GILYARD et al v. DUSAK et al
Plaintiff: EUGENE GILYARD and TYREE WELLS
Defendant: DENNIS DUSAK, JOHN BENHAM, WILLIAM WYNN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and RICHARD NEAL
Case Number: 2:2016cv02986
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: MARK A. KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND PROPOSED VERDICT SLIP BY 6/29/18; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/15/18. 6/15/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED AND WE DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS UNDER THE FIFTH AND FOURTEENTH AMENDMENTS AS WELL AS ANY CLAIMS FOR MONELL SUPERVISORY LIABILITY AGAINST THE CITY BASED ON ANY THEORY OTHER THAN CHALLENGING THE PHILADELPHIA POLICE'S POLICY, TRAINING AND SUPERVISING OF OFFICERS' OBLIGATIONSTO INCLUDE EXCULPATORY EVIDENCE IN AFFIDAVITS OF PROBABLE CAUSE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/8/18. 5/9/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/29/17. 6/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT FORMER COMMISSIONER RICHARD NEAL IS DISMISSED AS PLAINTIFFS' ONLY REMAINING CLAIM AGAINST HIM IS REDUNDANT GIVEN THEIR SUPERVISORY LIABILITY CLAIM AGAINST THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/4/16. 10/4/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILYARD et al v. DUSAK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE GILYARD
Represented By: JOHN WENDELL BEAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYREE WELLS
Represented By: JOHN WENDELL BEAVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS DUSAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BENHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?