EVANS et al v. LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: CARL EVANS, DONALD SPENCER, VALERIE SPENCER and CINDY CARTER
Defendant: LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. and PHILIP ROSEDALE
Case Number: 2:2010cv01679
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2010 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants Linden Research, Inc. and Philip Rosedale's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) or in the Alternative to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a) filed by CARL EVANS. (ARCHINACO, JASON)
October 13, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. AND PHILIP ROSEDALES MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b)(6) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(SHIEKMAN, LAURENCE)
October 11, 2010 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CARL EVANS. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4-1, # 6 Exhibit 4-2, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(ARCHINACO, JASON)
September 30, 2010 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss / Supplemental Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of John Rountree)(JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
September 23, 2010 Filing 23 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 22 Transcript - PDF, 9/23/2010 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (sg, )
September 23, 2010 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of held on 9/9/2010, before Judge EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Court Reporter/Transcriber JOSEPH MATKOWSKI. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2010. (sg, )
September 23, 2010 Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 30024 RECIEVED FOR PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION FOR ROBERT A. BRACKEN. (sg, )
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SUBMIT TO THE COURT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY FRIDAY 10/1/2010 AND PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY MONDSAY 10/11/2010. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/9/2010. 9/10/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO: Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2010 re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PHILIP ROSEDALE, LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. Court Reporter: JOSEPH MATKOWSKI. (sg, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE AND ROBERT A. BRACKEN IS ADMITTED IN THIS CASE PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/8/2010.9/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
September 8, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert A. Bracken, Esq. filed by CARL EVANS.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(ARCHINACO, JASON)
September 7, 2010 Filing 17 Report Of the Parties Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by CARL EVANS. (ARCHINACO, JASON)
September 2, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants Linden Research, Inc. and Philip Rosedale's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE.Memorandum of Law in Support, Certificate of Service.(SHIEKMAN, LAURENCE)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT A MOTION HEARING SET FOR 9/9/2010 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/27/2010. 8/30/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 27, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/9/2010 10:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 11A, BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO.(to, )
August 16, 2010 Filing fee: $ 80.00, receipt number 028044, for PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF MICHAEL H. PAGE AND JOHANNA CALABRIA. (sg, )
August 6, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by CARL EVANS.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARCHINACO, JASON)
July 30, 2010 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Paintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed by CARL EVANS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(ARCHINACO, JASON)
July 9, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE.Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 A, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 1 B-1, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 1 B-2, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 2)(SHIEKMAN, LAURENCE)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT MICHAEL H. PAGE AND JOHANNA CALABRIA ARE ADMITTED IN THIS CASE AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. AND PHILIP ROSEDALE.ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/8/2010. 7/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 7, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Johanna Calabria, Esq. filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE.Certificate of Service.(JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
July 7, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael H. Page, Esq. filed by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE.Certificate of Service.(JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
July 7, 2010 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LINDEN RESEARCH, INC..(JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
July 7, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW D. JANSSEN on behalf of LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE with Certificate of Service(JANSSEN, MATTHEW)
July 7, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE Z. SHIEKMAN on behalf of LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE with Certificate of Service(SHIEKMAN, LAURENCE)
June 16, 2010 Filing 4 PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE, filed by CARL EVANS, DONALD SPENCER, CINDY CARTER, VALERIE SPENCER. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT 1, # 2 EXHIBIT 3)(EXHIBIT 2 ATTACHED ON HARD COPY, OVER 3.5 mb)(sg, )
June 15, 2010 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CARL EVANS. PHILIP ROSEDALE waiver sent on 5/6/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (ARCHINACO, JASON)
June 15, 2010 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CARL EVANS. LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. waiver sent on 5/6/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (ARCHINACO, JASON)
April 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 021108.), filed by CARL EVANS, DONALD SPENCER, CINDY CARTER, VALERIE SPENCER.(ks, )
April 15, 2010 2 Summonses Issued as to LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., PHILIP ROSEDALE. Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/16/10 (ks, ) Modified on 4/16/2010 (ks, ).
April 15, 2010 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CINDY CARTER, CARL EVANS, DONALD SPENCER, VALERIE SPENCER. (ks, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS et al v. LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL EVANS
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD SPENCER
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE SPENCER
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY CARTER
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN RESEARCH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP ROSEDALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?