HIPPLE v. SCIX, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TERESA HIPPLE
Defendant: SCIX, LLC, STEEL SEAL LLC, STEEL SEAL PRO, LLC, BRIAN HIPPLE and CLEMENT HIPPLE
Case Number: 2:2012cv01256
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: JAN E. DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DECLARE THE REGISTRATION OF THE "STEEL SEAL" TRADEMARK BY HIPPLE TO HAVE BEEN FRAUDULENTLY OBTAINED IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE STEEL SEAL TRADEMARK OBTAINED BY DEFENDANT CLEMENT HIPPLE FOR BBB MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC WAS FRAUDULENTLY OBTAINED. THE COURT APPOINTED RECEIVER FOR SCIX, LLC MAY PETITION THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE TO HAVE THE TRADEMARK REGISTRATION CANCELLED PURSUANT TO 15 USC 1064(3). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 12/18/17. 12/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST CLEMENT HIPPLE FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT FOR HIS ONGOING, KNOWING AND INTENTIONAL VIOLATIONS OF THE COURT'S ORDERS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 7/19/16. 7/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR POST TRIAL INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ARE GRANTED TO THE EXTENT STATED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 4/13/16. 4/13/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF TERESA HIPPLE AND AGAINST DEFENDANT CLEMENT HIPPLE, IN THE AMOUNT OF $427,507.09, AS OF 2/10/16, AND INTEREST SHALL ACCRUE ON THE JUDGMENT AT THE RATE OF $50.11 PER DAY FROM 2/10/16 UNTIL PAID IN FULL. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 3/1/16. 3/2/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED(mbh, )
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER THAT JUDGEMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT CLEMENT HIPPLE IN THE AMOUNT OF $304,851.12 PLUS PREJUDGMENT INTEREST IN ACCORDANCE WITH PENNSYLVANIA LAW. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 1/27/16. 1/27/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE TO THE COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/13/14. 8/15/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIPPLE v. SCIX, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA HIPPLE
Represented By: GERALD S. BERKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCIX, LLC
Represented By: DAVID L. MARSHALL
Represented By: ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEEL SEAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEEL SEAL PRO, LLC
Represented By: DAVID L. MARSHALL
Represented By: ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN HIPPLE
Represented By: DAVID L. MARSHALL
Represented By: ROBERT R. WATSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEMENT HIPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?