THE KROGER CO. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P. and THE KROGER CO.
Defendant: PLIVA, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., SANDOZ, INC., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., MYLAN N.V., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., APOTEX CORP., MYLAN INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, AKORN, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, G&W LABORATORIES, INC. and OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00284
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Outside the State of PA.
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO..Notice.(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 12/18/2019 (kp, ).
November 13, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA PENG on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(PENG, VICTORIA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #185 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (BECKER, RYAN)
September 26, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL E. HERRMANN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HERRMANN, KARL)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANY OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO AMEND NO LATER THAN 10/4/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/12/2019. 9/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1081 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH C. SILBER on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. (SILBER, SETH)
September 4, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by CHUL PAK on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. (PAK, CHUL)
September 4, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY C. BANK on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC. (BANK, JEFFREY)
August 30, 2019 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO... (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Complaint Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MATTHEW C LAMB on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC(LAMB, MATTHEW)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/15/2019. 7/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1071 IN 16-MD-2724)
August 15, 2019 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/15/2019. 8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 1070 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.(ZASTROW, DENNIE)
July 1, 2019 Filing 180 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Corporacion Quimico Farmaceutica Esteve, SA with Certificate of Service by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(MAHONEY, STACEY)
June 18, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMON W. SUDEN on behalf of MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(SUDEN, DAMON)
June 18, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR on behalf of MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(ESCOBAR, WILLIAM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD KATZ on behalf of MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WOCKHARDT USA LLC with Certificate of Service(KATZ, CLIFFORD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 176 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF #91 /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. filed by TELIGENT, INC.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (kp, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 175 REPLY to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION to Dismiss /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. / Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaint Against Teligent, Inc. filed by TELIGENT, INC.. (MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
June 13, 2019 Filing 174 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP.. (MATTHEWS, JAMES)
June 13, 2019 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.. (EVERETT, J.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (CHAPMAN, JULIA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 171 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA. (REED, STEVEN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 170 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Humana Inc. and Kroger Co. complaints filed by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
June 13, 2019 Filing 169 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Kroger Plaintiffs' and Humana, Inc.'s Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (BLAD, LEIV)
June 13, 2019 Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints) filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (JACOBSEN, RAYMOND)
June 13, 2019 Filing 167 Memorandum / Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support re #78 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (LEVINE, JAN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by G&W LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.. (PARISH, JASON)
June 13, 2019 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNT ONE OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY THE KROGER PLAINTIFFS filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC.. (ARTH, GERALD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
June 13, 2019 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss (Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) filed by OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC. (LAMB, MATTHEW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by COURTNEY B AVERBACH on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AVERBACH, COURTNEY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J SHERIDAN on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER M DRISCOLL on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRISCOLL, JENNIFER)
May 14, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C BERNASCONI on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BERNASCONI, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, EDWARD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN T. FEENEY on behalf of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. (FEENEY, BRIAN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET)
May 8, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA C CROUSHORE on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(CROUSHORE, AMANDA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(SCHMIDTLEIN, JOHN)
May 8, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH F. TEICH on behalf of PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(TEICH, SARAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 144 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO VALEANT AND OCEANSIDE'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER AND KROGER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS. (RELATES TO CIVIL ACTION NOS. 18-2641 AND 18-284) (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 143 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO IMPAX LABORATORIES INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER, KROGER, AND HUMANA COMPLAINTS filed by PLAINTIFFS. (RELATES TO 18-2641, 18-284, 18-3299) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 142 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT G & W LABORATORIES INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASER AND KROGER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS filed by PLAINTIFFS. (RELATES TO CIVIL ACTION NOS. 18-2641, 18-284) (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) Planitiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Individual Motion to Dismiss Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Perrigo New York Inc.'s Individual Motion to Dismiss filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #95 MOTION to Dismiss, #74 MOTION to Dismiss (Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Valeant and Oceanside's Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints Plaintiffs' Joint Response to Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNT ONE OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY THE KROGER PLAINTIFFS Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Lannett's Individual Motion to Dismiss filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser, Kroger and Humana Complaints filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USAs Individual Motion to Dismiss filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant G&W Laboratories Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Humana Inc. and Kroger Co. complaints, #91 MOTION to Dismiss /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc., #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Kroger Plaintiffs' and Humana, Inc.'s Overarching Conspiracy Claims Plaintiff Humana Inc.'s and The Kroger Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss by (1) Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., (2) Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., and (3) Teligent, Inc. filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apotex Corp.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Kroger Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Joint Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
April 30, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS AND DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SET-ASIDE ORDERS IS GRANTED. ANY RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5/15/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/29/2019. 4/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 972 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCCONNELL, SEAN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by ARIO FAZLI on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(FAZLI, ARIO)
April 17, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. ARGYLE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(ARGYLE, BENJAMIN)
April 17, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by LISA JOSE FALES on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(FALES, LISA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS J. WELLING on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(WELLING, THOMAS)
April 17, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIELLE R. FOLEY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(FOLEY, DANIELLE)
April 10, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN LEMMO on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEMMO, ANN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(FOUSE, LINDSAY)
April 8, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI)
April 5, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JAMES DOUGLAS BALDRIDGE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(BALDRIDGE, JAMES)
April 1, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(WILSON, CHIRSTOPHER)
April 1, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by S TURNER on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TURNER, S)
April 1, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK THOMAS KOONS on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KOONS, ERIK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MARTIN TALADAY on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TALADAY, JOHN)
March 1, 2019 Filing 112 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 28, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID)
February 28, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON)
February 28, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC)
February 26, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MCCLAM on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(MCCLAM, JOHN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(ENGSELL, TIFFANY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN E. BIZAR on behalf of CITRON PHARMA, LLC with Certificate of Service(BIZAR, STEVEN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA W. ALLON on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(ALLON, DEVORA)
February 26, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXIA R BRANCATO on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(BRANCATO, ALEXIA)
February 26, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN OGBURN on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(OGBURN, ERIN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY P. LEFKOWITZ on behalf of UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC with Certificate of Service(LEFKOWITZ, JAY)
February 25, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO. As To Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc from Count 27 of the Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINA R. DIMATTIO on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(DIMATTIO, MELINA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S WELLIN on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(WELLIN, ANDREW)
February 22, 2019 Filing 95 VALEANT AND OCEANSIDES MOTION TO DISMISS DIRECT PURCHASERS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND KROGER PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC.MEMORANDUM OF LAW, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(SEE DOC NO. 876 IN 16-MD-2724)(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2019: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (kp, ).
February 22, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by ZAREMA A. JARAMILLO on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(JARAMILLO, ZAREMA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by KATIE ROSE GLYNN on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(GLYNN, KATIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs', Kroger Plaintiffs', and Humana's Amended Complaints) filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBSEN, RAYMOND)
February 21, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss /Teligent's Individual Motion to Dismiss the Kroger and Humana Complaints Against Teligent, Inc. filed by TELIGENT, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Teligent's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
February 21, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Perrigo New York, Inc.'s Individual Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' "Overarching Conspiracy" Claims filed by PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EVERETT, J.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN DANIEL GANT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(GANT, BRYAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER K. MCDEVITT on behalf of TELIGENT, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCDEVITT, HEATHER)
February 21, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims) filed by ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Humana Inc. and Kroger Co. complaints filed by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON R. PARISH on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(PARISH, JASON)
February 21, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI on behalf of ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. with Certificate of Service(KITLOWSKI, BRADLEY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAPMAN, JULIA) (Main Document 83 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (kp, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by G&W LABORATORIES, INC..Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant G&W Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Direct Purchaser and Kroger Plaintiffs' Complaints, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Kroger Plaintiffs' and Humana, Inc.'s Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BLAD, LEIV)
February 21, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by LEIV H. BLAD on behalf of LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(BLAD, LEIV)
February 21, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Claims in the Multi-Drug Complaints) filed by GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss THE OVERARCHING CONSPIRACY CLAIMS FILED BY END-PAYER PLAINTIFFS, INDIRECT RESELLER PLAINTIFFS, KROGER PLAINTIFFS, AND HUMANA, INC. filed by WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims filed by APOTEX CORP..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Overarching Conspiracy Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 21, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED-COUNT ONE OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY THE KROGER PLAINTIFFS filed by LANNETT COMPANY, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARTH, GERALD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.'s Motion Under FRCP 12(b)(6) to Dismiss Various Plaintiffs' So-Called "Overarching Conspiracy" Complaints filed by MAYNE PHARMA USA INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss (Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) filed by OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC.Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Valeant and Oceanside's Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, Declaration of Jay D. Smith in Support of Valeant and Oceanside's Motion to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' First Amended Complaint and Kroger Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay D. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1 to Jay D. Smith Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LAMB, MATTHEW)
February 21, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by R. BRENDAN FEE on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(FEE, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(ZASTROW, DENNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. REED on behalf of GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA with Certificate of Service(REED, STEVEN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by CONNIE LEE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEE, CONNIE)
February 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(HARTMAN, MICHAEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. CARR on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(CARR, JEFFREY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by JAN P. LEVINE on behalf of WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. with Certificate of Service(LEVINE, JAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA CHAPMAN on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CHAPMAN, JULIA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK DESIMONE on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(DESIMONE, FRANK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by HARVEY BARTLE, IV on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARTLE, HARVEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACEY F MILICH on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(MILICH, TRACEY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. STEMPEL on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEMPEL, SCOTT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR on behalf of PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC. with Certificate of Service(EVERETT, J.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL)
February 20, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M KOWAL on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(KOWAL, STEVEN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(DONAHUE, LAUREN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by KENN BROTMAN on behalf of MAYNE PHARMA USA INC. with Certificate of Service(BROTMAN, KENN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. NAGLE on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(NAGLE, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(HAAS, ELIZABETH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES T. MCKEOWN on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MCKEOWN, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. MATTHEWS on behalf of APOTEX CORP. with Certificate of Service(MATTHEWS, JAMES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. REITMEYER on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(REITMEYER, CHARLES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN)
February 20, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(ADELSTEIN, ROBIN)
February 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW C LAMB on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(LAMB, MATTHEW)
February 1, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. ROBERTSON on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(ROBERTSON, MARK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD STEIN on behalf of OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(STEIN, GERALD)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION REGARDING WAIVER OF SERVICE IS HEREBY APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/31/2019. 1/31/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 839 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D FITTS on behalf of AKORN, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(FITTS, AMY)
January 11, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY C. PORCELLI on behalf of AKORN, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC. with Certificate of Service(PORCELLI, ANTHONY)
January 10, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNA M. RATHBUN on behalf of G&W LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(RATHBUN, ANNA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGUERITE M. SULLIVAN on behalf of G&W LABORATORIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SULLIVAN, MARGUERITE)
December 21, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to G&W LABORATORIES, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC. Forwarded To: William J. Blechman on 12/26/2018 (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC, WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., filed by THE KROGER CO., ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by THE KROGER CO., ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P.. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2018: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (ems).
December 3, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel on Global Issues filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. **(FILED IN ERROR; DUPLICATE FILING)** (HANSELMAN, DAVID) Modified on 12/4/2018 (ems).
December 3, 2018 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel on Global Issues filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (HANSELMAN, DAVID)
October 29, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery filed by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent M. Catanzaro)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
October 23, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery with Certificate of Service filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(HANSELMAN, DAVID)
October 23, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. GOLDBERG on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(GOLDBERG, SETH)
October 23, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by WAYNE A. MACK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MACK, WAYNE)
October 23, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KULIK, SARAH)
October 8, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FLOCH, BRANDON)
October 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON S FLOCH on behalf of ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO. with Certificate of Service(FLOCH, BRANDON)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.'S MOTION TO LIMIT DISCOVERY IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/1/2018. 10/2/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 716 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 25 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.. (JACOBSEN, RAYMOND) Modified on 10/2/2018 (kp, ).
September 25, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery (Private Plaintiffs' Opposition) filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRAY, JOSHUA)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED SECOND STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION TO LIMIT DISCOVERY IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/24/2018. 9/24/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 713 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
September 17, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery filed by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Limit Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(MAHONEY, STACEY)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY VAN VUREN on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. (VAN VUREN, ANTHONY)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. (MAHONEY, STACEY)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING ON IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.'S MOTION TO LIMIT DISCOVERY IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/10/2018. 9/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 707 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
August 28, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Order Limiting Discovery filed by IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Limit Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20)(HANSELMAN, DAVID)
May 25, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Caplan, Caplan & Caplan re: served Summons and Complaint (Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service) upon Ascend Laboratories, LLC by Corporate on 5/21/18 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(RANDALL, SAMUEL)
May 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA BARTON GRAY on behalf of ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO. with Certificate of Service(GRAY, JOSHUA)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/3/2018. 4/3/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 581 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF AMANDA B. ROBINSON IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/28/2018. 3/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 580 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems)
March 8, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Amanda B. Robinson filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Certificate of Service. (FEE PAID ON 3/27/2018) (DRAGALIN, MICHAELA) Modified on 3/22/2018 (ems). Modified on 3/28/2018 (ems).
March 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAELA DRAGALIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DRAGALIN, MICHAELA)
March 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISON TANCHYK on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TANCHYK, ALISON)
March 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J. GORDON COONEY, JR on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(COONEY, J.)
March 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PEASE on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEASE, JOHN)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY PTO NOS. 21 & 37 TO ACCOMMODATE DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS IN THE CASE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART AS FOLLOWS: C.A. 18-284 IS INCORPORATED INTO THE MDL AS OUTLINED HEREIN, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/22/2018; 2/22/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 5678 IN 16-MD-2724). (tjd)
February 20, 2018 Filing 7 Kroger Direct Action Plaintiffs' Supplement to Motion to Modify Pretrial Orders (Dkt. 6) filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. Certificate of Service. (BLECHMAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 2/21/2018 (ems).
February 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Modify Pretrial Order Nos. 21 & 37 to Accommodate Direct Action Plaintiffs in this MDL Case filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
February 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNA T. NEILL on behalf of ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO. with Certificate of Service(NEILL, ANNA)
February 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT E. PERWIN on behalf of ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO. with Certificate of Service(PERWIN, SCOTT)
January 30, 2018 Filing 3 Statement of Kroger Direct Action Plaintiffs in Support of an Overarching Conspiracy Track by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (BLECHMAN, WILLIAM)
January 22, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO..(ahf)
January 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P., THE KROGER CO.. (ahf)
January 22, 2018 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. 35 Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/24/2018 (ahf)
January 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., APOTEX CORP., ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., EPIC PHARMA, LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PLIVA, INC., SANDOZ, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 172282.), filed by THE KROGER CO., ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC, H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE KROGER CO. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BLECHMAN
Represented By: JOSHUA BARTON GRAY
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Represented By: BRANDON S FLOCH
Represented By: ANNA T. NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.E. BUTT GROCERY COMPANY L.P.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BLECHMAN
Represented By: JOSHUA BARTON GRAY
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Represented By: BRANDON S FLOCH
Represented By: ANNA T. NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE KROGER CO.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. BLECHMAN
Represented By: JOSHUA BARTON GRAY
Represented By: SCOTT E. PERWIN
Represented By: BRANDON S FLOCH
Represented By: ANNA T. NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLIVA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.
Represented By: JASON R. PARISH
Represented By: BRADLEY J. KITLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: J. GORDON COONEY, JR.
Represented By: JOHN J. PEASE
Represented By: AMANDA B. ROBINSON
Represented By: MICHAELA DRAGALIN
Represented By: ALISON TANCHYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: TRACEY F MILICH
Represented By: HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Represented By: J. CLAYTON EVERETT, JR.
Represented By: FRANK DESIMONE
Represented By: SCOTT A. STEMPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: CLIFFORD KATZ
Represented By: DAMON W. SUDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN T. FEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOCKHARDT USA LLC
Represented By: CLIFFORD KATZ
Represented By: DAMON W. SUDEN
Represented By: WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY VAN VUREN
Represented By: STACEY ANNE MAHONEY
Represented By: CHARLES J. REITMEYER
Represented By: VICTORIA PENG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA C CROUSHORE
Represented By: MARGARET A. ROGERS
Represented By: ADA VICTORIA ANON
Represented By: SAUL P MORGENSTERN
Represented By: KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG
Represented By: LAURA S. SHORES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRON PHARMA, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN E. BIZAR
Represented By: JOHN MCCLAM
Represented By: TIFFANY ELLEN ENGSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: S TURNER
Represented By: LAURI A. KAVULICH
Represented By: ERIK THOMAS KOONS
Represented By: LINDSAY S. FOUSE
Represented By: JOHN MARTIN TALADAY
Represented By: ANN LEMMO
Represented By: CHIRSTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAGE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: JAMES T. MCKEOWN
Represented By: JOHN F. NAGLE
Represented By: JAMES W. MATTHEWS
Represented By: ELIZABETH A.N. HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: DEVORA W. ALLON
Represented By: JAY P. LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: ALEXIA R BRANCATO
Represented By: ERIN OGBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Represented By: JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN
Represented By: SARAH F. TEICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYNE PHARMA USA INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ
Represented By: LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE
Represented By: KENN BROTMAN
Represented By: STEVEN M KOWAL
Represented By: BRIAN J SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: DAVID L. HANSELMAN
Represented By: RAYMOND A. JACOBSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.
Represented By: JAN P. LEVINE
Represented By: ROBIN P. SUMNER
Represented By: JEFFREY A. CARR
Represented By: CONNIE LEE
Represented By: DENNIE BENJIMAN ZASTROW
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARTMAN
Represented By: MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC PHARMA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKORN, INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY C. PORCELLI
Represented By: AMY D FITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: ARIO FAZLI
Represented By: KATIE ROSE GLYNN
Represented By: ZAREMA A. JARAMILLO
Represented By: LEIV H. BLAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS BECKER
Represented By: JULIA CHAPMAN
Represented By: GERALD E. ARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC.
Represented By: HECTOR TORRES
Represented By: SHERON KORPUS
Represented By: MARC E. KASOWITZ
Represented By: SETH B. DAVIS
Represented By: SETH A. MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: DAVID M. MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: WAYNE A. MACK
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Represented By: HEATHER K. MCDEVITT
Represented By: BRYAN DANIEL GANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDL LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY C. BANK
Represented By: SETH C. SILBER
Represented By: CHUL PAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: ANDREW C BERNASCONI
Represented By: COURTNEY B AVERBACH
Represented By: EDWARD B. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: WILLIAM J SHERIDAN
Represented By: JENNIFER M DRISCOLL
Represented By: KARL E. HERRMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: MATTHEW C LAMB
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: GERALD STEIN
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW C LAMB
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: GERALD STEIN
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA
Represented By: MELINA R. DIMATTIO
Represented By: R. BRENDAN FEE
Represented By: ANDREW S WELLIN
Represented By: STEVEN A. REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: ANNA M. RATHBUN
Represented By: MARGUERITE M. SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW C LAMB
Represented By: ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN
Represented By: GERALD STEIN
Represented By: MARK A. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?