VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC et al v. WHITCHURCH et al
Plaintiff: VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and JOSEPH BIZZARRO
Defendant: JULIE P. WHITCHURCH and JAMIE DAVIS
Case Number: 2:2015cv00431
Filed: January 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC AND JOSEPH BIZZARRO FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AGAINST DEFENDANT JULIE P. WHITCHURCH (DOC. 138) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC AND JOSEPH BIZZARRO ARE AWARDED ATTORNEYS FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,319.00 AND COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.99 FOR A TOTAL OF $4,320.99 AGAINST DEFENDANT JULIE P. WHITCHURCH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/7/17. 3/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP & GOLD, EMAILED.(rf, )
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MEMORANDUN AND ORDER THAT WHITCHURCH SHALL EMAIL AN APOLOGY TO FRANK SEIDMAN ON OR BEFORE 2/15/17. THE APOLOGY MUST STATE SPECIFICALLY THAT WHITCHURCH APOLOGIZES FOR HER CONDUCT IN SENDING SEIDMAN EMAILS DATED 11/21/16, 11/28/16, 11/29/16, 12/2/16 AN D 1/12/17 AND FOR HER VIOLATION OF THIS COURTS 1/8/16 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. WHITCHURCH SHALL FILE FORTHWITH AN AFFIDAVIT STATING THAT SHE HAS COMPLIED WITH PARAGRAPHS (1) AND (2) OF THIS ORDER AND STATE THE DATE WHEN COMPLIANCE TOOK PLACE. A COPY OF THE EMAILED APOLOGY SHALL BE ATTACHED TO THE AFFIDAVIT, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/13/17. 2/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP DEFENDANT, EMAILED.(rf, )
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION OF DEFENDANT (DOC. 310) IS DENIED. THE CONTEMPT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR TOMORROW, 2/2/17, WILL PROCEED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/1/17. 2/1/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT AND COUNSEL, EMAILED.(rf, )
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC AND JOSEPH BIZZARRO FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1963 ALLOWING REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENTS IN THE STATE OF GEORGIA (DOC. 280) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC AND JOSEPH BIZZARRO MAY REGISTER IN ANY JUDICIAL DISTRICT IN THE STATE OF GEORGIA THIS COURT'S 3/22/16 JUDGMENTS AGAINST DEFENDANT JULIE P. WHITCHURCH AND THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL UPON PAYMENT OF THE APPROPRIATE FEES CERTIFIED COPIES OF THE JUDGMENTS AND ANY OTHER RELATED FORMS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/1/16. 6/1/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS "FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO DETERMINE AND AWARD ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS BY THE COURT RATHER THAN BY A JURY" (DOC. 245) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/1/16. 3/1/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC AND JOSEPH BIZZARRO "FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, FINAL MONEY JUDGMENT, AND PERMANENT INJUCTION" (DOC. 118) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. T HE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS JULIE P. WHITCHURCH AND JAMIE DAVIS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 174) AGAINST VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC AND JOSEPH BIZZARRO IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN... SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 1/8/16. 1/8/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT, EMAILED.(rf, )
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER WITH COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM IS STRICKEN. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO JOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTIES IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/23/15. 7/24/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT SANCTIONS ARE IMPOSED AGAINST EACH OF DEFENDANTS JULIE P. WHITCHURCH AND JAMIE DAVIS AND CONTINUING EACH DAY OR PART OF A DAY AGAINST EACH DEFENDANT UNTIL THAT DEFENDANT FILES AN AFFIDAVIT STATING THAT SHE IS IN FULL COMPLIA NCE WITH PARAGRAPH (3)(b)OF THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. 6) AND STATING THE DATE WHEN FULL COMPLIANCE TOOK PLACE. SAID SANCTIONS SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK FOR THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND MAILED T O: CLERK'S OFFICE, ATTENTION: FISCAL DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 2609 U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA. 19106. DEFENDANTS JULIE P. WHITCHURCH AND JAMIE DAVIS PAY PLAINTIF F VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC THE AMOUNT OF $29,200 FOR THE LEGAL FEES AND COSTS IT INCURRED IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONTEMPT PROCEEDINGS. THE LIABILITY OF JULIE P. WHITCHURCH AND JAMIE DAVIS FOR THIS PAYMENT IS JOINT AND SEVERAL. PLAINTIFFS REQUEST THAT THE COURT SANCTION DEFENDANT JULIE P. WHITCHURCH FOR ANY MISREPRESENTATIONS MADE BY HER CONCERNING THE SCOPE OF HER RELATIONSHIP WITH SIB DEVELOPMENT & CONSULTING, INC. IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/2/15. 6/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, EMAILED.(rf, )
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION OF PLAINTIFF VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS JULIE P. WHITCHURCH AND JAMIE DAVIS (DOC. 8) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/29/15. 4/29/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT, EMAILED.(rf, )
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 12(b)(2), 12(b)(6), 12(b)(7) OF THE FRCP (DOC. 16) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/1/15. 4/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE DEFENDANT, E-MAILED.(rf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC et al v. WHITCHURCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIZANT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: EDWARD T. KANG
Represented By: GREGORY H. MATHEWS
Represented By: JASON POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BIZZARRO
Represented By: EDWARD T. KANG
Represented By: GREGORY H. MATHEWS
Represented By: JASON POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE P. WHITCHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?