NWEGBO v. COLWYN BOROUGH et al
Plaintiff: SUNDAY NWEGBO
Defendant: TONETTE PRAY, COLWYN BOROUGH, WENDELL REED, CLINTON CRADOCK and MACDONALD FORD
Case Number: 2:2012cv05063
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: STEWART DALZELL
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTION (DOC. #29) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 7/10/2013. 7/11/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION IN LIMINE (DOC. #27) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 7/10/2013. 7/10/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT DEFT CRADDOCK'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMEN (DOC. #21) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFTS REED AND PRAY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #23) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENID IN PART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 7/3/2013. 7/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NWEGBO v. COLWYN BOROUGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONETTE PRAY
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLWYN BOROUGH
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDELL REED
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON CRADOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACDONALD FORD
Represented By: ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNDAY NWEGBO
Represented By: BRIAN J. ZEIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?