FTC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF LOUIS P. BERNEMAN (DOC. 278); FTC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPTIONS OF DR. ALLAN MYERSON AND OTHER DERIVATIVE OPINIONS (DOC. 279). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/30/14. 9/30/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Mary J. Edwards (GELLMAN, NANCY) (Main Document 328 replaced on 10/1/2014) (md, ).
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER THAT FTC'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOUR ATTORNEYS (DOC. 324) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/30/14. 9/30/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER THAT AFOREMENTIONED SHALL UPDATE THEIR ECF CONTACT INFORMATION TO INCLUDE A VALID EMAIL ADDRESS ON OR BEFORE 10/6/14. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES NOTICE TO THE AFOREMENTIONED COUNSEL THAT THE COURT WILL NO LONGER FORWARD PAPER COPIES OF COURT TO COUNSEL IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/29/14. 9/29/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CEPHALON TEN PATENT EXPERT (DOC. 280) IS GRANTED AS TO FTC ONLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/24/14. 9/25/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 12, 2014 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gail L. Gottehrer (fdc, )
August 5, 2014 Filing 324 MOTION to Withdraw Four Attorneys filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
July 29, 2014 Filing 323 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT FTC'S PRECLUSION MOTION (DOC. 218) IS GRANTED. CEPHALON'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 219) IS DENIED. FTCS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. 245) IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/29/14. 7/29/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, EMAILED.(rf, )
July 29, 2014 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/29/14. 7/29/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 18, 2014 Filing 321 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW RYAN VARZALLY on behalf of MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(VARZALLY, MATTHEW)
June 9, 2014 Filing 320 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, TEVA AND BARR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 319 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, TEVA AND BARR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS (FILED UNDER SEAL).. (rf, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 318 REPLY MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT DRS HARTMAN, LEFFLER, LEITZINGER AND NOLL (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 317 DEFENDANT CEPHALON INCS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S COUNTER STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS WHICH PRECLUDE SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DECLARATION AND EXHIBIT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 316 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC'S DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTDS AND TEVEA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT THOMAS HOXIE, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
June 6, 2014 Filing 315 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS AND EXHIBITS 19-26 (FILED UNDER SEAL) by CEPHALON, INC.. (rf, )
June 6, 2014 Filing 314 DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED EXPERT, JOHN R. THOMAS (FILED UNDER SEAL) by CEPHALON, INC.. (rf, )
June 6, 2014 Filing 313 NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. re #276 Notice (Other), NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXPERT JOHN R. THOMAS (BALDRIDGE, J.)
June 6, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. re #277 Notice (Other), NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS HAL J. SINGER, RAYMOND S. HARTMAN, ROGER G. NOLL, JEFFREY LEITZINGER, KEITH B. LEFFLER AND EINER R. ELHAGUE (BALDRIDGE, J.)
June 6, 2014 Filing 311 NOTICE by APOTEX, INC., BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY)
June 6, 2014 Filing 310 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support re #273 MOTION to Exclude Damages Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Drs. Hartman, Leffler, Leitzinger and Noll filed by CEPHALON, INC. (GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 6/9/2014 (md).
June 6, 2014 Filing 309 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal Cephalon's Responses to Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Counter-Statement of Material Facts Which Preclude Summary Judgment (GELLMAN, NANCY)
June 6, 2014 Filing 308 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Reply Memorandum in Support re #271 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Thomas Hoxie by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Cephalon, Inc. filed by CEPHALON, INC. (GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 6/9/2014 (md).
June 6, 2014 Filing 307 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support re #278 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Louis P. Berneman filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL) Modified on 6/9/2014 (md).
June 6, 2014 Filing 306 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Reply Brief in Support re #279 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Allan Myerson and Other Derivative Opinions filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL) Modified on 6/9/2014 (md).
June 6, 2014 Filing 305 REPLY to Response to Motion re #280 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Cephalon's Ten Patent Experts filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER THAT JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITIONS AND IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT OPPOSITIONS (DOC. 303) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/2/14. 6/3/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 29, 2014 Filing 303 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Briefing in Reply to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Oppositions and in Reply to Plaintiffs' Daubert Oppositions (Unopposed) filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 12, 2014 Filing 302 DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF GREGORY K. BELL (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
May 12, 2014 Filing 301 DEFENDANTS JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' DAUBERT MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS CONCERNING THE BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS WITH GENERIC DEFENDANTS, DECLARATION AND EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
May 12, 2014 Filing 300 DEFENDANT CEPHALONS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' DAUBERT MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS CONCERNING THE '516 PATENT DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
May 12, 2014 Filing 299 DEFENDANTS JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EXPERT REPORT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF JERRY HAUSMAN, EDWARD A. SNYDER, AND BRUCE STANGLE, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
May 9, 2014 Filing 298 DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF PAUL GARDNER AND S. PETER LUDWIG. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
May 9, 2014 Filing 297 NOTICE by MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Opinions of Paul Gardner and S. Peter Ludwig (VARZALLY, MATTHEW)
May 9, 2014 Filing 296 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION of Filing Under Seal of Response to Motion to Exclude John Thomas (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
May 9, 2014 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #271 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Thomas Hoxie filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
May 9, 2014 Filing 294 RESPONSE in Opposition re #273 MOTION to Exclude Damages Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Drs. Hartman, Leffler, Leitzinger and Noll filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
May 9, 2014 Filing 293 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Joint Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions and Testimony of Jerry Hausman and Edward A. Snyder (filed by all defendants) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 9, 2014 Filing 292 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Cephalon's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions to Exclude Opinions Concerning the '516 Patent (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 9, 2014 Filing 291 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Filing Under Seal of Defendants' Joint Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motions to Exclude Certain Opinions Concerning the Business Transactions with Generic Defendants (filed by all defendants) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 9, 2014 Filing 290 NOTICE by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. of Filing Under Seal (SKIDMORE, GREGORY)
May 9, 2014 Filing 289 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #275 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PERRY, MICHAEL)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING (DOC. 287) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/7/14. 5/7/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 6, 2014 Filing 287 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Briefing in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions (Unopposed) filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER THAT MOTION TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD (DOC. 240) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE MOTION MAY BE RE-FILED AT A LATER DATE, IF NECESSARY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/5/14. 5/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 17, 2014 Filing 285 STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/17/14. 4/17/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 16, 2014 Filing 284 STIPULATION Unopposed Amendment to Pre-Trial Scheduling Orders and proposed Order filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/17/2014 (nd, ).
April 7, 2014 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS DRS. HARTMAN,LEFFLER,LEITZINGER AND NOLL (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
April 7, 2014 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC'S, DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD'S AND TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT THOMAS HOXIE (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
April 4, 2014 Filing 281 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION of Joinder to Related Case Daubert Motions (BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
April 4, 2014 Filing 280 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Cephalon's Ten Patent Experts filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Notice. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
April 4, 2014 Filing 279 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Allan Myerson and Other Derivative Opinions filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Notice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
April 4, 2014 Filing 278 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Louis P. Berneman filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Notice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
April 4, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ECONOMIC EXPERTS HAL J. SINGER, RAYMOND S. HARTMAN, ROGER G. NOLL, JEFFREY LEITZINGER, KEITH B. LEFFLER AND EINER R. ELHAGUE AND THEIR MEMO IN SUPPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(BALDRIDGE, J.)
April 4, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE by RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL ALL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXPERT JOHN R. THOMAS AND THEIR MEMO IN SUPPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(BALDRIDGE, J.)
April 4, 2014 Filing 275 DEFENDANTS CEPHALON, BARR, AND TEVA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CHALLENGES TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (SKIDMORE, GREGORY)
April 4, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. re #273 MOTION to Exclude Damages Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Drs. Hartman, Leffler, Leitzinger and Noll - Notice of Filing Under Seal Memorandum, Declaration and Exhibits (GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 4, 2014 Filing 273 MOTION to Exclude Damages Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Drs. Hartman, Leffler, Leitzinger and Noll filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 4, 2014 Filing 272 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. re #271 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Thomas Hoxie - Notice of Filing Under Seal Memorandum, Declaration and Exhibits (GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 4, 2014 Filing 271 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Thomas Hoxie filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 2, 2014 Filing 270 PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISION'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. (rf, ) (Main Document 270 replaced on 4/3/2014) (rf, ).
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER FTC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION (DOC. 264) IS GRANTED. CLERK SHOULD FILE EXHIBIT A TO THE FTC'S MOTION TO ITS REPLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/2/14. 4/2/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/8/2014 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS. ONLY ONE ATTORNEY PER PARTY MAY ATTEND. ON OR BEFORE 4/4/14 THE PARTIES MAY SUBMIT BY EMAIL PROPOSED AGENDA/TOPIC ITEMS THAT ARE NOT COVERED IN THE 3/18/14 EMAIL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/20/14. 3/20/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 267 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DIRECT PURCHASERS MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED IN THE OPINION. THE END PAYORS MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED IN THE OPNION. APOTEX'S MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART, AS OUTLINED IN THE OPINION. THE MONOPOLY POWER PORTION OF APOTEX'S MOTION WILL BE RESOLVED SEPARATELY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/13/14. 3/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/12/14. 3/13/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER THAT JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY DEADLINES IS GRANTED. THE COURTS 12/3/13 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: PARAGRAPHS 6 AND 8 ARE VACATED; ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DEPOSITIONS, SHALL BE COMPLETED 3/18/2014; ALL OTHER MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AS WELL AS ANY DAUBERT MOTIONS, SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 4/4/14. RESPONSES TO SUCH MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 4/25/14. REPLIES TO SUCH MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5/9/14. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/3/14. 3/4/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 264 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PERRY, MICHAEL)
January 31, 2014 Filing 263 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 1/22/14. (rf, )
January 29, 2014 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/23/14 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: STEVE SONNIE. (SEE 06-1797 PAPER #591) (jl, )
January 28, 2014 Filing 261 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Oral Argument Court Reporter: S. SONNIE. (rf, )
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER THAT THREE BUSINESS DAY EXTENSION FOR SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS IS GRANTED. RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS ARE DUE BY 1/29/14. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/27/14. 1/28/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, EMAILED.(rf, )
January 27, 2014 Filing 259 REPLY to Response to Motion re #245 MOTION to Compel , #189 MOTION to Compel Discovery or Preclude Reliance filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
January 23, 2014 MOTIONS DUE BY 1/31/2014. (rf, )
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FTC SHALL HAVE UNTIL 1/31/14 TO FILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO TEVA'S OPPOSITION TO THE FTC'S MOTION TO JOIN IT AS A DEFENDANT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/23/14. 1/23/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ATTACHED STIPULTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/20/14. 1/23/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 14, 2014 Filing 256 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INCS CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO THE FTC'S MOTION TO COMPEL OR PRECLUDE RELIANCE AND THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONTO STRIKE, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO COMPEL DUE TO AT ISSUE WAIVER (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
January 13, 2014 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #245 MOTION to Compel (Redacted Version) filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 1/22/14 AT 10:00AM WILL BE RESCHEDULED FOR 3:30PM THE SAME DAY, IN COURTROOM 4B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/10/14. 1/10/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT SET FOR 1/22/2014 10:00 AM AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/9/14. 1/10/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSE, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 9, 2014 Filing 252 EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 10 IN SUPPORT OF NON PARTY TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD'S OPPOSITION TO FTC'S MOTION TO JOIN IT AS A DEFENDANT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
January 8, 2014 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #240 MOTION for Joinder filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WOLFSON, JOSEPH)
January 7, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #240 MOTION for Joinder , #245 MOTION to Compel . RESPONSES DUE BY 1/13/2014. REPLIES DUE BY 1/27/2014. (rf, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CEPHALON SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSES TO THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND FTCS MOTIONS ON OR BEFORE 1/13/14, WITH REPLIES DUE 1/27/14.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/6/14. 1/7/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 3, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRIDGET E. MONTGOMERY on behalf of SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC, Certificate of Service.(MONTGOMERY, BRIDGET) Modified on 1/6/2014 (md).
December 23, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #240 MOTION for Joinder . RESPONSES DUE BY 1/8/2014. (rf, )
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTDS TIME TO RESPOND TO FTC MOTION TO JOIN THAT PARTY IS EXTENDED UNTIL 1/8/14.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/23/13. 12/23/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 247 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONS COUNTERSTATEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO CEPHALON'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 246 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 245 MOTION to Compel filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Brief in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration and Exhibit Slip Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #5 26.1(f) Certification, #6 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
December 20, 2013 Filing 244 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. (Filing Under Seal) (GELLMAN, NANCY)
December 20, 2013 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Support re #219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
December 20, 2013 Filing 242 REPLY to Response to Motion re #218 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Preclude Patent Issues filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Response to Counterstatement of Material Facts, #2 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #3 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/20/2014 01:30 PM AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/11/13. 12/12/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 9, 2013 Filing 240 MOTION for Joinder filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PERRY, MICHAEL)
December 5, 2013 Filing 239 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 12/4/13. (rf, )
December 3, 2013 MOTIONS DUE BY 4/21/2014. (rf, )
December 3, 2013 Filing 238 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2014., DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 3/14/2014., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/14/2014. MATTERS ARE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/3/13. 12/3/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, ) *PARAGRAPGHS 6 AND 8 ARE VACATED PER COURT ORDER OF 3/4/14, DOC. 265*
November 19, 2013 Filing 237 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINITFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRECLUSION OF PATENT ISSUES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
November 19, 2013 Filing 236 CEPHALON, INC. COUNTER STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS WHICH PRECLUDE SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF CEPHALON'S OPPOSITION TO (1) DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE PATENT ISSUES AND (2) PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S MOTION FOR PRECLUSION OF PATENT ISSUES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DECLARATION, EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
November 19, 2013 Filing 235 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INCS' CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS SEEKING SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PRECLUSION ON WALKER PROCESS FRAUD AND OTHER ANTITRUST ISSUES FROM THE BIFURCATED PATENT LITIGATION, EXHIBITS VOLUMES 1-3 IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
November 18, 2013 Filing 234 RESPONSE in Opposition re #219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit, #6 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
November 18, 2013 Filing 233 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. (of Filing Under Seal of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER THAT CEPHALON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITION BRIEF (DOC. 531, 245, 630 & 230) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/4/13. 11/5/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 31, 2013 Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 10/24/13. (jl, )
October 31, 2013 Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to File a Consolidated Summary Judgment Opposition Brief on Patent-Related Issues and Separate Responses on Other Issues filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
October 28, 2013 MOTIONS DUE BY 4/21/2014. (rf, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER THAT DEADLINE FOR FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION TO FILE A MOTION TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION, ORIGINALLY SET FORTH IN THIS COURTS 8/15/13 ORDER (DOC. 210) IS EXTENDED UNTIL 12/9/13. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/25/13. 10/28/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED(rf, )
October 22, 2013 MOTIONS DUE BY 4/21/2014. (rf, )
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/10/2014., CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTIONS DUE BY 4/21/14., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 2/24/2014. CASE IS REFERRED TO HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. ALL OTHER SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/22/13. 10/22/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT REOPEN AND REMOVE THE ABOVE REFERENCED ACTIONS FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/18/13. 10/18/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED (rf, )
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER THAT ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES ARE TEMPORARILY PLACED IN SUSPENSE AND STAYED. THERE SHALL BE NO LITIGATION ACTIVITY OR SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT., ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/1/13. 10/1/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED.(rf, )
October 1, 2013 Filing 225 RESPONSE to Motion re #224 MOTION to Stay Due to Government Shutdown filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
October 1, 2013 Filing 224 MOTION to Stay Due to Government Shutdown filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
September 26, 2013 Filing 223 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 9/25/13. (rf, )
September 25, 2013 Filing 222 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT-RELATED MATTERS IS SET FOR 10/2/2013 04:45 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL, OR ALTERNATIVELY, PROVIDE A DIAL-IN CONFERENCE LINE NO LATER THAN 48 HOURS BEFORE THE SCHEDULED CALL TO ALL PARTIES, INCLUDING THE COURT(lds, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 221 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INCS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
September 20, 2013 Filing 220 Declaration re #219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
September 20, 2013 Filing 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by CEPHALON, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Cephalon's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Redacted Version), #2 Cephalon's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #3 proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
September 20, 2013 Filing 218 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , MOTION to Preclude filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preclusion or Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
September 11, 2013 Filing 217 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTIONS ARE GRANTED IN PART AS THEY RELATE TO CHALLENGE NO. 20 AND DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. FURTHER ORDERED THAT CEPHALON, INC. SHALL PRODUCE AN UNREDACTED VERSION OF CHALLENGE NO. 20 WITHIN 10 DAYS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/11/13. 9/11/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 11, 2013 Filing 216 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/11/13. 9/11/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT REOPEN AND REMOVE THE ABOVE REFERENCED ACTIONS FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/4/13. 9/4/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED.(rf, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE: Settlement Conference held on 8/28/13. (rf, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL BUTRYMOWICZ on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(BUTRYMOWICZ, DANIEL)
August 21, 2013 Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 8/8/13 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: S. SONNIE.. (rf, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 211 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: ALL MATTERS RELATED TO SETTLEMENT AND POSSIBLY SCHEDULING OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/28/2013 04:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL AND TO DIAL/CONNECT CHAMBERS (PH: 267-299-7790) INTO THE CALL ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE AND READY TO PROCEED.(lds, )
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER THAT ANY MOTION BY THE COMMISSION TO JOIN TEVA AS A DEFENDANT MUST BE FILED BY 11/8/2013. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS ARE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/15/2013. 8/15/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 15, 2013 Filing 209 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 1/3/2014. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 1/24/2014. FURTHER DEADLINES AND INSTRUCTIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE MATTER IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/14/2013. 8/15/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) *ORDER IS VACATED PER COURT ORDER OF 10/22/13, DOC. 228*
August 9, 2013 Filing 208 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/13 re #189 MOTION to Compel filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION Court Reporter: S.SONNIE. (rf, )
August 8, 2013 Filing 207 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by TIMOTHY J SLATTERY on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY)
July 31, 2013 Filing 206 Joint Discovery Plan and Proposed Schedule by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CEPHALON, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 8/1/2013 (md).
July 31, 2013 Filing 205 Proposed Final Pretrial Scheduling Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY) Modified on 8/1/2013 (md).
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER THAT AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING & MOTION HEARING SET FOR 8/8/2013 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/30/13. 7/30/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 16, 2013 Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/11/13 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: STEVE SONNIE. STATUS HEARING (jl, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Status Conference held on 7/11/13. Court Reporter: S. SONNIE. (rf, )
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AND SUMBIT TO THE COURT WITHIN 20 DAYS A JOINT DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING PLAN THAT INCLUDES A TIME PERIOD FOR ANY ADDITIONAL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY; THE SCOPE OF ADDITIONAL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY THAT SHOULD BE PERMITTED; BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTIONS, ISSUE PRECLUSION MOTIONS, DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND OTHER PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND A PROPOSED TRIAL DATE, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/11/13. 7/12/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 11, 2013 Filing 200 PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL CEPHALON, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHHELD ON PRIVILEGE GROUNDS (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. 195) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE UNDER SEAL, IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS REDACTIONS, EXHIBIT A TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION AS ITS REPLY BRIEF.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/10/13. 7/11/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/11/2013 02:00 PM AS OUTLINED HEREINSIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/24/13. 6/24/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 197 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re Supreme Court Decision (Attachments: #1 FTC v. Actavis (S. Ct. June 17, 2013))(PERRY, MICHAEL)
February 5, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by J. MAREN SCHMIDT on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (SCHMIDT, J.)
January 14, 2013 Filing 195 Redacted MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support re #189 MOTION to Compel filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Brief Proposed Brief, #3 Declaration Declaration of Dominic Vote, #4 Certificate of Service)(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY) Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/11/2013) (rf, ).
January 14, 2013 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY J SLATTERY on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY) *FILED IN ERROR BY WRONG ATTORNEY; J. MARE SCHMIDT MUST FILE APPEARANCE* Modified on 1/15/2013 (lisad, ).
December 18, 2012 Filing 193 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION'S AND DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL CEPHALON, INC. TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHHELD ON PRIVILEGE GROUNDS, DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (amas)
December 17, 2012 Filing 192 Memorandum in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Compel Cephalon, Inc. to Produce Documents Withheld on Privilege Grounds (Redacted Version) filed by CEPHALON, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark A. Ford (Exhibits 1-10 Filed Under Seal), #2 proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 12/18/2012 (lisad, ).
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CEPHALON HAS UNTIL 12/17/2012 TO FILE A BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL. FTC HAS UNTIL 1/14/13 TO FILE ANY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/26/12. 11/26/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, COUNSEL & E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 190 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by CEPHALON, INC.(GELLMAN, NANCY) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 11/19/2012 (md).
November 8, 2012 Filing 189 MOTION to Compel filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Brief [Redacted], #3 Text of Proposed Order [Redacted], #4 Declaration [Redacted], #5 Local Rule 26.1(f) Certification, #6 Certificate of Service)(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY)
October 31, 2012 Filing 188 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE MATTERS SHALL BE PLACED IN SUSPENSE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THESE MATTERS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/29/2012. 8/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, COUNSEL AND E-MAILED (rf)
July 25, 2012 Filing 186 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 25TH DAY OF JULY, 2012, IN LIGHT OF THE RECENT DECISION BY THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT IN IN RE K-DUR ANTITRUST LLITIGATION, NOS. 10-2077, 10-2078 AND 10-2079, A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 2:00 P.M., TUESDAY, AUGUST 7, 2012. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL PRIOR TO CALLING CHAMBERS. ONLY ONE (1) COUNSEL EACH FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, APOTEX, THE FTC, CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MAY PARTICIPATE. NO WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WILL BE ACCEPTED IN ADVANCE OF THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (CJL)
July 17, 2012 Filing 185 NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT J. GUNTHER, JR(GUNTHER, ROBERT)
May 30, 2012 Filing 184 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by NATHAN A. READ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(READ, NATHAN)
April 23, 2012 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/12/12 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: STEVE SONNIE. STATUS CONFERENCE (jl, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER THAT MOTION ON THE PRECLUSIVE EFFECT OF THE COURTS DECISION INVALIDATING THE 516 PATENT (DOC. 177) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/12/12. 4/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, EMAILED.(rf, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR JOINDER (DOC. 168) IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/12/12. 4/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND COUNSEL AND EMAILED.(rf, )
April 9, 2012 Filing 180 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 9TH DAY OF APRIL, 2012, A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11:00 A.M., THURSDAY, APRIL 12, 2012. COUNSEL FOR CEPHALON SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL PRIOR TO CALLING CHAMBERS. ONLY ONE (1) COUNSEL EACH FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, APOTEX, THE FTC, CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MAY PARTICIPATE. (CJL)
February 17, 2012 Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re #177 MOTION to Preclude filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
January 24, 2012 Filing 178 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #168 MOTION for Joinder (PERRY, MICHAEL)
January 20, 2012 Filing 177 MOTION to Preclude filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY)
December 21, 2011 Filing 176 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CEPHALON, INC..(GELLMAN, NANCY)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE ANY MOTIONS REQUESTING THAT COURTS 10/31/11 OPINION REGARDING THE RE 516 PATENT IN APOTEX V CEPHALON DOCKET NO. 06-2768 BE GIVEN PRECLUSIVE EFFECT AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS IN THE ANTITRUST CLAIMS ON OR BEFORE 1/20/12. BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF ANY MOTION ARE LIMITED TO 35 PAGES. DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IF ANY SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 2/17/12. BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF ANY RESPONSE ARE LIMITED TO 35 PAGESSIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/8/11. 12/12/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP & COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER THAT TEVA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR TEVA TO FILE A RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE FTCS MOTION TO JOIN TEVA SHALL BE EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING 12/14/11.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/2/11. 12/5/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, COUNSEL & E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 2ND DAY OF DECEMBER, 2011, THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2011 AT 10:30 A.M. WILL BE HEARD IN COURTROOM 11B.(CJL)
December 1, 2011 Filing 172 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 1ST DAY OF DECEMBER, 2011, THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2011, WILL BEGIN AT 10:30 A.M., AND NOT 9:30 A.M.(CJL)
November 30, 2011 Filing 171 STATUS REPORT by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
November 30, 2011 Filing 170 STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (SLATTERY, TIMOTHY)
November 29, 2011 Filing 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #168 MOTION for Joinder / Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Join Teva filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(READ, NATHAN)
November 18, 2011 Filing 168 MOTION for Joinder filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PERRY, MICHAEL)
November 15, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by W. ROSS FOOTE on behalf of BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC.(FOOTE, W.)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/6/2011 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG (COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/8/2011. 11/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED; AND MAILED TO UNREP NOTICE ONLY PARTY.(md)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER THAT THE COURT'S 3/8/11, AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IS VACATED. UPON ISSUANCE OF THE COURT'S DECISIONS IN 06-2768, THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE A CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL TO DISCUSS SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILING DEADLINES, PAGE LIMITS. THE FOURTEEN MOTIONS LISTED ABOVE ARE DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/23/2011.8/24/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED
August 23, 2011 Filing 164 MOTION to Expedite (Uncontested) Consideration of its Motion for Leave to File Two Consolidated Summary Judgment Briefs filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
August 23, 2011 Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to File Two Consolidated Summary Judgment Briefs filed by CEPHALON, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARY J EDWARDS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/5/2011.8/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO HAC VICE, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
August 5, 2011 Filing 161 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mary J. Edwards, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF EMILY R. WHELAN IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/1/11. 8/2/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 159 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Emily R. Whelan, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
July 26, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY J SLATTERY on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY)
July 19, 2011 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD HASSI, WALTER WAYNE BROWN, SUSAN MITCHELL on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(rf, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY J SLATTERY on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NICHOLAS E.O. GAGLIO IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/20/11. 4/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 20, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ELIZABETH M. RYAN on behalf of CEPHALON, INC.(RYAN, ELIZABETH)
April 19, 2011 Letter to Attorney David G. Adams re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (pod, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 153 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHELLE H. SEAGULL on behalf of URL PHARMA, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(rf, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 152 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NICHOLAS E. O. GAGLIO, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACTAVIS GROUP, URL PHARMA, INC..(PPE041639) (rf, )
April 8, 2011 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD A. FEINSTEIN on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (rf, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY J SLATTERY on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service(SLATTERY, TIMOTHY)
March 16, 2011 Filing 149 NOTICE: AND NOW, THIS 15TH DAY OF MARCH, 2011, A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE EISCOVERY DISPUTE ON RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TOPICS IS SCHEDULED FOR FRIDAY, MARCH 18, 2011, AT 10:00 A.M. E.S.T. COUNSEL FOR THE END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL PRIOR TO CALLING CHAMBERS. ONLY ONE (1) COUNSEL EACH FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS, END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, APOTEX, THE FTC, CEPHALON AND THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS MAY PARTICIPATE.(CJL)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER THAT FOR ALL SEALED MOTIONS AND DOCUMENTS COUNSEL SHALL FILE A REDACTED COPY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF. COUNSEL SHALL THEN SEND ONE UNREDACTED COPY TO CHAMBERS ONLY. COUNSEL SHALL NOT SEND ANY HARD COPIES TO THE CLERK OF COURTS OFFICE. CHAMBERS WILL HAVE THE UNREDACTED SEALED PAPERS PROPERLY FILED OF RECORD, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/10/11. 3/10/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 8, 2011 DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/12/2011. MOTIONS DUE BY 9/9/2011. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 9/9/2011. (rf, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER THAT APOTEX, INC'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY IS GRANED. PARAGRAPHS 10-11 AND 13-14 OF THE COURTS 4/26/10 ARE VACATED. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 9/9/11. EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE 8/12/11. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/8/11. 3/9/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC.84) IS DENIED. THIRD PARTY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES' MOTION TO INTERVENE (DOC. 87) IS GRANTED. THIRD PARTY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES' MOTION FOR PROTECTION ORDER (DOC. 88) IS DENIED AS MOOT, IN LIGHT OF THE DENIAL OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 2/28/2011.2/28/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 145 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Astellas Pharma Inc., Merck & Co., Inc. with Certificate of Service by ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.(MARTINEZ, PETER)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HELENE D. JAFFE IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/23/11. 2/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 23, 2011 Filing 143 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Helene D. Jaffe filed by SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC.Certificate of Service.(MONTGOMERY, BRIDGET)
February 23, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIDGET E. MONTGOMERY on behalf of SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC with Certificate of Service(MONTGOMERY, BRIDGET)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF PAUL LAURANCE YDE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/22/11. 2/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(rf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2011: #1 order) (rf, ).
February 22, 2011 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PERRY, MICHAEL)
February 22, 2011 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION for Protective Order by Third Party Pharmaceutical Companies filed by ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (MARTINEZ, PETER)
February 18, 2011 Filing 138 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF PAUL LAURANCE YDE, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (PPE037983) (rf, )
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF RICHARD J. STARK IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/17/11. 2/18/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL A. GLEASON IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/16/11. 2/17/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF PHILLIP A. PROGER IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/16/11. 2/17/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 134 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Phillip A. Proger filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ESAI INC, KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(IOLE, JOHN)
February 16, 2011 Filing 133 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Gleason filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ESAI INC, KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(IOLE, JOHN)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GEORGE S. CARY IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/7/11. 2/9/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KATHLEEN W. BRADISH IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/7/11. 2/9/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 8, 2011 Letter to Attorney DAVID G. ADAMS re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (rf, )
February 8, 2011 Letter to Attorney VINCENT E. VERROCCHIO re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (rf, )
February 8, 2011 Letter to Attorney LLEWELLYN DAVIS re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (rf, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 130 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF GEORGE S. CARY, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC. (PPE037169) (rf, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 129 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KATHLEEN W. BRADISH, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC. (PPE037169) (rf, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #124 Response to Motion (PERRY, MICHAEL)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER THAT REPLY MEMORANDA DUE 2/22/2011 WITH REGARDS TO THE PENDING MOTIONS; MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/4/2011 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 2/4/11. 2/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CREIGHTON J. MACY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/3/2011. 2/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SETH C. SILBER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/3/2011. 2/4/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 4, 2011 Filing 124 RESPONSE to Motion re #88 MOTION for Protective Order and Certificate of Service filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Orders)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
February 4, 2011 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION to Intervene and Certificate of Service filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
February 4, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION, ECKERD CORPORATION, GIANT EAGLE, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, KING DRUG COMPANY OF FLORENCE, INC., MAXI DRUG, INC., MEIJER DISTRIBUTION, INC., MEIJER, INC., ROCHESTER DRUG CO-OPERATIVE, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE HOLDINGS, INC., STEPHEN L. LAFRANCE PHARMACY, WALGREEN CO. Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Position with Respect to Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission and the Motion of Third-Party Pharmaceutical Companies' for Protective Order (CLARK, NEILL)
February 3, 2011 Filing 121 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CREIGHTON J. MACY, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., WOCKHARDT LIMITED, WOCKHARDT USA LLC. (PPE036938) (rf, )
February 3, 2011 Filing 120 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SETH C. SILBER, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., WOCKHARDT LIMITED, WOCKHARDT USA LLC. (PPE036938) (rf, )
February 2, 2011 Filing 119 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RICHARD J. STARK, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (rf, )
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF WILLIAM A. RAKOCZY TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/1/11. 2/2/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 2, 2011 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW J. SOVEN on behalf of IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., WOCKHARDT LIMITED, WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(SOVEN, ANDREW)
January 31, 2011 Filing 116 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF WILLIAM A. RAKOCZY, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ANCHEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS,INC..(PPE036749) (rf, )
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHELLE H. SEAGULL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/28/11. 1/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CLAUDIA R. HIGGINS, MICHAEL N. SOHN, PAMELA L. TAYLOR, BRENT P. RAY, MICHAEL SENNETT IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/25/11. 1/26/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF J. MARK GIDLEY, ROSS E. ELFAND, NOAH A. BRUMFIELD, JAMES S. TRAINOR AND ROBERT A. MILNE ARE GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/25/11. 1/26/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 26, 2011 Filing 112 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHELLE H. SEAGULL, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACTAVIS GROUP, URL PHARMA, INC.. (PPE036556)(rf, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Sennett filed by BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, BEN VENUE LABORATORIES, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(IOLE, JOHN)
January 25, 2011 Filing 110 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brent P. Ray filed by BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, BEN VENUE LABORATORIES, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(IOLE, JOHN)
January 25, 2011 Filing 109 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Pamela L. Taylor filed by BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, BEN VENUE LABORATORIES, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(IOLE, JOHN)
January 25, 2011 Filing 108 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL N. SOHN, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FOREST LABORATORIES, INC..(PPE036409) (rf, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 107 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CLAUDIA R. HIGGINS, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PURDUE PHARMA L.P..(PPE036408) (rf, )
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ERIC GRANNON IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/25/11. 1/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARK S. POPOFSKY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/25/11. 1/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 104 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROBERT A. MILNE, SPONSORS STATEMENT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NOVARTIS CORP., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., SANDOZ INC,.(PPE036373) (rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 103 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JAMES S. TRAINOR, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALMIRALL, S.A..(PPE036373) (rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 102 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NOAH A. BRUMFIELD, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. by SUNOVION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(PPE036373) (rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 101 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROSS E. ELFAND, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NOVARTIS CORP., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., SANDOZ INC,.(PPE036373) (rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 100 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSON OF J.MARK GIDLEY, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUNOVION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(PPE036373) (rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 99 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ERIC GRANNON, SPONSORS STATEMENT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC.. (PPE036373)(rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 98 Letter to the Honorable L. Felipe Restrepo from Nancy J. Gellman. (rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 97 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARK S. POPOFSKY, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PFIZER INC..(PPE036348) (rf, )
January 24, 2011 Filing 96 Correct Memorandum in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bradley S. Albert, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PERRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/25/2011 (nd, ).
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT "DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION", "THIRD-PARTY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES' MOTION TO INTERVENE", AND "THIRD PARTY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER," ARE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO FOR DISPOSITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/20/11. 1/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 20, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE G. GORDON on behalf of ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC. with Certificate of Service(GORDON, GEORGE)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TIMOTHY C. HESTER AND PETER J. MARTINEZ ARE GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/19/11. 1/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL, E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 19, 2011 Filing 92 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF PETER J. MARTINEZ, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.(PPE035935) (rf, )
January 19, 2011 Filing 91 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF TIMOTHY C. HESTER, SPONSORS STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (PPE035934) (rf, )
January 18, 2011 Filing 90 RESPONSE to Motion re #84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission filed by BARR LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD., RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., Certificate of Service. (SKIDMORE, GREGORY) Modified on 1/19/2011 (nd, ).
January 18, 2011 Filing 89 Memorandum in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bradley S. Albert) (PERRY, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/19/2011 (nd, ).
January 18, 2011 Filing 88 THIRD PARTY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ACTAVIS GROUP, ALMIRALL, S.A., ANCHEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BEN VENUE LABORATORIES, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC., ESAI INC, FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS,INC., MERK SHARP & DOHME CORP, NOVARTIS CORP., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PFIZER INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC, SHIRE LLC, SUNOVION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UPSHER SMITH LABORATORIES, INC., URL PHARMA, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT LIMITED, WOCKHARDT USA LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(rf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2011: #3 PROPOSED ORDER, #4 EXHIBIT, #5 EXHIBIT 2) (rf, ).
January 18, 2011 Filing 87 THIRD PARTY PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES' MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ACTAVIS GROUP, ALMIRALL, S.A., ANCHEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA INC., ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC., ASTRAZENECA PLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, BEN VENUE LABORATORIES, INC., BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC., ESAI INC, FOREST LABORATORIES, INC., FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS,INC., MERK SHARP & DOHME CORP, NOVARTIS CORP., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PFIZER INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., SANDOZ INC,, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC, SHIRE LLC, SUNOVION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UPSHER SMITH LABORATORIES, INC., URL PHARMA, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT LIMITED, WOCKHARDT USA LLC, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rf, )
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ORDER THAT THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CEPHALON'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED. THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE ON OR BEFORE 1/18/2011. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/3/2011. 1/3/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER THAT FTC SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO CEPHALONS MOTION TO COMPEL BY 1/18/2011SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/30/10. 12/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(rf, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission filed by CEPHALON, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Defendant Cephalon Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #11 Certification Pursuant to Local R. Civ. P. 26(f))(GELLMAN, NANCY)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT ATTORNEY ELIZABETH M. RYAN IS GRANTED PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/9/10. 12/9/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(rf, )
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF YIN ZHOU IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/9/10. 12/9/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 9, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Yin Zhou, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
December 9, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth M. Ryan, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
November 18, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by DOMINIC EDWARD VOTE, LLEWELLYN DAVIS, ABIGAIL SLATER, MICHAEL PERRY on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (rf, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE B MUNCK af ROSENCHOLD on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, Certificate of Service(rf, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY IS GRANTED AND THE TERMS OF EXHIBIT A TO THOSE MOTIONS "PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY COORDINATION ORDER" ARE ADOPTED AND ORDERED AS IF SET FORTH HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/31/10. 9/2/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Coordination Order filed by CEPHALON, INC... (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proposed Joint Discovery Coordination Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
June 29, 2010 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOHN ROBERT ROBERTSON on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(ROBERTSON, JOHN)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER THAT ALL COUNSEL SHALL REPORT BACK TO THE UNDERSIGNED NO LATER THAN 11/12/10 WITH AN UPDATE AS WHEN SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS SOULD RECONVENE, ETC. ( SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 6/18/10. ) 6/18/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (rf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO: Settlement Conference held on 6/17/10. (rf, )
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER THAT IN AN EFFORT TO MINIMIZE THE AMOUNT OF DOWN TIME FOR COUNSEL THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR IN COURTROOM 3-I AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 6/14/10. 6/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/22/2010 before Judge MITCHELL S. GOLBERG. Court Reporter: STEPHEN SONNIE.. (kk, )
April 27, 2010 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Status Conference held on 4/22/10. Court Reporter: STEPHEN SONNIE. (rf, )
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/27/2011., MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 6/17/2011.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/26/10. 4/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/17/2010 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3I BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 4/23/2010. 4/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
April 21, 2010 ***Update Answer Deadline (rf, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME IN WHICH THE GENERIC DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINTS SHALL BE EXTENDED BY 10 DAYS THROUGH AND INCLUDING 4/29/10; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/21/10. 4/21/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL, E-MAILED Modified on 4/21/2010 (rf, ).
April 21, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA S BLATT on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(rf, )
April 19, 2010 Filing 65 Statement -- Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Rule 16 Conference Memorandum by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
April 19, 2010 Filing 64 Statement Submission of Apotex in Response to Order of March 29, 2010 by APOTEX, INC.. (LANGER, HOWARD)
April 19, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Scheduling and Coordination Proposal (GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 19, 2010 Filing 62 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint and Certificate of Service by CEPHALON, INC..(GELLMAN, NANCY)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT THE AFOREMENTIONED COUNSEL SHALL UPDATE THEIR ECF CONTACT INFORMATION TO INCLUDE A VALID EMAIL ADDRESS ON OR BEFORE 4/22/10. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES AS NOTICE TO THE AFOREMENTIONED COUNSEL THAT THE COURT WILL NO LONGER FORWARD PAPER COPIES OF COURT DOCUMENTS TO COUNSEL IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/16/10. 4/19/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED
April 15, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY J SLATTERY, GARTH HUSTON, BRADLEY S. ALBERT, JON J NATHAN, SARALISA C BRAU, ALPA D GANDHI on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (rf, )
March 29, 2010 ***Update Answer Deadline (rf, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CEPHALON'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 43) IS DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON OR EBFORE 4/19/10. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2010 10:00 AM AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/10. 3/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINIONSIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/29/10. 3/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 57 Letter from Markus H. Meier to the Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg. (rf, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 56 DEFENDANT CEPHALON, INC RESPONSE TO THE COURTS QUESTIONS REGARDING THE PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (rf, )
November 27, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Responses To The Court's Questions Regarding The Pending Motions To Dismiss (Redacted) (GELLMAN, NANCY)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT ANY PARTY OR OTHER PERSON, INCLUDING NON PARTY RECIPIENTS OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS, MAY DESIGNATE ALL OR ANY PART OF A DOCUMENT, DISCOVERY RESPONSE, DEPOSITION, OR OTHER DISCOVERY MATERIALS WHICH THAT PARTY OR PERSON PRODUCES, SERVES, OR PROVIDES IN CONNECTION WITH THESE ACTIONS AS "CONFIDENTIAL" OR "HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL". BY DESIGNATING ANY MATERIAL "CONFIDENTIAL" OR "HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL" THE PARTIES DO NOT ACKNOWLEDGE THAT ANY SUCH MATERIAL IS RELEVANT OR DISCOVERABLE IN THESE ACTIONS. ALL PARTIES RESERVE THE RIGHT TO SEEK DISCOVERY OF, OR ALTERNATIVELY TO RESIST DISCOVERY OF, SUCH MATERIAL IN THESE ACTIONS. THE COURT RETAINS THE RIGHT TO ALLOW DISCLOSURE OF ANY SUBJECT COVERED BY THIS STIPULATION OR TO MODIFY THIS STIPULATION AT ANY TIME IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE; ETC... SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/9/2009. 11/10/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND COUNSEL, E-MAILED
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT NON PARTY TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA'S MOTION TO AMEND PROTECTIVE ORDER TO PROVIDE NOTICE TO CERTAIN NON PARTIES IS GRANTED AND TAKEDA PHARMACETICALS MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/9/09.11/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED
November 6, 2009 Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by CEPHALON, INC... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Amended Stipulated Protective Order)(GELLMAN, NANCY)
October 29, 2009 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument on Motion To Dismiss held on 10/21/09 before Judge GOLDBERG. Court Reporter: STEPHEN SONNIE.. (rf, )
October 22, 2009 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Oral Argument held on 10/21/09. (rf, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDERED THAT THE COURT'S 7/30/09 ORDER IS VACATED AS TO THE DATE FOR ORAL ARGUMENT IN THE VISTA HEALTPLAN END PAYOR CLASS ACTION AND THE F.T.C. LITIGATION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS WILL BE HELD IN THE F.T.C. LITIGATION ON 10/21/09 AT 2:00 AND IN THE VISTA HEALTHPLAN END PAYOR CLASS ACTION ON 10/22/09 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/15/09. 10/15/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS(stb, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. 11) IS DENIED AS MOOT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/24/09. 9/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 10/23/09 EACH DEFENDANT WILL PROVIDE LIAISON AND LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE KING DRUG DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS, LIAISON AND LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE VISTA HEALTHPLAN END-PAYOR CLASS PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR THE INDIVIDUAL DIRECT PURCHASER AND END PAYOR PLAINTIFFS, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. ON OR BEFORE 10/23/09 CONSISTENT WITH ALL APPLICABLE RULES AND REGULATIONS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO COMMISSION RULE 4.10(g), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/24/09. 9/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 24, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LISA S BLATT on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (rf, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS) Modified on 9/15/2009 (nd, ).
September 14, 2009 Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/11/09. 9/14/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by CEPHALON, INC..Memorandum, proposed Order and Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT TO THE EXTENT THAT AGREEMENTS HAVE BEEN REACHED REGARDING A JOINT PROPOSED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER AND A JOINT PROPOSED COORDINATION ORDER SUCH DOCUMENTS SHALL BE SUBMITTED FOR THE COURTS REVIEW NO LATER 8.31.09 AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/19/09. 8/20/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 8/31/09 ALL COUNSEL SHALL REGISTER WITH THE CLERK OF COURT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC FILINGS VIA EMAIL.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/18/09. 8/19/09 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
August 12, 2009 Filing 40 PLAINTIFF FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICVE against CEPHALON, INC., filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(rf, )
August 3, 2009 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 7/28/09 before Judge GOLDBERG.. (rf, )
July 30, 2009 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Status Conference held on 7/28/09. Court Reporter: S. SONNIE. (rf, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT FOR THE PURPOSES OF CLARITY AND SIMPLICITY, THE FOUR (4) CONSOLIDATED CASES BEFORE THE COURT WILL BE REFERRED TO AS THEY ARE OUTLINED HEREIN. ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/30/09. 7/31/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(rf, )
July 6, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Eric J. Mahr. Certificate of Service. (GELLMAN, NANCY) Modified on 7/7/2009 (lisad, ).
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SCHEDULING (DOC. 5) IS GRANTED, AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/30/09. 7/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 24, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. of Recent Federal Authority - Denial of Certiorari in In re Ciprofloxacin Hydrochloride Antitrust Litig., 544 F.3d 1323 (Fed. Cir. 2008) (GELLMAN, NANCY)
June 19, 2009 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
June 19, 2009 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT by CEPHALON, INC.. (GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT CEPHALON, INC.'S PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS ARE GRANTED (24-27). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/26/09.5/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 21, 2009 Filing fee: $ 160, receipt number PPE001347 (rf, )
May 21, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DAVID E. EDWARDS on behalf of CEPHALON, INC.(EDWARDS, DAVID)
May 21, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL N. ONUFRAK on behalf of CEPHALON, INC.(ONUFRAK, MICHAEL)
May 21, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DAVID J. CREAGAN on behalf of CEPHALON, INC.(CREAGAN, DAVID)
May 20, 2009 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Peter A. Spaeth, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 20, 2009 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michelle D. Miller, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 20, 2009 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Ford, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 20, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of James C. Burling, Esquire filed by CEPHALON, INC..Certificate of Service.(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 19, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. GUERNSEY on behalf of CEPHALON, INC. with Certificate of Service(GUERNSEY, JOHN)
May 19, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY J. GELLMAN on behalf of CEPHALON, INC. with Certificate of Service(GELLMAN, NANCY)
May 19, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK R. EMMERICH, JR on behalf of CEPHALON, INC. with Certificate of Service(EMMERICH, FRANK)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 7/28/2009 AT 9:30 AM IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: ALL COUNSEL IDENTIFIED IN JUDGE SURRICK'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (DOC. NO. 16 IN 2:96-CV-1797) AND THE "STIPULATION RE: MODIFICATION OF PARAGRAPH 15 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1" (DOC. NO. 22 IN 2:06-CV-1797) SHALL ATTEND THE CONFERENCE AS THEY ARE OUTLINED HEREIN, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/5/09. 5/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK TO HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. (SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III) ON 04/28/09; 04/28/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
February 23, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION Response to Defendant's Notice of Special Master's Report (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
February 23, 2009 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CEPHALON, INC..(CREAGAN, DAVID)
February 12, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. Special Master's Report in K-Dur re Scope of Patent Standard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(CREAGAN, DAVID)
January 23, 2009 Filing 15 Response re #14 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority and Certificate of Service by CEPHALON, INC.. (CREAGAN, DAVID)
January 16, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
December 30, 2008 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS) Modified on 12/31/2008 (le, ).
December 19, 2008 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Compel Discovery and Certificate of Service filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (CREAGAN, DAVID)
December 5, 2008 Filing 11 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(MEIER, MARKUS)
November 11, 2008 Filing 10 CEPHALON, INC.'S Reply to the FTC's Filing Regarding The Federal Circuit's Cipro Decision and Certificate of Service (CREAGAN, DAVID) Modified on 11/17/2008 (fh, ).
November 3, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION Reply to Cephalon's Notice of Authority (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(MEIER, MARKUS)
October 24, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE by CEPHALON, INC. New Federal Circuit Authority Affirming Scope of Patent Standard and Opinion and Certificate of Service (CREAGAN, DAVID)
June 25, 2008 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION Motion for a Scheduling Conference AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by CEPHALON, INC.. (EDWARDS, DAVID)
June 20, 2008 Filing 6 REPLY BRIEF in Support of MOTION to Dismiss filed by CEPHALON, INC., Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (EDWARDS, DAVID) Modified on 6/23/2008 (nd).
June 10, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION Motion for a Scheduling Conference filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.Memorandum; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(MEIER, MARKUS)
June 3, 2008 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Amendment to #3 Response Amended Certificate of Service. (MEIER, MARKUS)
June 2, 2008 Filing 3 Response In Opposition to Cephalon's Motion to Dismiss by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Certificate of Service, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2) (MEIER, MARKUS)
May 12, 2008 Filing 2 Discovery Plan by CEPHALON, INC..(CREAGAN, DAVID)
May 8, 2008 Letter to Attorney MARKUS MEIER, ERIC J. MAHR & ANDREW J. EWALT re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (tj, )
May 8, 2008 Filing 1 Original record together with certified copy of docket entries received from District of DC No. 08-244. (tj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. CEPHALON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH G. POLUKA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: ERIC GRANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ASTRAZENECA PLC
Represented By: PETER J. MARTINEZ
Represented By: NICOLE BRIDGET CHANDONNET
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: URL PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: NICHOLAS E.O. GAGLIO
Represented By: MICHELLE H. SEAGULL
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: GAIL L. GOTTEHRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: PHILLIP PROGER
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GLEASON
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: FOREST LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL N. SOHN
Represented By: NICOLE BRIDGET CHANDONNET
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BEN VENUE LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: PAMELA L. TAYLOR
Represented By: MICHAEL SENNETT
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: BRENT P. RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ESAI INC
Represented By: PHILLIP PROGER
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GLEASON
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS,INC.
Represented By: MONA GUPTA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: WILLIAM ANDREW RAKOCZY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: PAMELA L. TAYLOR
Represented By: MICHAEL SENNETT
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: BRENT P. RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Represented By: ROSS E. ELFAND
Represented By: JOSEPH G. POLUKA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: ROBERT A. MILNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: LUPIN LIMITED
Represented By: MONA GUPTA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: WILLIAM ANDREW RAKOCZY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ASTELLAS PHARMA INC.
Represented By: PETER J. MARTINEZ
Represented By: NICOLE BRIDGET CHANDONNET
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: RAYMOND M. WILLIAMS
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: MARK S. POPOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD J. STARK
Represented By: NICOLE BRIDGET CHANDONNET
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: ANDREW J. SOVEN
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: CREIGHTON J. MACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ANCHEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MONA GUPTA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: WILLIAM ANDREW RAKOCZY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: PAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: PAUL L. YDE
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: RICHARD E. COE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: PAMELA L. TAYLOR
Represented By: MICHAEL SENNETT
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: BRENT P. RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ALMIRALL, S.A.
Represented By: JOSEPH G. POLUKA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: JAMES S. TRAINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By: GEORGE G. GORDON
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: CLAUDIA R. HIGGINS
Represented By: ROBERT R. LAURENZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC
Represented By: GEORGE S. CARY
Represented By: MICHAEL LAZERWITZ
Represented By: KATHLEEN W. BRADISH
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC.
Represented By: PETER J. MARTINEZ
Represented By: NICOLE BRIDGET CHANDONNET
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: ANDREW J. SOVEN
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: CREIGHTON J. MACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ACTAVIS GROUP
Represented By: MICHELLE H. SEAGULL
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: GAIL L. GOTTEHRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP
Represented By: PETER J. MARTINEZ
Represented By: NICOLE BRIDGET CHANDONNET
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: KING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: PHILLIP PROGER
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GLEASON
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SUNOVION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: J. MARK GIDLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH G. POLUKA
Represented By: NOAH A. BRUMFIELD
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WOCKHARDT LIMITED
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: ANDREW J. SOVEN
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: CREIGHTON J. MACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: UPSHER SMITH LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SANDOZ INC,
Represented By: ROSS E. ELFAND
Represented By: JOSEPH G. POLUKA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: ROBERT A. MILNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: BAXTER HEALTHCARE CORPORATION
Represented By: PAMELA L. TAYLOR
Represented By: MICHAEL SENNETT
Represented By: JOHN E. IOLE
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: BRENT P. RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SHIRE LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC
Represented By: HELENE D. JAFFE
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: BRIDGET E. MONTGOMERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: NOVARTIS CORP.
Represented By: ROSS E. ELFAND
Represented By: JOSEPH G. POLUKA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. HESTER
Represented By: ROBERT A. MILNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: DOMINIC EDWARD VOTE
Represented By: SUZANNE B MUNCK AF ROSENCHOLD
Represented By: JOHN ROBERT ROBERTSON
Represented By: SARALISA C BRAU
Represented By: TIMOTHY J SLATTERY
Represented By: JON J NATHAN
Represented By: RICHARD A. FEINSTEIN
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEPRIN
Represented By: ABIGAIL SLATER
Represented By: LISA S BLATT
Represented By: DANIEL WALKER
Represented By: J. MAREN SCHMIDT
Represented By: MICHAEL PERRY
Represented By: DANIEL BUTRYMOWICZ
Represented By: MARKUS MEIER
Represented By: BRADLEY S. ALBERT
Represented By: SUSAN L.C. MITCHELL
Represented By: LAUREN K. PEAY
Represented By: WALTER WAYNE BROWN
Represented By: LLEWELLYN DAVIS
Represented By: GARTH HUSTON
Represented By: ALPA D GANDHI
Represented By: EDWARD D. HASSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Represented By: YIN ZHOU
Represented By: MARY J. EDWARDS
Represented By: FRANK R. EMMERICH, JR.
Represented By: PETER J. KOLOVOS
Represented By: DAVID J. CREAGAN
Represented By: NANCY J. GELLMAN
Represented By: GREGORY P. TERAN
Represented By: DAVID E. EDWARDS
Represented By: MICHELLE D. MILLER
Represented By: ANDREW J. EWALT
Represented By: MARK A. FORD
Represented By: ROBERT J. GUNTHER, JR.
Represented By: PETER A. SPAETH
Represented By: ERIC J. MAHR
Represented By: EMILY R. WHELAN
Represented By: JAMES C. BURLING
Represented By: JOHN A. GUERNSEY
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW PIKE
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?