KREMSKY v. KREMSKY
Plaintiff: STANTON S. KREMSKY
Defendant: KENNETH F. KREMSKY
Case Number: 2:2016cv04474
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Bucks
Presiding Judge: MARK A. KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OR NEW TRIAL WITH SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM, PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION, DEFENDANT'S REPLY AND FOR REASONS IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/21/17. 11/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE BRAD RYDEN'S TESTIMONY BASED UPON HIS 12/30/2016 DISCLOSURES UNDER DAUBERT 38 , IT IS ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/17/17. 2/17/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/3/17. 1/3/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KREMSKY v. KREMSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANTON S. KREMSKY
Represented By: NORMAN W. BRIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH F. KREMSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?