GADDY v. CITY OF PHILA. POLICE DEP'T et al
Plaintiff: TERRANCE GADDY
Defendant: CITY OF PHILA. POLICE DEP'T, MATTHEW WINSCOM and MICHAEL CHICHEARO
Case Number: 2:2014cv03435
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: GENE E.K. PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Ordered THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NO. 50) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING STATISTICS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/14/16. 10/14/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 27) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS SET FORTH IN THE ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/4/15. 6/4/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED (DOCKET NO. 12). PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 13, 2015 AND DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 27, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/22/15. 1/23/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GADDY v. CITY OF PHILA. POLICE DEP'T et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRANCE GADDY
Represented By: ANEESH A. MEHTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILA. POLICE DEP'T
Represented By: AARON SHOTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW WINSCOM
Represented By: AARON SHOTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CHICHEARO
Represented By: AARON SHOTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?