DHILLON VS ENDO PHARMACETICALS
Plaintiff: GURSHEEL S. DHILLON
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS
Intervenor_plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2011cv07767
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F. KELLY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT THE STAY ENACTED BY ORDER OF THIS COURT ON 3/27/15 IS LIFTED.RYAN'S MOTION FOR A RELATOR'S SHARE AWARD IS GRANTED FOR WHICH SHE SHALL RECEIVE A RELATOR'S SHARE AWARD OF 24 PERCENT. THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE CIVIL ACTION NOS.05-3450,10-2039 AND 11-7767 FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 7/15/15. 7/15/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, )
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT GURSHEEL DHILLON'S PRO SE EXPEDITED MOTION FOR COURT ALLOW IN-CAMERA REVIEW OF COURT RECORD IS GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS OF 1/13/12 WHICH PERMITTED THE LIMITED DISCLOSURE OF THE COMPLAINTS TO DEFENDANT ENDO IS UNSELAED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/22/14. 10/22/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT RELATOR GURSHEEL S. DHILLION PRO MOTION TO SET ASIDE COURTS DECISION AND FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPEALATE BOND BY THREE JUDGE PANEL IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 10/1/14. 10/1/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT RELATOR GURSHEEL S. DHILLON PRO SE MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE COURTS DECISION AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL ORAL ARGUEMENT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 8/25/14. 8/26/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF PEGGY RYAN'S MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF RYAN IS THE SOLE RELATOR ELGIBLE TO RECEIVE A PORTION OF THE SETTLEMENT AWARD UNDER 31 U.S.C. SECTION 3730(d)(1). SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 6/23/2014. 6/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ems)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DHILLON VS ENDO PHARMACETICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GURSHEEL S. DHILLON
Represented By: DANIEL L. CEVALLOS
Represented By: ANDREW PETERS DAVIS
Represented By: ELLEN BOWDEN MCINTYRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MICHAEL GRANSTON
Represented By: MARGARET L. HUTCHINSON
Represented By: BRIAN JAMES MCCABE
Represented By: GERALD B. SULLIVAN
Represented By: JAMIE ANN YAVELBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?