JUNKER v. MEDICAL COMPONENTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LARRY G JUNKER
Defendant: MEDICAL COMPONENTS, INC. and MARTECH MEDICAL PRODUCTS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2013cv04606
Filed: August 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: L. FELIPE RESTREPO
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER THAT JUDGEMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS MEDICAL COMPONENTS, INC AND MARTECH MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC AS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION. PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED $1,247,910 IN DISGORGED PROFITS. WITH IN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF MAY FILE FOR PRE AND/OR POST-JUGMENT INTEREST, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE 30 DAYS TO RESPOND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/14/21. 1/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER THAT PLFF'S REQUEST TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY OR DOCUMENTS RELATED TO SCENARIO 1D IN DANA TREXLER'S EXPERT REPORT PRODUCED ON 1/15/20 IS GRANTED; PLFF'S REQUEST TO EXCLUDE DEFTS' EXHIBIT 164 IS HELD UNDER ADVISEMENT; PLFF 9;S REQUEST FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES IS GRANTED AS TO ONLY THOSE EXPENSES INCURRED, ETC WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. DEFTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLFF'S MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS OF ITS FILING. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR BRIEFS WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/19/20. 3/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lvj, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC #197) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC #202) IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY (DOC #196) IS DENIED IN PART WITH PREJUDICE AND DENIED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT REPORTS (DOC #203) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/4/19. 1/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER THAT THE SINGLE CLAIM OF U.S. DESIGN PATENT NO. D450,839, ENTITLED "HANDLE FOR INTRODUCER SHEATH" (THE "D'839 PATENT"), SHALL BE CONSTRUED AS THE D'839 PATENT CLAIMS THE ORNAMENTAL DESIGN OF A HANDLE FOR AN INTRODUCER SHEATH, AS SHOWN IN FIGURES 1-9. THE BROKEN LINES IN THE FIGURES OF THE D'839 PATENT REPRESENT UNCLAIMED SUBJECT MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/30/17. 10/30/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' THIRD AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/4/17 AT 3:30 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/21/16. 12/21/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/9/15. 2/10/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUNKER v. MEDICAL COMPONENTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY G JUNKER
Represented By: ALAN S. GOLD
Represented By: ROBERT M. MASON
Represented By: JAMES D. PETRUZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL COMPONENTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTECH MEDICAL PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?