WEST PALM BEACH POLICE PENSION FUND v. DFC GLOBAL CORP. et al
Plaintiff: WEST PALM BEACH POLICE PENSION FUND
Defendant: DFC GLOBAL CORP., JEFFREY A. WEISS and RANDY UNDERWOOD
Case Number: 2:2013cv06731
Filed: November 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: THOMAS N. ONEILL
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS PLAN OF ALLOCATION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 9/20/17. 9/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS (DOC. 87) IS GRANTED. THE COURT CERTIFIES THE CLASS AS OUTLINED HEREIN, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/4/16. 8/4/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' MOTION (DOC. 63) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MOTION (DOC. 64) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/16/15. 6/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, )
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION OF THE INSTITUTIONAL INVESTOR GROUP (DOC. 8) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. MOTION OF THE PLUMBERS & PIEPFITTERS (DOC. 9) IS DENIED. THE MOTION OF THE CITY OF HOLLYWOOD (DOC. 10) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 4/9/14. 4/10/14 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST PALM BEACH POLICE PENSION FUND v. DFC GLOBAL CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST PALM BEACH POLICE PENSION FUND
Represented By: NAUMON A. AMJED
Represented By: SEAN M. HANDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFC GLOBAL CORP.
Represented By: MICHELE CRIMALDI ZARYCHTA
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: GAY BARLOW PARKS RAINVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY A. WEISS
Represented By: MICHELE CRIMALDI ZARYCHTA
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: GAY BARLOW PARKS RAINVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY UNDERWOOD
Represented By: MICHELE CRIMALDI ZARYCHTA
Represented By: JAY A. DUBOW
Represented By: GAY BARLOW PARKS RAINVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?