EASTERLING et al v. NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. Featured Case

Current and former NFL football players file a class-action lawsuit against the National Football League seeking "medical monitoring, compensation and financial recovery for long-term" chronic injuries, including brain injuries from concussions plaintiffs suffered in the NFL.

Plaintiff: CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, MARY ANN EASTERLING, WAYNE RADLOFF, GARLAND RADLOFF, JAMES MCMAHON, JOSEPH E. THOMAS, NICOLE THOMAS, GERALD FEEHERY, STEVE KINER, CAROL KINER, MICHAEL FURREY and KOREN FURREY
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2011cv05209
Filed: August 17, 2011
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: ANITA B. BRODY
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2012 49 Joseph E. Thomas/Nicole Thomas - AMENDED Short Form Complaint by JOSEPH E. THOMAS, NICOLE THOMAS. (THOMPSON, JULIE)
July 6, 2012 48 Short Form Complaint by GARLAND RADLOFF, WAYNE RADLOFF. (COBEN, LARRY)
July 6, 2012 47 Short Form Complaint by CAROL KINER, STEVE KINER. (COBEN, LARRY)
July 6, 2012 46 Short Form Complaint by CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, MARY ANN EASTERLING. (COBEN, LARRY)
July 6, 2012 45 Short Form Complaint - Michael/Koren Furrey by KOREN FURREY, MICHAEL FURREY. (THOMPSON, JULIE)
July 6, 2012 44 Short Form Complaint (static copy) - James McMahon by JAMES MCMAHON. (THOMPSON, JULIE)
July 6, 2012 43 Short Form Complaint - Joseph/Nicole Thomas by JOSEPH E. THOMAS, NICOLE THOMAS. (THOMPSON, JULIE)
July 6, 2012 42 Short Form Complaint - Gerald/Margaret Feehery by GERALD FEEHERY. (THOMPSON, JULIE)
July 5, 2012 41 Short Form Complaint - James McMahon by JAMES MCMAHON.**(FILED IN ERROR, ATTY RESUBMITTED SEE PAPER # 44)** (THOMPSON, JULIE) Modified on 7/6/2012 (tjd).
June 7, 2012 40 PLAINTIFFS' MASTER ADMINISTRATIVE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR MEDICAL MONITORING. JURY DEMAND. (tjd)
May 1, 2012 39 Featured Case ORDER that THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6)(ECF NO. 19) AND THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE'S MOTION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (ECF NO. 21 ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/30/2012.5/1/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
March 30, 2012 38 NOTICE by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (KLINGES, DANA)
February 1, 2012 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY: Telephone Conference held on 1/30/2012 Court Reporter: JAMES F.G. SCHEIDT. (sg, )
January 31, 2012 36 Copy of Transfer Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the ED-PA and assigned to the Honorable Anita B. Brody for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in that district. (See Paper # 1 in 12-md-2323). (tjd)
January 27, 2012 35 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IS GRANTED A THIRTY (30) DAY EXTENSION, UNTIL 3/2/12, IN WHICH TO FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO THE NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) FILED IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/26/12. 1/27/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ldb, )
January 26, 2012 34 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Related Actions, Exhibits in Hard Copy) Filed Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Regarding MDL 2323. (tjd)
January 23, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER that A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD ON 1/30/2012 AT 09:45 AM.. CHAMBERS WILL INITIATE THE CALL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 1/23/2012. 1/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
January 6, 2012 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 Memorandum in Support of Request to (Conduct Pretrial Discovery)Memorandum in Support of Request to (Conduct Pretrial Discovery) filed by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Plaintiffs' Amended Deposition Notice), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Maxwell v. Nat'l Football League (C.D. Cal. No. 11-CV-08394), Dec. 8, 2011 Order))(KARP, BRAD)
December 30, 2011 31 Copy Re: Documents (Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions) Filed Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(FILED IN HARD COPY DUE TO SIZE)(kk, )
December 20, 2011 30 Memorandum in Support of Request to (Conduct Pretrial Discovery) filed by CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, MARY ANN EASTERLING, GERALD FEEHERY, KOREN FURREY, MICHAEL FURREY, CAROL KINER, STEVE KINER, JAMES MCMAHON, GARLAND RADLOFF, WAYNE RADLOFF, JOSEPH E. THOMAS, NICOLE THOMAS, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A)(COBEN, LARRY) Modified on 12/21/2011 (nd).
December 16, 2011 29 LETTER STATUS REPORT RE Discovery by CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, MARY ANN EASTERLING, GERALD FEEHERY, KOREN FURREY, MICHAEL FURREY, CAROL KINER, STEVE KINER, JAMES MCMAHON, GARLAND RADLOFF, WAYNE RADLOFF, JOSEPH E. THOMAS, NICOLE THOMAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Cert of Service)(COBEN, LARRY) Modified on 12/19/2011 (nd, ).
December 7, 2011 28 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/21/2011 before Judge HONORABLE ANITA BRODY. Court Reporter: JAMES F.G. SCHEIDT.. (sg, )
November 23, 2011 27 Copy Re: Documents (Motion for Transfer) Filed Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (tjd)
November 23, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). RESPONSES DUE BY 2/1/2012. (afm, )
November 22, 2011 26 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER - DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/2/2012; DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 7/16/2012; PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS DUE JUNE 4, 2012; DEFENDANT'S REPORTS DUE JUNE 18, 2012; DEPOSITIONS OF ALL EXPERTS TO BE COMPLETED BY JULY 2, 2012 AND PLAINTIFF'S MUST RESPOND TO NFL'S MOTION TO DISMISS BY FEBRUARY 1, 2012.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/21/2011. 11/22/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
November 21, 2011 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY: Rule 16 Conference held on 11/21/2011 Court Reporter: James F. G. Scheidt. (ems)
November 19, 2011 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by CHARLES RAY EASTERLING. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Law, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(COBEN, LARRY)
November 18, 2011 23 Discovery Plan by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC..(KLINGES, DANA)
November 18, 2011 22 Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(COBEN, LARRY)
November 17, 2011 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(KARP, BRAD)
November 9, 2011 20 DECLARATION OF DENNIS L. CURRAN by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.. (DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS FILED IN HARD COPY) (ems)
November 9, 2011 19 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Dennis L. Curran)(KARP, BRAD)
November 2, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER that PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES LETTER DATED NOVEMBER 2, 2011, THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 8, 2011 AT 10:00 A.M. IS CANCELED AND RESCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, NOVEMBER 21, 2011 AT 10:00 A.M.. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S.COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA. BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/2/2011. 11/2/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
October 21, 2011 17 Featured Case ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF BETH A. WILKINSON, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. ATTORNEY BETH A. WILKINSON for NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. ADDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/19/2011. 10/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
October 21, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF LYNN B. BAYARD, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. LYNN B. BAYARD, ESQUIRE for NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. ADDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/19/2011. 10/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
October 21, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER that THE APPLICAION OF BRUCE BIRENBOIM, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE INT HIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. BRUCE BIRENBOIM for NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. ADDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/19/2011. 10/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
October 21, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF THEODORE V. WELLS, JR., ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. ATTORNEY THEODORE V. WELLS for NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. ADDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/19/2011. 10/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
October 21, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF BRAD S. KAPR, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. ATTORNEY BRAD S. KARP for NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. ADDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/19/2011. 10/19/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
October 19, 2011 12 NOTICE of Appearance by SOL H. WEISS on behalf of CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, MARY ANN EASTERLING, GERALD FEEHERY, KOREN FURREY, MICHAEL FURREY, CAROL KINER, STEVE KINER, JAMES MCMAHON, GARLAND RADLOFF, WAYNE RADLOFF, JOSEPH E. THOMAS, NICOLE THOMAS (WEISS, SOL)
October 17, 2011 11 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR BETH A. WILKINSON by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 51485. (sg, )
October 17, 2011 10 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 51485. (sg, )
October 17, 2011 9 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR BRAD S. KARP by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 51485. (sg, )
October 17, 2011 8 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR BRUCE BIRENBOIM by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 51485. (sg, )
October 17, 2011 7 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR LYNN B. BAYARD by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.. $40.00 FEE PAID, RECEIPT No.: 51485. (sg, )
October 17, 2011 6 NOTICE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/8/2011 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY. COPIES E-MAILED(ldb, )
October 17, 2011 5 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT BE EXTENDED TO AND INCLDUING NOVEMBER 9, 2011. THIS IS THE FIRST EXTENSION OF DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/17/11. 10/17/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (ldb, )
October 6, 2011 4 CLASS ACTION FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC., filed by JOSEPH E. THOMAS, MICHAEL FURREY, MARY ANN EASTERLING, GARLAND RADLOFF, JAMES MCMAHON, STEVE KINER, GERALD FEEHERY, CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, NICOLE THOMAS, KOREN FURREY, CAROL KINER, WAYNE RADLOFF.(sg, )
September 13, 2011 3 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER that DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BE EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING OCTOBER 28, 2011. THIS IS THE FIRST EXTENSION OF DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/12/2011. 9/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF AND U.S. MAIL.(mo, )
September 9, 2011 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC..(KLINGES, DANA)
August 17, 2011 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, MARY ANN EASTERLING, GERALD FEEHERY, KOREN FURREY, MICHAEL FURREY, CAROL KINER, STEVE KINER, JAMES MCMAHON, GARLAND RADLOFF, WAYNE RADLOFF, JOSEPH E. THOMAS, NICOLE THOMAS. (rt)
August 17, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 048286.), filed by JOSEPH E. THOMAS, MICHAEL FURREY, MARY ANN EASTERLING, GARLAND RADLOFF, JAMES MCMAHON, STEVE KINER, GERALD FEEHERY, CHARLES RAY EASTERLING, NICOLE THOMAS, KOREN FURREY, CAROL KINER, WAYNE RADLOFF.(rt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EASTERLING et al v. NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES RAY EASTERLING
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ANN EASTERLING
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE RADLOFF
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARLAND RADLOFF
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCMAHON
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH E. THOMAS
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE THOMAS
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD FEEHERY
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE KINER
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL KINER
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FURREY
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOREN FURREY
Represented By: LARRY E. COBEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, INC.
Represented By: DANA B. KLINGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?