BURLINGTON v. NEWS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS BURLINGTON
Defendant: NEWS CORPORATION, FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC. and FOX TELEVISION STATIONS OF PHILADELPHIA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01908
Filed: May 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: R. BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION PRUSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50 AND 59 FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL, AND ALL PAPERS AND EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT THEREOF AND IN OPPOSITION THERETO IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 3/29/16. 3/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED/EMAILED TO COUNSEL AND COPY TO LEGAL.(jaa, )
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 89 ) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 88 ) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 87 ) IS DENIED. PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO.S 33 , 85 ) IS GRANTED. DEFENADNTS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 39 ) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 38 ) IS DENIED. (DOC. NO. 37 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 34 , 35 , 84 ) WILL BE DENIED. PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. NO. 86 ) WILL BE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/27/2015. 5/28/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(sg, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DAN GROSS AND NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA TO INTERVENE (DOC. NO. 83 ), IS DENIED. DAN GROSS AND NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA ARE NEVERTHELESS GRANTED AMICUS CURIAE STATUS. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. NO. 79 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/4/2015. 5/5/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS; MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED 10/24/2014 FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL (DOC. NO. 71 ), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/12/2015. 1/13/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(amas)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR A STAY IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/7/11. ) 1/10/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC #36) IS DENIED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 12/30/10. ) 1/3/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, )
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC NO 26 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 12/23/2010. 12/28/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURLINGTON v. NEWS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS BURLINGTON
Represented By: STEPHEN G. CONSOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX TELEVISION STATIONS OF PHILADELPHIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?