SPEAR et al v. FENKELL et al

Plaintiff: BARBIE SPEAR and ALLIANCE HOLDINGS, INC.
Defendant: DAVID B. FENKELL, STONEHENGE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS, INC., DBF CONSULTING, LLC, STUDENT LOAN MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH SERVICES, LLC, STUDENT LOAN ADVISORY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, JOHN P. WITTEN, BARRY GOWDY, RONALD D. BROOKS, PAUL SEFCOVIC, LIANNE SEFCOVIC and KAREN FENKELL
Case Number: 2:2013cv02391
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F. KELLY
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 591 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT THE PARTIES HAVE FILED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SEE DOC. 496 498 500 505 AND FOR THE REASONS DESCRIBED AT LENGTH IN THE MEMORANDUM FILED WITH THIS ORDER, IT IS ORDERED THE PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DENIED, EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN PARAGRAPHS TWO THROUGH FOUR, BELOW AND AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 9/30/16. 9/30/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(gs)
September 21, 2015 482 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND RECONSIDERATION (DOC. 443) IS DENIED. PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY (DOC. 462) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 9/21/15. 9/21/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
August 20, 2015 471 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT FENKELL PARTIES' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 267) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 8/19/15. 8/21/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
June 19, 2015 435 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER RELIEF IS DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 6/19/15. 6/19/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 12, 2015 433 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 231 ) IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 6/12/2015. 6/12/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 13, 2015 345 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 322) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 4/13/15. 4/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 4, 2015 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THE FENKELL PARTIES MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 113-1) SLMRS'S CROSSCLAIMS (DOC. 87) INSOFAR AS THOSE CLAIMS RELA TE TO COUNTS FOUR AND FIVE OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 68) IS GRANTED. THE FENKELL PARTIES MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 113-1) SLMRS'S CROSSCLAIMS (DOC. 87) INSOFAR AS THOSE CLAIMS RELATE TO COUNTS ELEVEN AND THIRTEEN OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC . 68) IS DENIED. THE FENKELL PARTIES MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 113-1) SLMRS'S CROSSCLAIMS (DOC. 87) INSOFAR AS THEY RELATE TO INDEMNIFICATION, IS DENIED. THE FENKELL PARTIES MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 113-1) SLMRS'S CROSSCLAIMS (DOC. 87) INSOFAR AS THEY RELATE TO CIVIL CONSPIRACY CLAIMS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/29/15. 2/4/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 5, 2014 274 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DAVID AND KAREN FENKELL'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS (DOC. 176) IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 12/5/14. 12/5/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 25, 2014 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DAVID B. FENKELL'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY (DOC. NO. 178) IS DENIED. OTHER INSTRUCTIONS ARE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 11/24/2014. 11/25/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jmg, )
July 23, 2014 220 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION SEEKING 20 HOURS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (DOC. 197) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 7/23/14. 7/23/14 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPEAR et al v. FENKELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBIE SPEAR
Represented By: LARS C. GOLUMBIC
Represented By: DAVID N. LEVINE
Represented By: NANCY F. MCTYRE
Represented By: EDWARD JOSEPH MEEHAN
Represented By: JULIA E. ZUCKERMAN
Represented By: SARAH A. ZUMWALT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. DELANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. FIELD
Represented By: EMILY A. GLUNZ
Represented By: CHARLES C. JACKSON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. WEALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B. FENKELL
Represented By: DAVID R. JOHANSON
Represented By: JOHN M. NOLAN
Represented By: DOUGLAS A. RUBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STONEHENGE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBF CONSULTING, LLC
Represented By: DAVID R. JOHANSON
Represented By: JOHN M. NOLAN
Represented By: DOUGLAS A. RUBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUDENT LOAN MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUDENT LOAN ADVISORY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN P. WITTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY GOWDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D. BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL SEFCOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIANNE SEFCOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN FENKELL
Represented By: DAVID R. JOHANSON
Represented By: JOHN M. NOLAN
Represented By: DOUGLAS A. RUBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?