NANNI v. DDR NOBLE TC TRUST
Plaintiff: JOHN NANNI
Defendant: DDR NOBLE TC TRUST
Case Number: 2:2014cv06805
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE UNDER AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL AND F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); & THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL AND ALL OTHER PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/18/16. 3/18/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 17, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JOHN NANNI. (FROELICH, JAMES)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT COSTS, PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL & LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/4/15. 6/4/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF BRIAN T. KU, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/2/15.6/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian T. Ku filed by JOHN NANNI.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(FROELICH, JAMES)
May 7, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW MITCHELL OATES on behalf of DDR NOBLE TC TRUST (OATES, MATTHEW)
May 7, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFRY W. DUFFY on behalf of DDR NOBLE TC TRUST (DUFFY, JEFFRY)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE PRETRIAL DEADLINES IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE NOTICED, SERVED AND COMPLETED BY 7/3/15. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 7/13/15. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 8/12/15. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE 8/17/15. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/15/15 AT 4:00 P.M.. A THREE DAY NON JURY TRIAL BEGINNING ON 9/30/15 AT 9:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/5/15. 5/5/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 4, 2015 Filing 27 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND PRETRIAL DEADLINES filed by JOHN NANNI, DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.(FROELICH, JAMES) Modified on 5/5/2015 (lisad, ).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON 6/10/2015 AT 1:30 P.M., BEFORE THE HONORABLE MARILYN HEFFLEY, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ROOM 4001, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 4/30/15. 5/1/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF BRIAN T. KU, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH ALLOWANCE TO FILE A NEW MOTION IN COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES (JANUARY 2015). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/1/15. 4/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 31, 2015 Filing 24 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF BRIAN T. KU ON BEHALF OF JOHN NANNI. PROPOSED ORDER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, SPONSOR'S STATEMENT. (FILING FEE PAID $40. RECEIPT NO 118542) (kp, )
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF BRIAN C. BLAIR, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #22 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/13/2015.3/16/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Main Document 23 replaced on 3/17/2015) (amas, ).
March 13, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian C. Blair filed by DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(HITTINGER, CARL)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON 5/8/2015 AT 9:30 A.M., BEFORE THE HONORABLE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, ROOM 4001, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 3/12/15. 3/13/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 11, 2015 Filing 20 Report of Pretrial Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY on 3/9/15. (kw, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT & EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/5/2015. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY FOR ALL SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 6/12/2015. NO LATER THAN 7/10/2015, EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 7/15/2015. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/30/2015 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 5-D, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/9/15. 3/10/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 6, 2015 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.(HITTINGER, CARL)
February 27, 2015 Filing 17 Report Of RULE 26(f) MEETING by All Parties. (FROELICH, JAMES) Modified on 3/2/2015 (lisad, ).
February 19, 2015 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DDR NOBLE TC TRUST, Certificate of Service, filed by PLFF JOHN NANNI.(kw, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE CONSENT MOTION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE HIS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #13 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 2/19/2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #8 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/13/15. 2/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BRIAN C. BLAIR, ESQUIRE #12 TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/13/15.2/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
February 12, 2015 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by JOHN NANNI.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint First Amended Complaint)(FROELICH, JAMES)
February 12, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian C. Blair filed by DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL) (Filing fee paid on 2/12/15, #PPE116119) Modified on 2/12/2015 (kw, ).
February 10, 2015 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including DDR CORP. by DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.(HITTINGER, CARL) Modified on 2/11/2015 (lisad, ).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 3/9/2015 AT 11:00 A.M. IN ROOM 5118, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/9/15. 2/9/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 3/6/2015 AT 10:00 A.M., IN ROOM 5118, ETC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER F.R.C.P. 26(a) WITHIN 7 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/2/15. 2/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 30, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(HITTINGER, CARL)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 1/29/15. 1/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT DEFT'S SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS HEREBY GRANTED. DEFT MUST SERVE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/30/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/16/15. 1/20/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 16, 2015 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT DEFT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS HEREBY GRANTED. DEFT MUST SERVE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/16/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/12/15. 1/13/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
January 5, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN NANNI served Summons and Complaint upon DDR NOBLE TC TRUST. DDR NOBLE TC TRUST served on 12/12/2014, answer due 1/2/2015. (FROELICH, JAMES)
December 30, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by DDR NOBLE TC TRUST.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HITTINGER, CARL)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DDR NOBLE TC TRUST ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 112113.), filed by JOHN NANNI. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(jwl, )
December 1, 2014 Summons Issued as to DDR NOBLE TC TRUST. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/2/14 (jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NANNI v. DDR NOBLE TC TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN NANNI
Represented By: BRIAN T. KU
Represented By: JAMES CHRISTOPHER FROELICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDR NOBLE TC TRUST
Represented By: BRIAN C. BLAIR
Represented By: JEFFRY W. DUFFY
Represented By: MATTHEW MITCHELL OATES
Represented By: CARL W. HITTINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?