WOLK v. OLSON et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: ARTHUR ALAN WOLK
Defendant: WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT, THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP and OVERLAWYERED.COM
Case Number: 2:2009cv04001
Filed: September 1, 2009
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2010 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION for Relief from the August 2, 2010 Order Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b)(2), (3) and (6) MOTION for Relief from the August 2, 2010 Order Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b)(2), (3) and (6) filed by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(HEIM, DAVID)
December 17, 2010 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Relief from the August 2, 2010 Order Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b)(2), (3) and (6) MOTION for Relief from the August 2, 2010 Order Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b)(2), (3) and (6) filed by THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT, WALTER K. OLSON, OVERLAWYERED.COM, THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP. (ONUFRAK, MICHAEL)
November 30, 2010 42 MOTION for Relief from the August 2, 2010 Order Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 60(b)(2), (3) and (6) filed by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
October 6, 2010 41 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE BOCHETTO on behalf of ARTHUR ALAN WOLK with Certificate of Service(BOCHETTO, GEORGE)
September 23, 2010 40 NOTICE of Appearance by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK on behalf of ARTHUR ALAN WOLK with Certificate of Service(WOLK, ARTHUR)
August 9, 2010 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 38 Notice of Appeal filed by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK. USCA Case Number 10-3352 (rf, )
August 3, 2010 39 Clerk's Notice to USCA re 38 Notice of Appeal. (kp, )
August 3, 2010 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 027316 re 38 Notice of Appeal filed by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK. (kp, )
August 3, 2010 38 NOTICE OF APPEAL by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and (ROSEN, PAUL) Modified on 8/3/2010 (afm, ).
August 2, 2010 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. 7)IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS CAS IS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/2/10. 8/2/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
August 2, 2010 36 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/2/10. 8/2/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
August 2, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER THAT ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER SHALL BE REMOVED FROM CIVIL SUSPENSE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 8/2/10. 8/2/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
July 15, 2010 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Sur-reply in opposition to motion to dismiss filed by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK. (ROSEN, PAUL)
July 9, 2010 33 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISSPURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (rf, )
July 9, 2010 32 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (DOC. 31) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DOCKET THE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE DEFENDANTS MOTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON OR BEFORE 7/15/10.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/8/10. 7/9/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
July 7, 2010 31 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT, WALTER K. OLSON, OVERLAWYERED.COM, THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(ONUFRAK, MICHAEL)
July 7, 2010 30 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 29 Transcript - PDF, 7/7/10 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (rf, )
July 7, 2010 29 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 6/24/10, before Judge MCLAUGHLIN. Court Reporter/Transcriber RAYMOND WOLF. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2010. (rf, )
June 25, 2010 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/10 re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, DAVID M. NIEPORENT Court Reporter: RAY WOLF. (rf, )
June 17, 2010 27 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6), PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Errata) (rf, ) Modified on 6/18/2010 (rf, ). (FILED IN ERROR)
June 17, 2010 26 AMENDED ORDER THAT MOTION HEARING SET FOR 6/24/2010 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13-A AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/17/10. 6/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
June 16, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER THAT MOTION HEARING SET FOR 6/25/2010 09:30 AM AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 6/16/10. 6/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 6/18/2010 (rf, ).
June 1, 2010 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY: Settlement Conference held on 5/28/10. (rf, )
May 25, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/28/2010 03:00 PM AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/25/10. 5/26/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
May 19, 2010 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY: Settlement Conference held on 5/19/10. (rf, )
May 12, 2010 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY: Settlement Conference held on 5/11/10. (rf, )
May 12, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/19/2010 09:30 AM AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/12/10. 5/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
March 15, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER THAT STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/22/2010 04:00 PM AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 3/15/10. 3/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
March 15, 2010 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY: Settlement Conference held on 3/12/10. (rf, )
February 24, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDERED THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/12/10 AT 1:30 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/23/10. 2/24/10 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
February 17, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 2/17/10. 2/18/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
January 7, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER THAT CASE IS PLACED IN CIVIL SUSPENSE AND THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL NOTIFY THE COURT OF THE PROGRESS OF THE SETTLEMENT EFFORTS OR BEFORE 2/8/10.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 1/7/10. 1/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
November 9, 2009 14 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (rf, )
October 6, 2009 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN: Conference held on 10/5/09. (rf, )
September 29, 2009 12 CERTIFICATE of Service re 11 Reply to Response to Motion by SIOBHAN KATHERINE COLE on behalf of all defendants(COLE, SIOBHAN) Modified on 9/30/2009 (lisad, ).
September 29, 2009 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT. (COLE, SIOBHAN)
September 29, 2009 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK. Brief. (DEFALCO, ANDREW) Modified on 9/30/2009 (lisad, ).
September 22, 2009 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b) (6) filed by ARTHUR ALAN WOLK. Brief, Certificate of Service. (ROSEN, PAUL) Modified on 9/23/2009 (lisad, ).
September 21, 2009 8 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY,EXHIBITS (FILED IN HARD COPY), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT..(rf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2009: # 1 cos) (rf, ).
September 18, 2009 7 MOTION for a Protective Roder to Stay Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26(c) filed by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT.Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Errata B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(COLE, SIOBHAN) Modified on 9/21/2009 (lisad, ).
September 10, 2009 6 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6), MEMORANDUM OF LAW, EXHIBITS (FILED IN HARD COPY), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT..(rf, )
September 9, 2009 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT.Motion, Memorandum, Exhibits, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(COLE, SIOBHAN) Modified on 6/17/2010 (rf, ).
September 4, 2009 4 NOTICE of Hearing:RULE 16 STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/5/2009 04:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS, ROOM 13614, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, BEFORE THE HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN.(cps, )
September 3, 2009 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL N. ONUFRAK on behalf of THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT with Certificate of Service(ONUFRAK, MICHAEL)
September 1, 2009 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT. (jeb, )
September 1, 2009 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM.(jeb, )
September 1, 2009 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP, OVERLAWYERED.COM, WALTER K. OLSON, THEODORE H. FRANK, DAVID M. NIEPORENT from Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia County, case number 090501489, Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE008272) (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Prothonotary, # 2 Notice to Plaintiff, # 3 Proof of Filing, # 4 Verification)(jeb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOLK v. OLSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR ALAN WOLK
Represented By: PAUL R. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER K. OLSON
Represented By: SIOBHAN KATHERINE COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEODORE H. FRANK
Represented By: SIOBHAN KATHERINE COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID M. NIEPORENT
Represented By: SIOBHAN KATHERINE COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OVERLAWYERED GROUP
Represented By: SIOBHAN KATHERINE COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OVERLAWYERED.COM
Represented By: SIOBHAN KATHERINE COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?