CONNELL et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA CONNELL and DANIEL CONNELL
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS and A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Respondent: D.O. ALVIN SCHONFELD
Case Number: 2:2009cv60552
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: P.I. : Asbestos Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge:
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2014 Filing 164 Copy of Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all claims in the actions on this order except the severed damages claims be remanded to their respective transferor courts: CA-N 3:10-1960; IL-S 4:94-4219; AL-N 5:11-2189; WA-W 2:11-1300; WI-W 3:05-219. (See Paper # 8942 in 01-md-875). (tjd)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER THAT THE COURT SUGGESTS THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/19/14. 2/20/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 18, 2014 Filing 162 STATUS REPORT by DANIEL CONNELL. (CASCINO, MICHAEL)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDERED THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED OR REMANDED TO THE TRANSFEROR COURT. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/4/2014. 2/6/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT THE OBJECTIONS (DOC. NO. 158) TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE'S ORDER OF 4/3/2013, WHICH GRANTED OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED STATEMENT ON EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS (AND ALL RELEVANT JOINDERS) ARE OVERRULED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/31/2014. 1/31/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER THAT THE OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT (DOC. NO. 115) IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/31/2014. 1/31/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
April 17, 2013 Filing 158 Objections by BARBARA CONNELL re 156 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Case List, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Declaration of Exhibits, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER THAT ALL RELATED JOINDERS ARE GRANTED. THE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 4/16/13. (Attachments: # 1 C.O.S, # 2 CASE LIST) 4/17/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER THAT ALL RELEVANT JOINDERS WHICH WERE FILED IN THE FOURTEEN CASES ON THE ATTACHED LIST ARE GRANTED. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND "PLANTIFFS AMENDED STATEMENT ON EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS" E.G. (01-MD-875 DOC.8803) IS STRUCK.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 4/3/13. 4/4/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
April 1, 2013 Filing 155 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(SEE 08-88411 DOC. NO.135 FOR COMPLETE EXHIBIT PDF) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(dp, )
March 22, 2013 Filing 154 Statement of Plaintiff's Clarification of Position at Hearing/Conference re: Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Statement on Expert Witness Reports (Kenoyer and Garza) by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Case List))(MCCOY, ROBERT)
March 15, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS of Telephonic Hearing (WATSON, BRIAN)
March 6, 2013 Filing 152 STATUS REPORT Regarding the March 11, 2013, Final Pre-Remand Hearing by BARBARA CONNELL. (CASCINO, MICHAEL)
February 27, 2013 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re 148 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Statement on Expert Witness Reports filed by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MCCOY, ROBERT)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED STATEMENT ON EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL RESPOND TO THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS LISTED HEREIN ON OR BEFORE 2/27/13.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 2/20/13. 2/20/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 19, 2013 Filing 149 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Statement on Expert Witness Reports filed by DANIEL CONNELL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
February 11, 2013 Filing 148 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Statement on Expert Witness Reports filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(WATSON, BRIAN)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND CLARIFY ORDER ENTERED 11/16/12, RE STRIKING INTERROGATORY ANSWERS (E.G. 10-67443, DOC.NO.286) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/4/13. 2/5/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 EXPLANATION AND ORDER THAT ANY RELATE JOINDERS ARE GRANTED. THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 2/1/13. 2/1/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
January 31, 2013 Filing 145 Objections by BARBARA CONNELL re 139 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), 138 Memorandum and/or Opinion, FOR FULL EXHIBITS, see Ahnert, 10-cv-67443, Doc. No. 332. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Declaration, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MCCOY, ROBERT)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY AND ANY RELATED JOINDERS ARE GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF'S "SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY" BRIEF ATTACHED TO THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE IS DEEMED FILED AS OF 1/18/13.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/30/13. 1/31/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER ENTERED 12/27/2012 BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(dp, )
January 25, 2013 Filing 142 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' COMBINED RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER ENTERED DECEMBER 27, 2012, RE MOTION TO BAR PERSONS IN CVLO MASTER LISTS. Certificate of Service, Exhibits. (ems)
January 24, 2013 Filing 141 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED STATEMENT ON EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS. Certificate of Service. (SEE PAPER # 8803 IN 01-MD-875 FOR COMPLETE DOCUMENT PDF). (ems)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER ENTERED ON 12/27/2012 BY MAGISTATE JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED ORDER, # 2 EXHIBIT A, # 3 PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING, # 4 EXHIBIT 1, # 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(dp, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER THAT ALL RELATED MOTIONS FOR JOINDER ARE GRANTED. THE MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND CLARIFY OUR 11/16/2012 ORDER IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/17/13. 1/18/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION THAT CVLO HAS FAILED TO PRESENT A PROPER BASIS FOR RECONSIDERING THE ORDER, IT WILL BE DENIED. WE DISPENSE WITH A RECITATION OF THE UNDERLYING CIRCUMSTANCES GIVING RISE TO THIS MOTION AS THEY ARE WELL KNOWN TO COUNSEL AND HAVE BEEN SET OUT IN OUR MEMORANDUM EXPLAINING THE BASIS FOR OUR ORDER AND NEED NOT BE REPEATED HERE. SEE ATTACHED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/17/13. 1/18/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
January 10, 2013 Filing 137 MOTION for Reconsideration re 135 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion),, filed by DANIEL CONNELL.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration of Exhibits, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER THAT A FINAL PRE-REMAND HEARING, INCLUDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OPPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS, WILL BE HELD ON 3/11/2013 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15A, JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSES, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/8/2013. 1/9/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER THAT ALL RELATED MOTIONS FOR JOINDER ARE HEREBY GRANTED, AND THE MOTION TO BAR IS HEREBY GRANTED. ALL WITNESSES DISCLOSED ON THE "SITE WORKER BY JOB SITES" AND "SITE WORKER PAST TESTIMONY" LISTS AND ALL SUPPLEMENTS THERETO ARE BARRED FROM TESTIFYING AT THE TIME OF TRIAL OR FROM OFFERING AFFIDAVITS OR DECLARATIONS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, UNLESS THOSE WITNESSES WERE OTHERWISE PROPERLY DISCLOSED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/27/2012. 12/28/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 27, 2012 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/27/2012. 12/28/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 22, 2012 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 MOTION for Reconsideration re 125 Order,, 126 Memorandum and/or Opinion, 127 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), FOR FULL EXHIBITS, see 10-CV-67443 (Ahnert) Doc. No. 286 filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(WATSON, BRIAN)
December 17, 2012 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss)(STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER)
December 5, 2012 Filing 131 MOTION for Reconsideration re 125 Order,, 126 Memorandum and/or Opinion, 127 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), FOR FULL EXHIBITS, see 10-CV-67443 (Ahnert) Doc. No. 286 filed by BARBARA CONNELL.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Case List), # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(MCCOY, ROBERT)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON CO. WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/28/12. 11/29/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON "CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BAR THOSE WITNESSES INCLUDED IN CASCINO VAUGHAN LAW OFFICES' (CVLO) SITE WORKERS BY JOB SITES FOR IL & WI JOB SITES' AND SITE WORKER PAST TESTIMONY BY JOBSITE FOR IL & WI JOB SITES', WHERE WITNESSES HAVE NOT BEEN OTHERWISE PROPERLY DISCLOSED AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR CASES INCLUDED IN CVLO 3, AND ALL SUPPLEMENTS TO THE SAME" AT 9:30AM ON MONDAY 12/10/12, IN COURTROOM 3H. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/28/12. 11/29/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE ANY MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING OUR 11/16/12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (SEE E.G. 08-90234 DOCS. 94 & 95) BY 12/4/12. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/28/12. 11/28/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT ALL MOTIONS FOR JOINDER ARE GRANTED. CBS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ARE DENIED. THE REMAINING MOTIONS LISTED IN THIS ORDER ARE GRANTED IN PART AS DESCRIBED IN THE ATTACHED MEMORANDUM IN THAT ALL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES WHICH WERE NOT VERIFIED BY THE PLAINTIFFS ARE STRUCK AND ALL OTHER RELIEF REQUESTED IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/16/2012. 11/19/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
November 16, 2012 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/16/2012. 11/19/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER THAT "CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THEIR MOTION TO BAR THOSE WITNESSES INCLUDED IN CASCINO VAUGHAN LAW OFFICES' ("CVLO") 'SITE WORKERS BY JOB SITES FOR I1 & WI JOB SITES' AND 'SITE WORKER PAST TESTIMONY BY JOBSITE FOR I1 & WI JOB SITES,' WHERE WITNESSES HAVE NOT BEEN OTHERWISE PROPERLY DISCLOSED AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR CASES INCLUDED IN CVLO-3, AND ALL SUPPLEMENTS TO THE SAME" IS GRANTED AND THE REPLY ATTACHED TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IS DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/16/2012. 11/19/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 168 ON 08-89845 FOR REPLY). (ems)
November 15, 2012 Filing 124 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THEIR MOTION TO BAR THOSE WITNESSES INCLUDED IN CVLO "SITE WORKERS BY JOB SITES FOR IL & WI JOB SITES" AND "SITE WORKER PAST TESTIMONY BY JOBSITE FOR IL & WI JOB SITES," WHERE WITNESSES HAVE NOT BEEN OTHERWISE PROPERLY DISCLOSED AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR CASES INCLUDED IN CVLO 3, AND ALL SUPPLEMENTS TO THE SAME. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (SEE 08-89845 DOCUMENT NO. 166 FOR COMPLETE DOCUMENT PDF) (dp,)
November 15, 2012 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS for previously served Rule 26(a) Disclosures and Designations of Prior Testimony (WATSON, BRIAN)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW ROBERT MATTHEW SCHROEDER AS COUNSEL LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A," ATTACHED, IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/6/12. 11/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 6, 2012 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 MOTION to Exclude filed by BARBARA CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Certificate of Service)(MCCOY, ROBERT)
October 23, 2012 Filing 120 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BAR THOSE WITNESSES INCLUDED IN CVLO'S "SITE WORKERS BY JOB SITES FOR IL & WI JOB SITES" AND "SITE WORKER PAST TESTIMONY BY JOBSITE FOR IL AND WI JOB SITES," WHERE WITNESSES HAVE NOT BEEN OTHERWISE PROPERLY DISCLOSED AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR CASES INCLUDED IN CVLO 3, AND ALL SUPPLEMENTS TO THE SAME. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE. (APPLIES TO THE CASES LISTED ON EXHIBIT P). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G part 1, # 10 Exhibit Gpart 2, # 11Exhibit H, # 12Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14Exhibit K, # 15Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17Exhibit N, # 18Exhibit O, # 19Exhibit P)(stwe, )
October 19, 2012 Filing 119 RESPONSE to Motion re 115 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert filed by DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER THAT THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE AND REPLY DATES IN THE 4/11/2012 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR THE CVLO-3 CASE GROUP ARE AMENDED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/18/2012. 10/19/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
October 17, 2012 Filing 117 Report Of A.W. Chesterton Company's Expert Reports and Disclosures of Fact and Expert Witnesses with Certificate of Service by A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Gerald R. Kerby, # 2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae of Gerald R. Kerby, # 3 Exhibit C - Disclosure of Prior Testimony of Gerald R. Kerby, # 4 Exhibit D - Expert Report of John W. Spencer, # 5 Exhibit E - Curriculum Vitae of John W. Spencer, # 6 Exhibit F - Disclosure of Prior Testimony of John W. Spencer)(JENKINS, STEPHEN)
October 15, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. CINCILLA on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY with Certificate of Service(CINCILLA, JASON)
October 5, 2012 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss)(STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUBDIVIDE THE CVLO 3 CASE GROUP IS GRANTED IN PART; ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/1/2012. 10/2/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER THAT BEFORE FILING A MOTION TO EXTEND AN EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE, THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE A GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO WORK OUT AN AGREEMENT BETWEEN THEMSELVES; THAT IF A MOTION FOR EXTENSION IS NECESSARY, WITHIN 24 HOURS OF BEING FILED, THE OPPOSING PARTY SHALL EMAIL JOEL LANG AND STATE WHETHER THAT PARTY WILL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION; AND THAT IF THE OPPOSING PARTY OPTS TO FILE A RESPONSE, IT MUST BE FILED WITHIN THREE DAYS AFTER THE MOTION IS FILED; ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 9/28/2012. 9/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
September 27, 2012 Filing 112 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUBDIVIDE THE CVLO 3 CASE GROUP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(stwe, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT OWEN-ILLINOIS, INC'S MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. NO.99) IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 9/25/2012.9/26/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
September 20, 2012 Filing 110 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(WATSON, BRIAN)
September 14, 2012 Filing 109 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SUBDIVIDE THE CVLO 3 CASE GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED ORDER, # 2 EXHIBIT A, # 3 EXHIBIT 1, # 4 EXHIBIT 2, # 5 EXHIBIT 3, # 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(uh, )
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT EXPERT REPORTS FOR CVLO-3 CASES ARE GRANTED AS UNOPPPOSED AND PLAINTIFFS MAY SUBMIT THEIR EXPERT REPORTS IN THESE CASES BY 8/15/12 AND DEFENDANTS MAY FILE THEIR EXPERT REPORTS BY 9/20/12.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 9/10/12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) 9/10/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONIC ORAL ARGUMENT AT 2PM ON 9/14/12 ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO STRIKE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 9/6/12. 9/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS;' EMERGENCY MOTION(s) FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.60(b) IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 9/6/2012.9/7/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(kk, )
September 5, 2012 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re 99 MOTION to Compel filed by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
August 29, 2012 Filing 104 Exhibit List re Doc. No 103 (Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Strike Based on Untimely Discovery Responses) by BARBARA CONNELL.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Certificate of Service)(MCCOY, ROBERT)
August 28, 2012 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re 93 MOTION to Strike ,(for full exhibits see Ahnert 10-CV-67443 Doc. No. 191) filed by BARBARA CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MCCOY, ROBERT)
August 28, 2012 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re 93 MOTION to Strike , Corrected Response filed by BARBARA CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
August 28, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re 93 MOTION to Strike filed by BARBARA CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
August 24, 2012 Filing 100 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELIEF from Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) re 98 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 93 MOTION to Strike filed by DANIEL CONNELL, BARBARA CONNELL, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/27/2012 (md).
August 22, 2012 Filing 99 MOTION to Compel filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(WATSON, BRIAN)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RESPONSES DATES IS GRANTED IN PART. BY 8/27/12, PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE A CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE BRIEF ONLY FOR THESE EIGHT MOTIONS TO STRIKE FILED BY OWENS-ILLINOIS., IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/20/12. 8/21/12 ENTERED AND E-MAILED(kk, )
August 15, 2012 Filing 97 MOTION to Consolidate Response Dates re 93 MOTION to Strike filed by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
August 15, 2012 Filing 96 Statement of Plaintiff's Expert Reports -- Revised August 15, 2012 by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-j, # 2 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
August 13, 2012 Filing 95 Statement Plaintiff's Expert Witness Reports by DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1a, # 2 Exhibit 1b, # 3 Exhibit 1c, # 4 Exhibit 1d, # 5 Exhibit 1e, # 6 Exhibit 1f, # 7 Exhibit 1g, # 8 Exhibit 1h, # 9 Exhibit 1i1, # 10 Exhibit 1i2, # 11 Exhibit 1i3, # 12 Exhibit 2a, # 13 Exhibit 2b, # 14 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
August 8, 2012 Filing 94 PLAINITFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT EXPERT REPORTS FOR CVLO-3 CASES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(dp, )
August 6, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION to Strike filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(WATSON, BRIAN)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER THAT THE 4/11/12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER PERTAINING TO DRS. SCHONFELD, ANDERSON, AND SADEK IS VACATED AND THE CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER OTHERWISE APPLICABLE TO EACH CASE SHALL CONTROL ALL DEADLINES, SUBJECT ONLY TO PARAGRAPH (4) WITHIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/3/12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) 8/3/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL NOT ADOPT PLAINTIFFS' SUGGESTIONS REGARDING AMENDING THE SCHEDULING ORDERS OR THE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL FOUND IN THEIR 7/27/2012 SUBMISSION OR THEIR PREVIOUSLY DENIED MOTION TO MODIFY AND/OR CLARIFY THE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Case List) 8/3/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stwe, )
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER THAT NO MOTIONS STYLED AS MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED IN ANY OF THE CASCINO VAUGHAN LAW OFFICES CASES IN MDL-875. NOTWITHSTANDING THE FOREGOING, ANY PARTY WHO BELIEVES THAT ANY PARTICULAR CASE PRESENTS A LIMINE ISSUE THAT WOULD HAVE A CASE DISPOSITIVE EFFECT, MUST PRESENT SUCH ISSUE TO THE COURT AS A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 7/17/12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) 7/18/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THAT CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE CASCINO VAUGHAN'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO STANDARD INTERROGATORIES IS DENIED. GENERAL ELECTRIC'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED. GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37 ARE GRANTED IN PART. (SEE ATTACHED). INLAND INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED AND THE SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY ANSWERS ARE STRUCK. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC'S MOTIONS TO STRIKE ARE GRANTED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 7/17/12. 7/18/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO MODIFY AND/OR CLARIFY THE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 7/13/12. 7/16/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
July 13, 2012 Filing 87 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE CASCINO VAUGHAN'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO STANDARD INTERROGATORIES. (SEE PAPER NO. 8657 ON 01-MD-875 FOR COMPLETE DOCUMENT PDF)(kp, )
July 11, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE ATTACHED LIST OF MOTIONS. ADDITIONALLY A CONFERENCE REGARDING THE ISSUES OF (1) DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING CONSOLIDATION, (2) DISCOVERY SUPPLEMENTATIONS AND (3) SEPTEMBER DAUBERT HEARING WILL BE HELD. THESE ARGUMENTS/CONFERENCE WILL TAKE PLACE ON FRIDAY 7/13/12 AT 9:30AM IN COURTROOM 3H.(dp, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MAY, IF APPROPRIATE, RESPOND FURTHER DURING OR AFTER THE ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 7/13/12 IN PHILADELPHIA.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 7/10/12. 7/11/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 84 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE "CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO STRIKE CASCINO VAUGHAN'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO STANDARD INTERROGATORIES." (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(dp, )
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT THE APPLICABLE RATE OF INTEREST FOR UNPAID FEES SHALL BE 3.5% AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COURT, COUNSEL MAY BE ENTITLED TO REIMBURSEMENT FOR SUCCESSFUL MOTIONS TO COLLECT EXPERT WITNESS FEES FROM DELINQUENT PARTIES. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 7/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Case List, # 2 Deposition) 7/5/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (stwe, )
July 3, 2012 Filing 82 OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.'S JOINDER IN GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY AND/OR CLARIFY DEPOSITION PROTOCOL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(dp, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 81 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO STRIKE CASCINO VAUGHAN'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO STANDARD INTERROGATORIES. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(SEE DOC NO. 8638 IN 01-MD-875 FOR COMPLETE SET OF EXHIBITS)(dp, )
June 18, 2012 Filing 80 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY AND/OR CLARIFY DEPOSITION PROTOCOL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(dp, )
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER THAT THE JOINDER MOTION FILED BY ERICSSON,INC. IS GRANTED. ALL OTHER NOTICES OR MOTIONS FOR JOINDER PROPERLY FILED BY ANY OTHER PARTIES ARE ACCEPTED AND THE PROPOSED JOINDERS ARE ALSO GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/31/12. 6/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER THAT THE JOINDER MOTION FILED BY PABST BREWING COMPANY IS HEREBY GRANTED, THE MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION IS HEREBY GRANTED TO THE EXTENT OUTLINED HEREIN, THE MOTION TO BAR JACK WETZEL IS HEREBY DENIED, AND CVLO AND MR. WETZEL ARE HEREBY ORDERED TO PRODUCE ALL DOCUMENTATION REGARDING ANY CONSULTING AGREEMENT OR OTHER EVIDENCE OF PAYMENTS TO MR. WETZEL ON OR BEFORE 6/11/2012 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/29/2012. 5/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SCHEDULING ORDERS ENTERED APRIL 12, 2012, LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A," ATTACHED, ARE OVERRULED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/25/2012. 5/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 24, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL re 72 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Plaintiffs' Supplement to its Sur-Reply to Owens-Illinois, Inc.'s Combined Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition and to Bar Jack Wetzel as a Fact Witness (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
May 23, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Hearing: NOTICE of Hearing:TAKE NOTICE that a Telephonic Oral Argument on motions regarding Jack Wetzel is scheduled in the above-captioned matter with Magistrate Judge David R. Strawbridge for Friday, May 25, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. (Eastern Time). The dial-in conference call information for this teleconference is as follows: Dial In Number: 1-888-255-1101 / Participant Code: 3122585784(lds, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 74 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING REQUESTS TO ADMIT AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(dp, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 73 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' COMBINED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SCHEDULING ORDERS ENTERED 4/12/2012 AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D1, # 5 Exhibit D2, # 6 Exhibit D3, # 7 Exhibit D4, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F1, # 10 Exhibit F2, # 11 Exhibit F3, # 12 Exhibit F4, # 13 Exhibit F5, # 14 Exhibit F6, # 15 Exhibit F7, # 16 Exhibit G, # 17 Exhibit H, # 18 Exhibit I)(stwe, )
May 5, 2012 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition and Motion to Bar Jack Wetzel as a Fact Witness filed by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19 (part 1 of 2), # 22 Exhibit 19 (part 2 of 2), # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SCHEDULING ORDERS ENTERED ON 4/12/12 (E.G. 08-88250 DOC.68) AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE (E.G. 08-88250 DOC.71) SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED INTO ONE RESPONSE BRIEF AND SHALL BE DUE BY 5/9/12.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 5/3/12. 5/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
May 2, 2012 Filing 70 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(dp, )
April 27, 2012 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Support re 61 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition and Motion to Bar Jack Wetzel as a Fact Witness filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS. (CASMERE, EDWARD)
April 27, 2012 Filing 68 PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO SCHEDULING ORDERS ENTERED ON 4/12/2012. (SEE PAPER #8551 ON 01-MD-875 FOR PDF AND CASE LIST)(stwe, )
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT THE 4/11/2012 ORDER SETTING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE (E.G., 10-67443, DOC. #94) IS AMENDED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 4/23/2012; 4/24/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(kk, )
April 13, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS Of Subpoena To Third-Party Jack G. Wetzel (WATSON, BRIAN)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' DIRECT EXAMINATION OF MR. JACK WETZEL SHALL CONCLUDE ON WEDNESDAY, 4/18/2012, PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF CONTINUED VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF JACK WETZEL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 4/11/2012; 4/13/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (kk, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT, AS TO THE CASES IDENTIFIED ON THE ATTACHED LIST, THE FOLLOWING DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT DEADLINES SHALL APPLY: PLAINTIFFS MUST SUBMIT TO THE DEFENDANTS AND TO THE COURT A LIST OF VIABLE DEFENDANTS WHO THEY ARE UNLIKELY TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS IN EACH OF THESE CASES BY MAY 1, 2012; ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 4/11/2012. 4/12/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition and Motion to Bar Jack Wetzel as a Fact Witness filed by BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Errata 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Certificate of Service)(CASCINO, MICHAEL)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT THE SCHEDULED DEPOSITION FOR JACK WETZEL MAY GO FORWARD BUT THE TESTIMONY SHALL BE LIMITED TO: (a) CASES IN WHICH PLAINTIFFS HAVE COMPLIED WITH THE DEPOSITION PROTOCOL, INCLUDING HAVING SERVED DEFTS THE REQUIRED VERIFIED DOCUMENTS, AND (b) THE DEFTS WHICH HAVE RECEIVED THOSE VERIFIED DOCUMENTS; AND PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL RESPOND TO THE REMAINING ALLEGATIONS IN THE MOTION BY THURSDAY, 4/5/2012. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/28/2012; 3/29/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(kk, )
March 27, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition and Motion to Bar Jack Wetzel as a Fact Witness filed by INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A - CVLO Cases, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Dep. Jack Wetzel, Mar. 31, 2011, # 4 Exhibit Ex. C - Hrg Tr., # 5 Exhibit Ex. D - Notice of Dep. Jack Wetzel, Mar. 15, 2012, # 6 Exhibit Ex. E - E-Mail, Mar. 20, 2012, # 7 Exhibit Ex. F - First Amended Notice of Dep. Jack Wetzel, Mar. 21, 2012, # 8 Exhibit Ex. G - Second Amended Notice of Dep. Jack Wetzel, 22, 2012, # 9 Exhibit Ex. H - E-Mail, Mar. 22, 2012, # 10 Exhibit Ex. I - Deposition Protocol, # 11 Exhibit Ex. J - Ahnert, 10-cv-67443, Interrogs., # 12 Exhibit Ex. K - Order, Ahnert, 10-cv-67443, ECF No. 83, # 13 Exhibit Ex. L - Dep. Jack Wetzel, Mar. 25, 2010, # 14 Exhibit Ex. M - Dep. Clifford Schultz, June 3, 2011, # 15 Exhibit Ex. N - Dep. David Christensen, June 9, 2011)(WATSON, BRIAN) Modified on 4/13/2012 (kk, ).
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL SELECT, FROM THE 80 CASES CURRENTLY IN CVLO-1&2, 10 CASES TO BE IN "SUB-GROUP A" OF ACCELERATED CASES BY 3/27/12, 10 CASES TO BE IN "SUB-GROUP B" BY 4/2/12, AND 17 CASES TO BE IN "SUB-GROUP C" BY 4/5/12. THE REMAINING CVLO-1&2 CASES WILL BE DISTRIBUTED INTO CASE GROUPS, CVLO-3 THROUGH CVLO-7.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/23/12. 3/23/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT AS AGREED TO BY PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL DURING THE 3/22/12 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE, THEY MUST PROVIDE TO DEFENSE COUNSEL, AS A PART OF THEIR BANKRUPTCY DISCOVERY RESPONSES, ANY RELEVANT BANKRUPTCY TRUST MATERIALS IN THEIR POSSESSION OR CONTROL.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/22/12. 3/23/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/6/12. 3/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, JON S. BAROOSHIAN AS HE IS IN NO LONGER WITH THE LAW FIRM COOLEY MANION JONES LLP. PLEASE ENTER AS COUNSEL FOR THIS DEFENDANT STEPHEN L. JENKINS FOR THE LAW FIRM COOLEY MANION JONES KUROWSKI LLP.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/15/12. 3/15/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT TO CHAMBERS BY 3/15/11, A COLLABORATIVELY DRAFTED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER(S) AND RECOMMENDED CASES LISTS FOR ALL CVLO CASES WHICH WILL, INTER ALIA : SEE ATTACHED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL SCHEDULING DEADLINES OTHER THAN THOSE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS INCLUDING SUMMARY JUDGEMENT MOTIONS AND AO12 MOTIONS TO DISMISS ARE STAYED UNTIL NEW SCHEDULING ORDERS HAVE BEEN ENTERED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/6/12. 3/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 28, 2012 Filing 55 DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR THE FAILURE OF CASCINO VAUGHAN LAW OFFICES, DR. ALVIN SCHONFELD, DR. HENRY ANDERSON, AND DR. IBRAHIM SADEK TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDERS. (kah, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 54 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(uh, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 53 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS REGARDING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS CONCERNING DOCTORS SCHONFELD, ANDERSON AND SADEK. FOR FULL PDF ATTACHMENTS SEE 08-88250 PAPER NUMBER 54. (kah, )
February 16, 2012 Filing 52 NON-PARTY WITNESS ALVIN SCHONFELD, D.O.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Modified on 2/22/2012 (amas, ).
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND DESIGNATED MEMBERS OF THE DEFENSE LIAISON COUNCIL ARE COMPELLED TO APPEAR IN PHILADELPHIA ON 3/5/12 AT 9:30AM FOR A CONFERENCE ON COMPLIANCE WITH OUR AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER PERTAIN TO DRS. SCHONFELD, ANDERSON, AND SADEK OF 2/9/12 (SEE E.G; 08-89293 DOC.NO.96), AND ANY ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH ANY OF OUR PREVIOUS ORDERS REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PERTAINING TO THESE DOCTORS. COUNSEL FOR ANY OTHER CONCERNED PARTIES MAY, BUT ARE NOT REQUIRED TO ATTEND. COUNSEL IN ATTENDANCE ARE EXPECTED TO RESERVE THE ENTIRE DAY FOR THE SESSION IN PHILADELPHIA. IF COUNSEL SO DESIRES, THE COURT WILL MAKE ITSELF AVAILABLE ON THIS DATE TO DISCUSS SETTLEMENT.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 2/14/12. 2/15/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION MUST BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 2/21/12. DEFENDANTS SHALL NOT FILE A REPLY WITHOUT THE PERMISSION OF THE COURT. AND IF DEFENDANTS CHOOSE TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY, SUCH A REQUEST MUST BE MADE ON OR BEFORE 2/23/12.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 2/14/12. 2/15/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 14, 2012 Filing 49 DEFENDANTS' COMBINED MOTION AND BRIEF FOR SANCTIONS FOR THE FAILURE OF CASCINO VAUGHAN LAW OFFICES, DR.ALVIN SCHONFELD, DR. HENRY ANDERSON, AND DR.IBRAHIM SADEK TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDERS. (SEE PAPER NO.8439 ON 01-MD-875 FOR COMPLETE DOCUMENTS PDF)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE STRAWBRIDGE'S 12/30/11 DISCOVERY ORDER ARE OVERRULED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 2/6/12. 2/9/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 47 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DECEMBER 20,2011 ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.636(b)(1)(A) AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 72(a). CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit) (dp, ) Modified on 2/8/2012 (dp, ).
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT FOLLOWING UPON OUR ORDER OF THIS SAME DATE IN THE "TOP TEN" CASES(E.G. 11-63482 DOC. NO. 299), ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MDL COURT WILL NOT CONSIDER MOTIONS IN LIMINE. IT IS THE JUDGMENT OF THIS COURT THAT THOSE MOTIONS WILL BE MORE APPROPRIATELY HANDLED IN THE DISTRICT COURTS TO WHICH THE CASES WILL BE REMANDED. ACCORDINGLY, THE PARTIES ARE HEREBY ORDERED TO REFRAIN FROM FILING ANY SUCH MOTIONS IN THE MDL.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 2/1/12. 2/1/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 45 PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DECEMBER 20,2011 ORDER. (SEE 01-875 DOC NO. 8394 FOR CASE LIST)(dp, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE PRODUCTION OF THOSE SPECIFIC DOCUMENTS THAT WERE THE SUBJECT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER IS SUSPENDED SUBJECT TO FURTHER ORDER OF THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO, FOLLOWING UPON PLAINTIFFS' ANTICIPATED MOTION TO RECONSIDER BEFORE JUDGE ROBRENO, AS MAY BE TO THEM UNDER 28 U.S.C.636(b)(1)(A). ACCORDINGLY, PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (E.G.08-88250 DOC.42) IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/18/12. 1/19/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM TO RECONSIDER ORDER ENTERED 12/20/2011 (E.G. 08-90011 DOC. NO. 26), IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/17/2012. 1/18/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 17, 2012 Filing 42 PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR LEAVE TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C).(ahf)
January 11, 2012 Filing 41 PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM TO RECONSIDER ORDER ENTERED 12-20-2011 (SEE PAPER NO. 41 ON CASE 08-88250 FOR COMPLETE PDF) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(stwe, )
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 1/10/12 TO FILE ANY SUCH MOTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL MATERIALS TO BE PRODUCED PURSUANT TO THE 12/20 ORDER THAT WERE PREVIOUSLY TO BE PRODUCED BY 1/10/12, MUST BE PRODUCED ON OR BEFORE 1/17/12. FOLLOWING UPON A FURTHER REQUEST BY THE PLAINTIFFS FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO PRODUCE THE MATERIALS SUBJECT TO THE ORDER OF 12/9/11, IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED THAT ALL MATERIALS THAT WERE PREVIOUSLY TO BE PRODUCED BY 12/30/11, MUST BE PRODUCED ON OR BEFORE 1/6/12.(SEE 01-875 PAPER NO. 8344 FOR FULL CASE LIST). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/29/11. 12/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 BY OUR ORDER OF DECEMBER 9, 2011 AND AS EXPLAINED IN OUR MEMORANDUM OPINION OF DECEMBER 12, 2011, WE DETERMINED THAT DEFENDANTS WERE ENTITLED TO THE DISCOVERY OF "MATERIALS NECESSARY TO MEASURE 'POSITIVE' AND/OR 'NEGATIVE' RATES," AND OF "MATERIALS REGARDING THE DAILY VOLUME OF SCREENINGS PERFORMED BY EACH DIAGNOSING DOCTOR." WE FURTHER DIRECTED PARTIES "TO WORK TOGETHER TO REACH AN AGREEMENT ON THE LEAST INTRUSIVE, MOST EXPEDITIOUS WAY TO PROVIDE THE DEFENDANTS THE INFORMATION REASONABLY NEEDED TO UNDERTAKE" THESE TESTING EXERCISES, ETC. (SEE 01-MD-875 DOC. NO. 8830 FOR COMPLETE CASE LIST) SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/20/2011. 12/22/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION CONCERNING THE REVISED AND RESTATED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER FOR THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT A ARE HEREBY DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/20/2011.12/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stwe, )
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE DECEMBER 9, 2011 ORDER AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM DATED DECEMBER 13,2011 ARE AMENDED TO APPLY TO THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A" ATTACHED.(SEE O1-875 DOCS. 8306,8317 & 8313). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/13/11. 12/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION THAT THE APPROPRIATE PLACE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO PURSE THE RELIEF THEY SEEK IS WITH THE CANKRUPTCY COURT THAT ISSUED THE ORDER. ACCORDINGLY, WE HAVE DENIED PLAINTIFFS' MOTION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/13/11. 12/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED (dp, )
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DRS. ANDERSON AND SADEK IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ALVIN J. SCHONFELD, D.O. IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING SCREENING DOCUMENTS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AND/OR VERIFY COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 (A)(1)(A)(ii) IS DENIED AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FORMAN PERRY WATKINS KRUTZ & TARDY, LLP TO TURN OVER W.R. GRACE STUDY DOCUMENTS RELATING TO DRS. SCHONFELD ANN ANDERSON IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A) 12/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(uh, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 34 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' COMBINED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY AND SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL FORMAN PERRY WATKINS KRUTZ AND TARDY LLP TO TURN OVER W.R. GRACE STUDY DOCUMENTS RELATING TO DRS. SCHONFELD AND ANDERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(dp, ) Modified on 12/5/2011 (stwe, ).
November 30, 2011 Filing 33 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re (39 in 2:09-cv-60945-ER, 20 in 2:09-cv-60154-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60364-ER, 27 in 2:09-cv-60512-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60519-ER, 18 in 2:09-cv-60329-ER, 31 in 2:09-cv-60286-ER, 29 in 2:09-cv-60487-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60504-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60536-ER, 48 in 2:09-cv-60939-ER, 12 in 2:09-cv-60455-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60444-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60356-ER, 38 in 2:09-cv-60406-ER, 32 in 2:09-cv-60482-ER, 34 in 2:09-cv-60947-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60268-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60952-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60331-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60231-ER, 16 in 2:09-cv-60326-ER, 44 in 2:09-cv-60648-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60456-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60395-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60298-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60445-ER, 20 in 2:09-cv-60466-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60535-ER, 43 in 2:09-cv-60550-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60552-ER, 17 in 2:09-cv-60164-ER, 21 in 2:09-cv-60547-ER, 40 in 2:09-cv-60645-ER, 23 in 2:09-cv-60537-ER, 32 in 2:09-cv-60287-ER, 37 in 2:09-cv-60267-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60186-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60273-ER, 29 in 2:09-cv-60481-ER, 39 in 2:09-cv-60266-ER, 38 in 2:09-cv-60937-ER, 34 in 2:09-cv-60501-ER, 23 in 2:09-cv-60296-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60513-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60285-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60440-ER, 27 in 2:09-cv-60523-ER, 29 in 2:09-cv-60256-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60498-ER) MOTION to Compel filed by CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED ORDER, # 2 EXHIBIT A, # 3 EXHIBIT B-1, # 4 EXHIBIT B-2, # 5 EXHIBIT C-1 PART 1, # 6 EXHIBIT C-1 PART 2, # 7 EXHIBIT C-2, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(uh, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 32 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re (39 in 2:09-cv-60945-ER, 20 in 2:09-cv-60154-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60364-ER, 27 in 2:09-cv-60512-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60519-ER, 18 in 2:09-cv-60329-ER, 31 in 2:09-cv-60286-ER, 29 in 2:09-cv-60487-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60504-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60536-ER, 48 in 2:09-cv-60939-ER, 12 in 2:09-cv-60455-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60444-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60356-ER, 38 in 2:09-cv-60406-ER, 32 in 2:09-cv-60482-ER, 34 in 2:09-cv-60947-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60268-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60952-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60331-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60231-ER, 16 in 2:09-cv-60326-ER, 44 in 2:09-cv-60648-ER, 19 in 2:09-cv-60456-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60395-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60298-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60445-ER, 20 in 2:09-cv-60466-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60535-ER, 43 in 2:09-cv-60550-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60552-ER, 17 in 2:09-cv-60164-ER, 21 in 2:09-cv-60547-ER, 40 in 2:09-cv-60645-ER, 23 in 2:09-cv-60537-ER, 32 in 2:09-cv-60287-ER, 37 in 2:09-cv-60267-ER, 26 in 2:09-cv-60186-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60273-ER, 29 in 2:09-cv-60481-ER, 39 in 2:09-cv-60266-ER, 38 in 2:09-cv-60937-ER, 34 in 2:09-cv-60501-ER, 23 in 2:09-cv-60296-ER, 28 in 2:09-cv-60513-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60285-ER, 22 in 2:09-cv-60440-ER, 27 in 2:09-cv-60523-ER, 29 in 2:09-cv-60256-ER, 33 in 2:09-cv-60498-ER) MOTION to Compel filed by CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED ORDER, # 2 EXHIBIT A, # 3 EXHIBIT B-1, # 4 EXHIBIT B-2, # 5 EXHIBIT C-1 PART 1, # 6 EXHIBIT C-1 PART 2, # 7 EXHIBIT C-2, # 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(uh, )
November 25, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE to MOTION to Compel FORMAN PERRY WATKINS KRUTZ AND TARDY LLP TO TURN OVER W.R. GRACE STUDY DOCUMENTS RELATING TO DRS. SCHONFELD AND ANDERSON filed by CERTAIN DEFENDANTS. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A, # 2 EXHIBIT B, # 3 EXHIBIT C, # 4 EXHIBIT D, # 5 EXHIBIT E)(uh, ) (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A, # 2 EXHIBIT B, # 3 EXHIBIT C, # 4 EXHIBIT D, # 5 EXHIBIT E)(uh, ) Modified on 11/25/2011 (td, ).
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT LONG FORM ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 7 AND RULE 8(C) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (MDL 875 DOC. NO. 8188) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/14/2011. 11/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT A HEARING IS SCHEDULED ON MONDAY 12/5/11 AT 10:30AM IN COURTROOM 3H IN ORDER TO ARGUE THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS RELATED TO DRS. SCHONFELD, ANDERSON, AND SADEK: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DRS. ANDERSON AND SADEK AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL THE SAME. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ALVIN J. SCHONFELD,D.O.. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND/OR VERIFY COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(a)(1)(A)(ii). PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING SCREENING DOCUMENTS. PLAINTIFFS' TO BE FILED MOTION REGARDING THE W.R. GRACE DOCUMENTS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT BY 11/18/11, PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR MOTION REGARDING THE W.R. GRACE DOCUMENTS. BY 11/23/11, DEFENDANTS' SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO THE MOTION.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/18/11. 11/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 21, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM to Compel FOREMAN, PERRY WATKINS, KRUTZ & TARDY, LLP TO TURN OVER W.R. GRACE STUDY DOCUMENTS RELATING TO DRS. SCHONFELD AND ANDERSONfiled by CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A, # 2 EXHIBIT B, # 3 EXHIBIT C, # 4 EXHIBIT D, # 5 EXHIBIT E, # 6 PROPOSED ORDER, # 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(uh, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 27 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL AND/OR VERIFY COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 (a)(1)(A)(ii). (aeg, )
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT AS TO ALL CVLO CASES WHICH HAVE BEEN SET ON A SCHEDULING ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE, ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED RECORDS COLLECTION PROTOCOL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/9/11. 11/12/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT AS TO ALL CVLO CASES WHICH HAVE BEEN SET ON A SCHEDULING ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE, ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED RECORDS COLLECTION PROTOCOL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/9/11. 11/10/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
November 7, 2011 Filing 24 Certain Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and/or Verify Compliance with Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(ii). Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(ahf)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT BY 11/4/11, PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL DISMISS ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE TOP TEN CASE GROUP AGAINST WHOM THEY ARE NOT GOING TO PROCEED. BY 11/18/11, PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL DISMISS ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE CVLO-1&2 CASE GROUP AGAINST WHOM THEY ARE NOT GOING TO PROCEED. BY 12/2/11, PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL DISMISS ALL DEFENDANTS IN THE CVLO-3 CASE GROUP AGAINST WHOM THEY ARE NOT GOING TO PROCEED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/2/11. 11/4/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT NO RECORDS RELATING TO CVLO MDL-875 CASES CURRENTLY BEING HOUSED AT IKON SHALL BE DESTROYED BEFORE 12/2/11. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT COUNSEL SHALL DISCUSS THE MATTER WITH THE IKON REPRESENTATIVES AND UPDATE THE COURT ON THE FATE OF THOSE RECORDS BY 11/10/11.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 11/2/11. 11/4/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
November 2, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE THAT JENNIFER M. STUDEBAKER, EDWARD CASMERE, ROBERT H. RILEY, MATTHEW J. FISCHER, AND JOSHUA D. LEE ENTER THEIR APPEARANCES AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.(dp, )
November 1, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JON BAROOSHIAN on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY with Certificate of Service(BAROOSHIAN, JON)
October 26, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION TO DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL AND/OR VERIFY COMPLIANCE. filed by PLAINTIFF(S). (Attachments: # 1 MEMORANDUM, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(amas)
October 26, 2011 Filing 18 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION CONCERNING THE REVISED AND RESTATED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER FOR THOSE CASES PREVIOUSLY SUBJECT TO SCHEDULING ORDERS FOR THE GROUPS CVLO-1 AND CVLO-2 AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO OBTAIN MEDICAL RECORDS IN CVLO-3. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 proposed order)(kp, )
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO OBTAIN MEDICIAL RECORDS FOR CASES IN CVLO-3 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/25/11. 10/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 16 CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION CONCERNING CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDERS FOR GROUPS CVLO-1 AND 2 AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO OBTAIN MEDICAL RECORDS IN CVLO-3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(dp, )
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT TO THE DEFENDANTS AND TO THE COURT A LIST OF VIABLE DEFENDANTS WHO HAVE STATED THAT THEY ARE UNLIKELY TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS IN THE CASES LISTED IN THE CVLO-1 AND 2 AND CVLO-3 CASE GROUPS NO LATER THAN 10/21/11. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 10/12/11. 10/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
October 12, 2011 Filing 14 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT LONG FORM ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 7 AND RULE 8(C) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by PLAINTIFF. (ems)
October 6, 2011 Filing 13 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO OBTAIN MEDICAL RECORDS FOR CASES IN CVLO-3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(dp, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT, AS TO THE CASES IDENTIFIED IN EXHIBIT "A" THE FOLLOWING DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT DEADLINES SHALL APPLY: SEE ATTACHED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 9/27/11. 9/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING PROCEDURES APPLY FOR THE FILING OF ALL MOTIONS OR PLEADINGS THAT APPLY IDENTICALLY TO, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT IF THE FILING ATTORNEY HAS NOT YET MADE AN APPEARANCE ON A CIVIL ACTION, THE CLERK'S OFFICE WILL NOTE THE ATTORNEY'S APPEARANCE FROM THE DOCUMENT BEING FILED AND A SEPARATE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WILL NOT BE REQUIRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT NOTHING IN THIS ORDER RELIEVES ANY COUNSEL OF THE DUTY TO COMPLY WITH THE MDL 875 PRO HAC VICE PROCEDURES PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 23, WHICH REQUIRES ALL COUNSEL TO BE REGISTERED ON ECF SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/16/2011. 8/16/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jcab)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR PRETRIAL DISCOVERY, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL PREPARATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/9/2011. 6/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (aeg, )
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/24/11. 5/26/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(dp, )
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING ASBESTOS CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/18/11. 4/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE LOWELL A. REED, JR. FOR MEDIATION AND ALL NECESSARY PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. (SEE PAPER #7430 ON 01-MD-875 FOR CASE LIST). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/18/10. 8/24/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ahf)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND/OR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR CASES IN WHICH PLAINTIFFS REPRESENTED BY THE CASCINO VAUGHAN LAW OFFICE IS SET FOR 8/17/10 AT 9:30 AM., ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED (SEE #7369 IN MDL 01-875).(tj, )
December 28, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERIK SWANSON on behalf of BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL. Certificate of Service.(kk, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. CASCINO on behalf of BARBARA CONNELL, DANIEL CONNELL (CASCINO, MICHAEL)
January 7, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (britb, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (britb, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 313 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. WESTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (britb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONNELL et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: SCOTT W. HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS
Represented By: MICHAEL W. DRUMKE
Represented By: BRIAN O'CONNOR WATSON
Represented By: DAVID M. SETTER
Represented By: EDWARD M. CASMERE
Represented By: JENNIFER MARIE STUDEBAKER
Represented By: JOSHUA D. LEE
Represented By: MATTHEW J. FISCHER
Represented By: ROBERT H. RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Represented By: JON BAROOSHIAN
Represented By: SCOTT W. HENRY
Represented By: STEPHEN L. JENKINS
Represented By: JASON A. CINCILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D.O. ALVIN SCHONFELD
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA CONNELL
Represented By: ERIK SWANSON
Represented By: MICHAEL P. CASCINO
Represented By: ROBERT G. MCCOY
Represented By: ROBERT MATTHEW SCHROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL CONNELL
Represented By: ERIK SWANSON
Represented By: MICHAEL P. CASCINO
Represented By: ROBERT G. MCCOY
Represented By: ROBERT MATTHEW SCHROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?