STATE OF CONNECTICUT et al v. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., STATE OF COLORADO, MAYNE PHARMA (USA), INC., STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF ARIZONA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF UTAH, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC, CITRON PHARMA, LLC, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA and STATE OF WYOMING
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, SATISH MEHTA, SANDOZ, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., RAJIV MALIK, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. and MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Respondent: STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL PLAINTIFFS
In Re: STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2017cv03768
Filed: August 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA of Joinder to Defendants Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Pending a Petition for a Writ of Mandamus (SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
September 26, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL E. HERRMANN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HERRMANN, KARL)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE STATES' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY IS WITHDRAWN AS IT RELATED TO EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. THE PARTIES SHALL APPRISE THE COURT OF A NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE WITHIN 15 DAYS OF ANY GRANT OF MR. MEHTA'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SHALL WITHDRAW THE MOTION IN THE EVENT MR. MEHTA'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/24/2019. 9/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO. 1122 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE COURT WILL ASSERT SPECIFIC PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER DEFENDANT EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. AND ALL PENDING BRIEFING RELATED TO SPECIFIC OR GENERAL PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER EMCURE IS WITHDRAWN. THE PLAINTIFF STATES' ALLEGATION THAT THE COURT COULD ASSERT GENERAL PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER EMCURE IS ALSO WITHDRAWN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/24/2019. 9/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO.1121 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by DIETRICH L. SNELL on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(SNELL, DIETRICH)
September 13, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERIN R ELDRIDGE on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA(ELDRIDGE, ERIN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 183 DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS STATE-LAW CLAIMS filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. (HOLT, BENJAMIN) Modified on 9/10/2019 (kp, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 182 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. AND SATISH MEHTAS MOTION TO DISMISS THE PLAINTIFF STATES CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LACOVARA, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/10/2019 (kp, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 181 ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLCS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS STATE-LAW CLAIMS filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC. (DOBIE, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/10/2019 (kp, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 180 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation [and Proposed Order] Regarding the States' Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.. (SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
August 22, 2019 Filing 179 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation [and Proposed Order] Regarding the Court's Personal Jurisdiction Over Defendant Emcure by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.. (SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/15/2019. 7/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1071 IN 16-MD-2724)
August 15, 2019 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/15/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1070 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by EDWARD T VASQUEZ on behalf of STATE OF UTAH(VASQUEZ, EDWARD)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE EMCURE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF STATES' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SHALL BE 8/23/2019.SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/8/2019. 8/9/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1066 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 174 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation [and Proposed Order] to Extend Deadline for Emcure Defendants to Respond to States' Motion by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE) Modified on 8/14/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State-Law Claims filed by STATE OF COLORADO. (HUNT, JENNIFER)
July 26, 2019 Filing 172 MOTION for Discovery filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit to proposed order)(LEFF, DANIEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 171 MOTION to Seal Document #170 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LEFF, DANIEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re #155 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A and attachments, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LEFF, DANIEL)
July 25, 2019 Filing 169 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State-Law Claims filed by STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL PLAINTIFFS. (HUBBARD, ROBERT)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER THAT STATES' CONSENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF FIFTEEN PAGES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/19/2019. 7/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO.1050 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 167 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEFF, DANIEL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by TRAVIS A. KENNEDY on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON with Certificate of Service(KENNEDY, TRAVIS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP.. (MATTHEWS, JAMES)
June 13, 2019 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. (HOLT, BENJAMIN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. (CHAPMAN, JULIA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (REED, STEVEN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 161 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC. (DOBIE, WILLIAM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 160 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. (PARISH, JASON)
June 13, 2019 Filing 159 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Strike #14 Amended Complaint,,,,, #15 Memorandum,,,, JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY ALLEGATIONS IN COUNTS ONE THROUGH EIGHTEEN OF THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF STATES filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC.. (ARTH, GERALD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
May 31, 2019 Filing 157 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State-Law Claims filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., SATISH MEHTA, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HOLT, BENJAMIN)
May 31, 2019 Filing 156 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State-Law Claims filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Declaration in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(DOBIE, WILLIAM)
May 31, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Emcure Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Heritage Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 - Mehta Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(LACOVARA, MICHAEL)
May 31, 2019 Filing 154 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD..(LACOVARA, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER THAT THE CONSENT #152 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 15 PAGES IS GRANTED. MOVING DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A MEMORANDUM OF LAW NO LONGER THAN 25 PAGES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 5/22/2019. 5/23/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO.1006 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 152 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of fifteen pages by Defendants Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. and Satish Mehta filed by EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(LACOVARA, MICHAEL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN) Modified on 5/20/2019 (lvj, ).(ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE)
May 16, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN) Modified on 5/20/2019 (lvj, ). (ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE )
May 15, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by INDRANEEL SUR on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SUR, INDRANEEL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERIC J. STOCK on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STOCK, ERIC)
May 14, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIEL W. NELSON on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NELSON, DANIEL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER BRETT LEACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEACH, CHRISTOPHER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MELANIE L. KATSUR on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KATSUR, MELANIE)
May 14, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by D. JARRETT ARP on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ARP, D.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY B AVERBACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AVERBACH, COURTNEY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J SHERIDAN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER M DRISCOLL on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRISCOLL, JENNIFER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C BERNASCONI on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BERNASCONI, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 9, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by COLLIN M. KESSNER on behalf of STATE OF NEBRASKA(KESSNER, COLLIN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
May 8, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. TEICH on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(TEICH, SARAH)
May 3, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by SHEREECE DENDY-SANDERS on behalf of STATE OF NEBRASKA with Certificate of Service(DENDY-SANDERS, SHEREECE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM STATE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC's MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SHERMAN ACT CLAIMS AGAINST ASCEND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by STATE OF COLORADO. (HUNT, JENNIFER)
May 2, 2019 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by STATE OF NEW YORK. (HUBBARD, ROBERT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by STATE OF NEW YORK. (HUBBARD, ROBERT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by STATE OF NEW YORK. (HUBBARD, ROBERT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by STATE OF NEW YORK. (HUBBARD, ROBERT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by STATE OF NEW YORK. (HUBBARD, ROBERT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by STATE OF IDAHO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(OLSON, JOHN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(MACKENZIE, MICHAEL)
May 2, 2019 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(MACKENZIE, MICHAEL)
May 1, 2019 Filing 117 DEFENDANT ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLCS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS #67 PLAINTIFFS SHERMAN ACT CLAIMS AGAINST ASCEND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (kp, ).
April 29, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KULIK, SARAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. ARGYLE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (ARGYLE, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA JOSE FALES on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (FALES, LISA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS J. WELLING on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (WELLING, THOMAS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIELLE R. FOLEY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (FOLEY, DANIELLE)
April 16, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by CARL J HAMMAKER, III on behalf of STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL LITIGATION with Certificate of Service(HAMMAKER, CARL)
April 12, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JULIA C. METZGER on behalf of STATE OF ALASKA(METZGER, JULIA)
April 10, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN LEMMO on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEMMO, ANN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JAMES DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (BALDRIDGE, JAMES)
April 1, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by S TURNER on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. LEFF on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS with Certificate of Service(LEFF, DANIEL)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. DEFENDANTS EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD. AND SATISH MEHTA SHALL MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE STATE ATTORNEY'S GENERAL PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 5/31/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/11/2019. 3/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO 909 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(MUNKITTRICK, DAVID)
March 6, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. CANTER on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CANTER, EDWARD)
March 5, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANNA PARVIS on behalf of EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA with Certificate of Service(PARVIS, ELIZABETH)
March 5, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLYSON M. MALTAS on behalf of EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA with Certificate of Service(MALTAS, ALLYSON)
March 1, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL LACOVARA on behalf of EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA with Certificate of Service(LACOVARA, MICHAEL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGUERITE M. SULLIVAN on behalf of EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., SATISH MEHTA with Certificate of Service(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 93 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
February 28, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO UNSEAL THE STATE CAC IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO UNSEAL THE STATE CAC. NO LATER THAN 3/27/2019, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE ON THE MASTER DOCKET A LIST OF ALL DOCUMENTS FILED IN ALL CASES IN THE MDL THAT WERE FILED UNDER SEAL BECAUSE THEY CITED MATERIAL IN THE STATE CAC AND MAY BE UNSEALED AS A RESULT OF THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/27/2019. 2/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO.894 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA B. ROBINSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROBINSON, AMANDA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T MCENROE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCENROE, WILLIAM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
February 27, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CHRISTINE C. LEVIN on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC(LEVIN, CHRISTINE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(ENGSELL, TIFFANY)
February 27, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MCCLAM on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(MCCLAM, JOHN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINA R. DIMATTIO on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DIMATTIO, MELINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S WELLIN on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(WELLIN, ANDREW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 74 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HOLT, BENJAMIN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON R. PARISH on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. with Certificate of Service(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. with Certificate of Service(KITLOWSKI, BRADLEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA) (Main Document 70 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service,. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Redacted) in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Declaration in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DOBIE, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Strike #14 Amended Complaint,,,,, #15 Memorandum,,,, JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY ALLEGATIONS IN COUNTS ONE THROUGH EIGHTEEN OF THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF STATES filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARTH, GERALD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. CLEARY on behalf of RAJIV MALIK with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, ROBERT)
February 21, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. REED on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
February 4, 2019 Filing 58 APPENDIX TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO UNSEAL REDACTED INFORMATION. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (UNSEALED PER ORDER 932 ) Modified on 4/9/2019 (kp, ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Unseal Document #15 Memorandum,,,, filed by STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF FLORIDA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF WYOMING, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF MISSOURI filed by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF WYOMING.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Filed Under Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(NIELSEN, W.)
January 15, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ERIN F. MERRICK on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE(MERRICK, ERIN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CHERYL LEE JOHNSON on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA(JOHNSON, CHERYL)
January 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DOAN-PHUONG PAMELA PHAM on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA(PHAM, DOAN-PHUONG)
December 31, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW M. LYONS on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS(LYONS, MATTHEW)
December 17, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL O DAVIS on behalf of STATE OF CONNECTICUT with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, RACHEL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by PAULA LAUREN GIBSON on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (GIBSON, PAULA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants filed by HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ARP, D.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 49 Memorandum in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants (Surreply) filed by APOTEX CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
December 3, 2018 Filing 48 Memorandum re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants [DEFENDANT MAYNE PHARMA INC.S SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL ON GLOBAL ISSUES AND THE STATES' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DATING FROM 2006 FOR CERTAIN, SPECIFIC REQUESTS RELATING TO OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY] filed by MAYNE PHARMA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2018 Filing 47 THE STATES' REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DATING FROM 2006 FOR CERTAIN, SPECIFIC REQUESTS RELATING TO OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF WYOMING. (SEE PAPER # 778 IN 16-MD-2724) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (UNSEALED PER ORDER 932 ) Modified on 4/9/2019 (kp, ).
November 20, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN R ELDRIDGE on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA with Certificate of Service(ELDRIDGE, ERIN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants filed by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF WYOMING. (NIELSEN, W.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by CALEB J. SMITH on behalf of STATE OF OKLAHOMA (SMITH, CALEB)
October 26, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN D BRENNER on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(BRENNER, NATHAN)
October 24, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. MCKEOWN on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MCKEOWN, JAMES)
October 24, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANDREW J. EWALT on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(EWALT, ANDREW)
October 23, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MAYNE PHARMA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(TEICH, SARAH)
October 23, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants filed by APOTEX CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Cichy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
October 23, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants filed by MAYNE PHARMA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Declaration of Brian J. Smith, #7 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
October 23, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants filed by HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher B. Leach, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ARP, D.)
October 23, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(HAAS, ELIZABETH)
October 23, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. NAGLE on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(NAGLE, JOHN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Apotex Holdings, Inc. and Aposherm Delaware Holding Corporation with Apotex Corp. by APOTEX CORP..(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
October 23, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MATTHEWS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
September 25, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Compel as to Certain Defendants filed by STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF WYOMING, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO. Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Local Rule 26.1 Certification)(NIELSEN, W.) Modified on 9/26/2018 (ems).
September 7, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CAROL E. HEAD on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS(HEAD, CAROL)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE STIPULATING DEFENDANTS TO MOVE AGAINST, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF STATES' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS ADJOURNED PURSUANT TO THE PROCEDURE SET FORTH IN PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 51. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/4/2018. 9/4/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 696 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
August 30, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by RONALD J. OCKEY on behalf of STATE OF UTAH(OCKEY, RONALD)
August 14, 2018 Filing 28 DEFENDANT ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC. (SEE PAPER # 678 IN 16-MD-2724) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems)(UNSEALED PER ORDER 932 ). Modified on 4/9/2019 (kp, ).
August 14, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC.Memorandum,Declaration, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Declaration of W. Gordon Dobie in Support of Ascend Laboratories, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(DOBIE, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2018 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Alkem Laboratories, Ltd. with Certificate of Service by ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC.(DOBIE, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM GORDON DOBIE on behalf of ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DOBIE, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BYRON D. HADLEY on behalf of STATE OF OREGON(HADLEY, BYRON)
August 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA C. METZGER on behalf of STATE OF ALASKA with Certificate of Service(METZGER, JULIA)
August 8, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET PATON WALSH on behalf of STATE OF ALASKA with Certificate of Service(PATON WALSH, MARGARET)
July 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOHN ROBERT ROBERTSON on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(ROBERTSON, JOHN)
July 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by SCHONETTE J WALKER on behalf of STATE OF MARYLAND.(WALKER, SCHONETTE) Modified on 7/16/2018 (tjd).
July 9, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN M BURNINGHAM on behalf of STATE OF WYOMING with Certificate of Service(BURNINGHAM, BENJAMIN)
June 25, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL U. WOOD on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(WOOD, ABIGAIL)
June 22, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL SCHWALBERT on behalf of STATE OF MISSOURI with Certificate of Service(SCHWALBERT, MICHAEL)
June 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by STATE OF IOWA of Substitution of Counsel. (MILLER, MAX)
June 18, 2018 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF STATES' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF WYOMING. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (UNSEALED PER COURT'S ORDER 894 IN 16-MD-2724). Modified on 2/28/2019 (kp, ).
June 18, 2018 14 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, SATISH MEHTA, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. Forwarded To: W. Joseph Nielsen on 6/18/2018 (ems)
June 18, 2018 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF STATES' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., RAJIV MALIK, SATISH MEHTA, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC., filed by STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF NEVADA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF WYOMING, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF FLORIDA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF ARKANSAS. (ems)
June 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT BRANT HARRELL on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE. Certificate of Service. (ems)
June 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEYER on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA (MEYER, JOSEPH)
June 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CYNTHIA E. KINSER on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE(KINSER, CYNTHIA)
June 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KATHERINE A. CAMPBELL on behalf of STATE OF OREGON(CAMPBELL, KATHERINE)
June 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. STOCK on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(STOCK, ERIC)
June 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CHERYL FAYE HIEMSTRA on behalf of STATE OF OREGON with Certificate of Service(HIEMSTRA, CHERYL)
June 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL JASON HEMKER on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON(HEMKER, MICHAEL)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A SEPARATE GOVERNMENT TRACK AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT IN 17-CV-3768 ARE GRANTED; A THIRD ELECTRONIC CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SHALL BE ENTERED THIS DATE; PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THAT ORDER NO LATER THAN JUNE 19, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/5/2018; 6/5/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCUMENT # 604 IN 16-MD-2724).(tjd)
June 5, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A SEPARATE GOVERNMENT TRACK AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/5/2018; 6/5/2018 ENTERED AND E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCUMENT # 603 IN 16-MD-2724). (tjd)
January 10, 2018 Filing 4 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS BY THE PLAINTIFF STATES FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND A SEPERATE GOVERNMENT TRACK by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN. (SEE PAPER # 553 IN 16-MD-2724) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (UNSEALED PER ORDER 932 ). Modified on 4/9/2019 (kp, ).
October 31, 2017 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum in Support)(MARTELLA, LAURA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2017: #4 Sealed Document) (ems). (3-4 UNSEALED PER ORDER 932 ) Modified on 4/9/2019 (kp, ).
October 10, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by NANCY M. BONNELL on behalf of STATE OF ARIZONA. Certificate of Service. (ems)
August 23, 2017 Filing 1 Original record together with certified copy of docket entries received from District of Connecticut. (jwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2017: #1 Complaint, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER, #4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER., #5 ORDER, #6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL, #7 NOTICE of Appearance, #8 WAIVER OF SERVICE) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2017: #9 NOTICE, #10 MOTION, #11 MOTION, #12 MOTION, #13 MOTION, #14 MOTION, #15 MOTION, #16 MOTION, #17 MOTION, #18 MOTION, #19 MOTION, #20 MOTION, #21 MOTION, #22 MOTION, #23 MOTION, #24 MOTION, #25 MOTION, #26 MOTION, #27 MOTION, #28 MOTION, #29 MOTION, #30 MOTION, #31 MOTION, #32 MOTION) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2017: #33 MOTION, #34 MOTION, #35 MOTION, #36 MOTION, #37 MOTION, #40 MOTION, #41 MOTION, #42 MOTION, #43 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #44 NOTICE, #45 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #46 NOTICE, #47 NOTICE, #48 WAIVER OF SERVICE, #49 WAIVER OF SERVICE, #50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED, #51 WAIVER OF SERVICE, #52 NOTICE, #53 WAIVER OF SERVICE, #54 NOTICE) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2017: #55 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #56 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #57 NOTICE, #58 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #59 NOTICE, #60 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #61 NOTICE, #62 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #63 NOTICE, #64 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #65 NOTICE, #66 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #67 NOTICE, #68 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #69 NOTICE, #70 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #71 NOTICE, #72 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #73 NOTICE, #74 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #75 NOTICE, #76 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #77 NOTICE, #78 NOTICE, #79 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #80 NOTICE, #81 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #82 NOTICE, #83 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #84 NOTICE, #85 NOTICE, #86 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #87 NOTICE, #88 SUMMONS, #89 NOTICE, #90 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #91 NOTICE, #92 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #93 NOTICE, #94 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #95 NOTICE, #96 NOTICE, #97 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #98 MOTION, #99 NOTICE) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2017: #100 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #101 NOTICE, #102 NOTICE, #103 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #104 NOTICE, #105 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #106 NOTICE, #107 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #108 NOTICE, #109 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #110 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #111 NOTICE, #112 MOTION, #113 Certificate of Good Standing, #114 NOTICE, #115 NOTICE, #116 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #117 NOTICE, #118 NOTICE, #119 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #120 NOTICE, #121 NOTICE, #122 NOTICE, #123 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #124 MOTION, #125 MOTION, #126 MOTION, #127 MOTION, #128 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #129 Consent MOTION) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2017: #130 Joint MOTION, #131 NOTICE, #132 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #133 NOTICE, #134 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #135 NOTICE, #136 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #137 NOTICE, #138 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #139 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #140 NOTICE, #141 NOTICE, #142 NOTICE, #143 MOTION, #144 MOTION, #145 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #146 Joint Motion, #147 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #148 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #149 MOTION, #150 MOTION, #151 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #152 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #153 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #154 MOTION, #155 MOTION, #156 MOTION, #157 MOTION, #158 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #159 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #160 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #161 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #162 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #163 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, #164 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #165 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #166 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #167 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #168 NOTICE) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2017: #169 MOTION, #170 MOTION, #171 MOTION, #172 MOTION, #173 MOTION, #174 MOTION, #175 MOTION, #176 MOTION, #177 MOTION, #178 MOTION, #179 MOTION, #180 MOTION, #181 MOTION, #182 MOTION, #183 MOTION, #184 MOTION, #185 MOTION, #186 MOTION, #187 MOTION, #188 MOTION, #189 MOTION, #190 MOTION, #191 MOTION, #192 MOTION, #193 MOTION, #194 MOTION, #195 MOTION, #196 MOTION, #197 MOTION, #198 MOTION, #199 MOTION, #200 MOTION, #201 MOTION, #202 MOTION, #203 MOTION, #204 NOTICE, #205 MOTION, #206 NOTICE) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2017: #207 MOTION, #208 MOTION, #209 MOTION, #210 MOTION, #211 NOTICE, #212 NOTICE, #213 NOTICE, #214 NOTICE, #215 NOTICE, #216 NOTICE, #217 Certificate of Good Standing, #218 NOTICE, #219 NOTICE, #220 NOTICE, #221 NOTICE, #222 NOTICE, #223 NOTICE, #224 NOTICE, #225 NOTICE, #226 NOTICE, #227 NOTICE, #228 NOTICE, #229 NOTICE, #230 NOTICE, #231 NOTICE, #232 NOTICE, #233 NOTICE, #234 NOTICE, #235 NOTICE, #236 NOTICE, #237 NOTICE, #238 NOTICE, #239 NOTICE, #240 NOTICE, #241 MOTION, #242 NOTICE) (jwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2017: #243 NOTICE, #244 NOTICE, #245 NOTICE, #246 NOTICE, #247 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #248 REPORT, #249 MOTION, #250 NOTICE, #251 NOTICE, #252 Joint MOTION, #253 NOTICE, #254 Joint MOTION, #255 MOTION, #256 MOTION, #257 Joint MOTION, #258 MOTION, #259 MOTION, #260 MOTION, #261 MOTION, #262 MOTION, #263 NOTICE, #264 NOTICE, #265 MOTION, #266 NOTICE, #267 MOTION, #268 MOTION, #269 NOTICE, #270 NOTICE, #271 Joint Memorandum, #272 Joint Memorandum, #273 NOTICE, #274 Joint MOTION, #275 NOTICE, #276 Memorandum, #277 MOTION, #278 REPLY, #279 REPLY, #280 REPLY, #281 REPLY, #282 REPLY, #283 NOTICE, #284 EXHIBIT, #285 MDL Transfer Order, #286 Docket Entry Correction) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF CONNECTICUT et al v. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
Represented By: PARRELL D. GROSSMAN
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: KIMBERLEY A. D'ARRUDA
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: JESSICA V. SUTTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: ROBERT CARY
Represented By: JUSTIN R. ERICKSON
Represented By: JAMES CANADAY
Represented By: JOSEPH C. MEYER
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: ERIN R ELDRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. FRASER
Represented By: LIZABETH A. BRADY
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: ANTONIA CARABILLO CONTI
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: MICHAEL E. COLE
Represented By: RACHEL O DAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: BRIAN F. JORDAN
Represented By: BETH A. FINNERTY
Represented By: THOMAS N. ANGER
Represented By: MATTHEW K. MCKINLEY
Represented By: EDWARD J. OLSZEWSKI
Represented By: JAMES C. ROBERTS
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: JILL S. ABRAMS
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: ERICA A. KOSCHER
Represented By: MICHAEL JASON HEMKER
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: TRAVIS A. KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEVADA
Represented By: SHERI ANN FORBES
Represented By: LUCAS J. TUCKER
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: COLLIN M. KESSNER
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: SHEREECE DENDY-SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: KATHERINE A. CAMPBELL
Represented By: BYRON D. HADLEY
Represented By: CHERYL FAYE HIEMSTRA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: SARAH OXENHAM ALLEN
Represented By: TYLER T. HENRY
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES T. SHEARIN
Represented By: D. JARRETT ARP
Represented By: NATHANIEL JOHN GENTILE
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: MELANIE L. KATSUR
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BRETT LEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: JENNIFER H. HUNT
Represented By: ABIGAIL L. SMITH
Represented By: DEVIN MICHAEL LAIHO
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYNE PHARMA (USA), INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: SEAN R. HIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: JOHN R. TENNIS
Represented By: SCHONETTE J WALKER
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: CHADWICK O. BROOKER
Represented By: ROBERT W. PRATT
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: DANA R. VOGEL
Represented By: NANCY M. BONNELL
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: TRACY W. WERTZ
Represented By: JENNIFER J. KIRK
Represented By: JOSEPH STEPHEN BETSKO
Represented By: ABIGAIL U. WOOD
Represented By: JENNIFER JANE KIRK
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: BILLINGTON M. GARRETT
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: WAYNE A. MACK
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: WILLIAM T. MATLACK
Represented By: MATTHEW M. LYONS
Represented By: CAROL E. HEAD
Represented By: MICHAEL B. MACKENZIE
Represented By: DANIEL H. LEFF
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: LAYNE M. LINDEBAK
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: MAX M. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: GWENDOLYN J. COOLEY
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: CRYSTAL UTLEY SECOY
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: RACHEL A. IRWIN
Represented By: JULIE A. BAYS
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: CALEB J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: DAVID N. SONNENREICH
Represented By: EDWARD T VASQUEZ
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: ADAM K. LEVIN
Represented By: JOHN ROBERT ROBERTSON
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: MITCHELL E. ZAMOFF
Represented By: JUSTIN W. BERNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITRON PHARMA, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: KRYSTYNA BLAKESLEE
Represented By: CHRISTINE C. LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: J. DAVID MCDOWELL
Represented By: CYNTHIA E. KINSER
Represented By: ERIN F. MERRICK
Represented By: ROBERT BRANT HARRELL
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: D. J. PASCOE
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: LYNETTE R. BAKKER
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: RUSSELL M. SMITH, JR.
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: JODIE E. VANWERT
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: MICHAEL CLARKE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. UNDORF
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: AMANDA J. LEE
Represented By: JUSTIN G. HAZLETT
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: TAMARA L. WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: STACIE LAMBERT DEBLIEUX
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: CHRISTINA M. MOYLAN
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: ROBERT L. HUBBARD
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: CHARLES R. MUNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: JOHN K OLSON
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: RODNEY I. KIMURA
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: BROOKSLEY C. BELANGER
Represented By: JENNIFER FOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: LEEANNE APPLEGATE
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: CLARK C. KIRKLAND, JR.
Represented By: LAURA JOHNSON MARTELLA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: REBECCA MAGILL MCCORMACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: CHERYL LEE JOHNSON
Represented By: PAULA LAUREN GIBSON
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: DOAN-PHUONG PAMELA PHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: JILL M. O'TOOLE
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: THOMAS J. AMBURGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JAY OWEN
Represented By: ANDREW J. EWALT
Represented By: ELLEN R. CLARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: MICHAEL SCHWALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ALASKA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: JULIA C. METZGER
Represented By: MARGARET PATON WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WYOMING
Represented By: W. JOSEPH NIELSEN
Represented By: BENJAMIN M BURNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MARGUERITE M. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ALLYSON M. MALTAS
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANNA PARVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL LACOVARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: WILLIAM GORDON DOBIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATISH MEHTA
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MARGUERITE M. SULLIVAN
Represented By: ALLYSON M. MALTAS
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANNA PARVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL LACOVARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: ADAM K. LEVIN
Represented By: JOHN ROBERT ROBERTSON
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: MITCHELL E. ZAMOFF
Represented By: JUSTIN W. BERNICK
Represented By: ROBERT M. LANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: JAMES T. MCKEOWN
Represented By: JOHN F. NAGLE
Represented By: JAMES W. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJIV MALIK
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: ROBERT J. CLEARY
Represented By: EDWARD J. CANTER
Represented By: DAVID A. MUNKITTRICK
Represented By: DIETRICH L. SNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: ANDREW S WELLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Represented By: KIM E. RINEHART
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: SEAN R. HIGGINS
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL LITIGATION
Represented By: CARL J HAMMAKER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: ROBERT L. HUBBARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?