COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION v. FORTE
Case Number: 2:2009cv00064
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
Presiding Judge: PAUL S. DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER SETTING A CLAIMS BAR DATE, ESTABLISHING CLAIMS RESOLUTION PROCEDURES AND APPROVING DISTRIBUTION METHODOLOGY, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/16/12. 5/16/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO-SE.
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM THAT I WILL DISAPPROVE WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER SETTLING THE RECEIVER'S POTENTIAL CLAIMS AGAINST BERNARD AND NORMA RAEVSKY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/17/2010. 3/17/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(tomg, ) (Main Document 53 replaced on 3/29/2010) (ti, ). (Main Document 53 replaced on 3/29/2010) (ti, ).
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/15/09. 12/15/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION v. FORTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?