FENNEN v. 3M et al
Plaintiff: FRANCIS JOSEPH FENNEN
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, CRANE COMPANY, JOHN CRANE, AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA, INC., EXXON MOBIL CORP., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., VIACOM, INC., BECHTEL CORPORATION, BECHTEL INC. doing business as BECHTEL INC. OF NEVADA also known as C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC., IMO INDUSTRIES, OAKFABCO, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., 3M, D.B. RILEY, INC., BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION, ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, UNIROYAL, INC., PFIZER, INC., PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC., COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHN CRANE PACKING COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION, A.K. STEEL CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC., OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, FOSECO, INC., BALTIMORE ENNIS, CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC., NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION, BIRD INCORPORATED, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS CO., SEPCO CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, UNIROYAL FIBER & TEXTILE DIVISION OF UNIROYAL, INC., KEWANEE BOILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC., CBS CORP., BECHTEL POWER CORP., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., HOBART CORPORATION, MAREMOUNT CORP., MT. VERNON MILLS, INC., AMETEK, INC., ASTEN, INC., DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY, CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC., RHONE-POULENC AG COMPANY, INC., DANA CORPORATION, ASARCO, INC., SOCONY MOBIL OIL COMPANY, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND BY MERGER TO MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY, BECHTEL GROUP, INC., SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC., KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., CSR, INC. doing business as ENCORE CORPORATION, AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEVER-BROOKS DIVISION, ASTEN-HILL, MORTON THIOKOL, GARLOCK, INC., CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC., IMO DELAVAL, TRANSAMERICA DELAVAL, AND DELAVAL TURBINE, NORTH BROTHERS, INC., SQUARE D, ERIE CITY IRON WORKS, CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY, SCAPA FABRICS, INC., WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC., POWERS REGULATOR COMPANY, DEMING CO., CHAPMAN VALVE MFG. CO., ALLOYCO VALVE, GREFCO, INC., INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY, TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY, BORGWARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT, SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACK PUMP CO., M-I L.L.C., HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO., KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT, INC., OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY, ASTEN GROUP, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION AND BW, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, U.C. REALTY CORPORATION, ITT GOULDS PUMP, H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY, CIRCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC., UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY, INC., CROMPTON PLASTICS, FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION, COASTAL RUBBER GASKET COMPANY, ANCO INSULATIONS, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, SCAPA GROUP, INC., CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION, WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC COMPANY, MORTON THIOKOL doing business as MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC., CSR AMERICA, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CARBORUNDUM, UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY, ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION, CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION, C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC., FLUOR CORPORATION, MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO., CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP, CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC. and ARMCO STEEL CORP.
Case Number: 2:2008cv86301
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: P.I. : Asbestos Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE by FRANCIS JOSEPH FENNEN of Substitution of Counsel (RASPANTI, VITO)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDNATS IN THE CASES LISED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(2). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/16/10. 6/29/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL THE VIABLE DEFENDANTS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO FILE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/25/10. 6/16/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, MAILED.(ah)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT ANY AND ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE ABOVE-REFERENCED CAUSES OF ACTION FILED BY THE ABOVE LISTED PLAINTIFFS BE AND THE SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED AS TO FORM AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 5/7/10 SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. 5/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED(tj, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE CAPTIONED CASES ON 6/15/2010 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; IT IS FURTHER ORDER THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE CONFERENCE SHALL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/14/2010. 5/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kk, )
May 14, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP, CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION, CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION, CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC. with Certificate of Service(ZUKOWSKI, MICHAEL)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/6/10. 5/14/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 29, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION to Substitute Counsel and Entry of Appearance filed by CATERPILLAR, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Motion for Substitution)(BRIDGES, SHARON)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO COMPLY WITH THE ORDER REQUIRING SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINTS, IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/14/10. 4/28/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ah)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 5/25/2010, AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106; FAILURE FOR PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TO APPEAR OR TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARING WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THE PLAINTIFF'S CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/14/2010. 4/21/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (kk, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC. IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. TERMINATED., ATTORNEY CHERI D. GREEN TERMINATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/1/2010. 3/5/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED,AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. AND U.C. REALTY CORPORATION ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY BEARING THEIR OWN RESPECTIVE COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/1/2010. 3/4/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
February 26, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 filed by KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., U.C. REALTY CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WHITEHEAD, MICHAEL)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT, WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS, EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ONE SEVERED AND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS COURT. THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IS DIRECTED TO ASSIGN CIVIL ACTION NUMBERS TO EACH INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS SECTION OF THE INSTANT ORDER MAY RESULT, UPON MOTION BY ANY CONCERNED DEFENDANT OR BY RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED BY THE COURT, IN THE DISMISSAL OF THAT SPECIFIC PLAINTIFFS CIVIL ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(B), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jaa, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT ALL CAUSES OF ACTIONS AGAINST MOBILE CORPORATION, PARENT OF MOBIL OIL CORPORATION,INCORRECTLY SUED AS EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, SHALL BE AND SAME ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS, ETC.SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/28/09. 11/9/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED (kk, )
October 26, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES MCVEA on behalf of WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC., CRANE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCVEA, W.)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT EXXON MOBIL OIL CORPORATION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/28/2009. 10/7/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (sg, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, WILL BE HELD ON 11/17/09 AT 10:00AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/2/09. 9/4/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
September 2, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by FRANCIS JOSEPH FENNEN.Certificate of Service.(COLEMAN, ALICE)
August 12, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to the Statute of Limitations filed by AMETEK, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Memorandum in Support, #7 Order Granting Motion)(EATON, ROCKY)
July 28, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by BYRON N. BROWN, IV on behalf of HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO. (BROWN, BYRON)
July 21, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL N. WATTS on behalf of CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(WATTS, MICHAEL)
April 17, 2009 Filing 6 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL THAT THE CLAIMS OF THE PLFF AS AGAINST DEFTS ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP., MT. VERNON MILLS, INC., SCAPA WAYCROSS, INC., ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/17/09. 4/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(sc, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHERI D. GREEN on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES (GREEN, CHERI)
October 27, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER W. DUKES on behalf of SEPCO CORPORATION, MT. VERNON MILLS, INC. (DUKES, WALTER)
August 7, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (nds)
August 7, 2008 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (nds)
August 7, 2008 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 222 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF MISSISSIPPI, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (nds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FENNEN v. 3M et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORP.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL INC. doing business as BECHTEL INC. OF NEVADA also known as C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES
Represented By: CHERI D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKFABCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B. RILEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIGLEY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE PACKING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/LEAR ROME DIVISION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.K. STEEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSECO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALTIMORE ENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE PUMPS & SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRD INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: KAREN E. HOWELL
Represented By: TAYLOR B. MCNEEL
Represented By: CLAIRE W. KETNER
Represented By: SHARON F. BRIDGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Represented By: WALTER W. DUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL FIBER & TEXTILE DIVISION OF UNIROYAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWANEE BOILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL POWER CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBART CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMOUNT CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT. VERNON MILLS, INC.
Represented By: WALTER W. DUKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMETEK, INC.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL N. WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONE-POULENC AG COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASARCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCONY MOBIL OIL COMPANY, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND BY MERGER TO MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, INC. doing business as ENCORE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUA-CHEM, INC. doing business as CLEVER-BROOKS DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN-HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON THIOKOL
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO DELAVAL, TRANSAMERICA DELAVAL, AND DELAVAL TURBINE
Represented By: CHERI D. GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D
Represented By: JEFFREY P. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE CITY IRON WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMPSON HAYWARD CHEMICAL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCAPA FABRICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELER PROTECTIVE APPAREL, INC.
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWERS REGULATOR COMPANY, DEMING CO., CHAPMAN VALVE MFG. CO., ALLOYCO VALVE
Represented By: W. CHARLES MCVEA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREFCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER SUPPLY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT, SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACK PUMP CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-I L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.
Represented By: BYRON N. BROWN, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLOGG, BROWN & ROOT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTEN GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER CORPORATION AND BW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KIMBERLY P. MANGUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.C. REALTY CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT GOULDS PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. ZACHERY COMPANY
Represented By: KIMBERLY P. MANGUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROMPTON PLASTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS E. VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: MARY WINTER VAN SLYKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COASTAL RUBBER GASKET COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCO INSULATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY
Represented By: ROCKY W. EATON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. BAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCAPA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSSFIELD PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON THIOKOL doing business as MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY STOKER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBORUNDUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/HYDRO-AIRE DIVISION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & I GIRDLER COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BECHTEL, INC., ETC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY/CRANE VALVE GROUP
Represented By: MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: DEBRA L. SWANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMCO STEEL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS JOSEPH FENNEN
Represented By: VITO J. RASPANTI
Represented By: ALICE WINDHAM COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?