JACKSON et al v. SWEET HOME HEALTHCARE LLC et al
Plaintiff: NAKIA JACKSON, SARITA B. CAVE, SHATIA JACKSON, TINA WILLIAMS and LAWRENCE G. HARRIS
Defendant: SWEET HOME HEALTHCARE LLC, SWEET HOME PRIMARY CARE LLC, TEKIA EMERSON and DARRYL EZELL
Case Number: 2:2016cv02353
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: GENE E.K. PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. THE COURT AWARDS ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $541,667, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $49,868.05, CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION EXPENSES NOT TO EXCEED $22,000 AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,000 TO EACH HARRIS AND WILLIAMS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 11/9/2018. 11/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FLSA CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION AND JUDICIAL NOTICE IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/31/2018. 1/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS 7/10/2017. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/26/2017. 6/27/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/4/2017. 4/5/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON et al v. SWEET HOME HEALTHCARE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAKIA JACKSON
Represented By: STEVEN E. ANGSTREICH
Represented By: AMY R. BRANDT
Represented By: CAROLYN C. LINDHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARITA B. CAVE
Represented By: STEVEN E. ANGSTREICH
Represented By: AMY R. BRANDT
Represented By: CAROLYN C. LINDHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHATIA JACKSON
Represented By: STEVEN E. ANGSTREICH
Represented By: AMY R. BRANDT
Represented By: CAROLYN C. LINDHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA WILLIAMS
Represented By: STEVEN E. ANGSTREICH
Represented By: AMY R. BRANDT
Represented By: CAROLYN C. LINDHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE G. HARRIS
Represented By: STEVEN E. ANGSTREICH
Represented By: AMY R. BRANDT
Represented By: CAROLYN C. LINDHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWEET HOME HEALTHCARE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWEET HOME PRIMARY CARE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEKIA EMERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARRYL EZELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?