STEWART v. KINCH et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT STEWART
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER LADZINSKI, R.N., PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC., CHERYL BOYD, L.P.N, CORNADENEEN BLAKELY, M.A., ROBERT KINCH, ARMBRUSTER, EAST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WESTTOWN TOWNSHIP, UNKNOWN POLICE OFFICERS, EMMONS, WHITESIDE, KELLY, YANIK, GRISWOLD, MOELLER, UNKNOWN CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, CHESTER COUNTY PRISON and THE COUNTY OF CHESTER PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2012cv01509
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: GENE E.K. PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED THAT PRIMECARE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION IS DENIED. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL AS FOLLOWS: JURY SELECTION SET FOR 11/14/2014 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 11/14/2014 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/9/2014. 9/10/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDERED THAT PLAITNIFF'S PETITION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 42 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 7 DAYS OF TEH DATE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO PLAINTIFFS SE COND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE DATE THAT COMPLAINT IS FILED. PRIMECARE DEFENADNTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 58 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CHESTER COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 38 IS DENIED WIHTOUT PREJUDICE. PLAITNIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY 47 IS DENIED AS MOOT. ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/27/2014. 3/28/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DCKET NO. 7) IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 8) IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. PROMACARE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKE T NO. 11) IS GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF PLAINTIFF CHOOSES TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, HE SHALL DO SO BY JANUARY 11, 2013. THE DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT EITHER BY JANUARY 25, 2013 OR WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS OF HIS FILING AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, WHICHEVER IS EARLIER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/20/12. 12/21/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEWART v. KINCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER LADZINSKI, R.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL BOYD, L.P.N
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORNADENEEN BLAKELY, M.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT KINCH
Represented By: SUSAN L. DIGIACOMO
Represented By: ANDREW J. BELLWOAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMBRUSTER
Represented By: SUSAN L. DIGIACOMO
Represented By: ANDREW J. BELLWOAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP
Represented By: SUSAN L. DIGIACOMO
Represented By: ANDREW J. BELLWOAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTTOWN TOWNSHIP
Represented By: SUSAN L. DIGIACOMO
Represented By: ANDREW J. BELLWOAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN POLICE OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMMONS
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITESIDE
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANIK
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRISWOLD
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOELLER
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER COUNTY PRISON
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COUNTY OF CHESTER PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: GUY A. DONATELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STEWART
Represented By: HARRY J. OXMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?