NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND and THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200
Defendant: JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Petitioner: THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND
In Re: REMICADE ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Interested Party: THE KROGER CO and WALGREEN CO
Case Number: 2:2017cv04326
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: J CURTIS JOYNER
Referring Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Filing 181 NOTICE of Change of Address by DENNIS STEWART(STEWART, DENNIS)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER THAT JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSEN BIOTECH, INC.'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF JONATHAN H. HATCH AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/3/22.8/3/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
August 2, 2022 Filing 179 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jonathan H. Hatch filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WINGFIELD, ELIZABETH)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION IS GRANTED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. A FINAL APPROVAL HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/27/23 AT 2:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/2/22. 8/2/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
August 2, 2022 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/2/22. 8/2/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
July 28, 2022 Filing 176 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Motion Hearing held on 7/28/22 re #172 MOTION for Settlement [Plaintiffs' Uncontested Motion for an Order: (1) Certifying a Settlement Class; (2) Granting Preliminary Approval of the Settlement Agreement; (3) Appointing Class Counsel; (4) Appointing a Settlement Administrator and E filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND Court Reporter: MAUREEN MCHUGH. (JL)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC.'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF JONAH M. KNOBLER AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/29/22.6/30/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(mbh) Modified on 6/30/2022 (fdc).
June 28, 2022 Filing 174 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney JONAH M. KNOBLER filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WINGFIELD, ELIZABETH)
June 27, 2022 DOC. NO. 173 MAILED TO ATTY KNOBLER ON 6/27/2022. (md)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR IN COURTROOM 15B ON 7/28/22 AT 10:00 AM FOR A HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/24/22. 6/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
April 18, 2022 DOC. NO. 171 MAILED TO ATTY KNOBLER ON 4/18/2022. (md)
April 15, 2022 Filing 172 MOTION for Settlement [Plaintiffs' Uncontested Motion for an Order: (1) Certifying a Settlement Class; (2) Granting Preliminary Approval of the Settlement Agreement; (3) Appointing Class Counsel; (4) Appointing a Settlement Administrator and Escrow Agent; (5) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice to the Settlement Class; (6) Preliminarily Approving the Plan of Allocation and Distribution; and (7) Scheduling a Fairness Hearing] filed by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix A - End-Payor/Indirect Purchaser Generic Suppression Cases, #3 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #4 Exhibit Bernay Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Class Action Settlement, #5 Exhibit Stipulation Exhibit A - [Proposed] Plan of Allocation and Distribution, #6 Exhibit Stipulation Exhibit B - [Proposed] Class Settlement Preliminary Approval Order, #7 Exhibit Stipulation Exhibit C - Form of Summary Notice of Settlement, #8 Exhibit Stipulation Exhibit D - Form of Long-Form Notice of Settlement, #9 Exhibit Stipulation Exhibit E - [Proposed] Form of Judgment, #10 Exhibit Bernay Exhibit 2 - Robbins Geller Rudman and Dowd LLP firm resume, #11 Declaration of Carla A. Peak in Support of Settlement Notice Plan, #12 Exhibit Peak Exhibit 1 - Gilardi & Co., LLC CV)(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING #169 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY ATTORNEY JAKE WALTER'WARNER TERMINATED; GRANTING #170 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY ATTORNEY NATHAN MONROE-YAVNEH TERMINATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 04/13/2022.04/14/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mr)
April 12, 2022 Filing 170 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nathan Monroe-Yavneh filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WINGFIELD, ELIZABETH)
April 12, 2022 Filing 169 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jake Walter-Warner filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WINGFIELD, ELIZABETH)
February 25, 2022 DOC 168 MAILED TO COUNSEL (rf, )
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 V. JOHNSON & JOHNSON ET AL. (#17-5481) AS A MEMBER CASE. THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS FURTHER DIRECTED TO MOVE THE PARTIES AND ATTORNEYS TO THE LEAD CASE. 2. IT IS ORDERED THE ATTORNEYS IN THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 MEMBER CASE SHALL ONLY FILE DOCUMENTS IN THE LEAD CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/17/22. 2/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL. (jaa, )
February 17, 2022 Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Status Conference BY PHONE held on 2/16/22. (JL)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Order #166 mailed to Knobler. (fdc)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE WITH THE PARTIES ON 2/16/2022 AT 4:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/15/22. 2/15/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTY AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
January 24, 2022 DOC. 165 MAILED TO COUNSEL WITHOUT EMAIL ADDRESSES. (sg)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF DANIELLE QUINN AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/21/22.1/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTY AND E-MAILED.(mbh)
January 19, 2022 Filing 164 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DANIELLE C. QUINN filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WINGFIELD, ELIZABETH)
December 10, 2021 PAPER #163 MAILED TO UNREPS (JL )
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SONI LAHR-PASTOR, ESQUIRE (DOC #99) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JEFFREY CAO, ESQUIRE (DOC #162) AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF CAROL WIELAND, ESQUIRE (DOC #162) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/9/21.12/9/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTY AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 162 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15599439.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(WINGFIELD, ELIZABETH)
December 6, 2021 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH WINGFIELD on behalf of JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (WINGFIELD, ELIZABETH)
November 30, 2021 DOC #160 MAILED TO COUNSEL (rf, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 4/1/2022. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANY AND ALL DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 12/16/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/29/21. 11/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTY AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 159 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON Status Conference by phone held on 11/29/21. (mbh, )
November 29, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/4/2022. (mbh, )
November 24, 2021 Copy of Doc. 158 mailed to Counsel. (mas, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL HOLD A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE WITH THE PARTIES ON 11/29/2021 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 11/23/21. 11/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED AND EMAILED(mbh, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 157 Letter dated November 18, 2021 by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
November 8, 2021 Filing 156 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL P. OLS on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN(BENNETT, NATALIE) Modified on 11/9/2021 (lisad, ).
November 5, 2021 Filing 155 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW VAHEY on behalf of JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON(VAHEY, MATTHEW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 154 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN(BENNETT, NATALIE)
August 13, 2021 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(COUGHLIN, PATRICK)
August 5, 2021 Filing 152 NOTICE by THE KROGER CO, WALGREEN CO to Judge Curtis Joyner of related cases transferred to Judge Marston. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON DOCUMENT). (PERWIN, SCOTT) Modified on 8/6/2021 (fb).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES IN THE ABOVE CASES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT BY 8/13/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/2/21. 8/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/29/21. 7/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 23, 2021 PLEADING #149 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NATHAN MONROE-YAVNEH, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND NATHAN MONROE-YAVNEH, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED LEAVE TO PRACTICE BEFORE THIS CASE PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS ACTION ONLY PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/21/21. 6/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 6/23/2021 (fb). Modified on 6/23/2021 (mbh, ). (FILED IN ERROR AS DUPLICATE FILING OF #147)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S MOTION #144 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMSSION OF DANHUI XU, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/22/21.6/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S MOTION #143 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMSSION OF NATHAN MONROE-YAVNEH, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/22/21.6/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S MOTION #142 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMSSION OF JEFFREY KINKLE, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/22/21.6/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S MOTION #141 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMSSION OF EMMA ELLMAN-GOLAN, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/22/21.6/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
June 21, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Danhui Xu ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15201638.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
June 21, 2021 Filing 143 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Nathan Monroe-Yavneh ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15201502.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
June 21, 2021 Filing 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Jeffrey Kinkle ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15201440.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
June 21, 2021 Filing 141 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Emma Ellman-Golan ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15201331.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER #140 MAILED TO ATTYS. (fdc)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOL FOR CONDUCTING REMOTE DEPOSITIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/8/21. 6/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 27, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 139 HAS BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL. (bw, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/3/21. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANY AND ALL DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 8/15/2022.SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/26/21. 4/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 138 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding a Revised Pretrial Schedule)(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
March 15, 2021 Filing 137 NOTICE of Change of Address by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT(FINKELMAN BENNETT, NATALIE)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF JULIA R. LIVINGSTON AS COUNSEL AND JULIA R. LIVINGSTON IS GIVEN LEAVE TO WITHDRAW HER APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/21/21.1/21/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 135 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF BENJAMIN F. JACKSON AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED AND BENJAMIN F. JACKSON IS GIVEN LEAVE TO WITHDRAW HIS APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/15/21.1/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 133 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
October 6, 2020 DOC 130 MAILED ON 10/6/2020 (kp, )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED AND BCBSMA IS DIRECTED TO PRODUCE ALL RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT NOTHING IN THIS ORDER SHALL SUPERSEDE ANY AGREEMENT BETWEEN DEFENDANTS AND BCBSMA REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 7/1/20.7/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION to Compel filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE REQUIREMENTS OF STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGED MATERIAL IS PARTIALLY SUSPENDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/30/20. 3/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 3/31/2020 (mbh, ). Filed in error, duplicate of order of (Doc. #129).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE REQUIREMENTS OF STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGED MATERIAL IS PARTIALLY SUSPENDED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/30/20. 3/30/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED.(fdc)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S ORDER TO EXTEND ALL DEADLINES IN THE PRETRIAL SCHEDULE BY FOUR WEEKS, DATED 3/16/20 (CASE NO. 17-CV-4180, DOC. NO. 145), IS AMENDED SO THAT ALL DEADLINES ARE FURTHER EXTENDED BY FIFTY-FIVE DAYS, AS SET FORTH IN EXHIBIT A APPENDED HERETO).SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/24/20. 3/26/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED.(fdc)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND ALL DEADLINES IN THE PRETRIAL SCHEDULE BY FOUR WEEKS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 03/17/2020. 03/18/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ABIGAIL E. MARION, ESQUIRE TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANTS IN THIS ACTION ONLY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 2/5/20. 2/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (W/ECF APPLICATION) AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Abigail E. Marion ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14090348.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
January 24, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. OLS on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN with Certificate of Service(OLS, MICHAEL)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' #118 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIELLE C. QUINN, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/15/20. 1/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO QUINN.(fdc)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' #119 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JAKE WALTER-WERNER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/15/20.1/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED WALTER-WERNER. (fdc)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' #120 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JULIA R. LIVINGSTON, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/15/20.1/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO LIVINGSTON. (fdc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Julia Livingston ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14025547.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
January 7, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Jake Walter-Warner ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14025544.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
January 7, 2020 Filing 118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Danielle C. Quinn ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14025524.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S #116 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NOLAN C. KNIGHT, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/17/19.12/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO KNIGHT. (fdc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nolan C. Knight ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13976618.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #109 MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS CONCERNING PAYER CONTRACTS FOR REMICADE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DEFENDANTS ARE DIRECTED TO PRODUCE EMAILS AND EMAIL ATTACHMENTS CONCERNING CONTRACTS RELATING TO REMICADE OR INFLIXIMAB WITH UP TO EIGHT (8) THIRD-PARTY PAYORS AND FROM NO MORE THAN 8 OF THE REQUESTED DOCUMENT CUSTODIANS (INCLUDING ANY OF THEIR PREDECESSORS AND/OR SUCCESSORS) OF PLAINTIFF'S CHOOSING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/21/19.11/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 115 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Concerning Payer Contracts for Remicade (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (lvj, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 113 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #109 Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents Concerning Payer Contracts for Remicade. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (fdc) (lvj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Declaration sealed document, #2 Declaration sealed document, #3 Declaration sealed document) (lvj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2019: #4 Declaration sealed document, #5 Exhibit sealed document, #6 Exhibit sealed document, #7 Exhibit sealed document, #8 Exhibit sealed document, #9 Exhibit sealed document, #10 Exhibit sealed document, #11 Exhibit sealed document, #12 Exhibit sealed document, #13 Exhibit sealed document, #14 Exhibit sealed document, #15 Exhibit sealed document, #16 Exhibit sealed document, #17 Exhibit sealed document, #18 Exhibit sealed document, #19 Exhibit sealed document) (lvj, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Compel filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Barsky-Harlan, #2 Declaration of Matthew Hales, #3 Declaration of Brian Kish, #4 Declaration of Adeel Mangi, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15)(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ARTHUR L. SHINGLER, III, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. ARTHUR L. SHINGLER, III, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE BEFORE THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE FOR THIS ACTION ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/13/19. 11/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 [Notice of Withdrawal of The Welfare Fund of Plumbers Local Union No. 200 as a Named Plaintiff and Proposed Class Representative] (BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
November 4, 2019 Filing 109 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Memorandum sealed document, #2 Declaration sealed document, #3 Text of Proposed Order sealed document) (lvj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #4 Exhibit sealed document, #5 Exhibit sealed document, #6 Exhibit sealed document, #7 Exhibit sealed document, #8 Exhibit sealed document, #9 Exhibit sealed document, #10 Exhibit sealed document, #11 Exhibit sealed document, #12 Exhibit sealed document, #13 Exhibit sealed document) (lvj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #14 Exhibit sealed document, #15 Exhibit sealed document, #16 Exhibit sealed document, #17 Exhibit sealed document, #18 Exhibit sealed document, #19 Exhibit sealed document, #20 Exhibit sealed document, #21 Exhibit sealed document, #22 Exhibit sealed document, #23 Exhibit sealed document) (lvj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #24 Exhibit sealed document, #25 Exhibit sealed document, #26 Exhibit sealed document, #27 Exhibit sealed document, #28 Exhibit sealed document, #29 Exhibit sealed document, #30 Exhibit sealed document, #31 Exhibit sealed document, #32 Exhibit sealed document, #33 Exhibit sealed document, #34 Exhibit sealed document) (lvj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #35 Exhibit sealed document, #36 Exhibit sealed document, #37 Exhibit sealed document, #38 Exhibit sealed document, #39 Exhibit sealed document, #40 Exhibit sealed document, #41 Exhibit sealed document, #42 Exhibit sealed document) (lvj, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #43 Exhibit sealed document, #44 Exhibit sealed document, #45 Exhibit sealed document, #46 Exhibit sealed document, #47 Exhibit sealed document, #48 Exhibit sealed document, #49 Exhibit sealed document, #50 Exhibit sealed document, #51 Exhibit sealed document, #52 Exhibit sealed document) (lvj, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Change of Address by JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 10/22/20, MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 11/19/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/2/19. 10/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Change of Address by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT(BENNETT, NATALIE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND of Change of Firm Affiliation (STEWART, DENNIS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 104 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Pretrial Schedule to Extend the Deadlines by Four Months. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (fdc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #1 Declaration sealed document) (lvj, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 103 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER REGARDING NONPARTY-DESIGNATED MATERIALS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 6/4/19. 6/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND JEREMY D. FARRIS, ESQ., IS GIVEN LEAVE TO WITHDRAW HIS APPEARNCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF WILL CONTINUE TO BE REPRESENTED IN THIS MATTER BY ITS REMAINING COUNSEL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/15/19.4/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 4/17/2019 (jaa, ).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER THAT MOTION IS GRANTED AND STEPHANIE TEPLIN, ESQ. IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF DEFTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSEEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH L.R.C.P. 83.5.2.SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/15/19.4/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ECF FORM MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 4/17/19)(kw, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LESLIE E. JOHN FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JONAH KNOBLER IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 4/15/19. 4/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie Teplin ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13452811.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Jonah M. Knobler ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13380007.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
February 14, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DEBORAH R. GROSS on behalf of THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND(GROSS, DEBORAH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(JOHN, LESLIE)
January 18, 2019 Filing 95 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur L. Shingler, III by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.. (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE) Modified on 1/22/2019 (mbh, ). Pro Hac Vice Fee Letter sent to Arthur L. Shingler, III on 1/18/19. (FEE PAID 01/31/19) Modified on 2/1/2019 (nd, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Jeremy Farris filed by THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200..(FARRIS, JEREMY)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON OR BEFORE 1/15/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/17/18. 12/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MAY ANSWER THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/23/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/17/18. 12/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' SHAM LITIGATION AND WALKER PROCESS CLAIMS AND THEIR CLAIMS UNDER THE CONSUMER PROTECTION STATUTES OF RHODE ISLAND AND NEW YORK ARE DISMISSED. FOR ALL OTHER CLAIMS, J&J'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/4/2018. 12/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/4/2018. 12/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, [Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/14/18. 11/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOL FOR COLLECTION AND PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND PAPER DOCUMENTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/14/18. 11/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOL FOR PRIVILEGED MATERIAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/14/18. 11/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE NON-DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION REGARDING EXPERT WITNESSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/14/18. 11/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT THAT DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC.'S #83 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF BENJAMIN F. JACKSON, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/25/18.10/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION & COPY OF ORDER MAILED TO JACKSON (fdc) Modified on 10/29/2018 (lisad, ).
October 24, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Benjamin Jackson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13130902.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 6/22/20, MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 7/14/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/4/18. 10/4/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
September 25, 2018 Filing 81 STATUS REPORT /Joint Case Management Status Report by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND GEORGE A. LOBIONDO, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 9/13/18.9/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND MAILED/EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 9/13/2018 (jaa, ).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 9/28/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 8/30/18. 8/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
August 11, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of George LoBiondo ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12979420.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF 7/11/18 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE APPEARANCE OF JAMISON DAVIES AS COUNSEL (DOC. NO. 76); IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: J. CURTIS JOYNER. 7/12/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
July 11, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(DAVIES, JAMISON)
June 25, 2018 Filing 75 REPLY Memorandum of Law in Support re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Indirect Purchasers' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (JOHN, LESLIE) Modified on 6/26/2018 (lisad, ).
June 13, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, [Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority] (BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
May 24, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaints] filed by LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND, NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ASHLEY E. BASS, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND ASHLEY E. BASS, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/21/18. 5/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (mbh)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER THAT MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF THOMAS O. BARNETT, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND THOMAS O. BARNETT, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 5/21/18. 5/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ).
April 20, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Ashley Bass ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12761877.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
April 20, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Barnett ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12761855.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
April 16, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN As To Plaintiff Twin Cities Pipe Trades Welfare Fund(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
April 9, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Errata D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHN, LESLIE)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF FRANK T. DAVIS, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND FRANK T. DAVIS, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/19/18. 3/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NICHOLAS T. HART, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND NICHOLAS T. HART, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/19/18. 3/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JEREMY D. FARRIS, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND JEREMY D. FARRIS, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/19/18. 3/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF CHARLES R. PEIFER, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND CHARLES R. PEIFER, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/19/18. 3/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JOSEPH GOLDBERG, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND JOSEPH GOLDBERG, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/19/18. 3/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF VINCENT J. WARD, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND VINCENT J. WARD, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/19/18. 3/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION SHALL NOW BE CAPTIONED AS "IN RE REMICADE (INDIRECT PURCHASER) ANTITRUST LITIGATION." EVERY DOCUMENT FILED IN TRHIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION SHALL BEAR THE ABOVE CAPTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 3/19/18. 3/22/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 13, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Frank T. Davis ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12682602.) filed by THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
March 13, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas T. Hart ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12682588.) filed by THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
March 13, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy D. Farris ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12682564.) filed by THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
March 13, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Charles R. Peifer ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12682542.) filed by THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
March 13, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Goldberg ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12682526.) filed by THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
March 13, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Vincent J. Ward ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12682508.) filed by THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
February 21, 2018 Filing 53 Consolidated Amended Complaint against JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC and JOHNSON & JOHNSON filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.(mbh, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT /Joint Rule 26(f) Report by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Proposed Deadlines)(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
February 16, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND (STREET, WHITNEY)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 23(g)(3) OF THE FRCP, THE COURT HEREBY APPOINTS ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD, PP. AS PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN OF SHEPHERD FINKELMAN, MILLER & SHAH, LLC AS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/22/18. 1/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 23, 2018 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/22/18. 1/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DENNIS STEWART, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND DENNIS STEWART IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WIT5H LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/8/18. 1/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ).
January 2, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Dennis Stewart filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE) Modified on 1/4/2018 (mbh, ). (Fee paid on 1/3/18)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRIAN O. O'MARA, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND BRIAN O. O'MARA, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/20/17. 12/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DAVID W. MITCHELL, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND DAVID W. MITCHELL, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL WITH JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVL PROCEDURE 83.5.2. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/20/17. 12/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 19, 2017 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Support re #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COUGHLIN, PATRICK)
December 19, 2017 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Class Counsel, #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLP as Interim Liaison Counsel filed BY TWIN CITIES PIPE TRADES WELFARE FUND and filed by THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND, UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND. (ASCIOLLA, GREGORY)
December 19, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian O. O'Mara filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, Certificate of Service. (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE) Modified on 12/20/2017 (fb). (fee paid on 12/21/17)
December 19, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David W. Mitchell filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Certificate of Service.(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE) Modified on 12/21/2017 (mbh, ). (fee paid on 12/21/17)
December 12, 2017 Filing 40 APPLICATION/PETITION TO APPOINT WHITNEY E. STREET OF BLOCK & LEVITON LLP TO PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE by THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(STREET, WHITNEY)
December 12, 2017 Filing 39 Memorandum in Support re #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Class Counsel (Hulett Harper Stewart LLP's Statement in Support of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LPP for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel) filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
December 12, 2017 Filing 38 Memorandum In Support re #36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Class Counsel, #37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLP as Interim Liaison Counsel filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
December 12, 2017 Filing 37 Application to Appoint Counsel Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLP as Interim Liaison Counsel filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFMS Firm Resume, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE) Modified on 12/13/2017 (fb).
December 12, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Memorandum, Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in support thereof, #2 Exhibit A - RGRD Firm Resume, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COUGHLIN, PATRICK)
December 12, 2017 Filing 35 Application to Appoint Counsel Gregory S. Asciolla of Labaton Sucharow LLP to Plaintiffs Steering Committee filed by UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gregory S. Asciolla In Support of Application to Appoint Gregory S. Asciolla of Labaton Sucharow LLP to Plaintiffs Steering Committee, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Gregory S. Asciolla - Firm Resume for Labaton Sucharow LLP, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, AUSTIN) Modified on 12/13/2017 (fb).
December 12, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Gregory S. Asciolla of Labaton Sucharow LLP to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND.Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory S. Asciolla in Support of Application to Appoint Gregory S. Asciolla of Labaton Sucharow LLP to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, #2 Exhibit Declaration - Labaton Sucharow LLP Firm Resume, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #35 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY). (COHEN, AUSTIN) Modified on 12/13/2017 (fb).
December 12, 2017 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(JOHN, LESLIE)
December 11, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE by THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND Compliance with Statutes Requiring Notice of Filing of Lawsuit to States' Attorneys General (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Certificate of Service)(GROSS, DEBORAH) Modified on 12/13/2017 (ti, ).
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF WILLIAM F. CAVANAUGH, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND WILLIAM F. CAVANAUGH IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/28/17. 11/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ADEEL MANGI, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND ADEEL MANGI IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/28/17. 11/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE JONATHAN H. HATCH, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND JONATHAN H. HATACH, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/28/17. 11/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JAMISON DAVIES, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND JAMISON DAVIES, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/28/17. 11/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF LESLIE E. JOHN, ESQUIRE FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SARA A. ARROW, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND SARA A. ARROW IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE BEFORE THIS COURT AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. FOR PURPOSES OF THIS ACTION ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/28/17. 11/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 27, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of William F. Cavanaugh ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12476641.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 21, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Adeel Mangi ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12471600.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 21, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Hatch ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12471595.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 21, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Jamison Davies ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12471586.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 21, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Sara Arrow ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12471583.) filed by JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON..(JOHN, LESLIE)
November 21, 2017 Filing 21 JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SERVICE, CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM COUNSEL, AND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 11/21/17. 11/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW VAHEY on behalf of JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (VAHEY, MATTHEW)
November 20, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by LESLIE E. JOHN on behalf of JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (JOHN, LESLIE)
November 3, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by CARMEN A. MEDICI on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN with Certificate of Service(MEDICI, CARMEN)
November 3, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. COUGHLIN on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN with Certificate of Service(COUGHLIN, PATRICK)
November 3, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA S. BERNAY on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN with Certificate of Service(BERNAY, ALEXANDRA)
November 3, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDI D. BANDMAN on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN with Certificate of Service(BANDMAN, RANDI)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF CARMEN A. MEDICI, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND CARMEN A. MEDICI, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN FOR THIS PURPOSE ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/25/17. 10/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF PATRICK J. COUGHLIN, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND PATRICK J. COUGHLIN, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN FOR THIS PURPOSE ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/25/17. 10/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ALEXANDRA S. BERNAY, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND ALEXANDRA S. BERNAY, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN FOR THIS PURPOSE ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/25/17. 10/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF RANDI D. BANDMAN, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED AND RANDI D. BANDMAN, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN FOR THIS PURPOSE ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/25/17. 10/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 18, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Carmen A. Medici filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BENNETT, NATALIE) Modified on 10/19/2017 (mbh, ).(fee paid on 10/19/17)
October 18, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Coughlin filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BENNETT, NATALIE) Modified on 10/19/2017 (mbh, ).(fee paid on 10/19/17)
October 18, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra S. Bernay filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BENNETT, NATALIE) Modified on 10/19/2017 (mbh, ).(fee paid on 10/19/17)
October 18, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Randi D. Bandman filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BENNETT, NATALIE) Modified on 10/19/2017 (mbh, ). (fee paid on 10/19/17)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANTS HAVE TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 11/28/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 10/16/17. 10/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN re: Albert G. Mentz served Summons and Complaint upon JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. by Personal Service. JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017. (BENNETT, NATALIE)
October 16, 2017 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Jocelyn Hester by Personal Service on 10/05/2017, SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN served Summons and Complaint upon JOHNSON & JOHNSON. JOHNSON & JOHNSON served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017. (BENNETT, NATALIE)
October 4, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN on behalf of NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN with Certificate of Service(GOLDSTEIN, JAYNE)
September 28, 2017 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN.(BENNETT, NATALIE)
September 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN, JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-12356707.), filed by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(BENNETT, NATALIE)
September 28, 2017 Summons Issued as to JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/28/17 (jwl, )
September 28, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN. (jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM F. CAVANAUGH, JR.
Represented By: THOMAS O. BARNETT
Represented By: JAMISON DAVIES
Represented By: MATTHEW VAHEY
Represented By: JONAH M. KNOBLER
Represented By: SARA A. ARROW
Represented By: ABIGAIL E. MARION
Represented By: STEPHANIE TEPLIN
Represented By: JAKE WALTER-WARNER
Represented By: NOLAN C. KNIGHT
Represented By: DANIELLE C. QUINN
Represented By: GEORGE A. LOBIONDO
Represented By: JULIA R. LIVINGSTON
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN H. HATCH
Represented By: ASHLEY E. BASS
Represented By: ADEEL A. MANGI
Represented By: LESLIE E. JOHN
Represented By: DANHUI XU
Represented By: EMMA ELLMAN-GOLAN
Represented By: JEFFREY F. KINKLE
Represented By: NATHAN MONROE-YAVNEH
Represented By: CAROL WEILAND
Represented By: ELIZABETH WINGFIELD
Represented By: JEFFREY CAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: WILLIAM F. CAVANAUGH, JR.
Represented By: THOMAS O. BARNETT
Represented By: JAMISON DAVIES
Represented By: MATTHEW VAHEY
Represented By: JONAH M. KNOBLER
Represented By: SARA A. ARROW
Represented By: ABIGAIL E. MARION
Represented By: STEPHANIE TEPLIN
Represented By: JAKE WALTER-WARNER
Represented By: NOLAN C. KNIGHT
Represented By: DANIELLE C. QUINN
Represented By: GEORGE A. LOBIONDO
Represented By: JULIA R. LIVINGSTON
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JACKSON
Represented By: JONATHAN H. HATCH
Represented By: ASHLEY E. BASS
Represented By: ADEEL A. MANGI
Represented By: LESLIE E. JOHN
Represented By: DANHUI XU
Represented By: EMMA ELLMAN-GOLAN
Represented By: JEFFREY F. KINKLE
Represented By: NATHAN MONROE-YAVNEH
Represented By: CAROL WEILAND
Represented By: ELIZABETH WINGFIELD
Represented By: JEFFREY CAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL EMPLOYEES HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: ROSS E. ELFAND
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Represented By: ALEXANDRA S. BERNAY
Represented By: DAVID W. MITCHELL
Represented By: BRIAN O. O'MARA
Represented By: MICHAEL P. OLS
Represented By: DEBORAH R. GROSS
Represented By: PATRICK J. COUGHLIN
Represented By: RANDI D. BANDMAN
Represented By: ARTHUR L. SHINGLER, III
Represented By: CARMEN A. MEDICI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOCAL 295 IBT EMPLOYER GROUP WELFARE FUND
Represented By: ROSS E. ELFAND
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Represented By: ALEXANDRA S. BERNAY
Represented By: DENNIS STEWART
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: PATRICK J. COUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE WELFARE FUND OF PLUMBERS LOCAL UNION NO. 200
Represented By: ROSS E. ELFAND
Represented By: NICHOLAS T. HART
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Represented By: VINCENT J. WARD
Represented By: ALEXANDRA S. BERNAY
Represented By: JEREMY D. FARRIS
Represented By: FRANK T. DAVIS, JR
Represented By: JOSEPH GOLDBERG
Represented By: CHARLES R. PEIFER
Represented By: JAYNE A. GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE CITY OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: WHITNEY E. STREET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: REMICADE ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: THE KROGER CO
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WALGREEN CO
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?