DOLINGER v. 3M et al
Plaintiff: EMILY D. DOLINGER-MILLER and JOHN DOLINGER
Defendant: VIACOM, INC., D.B. RILEY, INC., MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., 3M, IMO INDUSTRIES, BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., CRANE COMPANY, JOHN CRANE, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, BECHTEL INC. doing business as BECHTEL INC. OF NEVADA also known as C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, BECHTEL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL CORP., AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA, INC., OAKFABCO, INC., ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION, ASTEN-HILL, UNIROYAL, INC., CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, PFIZER, INC., BECHTEL POWER CORP., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHN CRANE PACKING COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION, A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC., OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., BALTIMORE ENNIS, CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC., H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS CO., CARBORUNDUM, KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION, BIRD INCORPORATED, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SEPCO CORPORATION, SCAPA GROUP, INC., UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY, INC., U.C. REALTY CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, ANCO INSULATIONS, INC., KEWANEE BOILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., CBS CORP., KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT, INC., CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., HOBART CORPORATION, MAREMOUNT CORP., MT. VERNON MILLS, INC., AMETEK, INC., ASTEN, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., MORTON THIOKOL, RHONE-POULENC AG COMPANY, INC., DANA CORPORATION, ASARCO, INC., HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO., SOCONY MOBIL OIL COMPANY, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND BY MERGER TO MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY, BECHTEL GROUP, INC., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., CSR, INC. doing business as ENCORE CORPORATION, COASTAL RUBBER GASKET COMPANY, AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEVER-BROOKS DIVISION, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., GARLOCK, INC., TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., IMO DELAVAL, TRANSAMERICA DELAVAL, AND DELAVAL TURBINE, UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY, NORTH BROTHERS, INC., SQUARE D, ERIE CITY IRON WORKS, CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, ARMCO STEEL CORP., GREFCO, INC., SCAPA FABRICS, INC., WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC., POWERS REGULATOR COMPANY, DEMING CO., CHAPMAN VALVE MFG. CO., ALLOYCO VALVE, M-I L.L.C., BORGWARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT, SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACK PUMP CO., THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY, UNIROYAL FIBER & TEXTILE DIVISION OF UNIROYAL, INC., ASTEN GROUP, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION AND BW, CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC., ITT GOULDS PUMP, CIRCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC., CSR AMERICA, CROMPTON PLASTICS, CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, MORTON THIOKOL doing business as MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC., C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC., FLUOR CORPORATION and MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO.
Cross Defendant: AQUA-CHEM, INC., BECHTEL INC. and CSR, INC.
Case Number: 2:2008cv86296
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: P.I. : Asbestos Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS BY THE PLAINTIFFS IN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED ACTION ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. ONLY, EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/14/2011. 4/16/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER THAT ALL PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT BIRD INCORPORATED BE AND ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/18/11. 3/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 10, 2011 Filing 104 AGREED ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/9/11. 3/11/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CRANE COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN IN TEREST TO CYCLOTHERM CORPORATION, CYCLOTHERM BOILER COMPANY, JENKINS VALVES, INC., JENKINS BROS. VALVE COMPANY, POWERS PROCESS CONTROLS, F/K/A POWERS REGULATOR COMPANY, DEMING CO., CHAPMAN VALVE MFG. CO., ALLOYCO VALVE; CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP; CRANE COMPANY/ HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION; CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION; AND CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC. ONLY ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS OF COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/28/2011. 3/2/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal Order by WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC.. (MCVEA, W.) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/28/2011 (md).
February 24, 2011 Filing 101 STIPULATION of Dismissal Order by CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP, CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION, CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION, CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC.. (ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/25/2011 (md).
February 24, 2011 Filing 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Itemization of Undisputed Facts, Memorandum Brief, or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss filed by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.Memorandum Brief.(VAUGHN, THOMAS)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT WESTINGHOUSE IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/20/2011. 1/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 98 NOTICE by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. re #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment of JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER)
December 30, 2010 Filing 97 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION re #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' COMBINED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ITEMIZATION OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND MEMORANDUM BRIEF (VAUGHN, THOMAS)
December 29, 2010 Filing 96 NOTICE by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. re #91 MOTION to Strike of JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' NOTICE REGARDING EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM DISCLOSING EXPERTS/FILING EXPERT REPORTS AND MOTION TO STRIKE ANY LATE FILED EXPERT REPORTS BY PLAINTIFF (STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER)
December 28, 2010 Filing 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AMETEK, INC., CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(JONES, CHRISTI)
December 27, 2010 Filing 94 NOTICE by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. of Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses (WATTS, MICHAEL)
December 27, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION re #91 MOTION to Strike of JOINDER IN CERTAIN DEFENDANTS NOTICE REGARDING EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM DISCLOSING EXPERTS/FILING EXPERT REPORTS AND MOTION TO STRIKE ANY LATE FILED EXPERT REPORTS BY PLAINTIFF (VAUGHN, THOMAS)
December 23, 2010 Filing 92 Witness List by WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC.. Certificate of Service (BOSIO, NATHANIEL)
December 21, 2010 Filing 91 MOTION to Strike filed by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AMETEK, INC., CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(COLE, T.)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS AGAINST AMETEK, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES, INC., SHOULD BE DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, IN THE ABOVE-STYLED AND NUMBERED CAUSES, WITH PLAINTIFFS SPECIFICALLY RESERVING THEIR RIGHTS AGAINST ALL OTHER DEFENDANTS. EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR ITS OWN COSTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/14/10. 12/16/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THAT UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS, LLC IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/10/2010. 12/13/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab)
December 9, 2010 Filing 88 MOTION AND ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT, OAKFABCO, INC. IN THE CASES LISTED IN THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT "A" ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/7/2010. 12/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS ABOVE ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT BECHTEL ONLY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/30/10. 12/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT, ALL AMENDEMENTS THERETO, INCLUDING ALL CLAIMS OR CAUSES OF ACTION WHICH WERE, OR MIGHT HAVE BEEN, ASSERTED BY THE PLAINTIFFS AGAINST ANCO INSULATIONS, INC. SHALL BE AND SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/15/10. 11/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/5/10. 11/9/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 3, 2010 ANY AND ALL CLAIMS BY THE PLAINTIFFS, BE AND THE SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, ASTEN INC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/27/2010. 11/15/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(lboy, )
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS IN THE ABOVE REFERENCES CAUSES OF ACTION FILED BY THE ABOVE-LISTED PLAINTIFFS, BE AND THE SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, ASTENJOHNSON, INC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/27/10. 11/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER, ADJUDGE AND DECREE THAT THE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY BEARING ITS OWN RESPECTIVE COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/20/2010. 10/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmf, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE by EMILY D. DOLINGER-MILLER of Substitution of Counsel (RASPANTI, VITO)
October 14, 2010 Filing 81 Response Answer re #20 Amended Complaint, by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (WATT, WILLIAM)
September 28, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. of Service of Discovery (WATT, WILLIAM)
September 23, 2010 Filing 79 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC..(WATT, WILLIAM)
September 22, 2010 Filing 78 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC..(WATT, WILLIAM)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFF ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT H.B. ZACHRY COMPANY ONLY, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/1/2010. 9/20/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LEE WATT on behalf of FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. with Certificate of Service(WATT, WILLIAM)
August 19, 2010 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. HUBBARD on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HUBBARD, JEFFREY)
August 18, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. HUBBARD on behalf of MAREMOUNT CORP. with Certificate of Service(HUBBARD, JEFFREY)
August 16, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L. STRAIN on behalf of SQUARE D with Certificate of Service(STRAIN, STACEY)
August 16, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE by SEPCO CORPORATION Notice of Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admissions Propounded to Plaintiff with Certificate of Service (DUKES, WALTER)
August 13, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L. STRAIN on behalf of MAREMOUNT CORP. with Certificate of Service(STRAIN, STACEY)
August 12, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY L. STRAIN on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY with Certificate of Service(STRAIN, STACEY)
August 3, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MAREMONT CORPORATION IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE INTITIAL DISCLOSURES UNTIL 7/26/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/29/2010. 8/3/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kk, )
July 30, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE by A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, ARMCO STEEL CORP. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (LANOUX, LOUIS)
July 29, 2010 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint by A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, ARMCO STEEL CORP..(LANOUX, LOUIS)
July 29, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (VAUGHN, THOMAS)
July 26, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE by SQUARE D of Service of Initial Disclosures (HUBBARD, JEFFREY)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS AGAINST U.C. REALTY CORPORATION ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 7/12/2010 SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. 7/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.LBOY
July 26, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS B. LANOUX on behalf of A.K. STEEL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LANOUX, LOUIS)
July 23, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE by AMETEK, INC. Pre-Discovery Initial Disclosures (MASSENBURG, CHRISTOPHER)
July 22, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AMETEK, INC., ASTEN GROUP, ASTEN, INC., ASTEN-HILL, CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, FOSECO, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. of Service of Discovery Propounded to Plaintiff (REED, SIMINE)
July 21, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. of Service of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce to Plaintiff (PERESICH, RONALD)
July 20, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE by OAKFABCO, INC. Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures with Certificate of Service (BUCHANAN, PATRICK)
July 19, 2010 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSE MARIE WADE on behalf of BECHTEL CORPORATION, BECHTEL GROUP, INC., BECHTEL INC., BECHTEL POWER CORP., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC. with Certificate of Service(WADE, ROSE)
July 16, 2010 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSE MARIE WADE on behalf of VIACOM, INC. with Certificate of Service(WADE, ROSE)
July 15, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE by ASTEN GROUP Of Initial Disclosures (BRASFIELD, CRAIG)
July 15, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (COLE, T.)
July 15, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY of RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES WITH CERTIFICATE of SERVICE (GOODSON, LAURA)
July 15, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE by BIRD INCORPORATED of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure (POWERS, MATTHEW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE by OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER)
July 15, 2010 Filing 51 NOTICE by NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (CROFT, MARCY)
July 15, 2010 Filing 50 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information (VAUGHN, THOMAS)
July 15, 2010 Filing 49 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY.(MANGUM, KIMBERLY)
July 15, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE by INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (COLE, T.)
July 15, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE by AMETEK, INC. Service of Initial Disclosure (HABEEB, SAMUEL)
July 15, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE by FOSECO, INC. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (CROFT, MARCY)
July 15, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE by ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. of Service of Initial Disclosures (JONES, CHRISTI)
July 15, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE by TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (MCGUFFEE, LAURIN)
July 15, 2010 Filing 43 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION.(SUMMERLIN, AMANDA)
July 15, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. Initial Disclosures (WATTS, MICHAEL)
July 14, 2010 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint (Third Amended) by BIRD INCORPORATED.(POWERS, MATTHEW)
July 14, 2010 Filing 40 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC..(MCVEA, W.)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE CAPTIONED PLAINTIFFS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINST IMO INDUSTRIES INC. WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/25/2010. 7/14/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
July 14, 2010 Filing 38 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by EMILY D. DOLINGER-MILLER.(COLEMAN, ALICE)
July 12, 2010 Filing 37 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC..(WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES SHALL BE SET FORTH AS OUTLINED HEREIN, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/30/10. 7/6/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
June 10, 2010 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended by OAKFABCO, INC..(BUCHANAN, PATRICK)
June 1, 2010 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Third Amended Complaint by WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC..(DANOS, JOSHUA)
May 30, 2010 Filing 33 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint #20 Amended Complaint, by U.C. REALTY CORPORATION. (WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
May 30, 2010 Filing 32 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint #20 Amended Complaint, by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.. (WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
May 28, 2010 Filing 31 Response re #20 Amended Complaint, Separate Answer and Defenses to Third Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service by SEPCO CORPORATION. (DUKES, WALTER)
May 27, 2010 Filing 30 Response Answer to Third Amended Complaint by IMO INDUSTRIES. (GREEN, CHERI)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CAPTIONED CASES ON 6/15/2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; IT IS FURTHER ORDER THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/14/2010. 5/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kk, )
May 21, 2010 Filing 28 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM with Certificate of Service against 3M, A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION, AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AMETEK, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, ANCO INSULATIONS, INC., AQUA-CHEM, INC., ARMCO STEEL CORP., ASARCO, INC., ASTEN GROUP, ASTEN, INC., ASTEN-HILL, AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA, INC., BALTIMORE ENNIS, BECHTEL CORPORATION, BECHTEL GROUP, INC., BECHTEL INC., BECHTEL POWER CORP., BIRD INCORPORATED, BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION, CARBORUNDUM, CATERPILLAR, INC., CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CIRCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS CO., CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., COASTAL RUBBER GASKET COMPANY, COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., CROMPTON PLASTICS, CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., CSR AMERICA, CSR, INC., CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC., D.B. RILEY, INC., DANA CORPORATION, DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FOSECO, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, GREFCO, INC., H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY, HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO., HOBART CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, ITT GOULDS PUMP, JOHN CRANE, KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT, INC., KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., KEWANEE BOILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., M-I L.L.C., MAREMOUNT CORP., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., MORTON THIOKOL, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., NORTH BROTHERS, INC., OAKFABCO, INC., OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY, OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY, PFIZER, INC., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, SCAPA FABRICS, INC., SCAPA GROUP, INC., SEPCO CORPORATION, SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., SQUARE D, THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY, TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, U.C. REALTY CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNIROYAL FIBER & TEXTILE DIVISION OF UNIROYAL, INC., UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC., UNIROYAL, INC., UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY, VIACOM, INC., WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. by CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC., CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION, CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP, CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION.(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
May 21, 2010 Filing 27 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC..(WATTS, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2010 Filing 26 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY.(MANGUM, KIMBERLY)
May 19, 2010 Filing 25 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC..(WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
May 19, 2010 Filing 24 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC..(WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
May 17, 2010 Filing 23 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION.(VAUGHN, THOMAS)
May 13, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP, CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION, CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION, CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE CLERK FOR THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT ENTER THE APPEARANCE OF BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC AND ITS ATTORNEYS SHARON F. BRIDGES, CLAIRE W. KETNER, KAREN E. HOWELL, AND TAYLOR B. MCNEEL AS COUNSEL FOR CATERPILLAR, INC. IN THE ABOVE-REFERENCED MATTERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/6/10. 5/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (fb)
May 10, 2010 Filing 20 Third Amended Complaint against A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, et al. filed by EMILY D. DOLINGER-MILLER, Individually, as Representative of the ESTATE OF DELLA FAY DOLINGER, Deceased and on behalf of the Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of DELLA RAY DOLINGER, Deceased, Certificate of Service. ($350 filing fee paid)(mbh, )
April 29, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Counsel and Entry of Appearance filed by CATERPILLAR, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Motion for Substitution)(BRIDGES, SHARON)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO COMPLY WITH THE ORDER REQUIRING SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINTS, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/14/10. 4/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WILL BE HELD ON MAY 11TH, 2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S FAILURE TO APPEAR OR TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARING WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT PLAINTIFF'S CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/6/10. 4/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
February 23, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 filed by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., U.C. REALTY CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT, WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS, EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ONE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS COURT. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS DIRECTED TO ASSIGN CIVIL ACTION NUMBERS TO EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS SECTION OF THE INSTANT ORDER MAY RESULT, UPON MOTION BY ANY CONCERNED DEFENDANT OR BY RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED BY THE COURT, IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT SPECIFIC PLAINTIFFS CIVIL ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(B), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jaa, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT ALL CAUSES OF ACTIONS AGAINST MOBILE CORPORATION, PARENT OF MOBIL OIL CORPORATION,INCORRECTLY SUED AS EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, SHALL BE AND SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS, ETC.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/28/09. 11/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED(kk, )
October 26, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES MCVEA on behalf of WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC., CRANE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCVEA, W.)
September 2, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by JOHN DOLINGER.Certificate of Service.(COLEMAN, ALICE)
July 28, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BYRON N. BROWN, IV on behalf of HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO. (BROWN, BYRON)
July 6, 2009 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by JOHN DOLINGER. (COLEMAN, ALICE)
July 6, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL N. WATTS on behalf of CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(WATTS, MICHAEL)
June 18, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BIRD INCORPORATED.Certificate of Service.(CROFT, MARCY)
April 17, 2009 Filing 7 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLFF AS AGAINST DEFTS ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., MT. VERNON MILLS, INC., SCAPA WAYCROSS, INC., ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/17/09. 4/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(sc, )
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/3/09. 3/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (stb, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHERI D. GREEN on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES (GREEN, CHERI)
October 27, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER W. DUKES on behalf of SEPCO CORPORATION, MT. VERNON MILLS, INC. (DUKES, WALTER)
August 7, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (nds)
August 7, 2008 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (nds)
August 7, 2008 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 222 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (nds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOLINGER v. 3M et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B. RILEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES
Represented By: CHERI D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL INC. doing business as BECHTEL INC. OF NEVADA also known as C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORP.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK R. BUCHANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN-HILL
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL POWER CORP.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.K. STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: LOUIS B. LANOUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: STACEY L. STRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSECO, INC.
Represented By: MARCY B. CROFT
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALTIMORE ENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY
Represented By: KIMBERLY P. MANGUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MARCY B. CROFT
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBORUNDUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION
Represented By: PATRICK R. BUCHANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRD INCORPORATED
Represented By: MARCY B. CROFT
Represented By: MATTHEW F. POWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: TAYLOR B. MCNEEL
Represented By: CLAIRE W. KETNER
Represented By: KAREN E. HOWELL
Represented By: SHARON F. BRIDGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KIMBERLY P. MANGUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Represented By: WALTER W. DUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCAPA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.C. REALTY CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Represented By: LAURA DEVAUGHN GOODSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCO INSULATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWANEE BOILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORP.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Represented By: AMANDA D. SUMMERLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM LEE WATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBART CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMOUNT CORP.
Represented By: STACEY L. STRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. VERNON MILLS, INC.
Represented By: WALTER W. DUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMETEK, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER O. MASSENBURG
Represented By: SAMUEL D. HABEEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN, INC.
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Represented By: JENNIFER MARIE STUDEBAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Represented By: RONALD G. PERESICH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL N. WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON THIOKOL
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONE-POULENC AG COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASARCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.
Represented By: BYRON N. BROWN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCONY MOBIL OIL COMPANY, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND BY MERGER TO MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, INC. doing business as ENCORE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COASTAL RUBBER GASKET COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEVER-BROOKS DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: MARY WINTER VAN SLYKE
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: T. HUNT COLE, JR.
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Represented By: LAURIN D MCGUFFEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO DELAVAL, TRANSAMERICA DELAVAL, AND DELAVAL TURBINE
Represented By: CHERI D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D
Represented By: STACEY L. STRAIN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE CITY IRON WORKS
Represented By: CHRISTI G. JONES
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMCO STEEL CORP.
Represented By: LOUIS B. LANOUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREFCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCAPA FABRICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC.
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWERS REGULATOR COMPANY, DEMING CO., CHAPMAN VALVE MFG. CO., ALLOYCO VALVE
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-I L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT, SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACK PUMP CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL FIBER & TEXTILE DIVISION OF UNIROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN GROUP
Represented By: SIMINE BAZYARI REED
Represented By: CRAIG E. BRASFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION AND BW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: DEBRA L. SWANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT GOULDS PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROMPTON PLASTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON THIOKOL doing business as MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY STOKER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC.
Represented By: ROSE MARIE WADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AQUA-CHEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BECHTEL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CSR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY D. DOLINGER-MILLER
Represented By: ALICE WINDHAM COLEMAN
Represented By: VITO J. RASPANTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOLINGER
Represented By: ALICE WINDHAM COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?