BEDROSIAN v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Plaintiff: ARTHUR BEDROSIAN
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2015cv05853
Filed: October 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT RE PENALTY AMOUNT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/29/21. 1/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THAT THE COURT FINDS THAT ARTHUR BEDROSIANS ACTIONS WERE WILLFUL WITHIN THE MEANING OF 31 U.S.C. § 5321 AND WITH RESPECT TO THE AMOUNT OF THE PENALTY TO BE IMPOSED, THE COURT WILL REQUIRE THE PARTIES TO CONFER PROMPTLY AND THE N FILE EITHER A JOINT STATEMENT ON THIS ISSUE, OR SEPARATE STATEMENTS (LIMITED TO FIVE PAGES DOUBLE-SPACED) SETTING FORTH THEIR ARGUMENTS WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/4/20. 12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PERMIT THE USE OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/5/2017. 9/5/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 25) AND DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 22) ARE BOTH DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/13/17. 4/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEDROSIAN v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR BEDROSIAN
Represented By: BETH L. WEISSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?