GARCIA v. BUCKS COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER et al
Plaintiff: HAMLET GARCIA, JR.
Defendant: BUCKS COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER, BUCKS COUNTY ADULT PAROLE AND PROBATION, BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, PHILADELPHIA 24TH DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT, CHRISTINA A. KING, MATTHEW D. WEINTRAUB, DANIEL B. SWEENEY, CHRISTOPHER A. PIROLLI, SEAN R. RYAN and BRIAN HESSENTHALER
Case Number: 2:2017cv03381
Filed: July 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: GERALD A. MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. PLFF'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 3/26/19. 3/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF. AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER THAT MOTIONS BY DEFT. CFG (ECF NO. 19), THE INDIVIDUAL DEFTS. (ECF NO. 21), AND THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (ECF NO. 29) ARE GRANTED IN THEIR ENTIRETY AND ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THOSE DEFTS. ARE DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE MOTION BY DEF T. BUCKS COUNTY (ECF NO. 20) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS DENIED ONLY AS TO PLFF'S MONELL CLAIMS BASED ON OVERCROWDING AND ITS ALLEGED BUNKING POLICY, EMBODIED IN PLFF'S "TWENTY-FOUR" CLAIM, AND GRANTED ON ALL OTH ER GROUNDS. ALL OTHER CLAIMS AGAINST BUCKS ARE DISMISSED. THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM SETS FORTH AT PAGES 6-7 AND 9-10 WHETHER THE DISMISSALS OF PLFF'S TWENTY-SIX OTHER CLAIMS ARE WITH OR WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/25/18. 7/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF., E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS FRIVOLOUS FOR THE REASONS STATED IN COURTS MEMORANDUM. PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE A 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. UPON FILING OF A THIRD AMENDED COMPL AINT, CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/26/17. 10/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(rf, )
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DIMISSED FOR THE REASONS STATES IN COURTS MEMORANDUM. PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS AS OUTLINED HEREIN, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/18/17. 9/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (rf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARCIA v. BUCKS COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAMLET GARCIA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKS COUNTY JUSTICE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKS COUNTY ADULT PAROLE AND PROBATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA 24TH DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA A. KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW D. WEINTRAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL B. SWEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A. PIROLLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN R. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN HESSENTHALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?