BENNETT et al v. ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN A. BENNETT, M.D., DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC and DEVON HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC., MEDSURG SPECIALTY DEVICES, INC., THOMAS N. APPLE, MOUNIR RABBIT and YOSHIHISA SUZUKI
Case Number: 2:2009cv01819
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENA IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/8/2014. 10/9/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDERED THAT ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER DETERMINING OWNERSHIP OF DR. JOHN A. BENNETT'S EIGHT VEHICLES IS GRANTED IN PART. DR. JOHN BENNETT'S REQUEST FOR A FULL EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON THE MOTION IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED THAT, IMMEDIATELY UPON ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL, INC. SHALL BE ENTITLED TO COLLECT THE MONEY OBLIGATED TO IT PURSUANT TO THE BOND ENTERED ON 1/27/2014, BETWEEN DR. JOHN BENNETT AND NANCE DIROCCO AS PRINCIPALS AND INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SURETY IN THE FULL AMOUNT $87,236.00. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/22/2014. 5/28/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED, USM.(sg, ) Modified on 5/28/2014 (afm, ).
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC., et al.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED AS TO COUNT II FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ITOCHU AND MED SURG. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO ALL OTHER REMAINING COUNTS. DEFENDANT/COUNT ER-CLAIMANT MEDSURG SPECIALTY DEVICES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 8/23/2012. 8/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. COUNTS I AND IV OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED. IN ALL OTHER ASPECTS, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/25/2010. 1/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. #6) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 8/17/2009. 8/20/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENNETT et al v. ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN A. BENNETT, M.D.
Represented By: PAUL CROWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVON ROBOTICS, LLC
Represented By: PAUL CROWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVON HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: PAUL CROWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITOCHU INTERNATIONAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDSURG SPECIALTY DEVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS N. APPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNIR RABBIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOSHIHISA SUZUKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?