LIBERI et al v. TAITZ et al

Plaintiff: LISA LIBERI, PHILIP J. BERG, THE LAW OFFICES OF PHILIP J. BERG, EVELYN ADAMS, LISA M. OSTELLA and GO EXCEL GLOBAL
Defendant: ORLY TAITZ, DEFEND OUR FREEDOMS FOUNDATIONS, INC., YOSEF TAITZ, THE SANKEY FIRM, SANKEY INVESTIGATIONS, INC., NEIL SANKEY, JAMES SUNDQUIST, ROCK SALT PUBLISHING, LINDA SUE BELCHER, EDGAR HALE, CAREN HALE, PLAINS RADIO NETWORK, BAR H FARMS, KPRN AM 1610 and DOES 1 THROUGH 200 INCLUSIVE
Case Number: 2:2009cv01898
Filed: May 4, 2009
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS DENIED; AND, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT, TAITZ'S ORAL MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER MADE DURING THIS COURT'S HEARING ON 12/20/2010 IS ALSO DENIED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/23/2010. 12/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(nds)
June 23, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLFF BERG'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE DEFT TAITZ'S 6/14/10 FILING (DOC #122) WILL BE DENIED AS MOOT. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/22/10. ) 6/24/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gn, )
June 4, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION SEEKS TOSEVER AND TRANSFER THIS CASE FROM THE EASTERN DISTRIVT OF PA, THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC #10) IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS CASE SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/3/10. ) 6/4/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 6/4/2010 (gn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBERI et al v. TAITZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA LIBERI
Represented By: PHILIP J. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. BERG
Represented By: PHILIP J. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LAW OFFICES OF PHILIP J. BERG
Represented By: PHILIP J. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN ADAMS
Represented By: PHILIP J. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA M. OSTELLA
Represented By: PHILIP J. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GO EXCEL GLOBAL
Represented By: PHILIP J. BERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORLY TAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFEND OUR FREEDOMS FOUNDATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOSEF TAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SANKEY FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANKEY INVESTIGATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL SANKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES SUNDQUIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCK SALT PUBLISHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA SUE BELCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGAR HALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREN HALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAINS RADIO NETWORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAR H FARMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPRN AM 1610
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 200 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?