UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NOBEL LEARNING COMMUNITIES, INC.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: NOBEL LEARNING COMMUNITIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01818
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED MEMORANDUM. (SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/24/2010.) 3/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC #47) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE PLFF MAY AMEND IT COMPLST TO ALLEGE DISCRIMINATION AT THE DAYCARE AND PRESCHOOL LEVELS AND TO ALLEGE DISCRIMINATION EXPERIENC ED BY A.O.R., ETC. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, AS REDACTED AND FILED AS EXHIBIT A WITH THE PLFF'S MOTION, AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS MEMORANDUM, SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN FILED AS OF THE DATE OF THE ORDER. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 3/19/10. ) 3/22/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 3/22/2010 (gn, ).
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC #28) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW BEARING TODAY'S DATE. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 11/2/09. ) 11/3/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NOBEL LEARNING COMMUNITIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: KATHLEEN P. WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBEL LEARNING COMMUNITIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?