MCCARRIN v. POLLERA et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL W. MCCARRIN
Defendant: MARIO POLLERA, WILLIAM DI FLORIO, TIMOTHY FEENEY, TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 1414 NEWSPAPER & MAGAZINE EMPLOYEES UNION, JOSEPH LYONS and NEWSPAPERS AND MAGAZINE EMPLOYEES UNION AND PHILADELPHIA PUBLISHERS NEWSPAPERS AND MAGAZINE EMPLOYEES UNION AND PHILADELPHIA PUBLISHERS PENSION FUND
Case Number: 2:2017cv01691
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: C. DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 44) IS GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTST POLLERA, FEENEY, LYONS AND NEWSPAPER AND MAGAZINE EMPLOYEES UNION AND PHILADELPHIA PUBLISHERS PENSION PLAN AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF MCCARRIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/27/19. 10/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO STRIKE (ECF NOS 50-53) ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/2/19. 5/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(3) AND (F) (ECF NO. 13), DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION THERETO, (ECF NO. 16) AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY, (ECF NO. 17), AND FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE M EMORANDUM FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH THIS ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(E) AND (F) (ECF NO. 13) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/30/2017. 11/30/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (rz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCARRIN v. POLLERA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL W. MCCARRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIO POLLERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM DI FLORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 1414 NEWSPAPER & MAGAZINE EMPLOYEES UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH LYONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWSPAPERS AND MAGAZINE EMPLOYEES UNION AND PHILADELPHIA PUBLISHERS NEWSPAPERS AND MAGAZINE EMPLOYEES UNION AND PHILADELPHIA PUBLISHERS PENSION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?