BANEGAS v. HAMPTON et al
Plaintiff: MARIO BANEGAS
Defendant: JOHN HAMPTON, CHARLES GOODMAN, STEPHON GILCHRIST, D. EDWARD MCFADDEN, CHESTER COUNTY PRISON BOARD and COUNTY OF CHESTER
Case Number: 2:2008cv05348
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: LAWRENCE F. STENGEL
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. DEFENDANTS MMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CLAIM V IS GRANTED HEEBY DISMISSING CHESTER COUNTY AS A DEFENDANT FROM THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 9/22/10. 9/22/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jpd)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT PLFF'S FIRST MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC #14) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 5/20/09. ) 5/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/27/09. 4/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO.5) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/23/09. 4/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jpd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANEGAS v. HAMPTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO BANEGAS
Represented By: AARON DIEGO MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HAMPTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES GOODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHON GILCHRIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. EDWARD MCFADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER COUNTY PRISON BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF CHESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?