ANDREWS v. KENNEY et al
Plaintiff: HAKIEM ANDREWS
Defendant: JIM KENNEY, MICHAEL NUTTER, MICHAEL RESNICK, BLANCH CARNEY and JERALD MAY
Case Number: 2:2016cv01872
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: NORMA L. SHAPIRO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RE: DENYING DEFEDNANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 73 . SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/11/2020. 3/16/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sfl, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE: THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 59 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/18/2019. 12/20/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(sfl, )
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT DEFTS' SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 15) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; DEFT'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED SUCH THAT ANY AND ALL CLAIMS ASSERTED AGAINST DEFTS. JAMES KENNEY, MICHAEL NUTTER, MICHAEL RESNICK, A ND BLANCH CARNEY ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND IT IS DENIED WITH RESPECT TO THE CONDITIONS OF CONFINEMENT CLAIM ASSERTED AGAINST DEFT. GERALD MAY; PLFF. MAY FILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 7/14/17; AND IF PLFF. FILES A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, PLFF. MUST ATTACH A PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO HIS MOTION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/14/17. 6/15/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF., E-MAILED TO COUNSEL, 1 COPY TO LEGAL BIN.(pr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDREWS v. KENNEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAKIEM ANDREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM KENNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL NUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RESNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLANCH CARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERALD MAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?