LANGLAIS et al v. PENNMONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC. et al
Petitioner: MELISSA LANGLAIS, REBECCA EDMUNDSON, ROB PERITZ, RACHEL MARTONE, JAIME FARREL, KATRINA KNIEST and GEORGE MCLAIN
Respondent: PENNMONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC., JOHN J. KORESKO, V, THE KORESKO LAW FIRM, P.C., REGIONAL EMPLOYERS ASSURANCE LEAGUES VOLUNTARY EMPLOYEE BENEFICIARY ASSOCIATION TRUST, SINGLE EMPLOYER WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN TRUST and PENN PUBLIC TRUST
Case Number: 2:2011cv05275
Filed: August 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER THAT THE LANGLAIS PETITIONERS' MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY & FOR PARTIAL RELEASE OF THE SUPERSEDEAS BOND FUNDS ARE GRANED. THE BANKRUPTCY STAY IS LIFTED & ANNULLED WITH RESPECT TO THE PROCEEDING IN LANGLAIS. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE $3,800,000.00 OF THE SUPERSEDEAS FUNDS ON OR AFTER 4/18/2014. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE THE FUNDS BY CHECK MADE PAYABLE TO THE FELDMAN MORGADO, P.A. CLIENT TRUST ACCOUNT, ETC. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED THAT LANGLAIS PETITIONERS' COUNSEL MAY FILE A RENEWED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 4/3/14. 4/3/14 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING IS GRANTED & MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELEASE OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND FUNDS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PETITIONERS MAY REFILE THEIR MOTION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS AT THE CONCLUSION OR DISMISSAL OF THE RELATED PROCEEDINGS IN THE BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE E.D. OF PA, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 12/18/13. 12/19/13 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT PETITIONERS' MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD IS GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART, ETC. JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN THE MCLAIN FAMILY'S FAVOR, & AGAINST RESPONDENT PENNMONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC. WITH RESPECT TO THE CORPUS O F THE TRUST, IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,800,000 PURSUANT TO THE ARBITRATION AWARD. THE MCLAIN FAMILY MAY FILE A MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO THE ARBITRATION AWARD ON OR BEFORE 8/10/2012, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARY A. MCLAUGHLIN ON 7/10/12. 7/11/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANGLAIS et al v. PENNMONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MELISSA LANGLAIS
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REBECCA EDMUNDSON
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROB PERITZ
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RACHEL MARTONE
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAIME FARREL
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KATRINA KNIEST
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEORGE MCLAIN
Represented By: IRA B. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENNMONT BENEFIT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE KORESKO LAW FIRM, P.C.
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: REGIONAL EMPLOYERS ASSURANCE LEAGUES VOLUNTARY EMPLOYEE BENEFICIARY ASSOCIATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SINGLE EMPLOYER WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN TRUST
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENN PUBLIC TRUST
Represented By: JOHN J. KORESKO, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?