ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC. v. SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Plaintiff: ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Case Number: 2:2009cv01638
Filed: April 17, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: ANITA B. BRODY
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER of MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (DOC. #303) that DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DAVID A. KESSLER (CASE NO. 08-3149 ECF NO. 456) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/31/2012. 11/1/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER of MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (DOC. #148) that DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP. D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CAUSATION GROUNDS (NO. 08-3149 (DIRECT), ECF NO. 150; NO. 08-3301 (INDIRECT), ECF NO. 272; NO. 09-1638 (ROXANE), ECF NO. 97) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/14/2011. 7/14/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER of MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (DOC. #144) that DEFENDANT SMITHIKLINE BEECHAM CORP D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON NOERR-PENNINGTON GROUDNS (NO. 08-3149 (DIRECT), ECF NO. 151; NO. 08-3301 (INDIRECT), ECF NO. 190; NO. 09-1638 (FOXANE), ECF NO. 98) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 6/2/2011. 6/2/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER of MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION (DOC. #60) that DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. #29) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/26/2010. 1/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC. v. SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Represented By: ARTHUR MAKADON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?