COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA v. THINK FINANCE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant: THINK FINANCE, INC., TC LOAN SERVICE, LLC, ELEVATE CREDIT, INC., FINANCIAL U, LLC, KENNETH E. REES, WILLIAM WEINSTEIN, WEINSTEIN, PINSON AND RILEY, PS, CERASTES, LLC, SELLING SOURCE, LLC, PARTNERWEEKLY, LLC, JOHN DOE and NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv07139
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: J. CURTIS JOYNER
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1831
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 255 ), PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 259 ), DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NOS. 256 AND 257 ) ARE DENIED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE PRECEDING MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/18/2019. 11/21/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. 207 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/3/2018. 4/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART CONSISTENT WITH THIS COURT'S ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/26/18. 1/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS LETTER APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. NO. 168 ) IS DENIED; AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO UNSEAL THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 162 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 7/26/17. 7/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC NOS. 67, 68, 69, 70, 71, 73) ARE DENIED, WITH THE EXCEPTION OF CERTAIN CLAIMS UNDER COUNT SIX, AS ADDRESSED IN THE ATTACHED MEMORANUM, WHICH ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/14/2016. 1/14/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA v. THINK FINANCE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Represented By: JOHN J. GROGAN
Represented By: SAVERIO P. MIRARCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THINK FINANCE, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH BALASSONE
Represented By: STEPHEN ANDREW FOGDALL
Represented By: ARLEIGH PRITCHARD HELFER
Represented By: ANGELA E. KLEINE
Represented By: JAMES R. MCGUIRE
Represented By: IRA NEIL RICHARDS
Represented By: LAUREN L. WROBLEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TC LOAN SERVICE, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN ANDREW FOGDALL
Represented By: ARLEIGH PRITCHARD HELFER
Represented By: IRA NEIL RICHARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELEVATE CREDIT, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN P. BOUGHRUM
Represented By: CHRISTINE PROKOPICK
Represented By: RICHARD L. SCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINANCIAL U, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN ANDREW FOGDALL
Represented By: ARLEIGH PRITCHARD HELFER
Represented By: IRA NEIL RICHARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH E. REES
Represented By: JONATHAN P. BOUGHRUM
Represented By: CHRISTINE PROKOPICK
Represented By: RICHARD L. SCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WEINSTEIN
Represented By: BRIAN S. PASZAMANT
Represented By: JAMES T. SMITH
Represented By: JOHN P. WIXTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEINSTEIN, PINSON AND RILEY, PS
Represented By: BRIAN S. PASZAMANT
Represented By: JAMES T. SMITH
Represented By: JOHN P. WIXTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERASTES, LLC
Represented By: BRIAN S. PASZAMANT
Represented By: JAMES T. SMITH
Represented By: JOHN P. WIXTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELLING SOURCE, LLC
Represented By: JAMES E. NESLAND
Represented By: LLOYD G. PARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARTNERWEEKLY, LLC
Represented By: JAMES E. NESLAND
Represented By: LLOYD G. PARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?